Freitag v. La Jolla Bridge, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Krista Freitag
Defendant: La Jolla Bridge, LLC, Frontier Global Partners, Horacio Valeiras and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 3:2021cv01642
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Allison H Goddard
2 Judge: Thomas J Whelan
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1367
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Via Videoconference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 11/8/2021.(dxf)
October 27, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Krista Freitag, as to Horacio Valeiras. (Fates, Edward) (dxf).
October 27, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Krista Freitag, as to Frontier Global Partners. (Fates, Edward) (dxf).
October 27, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Krista Freitag, as to La Jolla Bridge, LLC. (Fates, Edward) (dxf).
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Larry Alan Burns for all further proceedings. Judge Thomas J. Whelan no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:19-cv-01628-LAB-AHG. The new case number is 3:21-cv-01642-LAB-AHG. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 10/6/2021. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 10/5/2021.(jrm)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Krista Freitag of case(s) 3:19-cv-01628-LAB-AHG . (Fates, Edward)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (fth) (rmc).
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against La Jolla Bridge, LLC; Frontier Global Partners; Horacio Valeiras; Does 1 through 10 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-16146802.), filed by Krista Freitag. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1642-W-AHG. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Fates, Edward) (fth) (rmc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freitag v. La Jolla Bridge, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krista Freitag
Represented By: Edward G Fates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Jolla Bridge, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Global Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horacio Valeiras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?