Gopher Media LLC et al v. Melone et al
Plaintiff: Gopher Media LLC a Nevada Limited Liability Corporation formerly known as Local Clicks doing business as Doctor Multimedia, Local Clicks and Ajay Thakore
Defendant: American Pizza Manufacturing, Andrew Melone, American Pizza Mfg., Does 1-10 and AGFM Family Enterprises, LLC
Counter Defendant: Gopher Media LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01909
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Referring Judge: William V Gallo
2 Judge: Linda Lopez
3 Judge: Ruth Bermudez Montenegro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 ra Race Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Gopher Media LLC, Ajay Thakore, filed by AGFM Family Enterprises, LLC, Andrew Melone. (Praskievicz, Owen) (jpp).
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Defendants' ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint by Andrew Melone, AGFM Family Enterprises, LLC.(Watson, Timothy)Attorney Timothy J Watson added to party AGFM Family Enterprises, LLC(pty:dft) (jpp).
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SCHEDULING ORDER regulating discovery and other pre-trial proceedings. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 1/30/2023 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 7/5/2023. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/24/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2023 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5B before District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/17/2022.(jpp)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jpp)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against American Pizza Manufacturing, Does 1-10, Andrew Melone, AGFM Family Enterprises, LLC, filed by Gopher Media LLC, Ajay Thakore.New Summons Requested. (Chalk, Pamela) (jpp).
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Minute Order. for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo:The Parties, their counsel, and any insurance adjusters shall appear in person for the May 11, 2022 Early Neutral Evaluation Conference at 2:30 p.m. (no document attached) (djk)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #24 Joint Motion for leave to amend Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro on 5/5/2022. (jpp)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER resetting Early Neutral Evaluation and Video Case Management Conference to 5/11/2022 at 2:30pm. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/18/2022.(jpp)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Gopher Media LLC, Ajay Thakore (Chalk, Pamela) (jpp).
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER resetting video Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and video Case Management Conference to 5/11/2022 at 2:00pm. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/12/2022.(jpp)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, MOTION to Amend/Correct Joint Motion And Stipulation; Request For Order Re: Leave To Amend Plaintiffs' Original Complaint by Gopher Media LLC, Ajay Thakore. (Chalk, Pamela) (dlg).
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Judge Cynthia Bashant is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Ruth Bermudez Montenegro for all further proceedings. The new case number is 21cv1909-RBM-WVG. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 4/7/22.(jmo)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order on Joint Motion to Continue Deadline to Exchange Initial Disclosures (ECF No. #21 ). Deadline to exchange initial disclosures 4/18/22. Plaintiffs to file a motion for leave to amend the complaint no later than Friday, 4/8/22.Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/1/22. (jmo)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint Motion And Stipulation; Request For Order Re: Continuing Deadline For Exchange Of Initial Disclosures by Gopher Media LLC. (Chalk, Pamela) (jmo).
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel E Gardenswartz on behalf of American Pizza Manufacturing, Andrew Melone (Gardenswartz, Daniel)Attorney Daniel E Gardenswartz added to party American Pizza Manufacturing(pty:cc), Attorney Daniel E Gardenswartz added to party Andrew Melone(pty:cc) (jmo).
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE AND ORDER for (1) Video Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, (2) Video Case Management Conference, and (3) Telephonic Status Conference. Zoom video Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2022 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Attorneys-only Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/22/2022 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Joint Discovery Plan due 4/13/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/10/22.(jmo)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ANSWER to #14 Counterclaim by Gopher Media LLC, Ajay Thakore.(Chalk, Pamela) (jmo).
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to Defendants Counterclaims #16 . The Court sets February 7, 2022, as Plaintiffs deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Defendants Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 1/25/2022. (zda)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File to respond to counterclaims by Gopher Media LLC, Ajay Thakore. (Chalk, Pamela) (jmo).
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion And Stipulation To Extend Time For Plaintiffs To Respond To Defendants' Counterclaims; [Proposed] Order by Gopher Media LLC, Ajay Thakore. (Chalk, Pamela) **QC Mailer to withdraw and refile without proposed order as part of motion. (jmo). Modified on 2/7/2022 to withdraw per chambers (jmo).
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs, filed by Andrew Melone, American Pizza Manufacturing. (Praskievicz, Owen) (dxf).
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Andrew Melone and AGFM FAMILY ENTERPRISES, LLC, erroneously sued as American Pizza Manufacturing by American Pizza Manufacturing, Andrew Melone.(Watson, Timothy) (dxf).
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Granting Defendants' Unopposed Ex Parte Application to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (ECF No. #11 ). Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 1/3/2022. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 12/29/21. (jmo)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by American Pizza Manufacturing, Andrew Melone. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy Watson)(Watson, Timothy)Attorney Timothy J Watson added to party American Pizza Manufacturing(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy J Watson added to party Andrew Melone(pty:dft) (jmo).
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Linda Lopez to the calendar of the Honorable William V. Gallo for all further proceedings. All conference or hearing dates currently set before Magistrate Judge Lopez remain as scheduled before Magistrate Judge Gallo. Any dates set before any district judge remain unchanged. The new case number is 21cv1909 BAS (WVG).(no document attached) (jcj)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Anton N. Handal on behalf of Gopher Media LLC, Ajay Thakore (Handal, Anton)Attorney Anton N. Handal added to party Gopher Media LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Anton N. Handal added to party Ajay Thakore(pty:pla) (jmo).
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Joint Motion to extend time to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint to on or before 12/27/2021. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 12/08/2021. (jpp)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation To Extend Time For Defendants To Respond To Plaintiffs' Complaint by Gopher Media LLC, Ajay Thakore. (Chalk, Pamela) (jpp).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Anton N. Handal for Plaintiffs by Pamela C. Chalk on behalf of Gopher Media LLC, Ajay Thakore (Chalk, Pamela) **QC mailer to withdraw document and properly file NOA. Another attorney cannot enter a NOA on behalf of someone else. Attorney Handal not added to case** (jmo).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Pamela C. Chalk for Plaintiffs by Pamela C. Chalk on behalf of Gopher Media LLC, Ajay Thakore (Chalk, Pamela) (jmo).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gopher Media LLC, Ajay Thakore. Andrew Melone served. (Chalk, Pamela) (jmo).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gopher Media LLC, Ajay Thakore. American Pizza Manufacturing served. (Chalk, Pamela) (jmo).
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (axc) (rmc).
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against American Pizza Manufacturing, Does 1-10, Andrew Melone ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-16306597.), filed by Gopher Media LLC., Ajay Thakore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1909-BAS-LL. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (Chalk, Pamela)(axc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gopher Media LLC et al v. Melone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gopher Media LLC a Nevada Limited Liability Corporation formerly known as Local Clicks doing business as Doctor Multimedia
Represented By: Pamela C. Chalk
Represented By: Anton N. Handal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Clicks
Represented By: Pamela C. Chalk
Represented By: Anton N. Handal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ajay Thakore
Represented By: Pamela C. Chalk
Represented By: Anton N. Handal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Pizza Manufacturing
Represented By: Timothy J Watson
Represented By: Owen M. Praskievicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Melone
Represented By: Timothy J Watson
Represented By: Owen M. Praskievicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Pizza Mfg.
Represented By: Timothy J Watson
Represented By: Owen M. Praskievicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGFM Family Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Owen M. Praskievicz
Represented By: Timothy J Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Gopher Media LLC
Represented By: Anton N. Handal
Represented By: Pamela C. Chalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?