Bautista v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Geraldine C. Bautista
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 3:2021cv01750
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Daniel E Butcher
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 id
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jpp)
November 2, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER. Re: #7 , Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher is no longer assigned as presiding judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher for all further proceedings. The new case number is 21cv1750-DEB.(no document attached) (sjt)
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER. Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher is no longer assigned as presiding judge. Case reassigned to Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher for all further proceedings. The new case number is 21cv1750-H-DEB.(no document attached) (sjt)
October 29, 2021 Filing 7 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, Pursuant to General Order 707, by Geraldine C. Bautista. (axc)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #3 Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 10/21/2021. (ag)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASE ASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to General Order 707, United States Magistrate Daniel E. Butcher has been randomly assigned. Plaintiff should print and complete the attached consent/declination form. The executed form must be received by the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of this notice. (axc)
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Geraldine C. Bautista. (axc)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Geraldine C. Bautista. (axc)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, IFP Filed, filed by Geraldine C. Bautista. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1750-DEB. Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher is assigned to the case. (Holmberg, Matthew)(axc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bautista v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine C. Bautista
Represented By: Matthew Franklin Holmberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?