E.C. et al v. Lincoln Military Property Management LP et al
Plaintiff: Emma Caraballo, Violet Bradley, Zachary Merten, Gretta Caraballo, Rebecca Patterson, Johnathon Merten, E. C., V. B. and Z. M.
Defendant: Lincoln Military Property Management LP, LMH Holdings, LLC, Camp Pendleton & Quantico Housing, LLC, LPC Pendleton Quantico Housing LLC, Rheem Manufacturing Company, Honeywell International, Inc. and Does 1 through 100
Case Number: 3:2021cv02070
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 pi
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LMH Holdings, LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Reyna, Kristin) (tcf).
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by LMH Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO LMH Holding's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration Dec of Kristin N. Reyna DeHart ISO LMH Holding's Motion to Dismiss, #3 Request for Judicial Notice Request for Judicial Notice ISO LMH Holding's Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit Exhibits to LMH Holding's Motion to Dismiss)(Reyna, Kristin)Attorney Kristin Nell Reyna added to party LMH Holdings, LLC(pty:dft) (tcf).
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by V. B., E. C. LMH Holdings, LLC served. (Ritterbeck, Jamie) (tcf).
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Alexander Hanna on behalf of Camp Pendleton & Quantico Housing, LLC, LPC Pendleton Quantico Housing LLC, Lincoln Military Property Management LP (Hanna, Timothy)Attorney Timothy Alexander Hanna added to party Camp Pendleton & Quantico Housing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Alexander Hanna added to party LPC Pendleton Quantico Housing LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Alexander Hanna added to party Lincoln Military Property Management LP(pty:dft) (tcf).
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Camp Pendleton & Quantico Housing, LLC, Lincoln Military Property Management LP, LPC Pendleton Quantico Housing LLC re #17 Notice of Appearance, filed by LPC Pendleton Quantico Housing LLC, Lincoln Military Property Management LP, Camp Pendleton & Quantico Housing, LLC . (Hanna, Timothy) (tcf).
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ***Document withdrawn per ECF #8 *** NOTICE of Appearance Timothy A. Hanna, ESQ. by Kristin Nell Reyna on behalf of Camp Pendleton & Quantico Housing, LLC, LPC Pendleton Quantico Housing LLC, Lincoln Military Property Management LP (Reyna, Kristin) QC mailer sent re: document filed under the wrong attorney account (tcf). Modified to withdraw on 2/3/2022 (tcf).
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference will be held via videoconference on 3/14/2022 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Joint Discovery Plan due 3/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 2/1/2022. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(zda)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF ERRATA by Lincoln Military Property Management LP re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Reyna, Kristin) QC-mailer sent (axc).
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Camp Pendleton & Quantico Housing, LLC, LPC Pendleton Quantico Housing LLC. (Attachments: #1 CPQH Corp. Disclosure Statement, #2 LMPM Corp. Disclosure Statement, #3 LPCPQ Corp. Disclosure Statement)(Reyna, Kristin) (axc).
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lincoln Military Property Management LP. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice RJN with Exhibits)(Reyna, Kristin)Attorney Kristin Nell Reyna added to party Camp Pendleton & Quantico Housing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kristin Nell Reyna added to party LPC Pendleton Quantico Housing LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kristin Nell Reyna added to party Lincoln Military Property Management LP(pty:dft) (axc).
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Amended Summons Issued as to First Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (tcf)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Issued as to First Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (tcf)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by E. C. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Garrard, Corey) (tcf).
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by E. C. (Garrard, Corey) (tcf).
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Norma Jessica Lujan on behalf of E. C. (Lujan, Norma)Attorney Norma Jessica Lujan added to party E. C.(pty:pla) (tcf).
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie M Ritterbeck on behalf of E. C. (Ritterbeck, Jamie)Attorney Jamie M Ritterbeck added to party E. C.(pty:pla) (tcf).
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ***Document withdrawn per ECF #7 *** COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by E. C. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Garrard, Corey) QC mailer sent re: signature does not match account used to file (tcf). Modified to withdraw on 12/16/2021 (tcf).
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Janis L. Sammartino Rejecting Complaint, from Plaintiff Johnathon Merten. Non-compliance with local rule(s):General Order No. 514: [C]ounsel or parties shall be required to remove or redact the... Names of Minor Children. If the involvement of a minor child must be mentioned, only the initials of that child should be used.. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxf)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (ggv)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ***DOCUMENT STRICKEN Per ECF No. #3 *** COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against All Defendants (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC- 16396186.), filed by Johnathon Merten, et al. The new case number is 3:21-cv-2070-JLS-BLM. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Garrard, Corey)(ggv)(jrd)(Attachment 1 replaced on 12/14/2021)(dxf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E.C. et al v. Lincoln Military Property Management LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Caraballo
Represented By: Corey Clarke Garrard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Violet Bradley
Represented By: Corey Clarke Garrard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Merten
Represented By: Corey Clarke Garrard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gretta Caraballo
Represented By: Corey Clarke Garrard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Patterson
Represented By: Corey Clarke Garrard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnathon Merten
Represented By: Corey Clarke Garrard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. C.
Represented By: Corey Clarke Garrard
Represented By: Jamie M Ritterbeck
Represented By: Norma Jessica Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V. B.
Represented By: Corey Clarke Garrard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z. M.
Represented By: Corey Clarke Garrard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Military Property Management LP
Represented By: Angela M. Hampton
Represented By: Kristin Nell Reyna
Represented By: Timothy Alexander Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LMH Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Angela M. Hampton
Represented By: Kristin Nell Reyna
Represented By: Timothy Alexander Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camp Pendleton & Quantico Housing, LLC
Represented By: Angela M. Hampton
Represented By: Kristin Nell Reyna
Represented By: Timothy Alexander Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LPC Pendleton Quantico Housing LLC
Represented By: Angela M. Hampton
Represented By: Kristin Nell Reyna
Represented By: Timothy Alexander Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rheem Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Barry Schirm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?