Collazo Gutierrez v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Martha Collazo Gutierrez
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 3:2021cv01702
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 id
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martha Collazo Gutierrez. Kilolo Kijakazi served. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cho, Young)
November 3, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jpp)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 10/18/2021. (ag)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, Pursuant to General Order 707, by Martha Collazo Gutierrez. (ggv)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Martha Collazo Gutierrez. (fth)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Martha Collazo Gutierrez. No Parties With Financial Interest. (fth)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASE ASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to General Order 707, United States Magistrate Jill L. Burkhardt has been randomly assigned. Plaintiff should print and complete the attached consent/declination form. The executed form must be received by the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of this notice. (fth)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, IFP Filed, filed by Martha Collazo Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1702-JLB. Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt is assigned to the case. (Cho, Young) (fth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collazo Gutierrez v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Collazo Gutierrez
Represented By: Young Chul Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?