Halushka v. Northrop Grumman Employee Benefit Plan et al
Plaintiff: Earl Halushka
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Employee Benefit Plan and American Family Life Assurance Company (AFLAC)
Case Number: 3:2021cv01661
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: M James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER confirming settlement and setting deadline to file a joint motion for dismissal. Settlement Disposition Conference set for 1/18/2022 at 9:30am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 11/19/2021.(jpp)
November 18, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement Joint by Earl Halushka (Troya, Alis) (jpp).
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 12/1/2021 at 9:30am. Joint Discovery Plan due 11/19/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/26/2021.(jpp)
October 25, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Family Life Assurance Company (AFLAC), Northrop Grumman Employee Benefit Plan identifying Corporate Parent AFLAC Incorporated for American Family Life Assurance Company (AFLAC), Northrop Grumman Employee Benefit Plan.. (Torrence, Francis) (jpp).
October 25, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by American Family Life Assurance Company (AFLAC), Northrop Grumman Employee Benefit Plan.(Torrence, Francis)Attorney Francis J Torrence added to party American Family Life Assurance Company (AFLAC)(pty:dft), Attorney Francis J Torrence added to party Northrop Grumman Employee Benefit Plan(pty:dft) (jpp).
October 20, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Earl Halushka. Northrop Grumman Employee Benefit Plan served. (Troya, Alis)(ag).
October 20, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Earl Halushka. American Family Life Assurance Company (AFLAC) served. (Troya, Alis) (ag).
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (fth)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Family Life Assurance Company (AFLAC), Northrop Grumman Employee Benefit Plan ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-16154829.), filed by Earl Halushka. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1661-L-BLM. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Troya, Alis) (fth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halushka v. Northrop Grumman Employee Benefit Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Halushka
Represented By: Alis Elias Troya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Employee Benefit Plan
Represented By: Francis J Torrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Life Assurance Company (AFLAC)
Represented By: Francis J Torrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?