Freitag v. Potter et al
Plaintiff: Krista Freitag
Defendant: Robb Potter and Does 1 Through 10
Case Number: 3:2021cv01717
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Karen S Crawford
2 Judge: Allison H Goddard
3 Judge: Todd W Robinson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0754
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation And Case Management Conference Via Videoconference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 11/8/2021.(dxf)
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Krista Freitag, as to Robb Potter. (Fates, Edward) (dxf).
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard for all further proceedings. Judge Todd W. Robinson, Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:19-cv-01628-LAB-AHG. The new case number is 21-cv-01717-LAB-AHG. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 10/7/21. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 10/7/21.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sxa)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Krista Freitag of case(s) 3:19-cv-01628-LAB-AHG . (Fates, Edward)(sxa).
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (axc)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robb Potter, Does 1 Through 10 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-16192561.), filed by Krista Freitag. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1717-TWR-KSC. Judge Todd W. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Fates, Edward)(axc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freitag v. Potter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krista Freitag
Represented By: Edward G Fates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robb Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 Through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?