Carlsberg v. Wilken
Plaintiff: Deanna Carlsberg
Defendant: Robert L. Wilken and Denis McDonough
Case Number: 3:2021cv01746
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Ruben B Brooks
Referring Judge: Marilyn L Huff
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0794
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Filing 29 Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks assigned to transfer case from District of Utah. (no document attached) (jpp)
October 8, 2021 Filing 28 Case transferred in from District of Utah; Case Number 1:20-cv-00080. Original file received electronically
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Transfer Venue and Enlarging Time to File Responsive Pleading: This matter is transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of California, and Defendant has 60 days from the date of transfer to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/8/21. (dla) [Transferred from Utah on 10/8/2021.]
October 7, 2021 Filing 26 Stipulated MOTION to Change Venue and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Denis McDonough. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Hilbig, Todd) [Transferred from Utah on 10/8/2021.]
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #15 Amended Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Denis McDonough to 10/7/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/2/21. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 10/8/2021.]
September 2, 2021 Filing 24 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Denis McDonough. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Hilbig, Todd) [Transferred from Utah on 10/8/2021.]
September 1, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd C. Hilbig on behalf of Denis McDonough (Hilbig, Todd) [Transferred from Utah on 10/8/2021.]
July 27, 2021 Filing 22 Plaintiff's RESPONSE re #20 Order,of July 8, 2021 filed by Deanna Carlsberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachments: Copies of Green Cards)(Holdsworth, David) [Transferred from Utah on 10/8/2021.]
July 12, 2021 Filing 21 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deanna Carlsberg. Denis McDonough served on 7/7/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Holdsworth, David) [Transferred from Utah on 10/8/2021.]
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Plaintiff is to complete service within 30 days from the date of this order, or face sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/8/21 (alt) [Transferred from Utah on 10/8/2021.]
July 6, 2021 Filing 19 Plaintiff's RESPONSE re #18 Order,to Provide Status Update (Order to Show Cause) filed by Deanna Carlsberg. (Attachments: #1 Errata Exhibit 1: USPS Receipt)(Holdsworth, David) [Transferred from Utah on 10/8/2021.]
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Plaintiff is to provide an update on the status of this case and intentions to proceed within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 6/16/21 (alt) [Transferred from Utah on 10/8/2021.]
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #16 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Deanna Carlsberg. Plaintiff is HEREBY ORDERED to properly serve the Amended Complaint within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. A failure to do so may result in the court dismissing the matter for a failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 4/16/2021. (reb) [Transferred from Utah on 10/8/2021.]
March 17, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #13 Order to Show Cause, filed by Deanna Carlsberg. (Holdsworth, David) [Transferred from Utah on 10/8/2021.]
March 17, 2021 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Denis McDonough with Jury Demand. filed by Deanna Carlsberg. (Attachments: #1 Errata Exhibit 1: Final Agency Decision) (Holdsworth, David) [Transferred from Utah on 10/8/2021.]
March 16, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE FROM THE COURT - Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(d), Denis McDonough is substituted for Robert L. Wilkin is a defendant in this suit. (jwt) [Transferred from Utah on 10/8/2021.]
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Plaintiff is directed to respond in writing within 14 days from the date of this order and inform the Court of the status of the case and intentions to proceed. Failure to do so will result in recommending dismissal of the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/3/21. (dla) [Transferred from Utah on 10/8/2021.]
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff(s) must propose a discovery schedule to defendant(s) in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within twenty-one (21) days after any defendant has been served or any defendant has appeared, unless any party is appearing pro se. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/30/2020. (lnp) [Transferred from Utah on 10/8/2021.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to John Huber. (kn) [Transferred from Utah on 10/8/2021.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to US Attorney General. (kn) [Transferred from Utah on 10/8/2021.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Robert L. Wilken. (kn) [Transferred from Utah on 10/8/2021.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 Plaintiff's RESPONSE re #6 Order,Directing Plaintiff to File Additional Information filed by Deanna Carlsberg. (Holdsworth, David) [Transferred from Utah on 10/8/2021.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Holdsworth on behalf of Deanna Carlsberg (Holdsworth, David) [Transferred from Utah on 10/8/2021.]
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Additional Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/7/2020. (lnp) [Transferred from Utah on 10/8/2021.]
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 7/2/2020. (lnp) [Transferred from Utah on 10/8/2021.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Robert L. Wilken (Originally received by the court on 06/29/2020). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Deanna Carlsberg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #2 Exhibit Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr (kn) [Transferred from Utah on 10/8/2021.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 07/01/2020. (kn) [Transferred from Utah on 10/8/2021.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 REASSIGNMENT of case to District Judge. Case randomly reassigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr.. Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg no longer assigned to the case as the presiding judge but will review the #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jwt) [Transferred from Utah on 10/8/2021.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne Oberg for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 06/29/2020) filed by Plaintiff Deanna Carlsberg. (kn) [Transferred from Utah on 10/8/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlsberg v. Wilken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Carlsberg
Represented By: David J. Holdsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Wilken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denis McDonough
Represented By: Todd C. Hilbig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?