Reiner v. Navarette et al
Plaintiff: Mark Reiner and Martin Reiner
Defendant: Jorge Navarette, Tom Zhang, Tani Cantil-Sakauye, Carol Corrigan, Goodwin Liu, Leondra Kruger, Mariano-Florentino Cuellar, The State Bar of California, Vanessa Holton, Sean Strauss, Jennifer Pinney, Michael Chavez, Catherine Purcell, Sean Selegue, Ruben Duran, Sonia Delen, Mark Broughton, Hailyn Chen, Jose Cisneros, Juan De La Cruz, Christine Gonong, Joshua Perttula, Melanie Shelby, Mark Toney, Brandon Stallings, Ronnie Carplane, Manuel Graiwer, Gary Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Craig Holden, Bryan Leifer, John Barber, Steven Yee, Steve Belilove, Rosely George, Gregory Alarcon, Mitchell Beckloff, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard Smith, LLP, Tayuan Ma, Arnold Sowell, Jr., John Haubrich, Jr., Does 1 Through 10, Mark Kim, Sarah Overton, Cummings McClorey & Acho P.L.O., Dennis Perluss, John Segal, Suzanne Segal and Ronnie Caplane
Case Number: 3:2021cv02077
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael S Berg
Referring Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
2 Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
3 Judge: Robert S Huie
4 Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Civil Remedies: Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2023 Filing 58 NOTICE Notice of Entry of Judgment by Mark Broughton, Michael Chavez, Hailyn Chen, Jose Cisneros, Juan De La Cruz, Sonia Delen, Ruben Duran, Christine Gonong, Vanessa Holton, Joshua Perttula, Jennifer Pinney, Catherine Purcell, Sean Selegue, Melanie Shelby, Arnold Sowell, Jr, Brandon Stallings, Sean Strauss, The State Bar of California, Mark Toney re #57 Judgment (Himes, Rita) (alns).
January 23, 2023 Filing 57 JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants against Martin Reiner. Signed by District Judge Robert S. Huie on 1/23/2023.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(alns) (jms).
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #55 Motion for Judgment. Signed by District Judge Robert S. Huie on 1/23/2023. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(alns) (jms).
January 23, 2023 Filing 55 MOTION for Judgment Request for Entry of Judgment by Mark Broughton, Michael Chavez, Hailyn Chen, Jose Cisneros, Juan De La Cruz, Sonia Delen, Ruben Duran, Christine Gonong, Vanessa Holton, Joshua Perttula, Jennifer Pinney, Catherine Purcell, Sean Selegue, Melanie Shelby, Arnold Sowell, Jr, Brandon Stallings, Sean Strauss, The State Bar of California, Mark Toney. (Himes, Rita) (alns).
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying as moot #19 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting #20 Motion to Dismiss; granting #27 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting #41 Motion to Dismiss; denying #42 Motion. Signed by District Judge Robert S. Huie on 1/13/2023. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(alns)(jms). (Main Document 54 replaced to correct case number in caption on 1/23/2023 ) (alns).
June 30, 2022 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Rita Kathryn Himes on behalf of Mark Broughton, Michael Chavez, Hailyn Chen, Jose Cisneros, Juan De La Cruz, Sonia Delen, Ruben Duran, Christine Gonong, Vanessa Holton, Joshua Perttula, Jennifer Pinney, Catherine Purcell, Sean Selegue, Melanie Shelby, Arnold Sowell, Jr, Brandon Stallings, Sean Strauss, The State Bar of California, Mark Toney (Himes, Rita)Attorney Rita Kathryn Himes added to party Mark Broughton(pty:dft), Attorney Rita Kathryn Himes added to party Michael Chavez(pty:dft), Attorney Rita Kathryn Himes added to party Hailyn Chen(pty:dft), Attorney Rita Kathryn Himes added to party Jose Cisneros(pty:dft), Attorney Rita Kathryn Himes added to party Juan De La Cruz(pty:dft), Attorney Rita Kathryn Himes added to party Sonia Delen(pty:dft), Attorney Rita Kathryn Himes added to party Ruben Duran(pty:dft), Attorney Rita Kathryn Himes added to party Christine Gonong(pty:dft), Attorney Rita Kathryn Himes added to party Vanessa Holton(pty:dft), Attorney Rita Kathryn Himes added to party Joshua Perttula(pty:dft), Attorney Rita Kathryn Himes added to party Jennifer Pinney(pty:dft), Attorney Rita Kathryn Himes added to party Catherine Purcell(pty:dft), Attorney Rita Kathryn Himes added to party Sean Selegue(pty:dft), Attorney Rita Kathryn Himes added to party Melanie Shelby(pty:dft), Attorney Rita Kathryn Himes added to party Arnold Sowell, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Rita Kathryn Himes added to party Brandon Stallings(pty:dft), Attorney Rita Kathryn Himes added to party Sean Strauss(pty:dft), Attorney Rita Kathryn Himes added to party The State Bar of California(pty:dft), Attorney Rita Kathryn Himes added to party Mark Toney(pty:dft) (anh).
June 28, 2022 Filing 52 Plaintiff's Notice of Rule 46 Supplemental Request in Response to the June 24,2022 Order of Re-Assignment of this Matter With Supporting Points and Authorities - by Martin Reiner. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ave)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 This case is transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Linda Lopez to the calendar of the Honorable Robert S. Huie. All dates currently set before Judge Linda Lopez remain as scheduled before Judge Huie. Dates before the Magistrate Judge are unaffected by this Order. The new case number is: 21cv2077-RSH-MSB. Signed by Judge Linda Lopez on 6/24/2022. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ddf)
June 7, 2022 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to Motion re #42 MOTION to declare plaintiff martin reiner a vexatious litigant filed by Gregory Alarcon, Mitchell Beckloff, Tani Cantil-Sakauye, Carol Corrigan, Mariano-Florentino Cuellar, Cummings McClorey & Acho P.L.O., Mark Kim, Leondra Kruger, Goodwin Liu, Tayuan Ma, Jorge Navarette, Sarah Overton, Dennis Perluss, John Segal, Tom Zhang. (Overton, Sarah) (ddf).
June 6, 2022 Filing 49 Notice Of Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendant's Motion For Vexatious Litigant Order filed by Martin Reiner. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Objection, #4 Request for Judicial Notice)(ddf)
June 2, 2022 Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER: The parties stipulated request to extend the time to file a reply to vexatious litigant motion [ECF No. #47 ] is GRANTED. The listed Defendants may file a reply on or before June 7, 2022. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (ddf)
June 2, 2022 Filing 47 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #42 MOTION to declare plaintiff martin reiner a vexatious litigant by Gregory Alarcon, Mitchell Beckloff, Tani Cantil-Sakauye, Carol Corrigan, Mariano-Florentino Cuellar, Cummings McClorey & Acho P.L.O., Mark Kim, Leondra Kruger, Goodwin Liu, Tayuan Ma, Jorge Navarette, Sarah Overton, Dennis Perluss, John Segal, Tom Zhang. (Overton, Sarah) (jms).
May 27, 2022 Filing 46 REPLY to Response to Motion re #41 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Gregory Alarcon, Mitchell Beckloff, Tani Cantil-Sakauye, Carol Corrigan, Mariano-Florentino Cuellar, Cummings McClorey & Acho P.L.O., Mark Kim, Leondra Kruger, Goodwin Liu, Tayuan Ma, Jorge Navarette, Sarah Overton, Dennis Perluss, John Segal, Tom Zhang. (Frazier-Krane, Lindsay) (ddf).
May 23, 2022 Filing 45 Notice Of (1)Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendants' 12(b)(1) Motion To Dismiss, And (2)Plaintiff's Rule 12(d) Conversion Of Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion To Dismiss Into Summary Judgment In Favor Of The Plaintiff And Adverse To Defendants Ta Yuan Ma And To Zhang filed by Martin Reiner. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Statement of Facts)(ddf)
May 9, 2022 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim (12)(b)(1) & (12)(b)(6) and Opposition to Plaintiff's 12 (d) Motion filed by Ronnie Caplane. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Service of Reply and Opposition to MPSJ)(Marsh, Susan) (ddf).
May 6, 2022 Filing 43 NOTICE of Joinder by Mark Broughton, Michael Chavez, Hailyn Chen, Jose Cisneros, Juan De La Cruz, Sonia Delen, Ruben Duran, Christine Gonong, Vanessa Holton, Joshua Perttula, Jennifer Pinney, Catherine Purcell, Sean Selegue, Melanie Shelby, Arnold Sowell, Jr, Brandon Stallings, Sean Strauss, The State Bar of California, Mark Toney re #42 MOTION to declare plaintiff martin reiner a vexatious litigant State Bar Defendants' Notice of Joinder in Defendants Tani G. Cantil-Sakauye, Chief Justice of California, et al's Motion to Declare Plaintiff Martin Reiner a Vexatious Litigant (Shapp, Marc) (ddf).
May 5, 2022 Filing 42 MOTION to declare plaintiff martin reiner a vexatious litigant by Gregory Alarcon, Mitchell Beckloff, Tani Cantil-Sakauye, Carol Corrigan, Mariano-Florentino Cuellar, Cummings McClorey & Acho P.L.O., Mark Kim, Leondra Kruger, Goodwin Liu, Tayuan Ma, Jorge Navarette, Sarah Overton, Dennis Perluss, John Segal, Tom Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice 1 of 4, #3 Request for Judicial Notice 2 of 4, #4 Request for Judicial Notice 3 of 4, #5 Request for Judicial Notice 4 of 4, #6 Declaration of Sarah L. Overton and Exhibits)(Overton, Sarah)*Motion under submission, no appearances are required unless ordered by the Court (ddf).
May 2, 2022 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss by Gregory Alarcon, Mitchell Beckloff, Tani Cantil-Sakauye, Carol Corrigan, Mariano-Florentino Cuellar, Cummings McClorey & Acho P.L.O., Mark Kim, Leondra Kruger, Goodwin Liu, Tayuan Ma, Jorge Navarette, Sarah Overton, Dennis Perluss, John Segal, Tom Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice)(Overton, Sarah)Attorney Sarah L Overton added to party Gregory Alarcon(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah L Overton added to party Mitchell Beckloff(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah L Overton added to party Tani Cantil-Sakauye(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah L Overton added to party Carol Corrigan(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah L Overton added to party Mariano-Florentino Cuellar(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah L Overton added to party Cummings McClorey & Acho P.L.O.(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah L Overton added to party Mark Kim(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah L Overton added to party Leondra Kruger(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah L Overton added to party Goodwin Liu(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah L Overton added to party Tayuan Ma (pty:dft), Attorney Sarah L Overton added to party Jorge Navarette(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah L Overton added to party Sarah Overton(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah L Overton added to party Dennis Perluss(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah L Overton added to party John Segal(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah L Overton added to party Tom Zhang(pty:dft) *Motion under submission, no appearances are required unless ordered by the Court (ddf).
May 2, 2022 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim (12)(b)(1) & (12)(b)(6) filed by Martin Reiner. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Statement of Facts, #4 Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Proof of Service)(ddf)
April 27, 2022 Filing 39 Plaintiff's Response To #37 Notice of Joinder filed by Martin Reiner. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Memo of Points and Authorities, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1-9)(ddf)
April 22, 2022 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Martin Reiner. (ddf)
April 22, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE of Joinder by Mark Broughton, Michael Chavez, Hailyn Chen, Jose Cisneros, Juan De La Cruz, Sonia Delen, Ruben Duran, Christine Gonong, Vanessa Holton, Joshua Perttula, Jennifer Pinney, Catherine Purcell, Sean Selegue, Melanie Shelby, Arnold Sowell, Jr, Brandon Stallings, Sean Strauss, The State Bar of California, Mark Toney re #34 Response in Support of Motion State Bar Defendants' Notice of Joinder in Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP, John Barber, John Haughbrich Jr., Craig Holden, and Bryan Leifer's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint and Motion for An Order Declaring Plaintiff to be a Vexatious Litigant (Shapp, Marc) (axc).
April 22, 2022 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint and Vexatious Litigant Motion Joinder filed by Steven Yee. (Sorkin, William) (axc).
April 22, 2022 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint and Vexatious Litigant Motion Joinder filed by Manuel Graiwer, Gary Kaplan, Susan Kaplan. (Yee, Steven) (axc).
April 22, 2022 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Support re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint and Vexatious Litigant Motion filed by John Barber, John Haubrich, Jr, Craig Holden, Bryan Leifer, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard Smith, LLP. (Leifer, Bryan) (axc).
April 20, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Tayuan Ma, Tom Zhang re #30 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, filed by Tayuan Ma, Tom Zhang . (Overton, Sarah) (ddf).
April 18, 2022 Filing 32 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Tayuan Ma, Tom Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial notice, #2 Opposition to statement of uncontroverted facts, #3 opposition to plaintiff's request for judicial notice, #4 Declaration of Lindsay N. Frazier-Krane in support of opposition to MSJ, #5 Objection to plaintiff's evidence)(Frazier-Krane, Lindsay) (ddf).
April 15, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay N. Frazier-Krane on behalf of Tayuan Ma, Tom Zhang (Frazier-Krane, Lindsay)Attorney Lindsay N. Frazier-Krane added to party Tayuan Ma (pty:dft), Attorney Lindsay N. Frazier-Krane added to party Tom Zhang(pty:dft) (ddf).
April 15, 2022 Filing 30 ***Withdrawn Per #33 *** RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Tayuan Ma, Tom Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF LINDSAY N. FRAZIER-KRANE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #2 DEFENDANTS TAYUAN MA AND TOM ZHANGS OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS EVIDENCE SUMITTED IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #3 DEFENDANTS TAYUAN MA AND TOM ZHANGS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #4 DEFENDANTS TAYUAN MA AND TOM ZHANGS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS, #5 DEFENDANTS TAYUAN MA AND TOM ZHANGS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)(Overton, Sarah) QC Mailer re Document contains wrong signature (ddf).
April 15, 2022 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim (12)(b)(1) & (12)(b)(6) filed by Martin Reiner. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit, #5 Request for Judicial Notice)(ddf)
April 14, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Joinder by Mark Broughton, Michael Chavez, Hailyn Chen, Jose Cisneros, Juan De La Cruz, Sonia Delen, Ruben Duran, Christine Gonong, Vanessa Holton, Joshua Perttula, Jennifer Pinney, Sean Selegue, Melanie Shelby, Arnold Sowell, Jr, Brandon Stallings, Sean Strauss, The State Bar of California, Mark Toney re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint and Vexatious Litigant Motion State Bar Defendants' Notice of Joinder to Co-Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Vexatious Litigant Order (ECF No. 20); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Shapp, Marc) (ddf).
April 13, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim (12)(b)(1) & (12)(b)(6) by Ronnie Caplane. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supporting Declaration by R. Caplane, #2 Supplement Proposed Order, #3 Declaration Decl of Service Of Notice and Motion to Dismiss, Memo of Ps & As, and Declaration of R. Caplane in Support Thereof)(Marsh, Susan) *Motion under submission, no appearances are required unless ordered by the Court. QC Mailer re Proposed orders should not be attached (ddf)
April 13, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE Corrected Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Mark Broughton, Michael Chavez, Hailyn Chen, Jose Cisneros, Juan De La Cruz, Sonia Delen, Ruben Duran, Christine Gonong, Vanessa Holton, Joshua Perttula, Jennifer Pinney, Catherine Purcell, Sean Selegue, Melanie Shelby, Arnold Sowell, Jr, Brandon Stallings, Sean Strauss, The State Bar of California, Mark Toney (Chang, James) (ddf).
April 12, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Mark Broughton, Michael Chavez, Hailyn Chen, Jose Cisneros, Juan De La Cruz, Sonia Delen, Ruben Duran, Christine Gonong, Vanessa Holton, Joshua Perttula, Jennifer Pinney, Catherine Purcell, Sean Selegue, Melanie Shelby, Arnold Sowell, Jr, Brandon Stallings, Sean Strauss, The State Bar of California, Mark Toney (Chang, James)Attorney James Jou Chang added to party Mark Broughton(pty:dft), Attorney James Jou Chang added to party Michael Chavez(pty:dft), Attorney James Jou Chang added to party Hailyn Chen(pty:dft), Attorney James Jou Chang added to party Jose Cisneros(pty:dft), Attorney James Jou Chang added to party Juan De La Cruz(pty:dft), Attorney James Jou Chang added to party Sonia Delen(pty:dft), Attorney James Jou Chang added to party Ruben Duran(pty:dft), Attorney James Jou Chang added to party Christine Gonong(pty:dft), Attorney James Jou Chang added to party Vanessa Holton(pty:dft), Attorney James Jou Chang added to party Joshua Perttula(pty:dft), Attorney James Jou Chang added to party Jennifer Pinney(pty:dft), Attorney James Jou Chang added to party Catherine Purcell(pty:dft), Attorney James Jou Chang added to party Sean Selegue(pty:dft), Attorney James Jou Chang added to party Melanie Shelby(pty:dft), Attorney James Jou Chang added to party Arnold Sowell, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney James Jou Chang added to party Brandon Stallings(pty:dft), Attorney James Jou Chang added to party Sean Strauss(pty:dft), Attorney James Jou Chang added to party The State Bar of California(pty:dft), Attorney James Jou Chang added to party Mark Toney(pty:dft) (ddf).
April 12, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Aaron Shapp on behalf of Mark Broughton, Michael Chavez, Hailyn Chen, Jose Cisneros, Juan De La Cruz, Sonia Delen, Ruben Duran, Christine Gonong, Vanessa Holton, Joshua Perttula, Jennifer Pinney, Catherine Purcell, Sean Selegue, Melanie Shelby, Arnold Sowell, Jr, Brandon Stallings, Sean Strauss, The State Bar of California, Mark Toney (Shapp, Marc)Attorney Marc Aaron Shapp added to party Mark Broughton(pty:dft), Attorney Marc Aaron Shapp added to party Michael Chavez(pty:dft), Attorney Marc Aaron Shapp added to party Hailyn Chen(pty:dft), Attorney Marc Aaron Shapp added to party Jose Cisneros(pty:dft), Attorney Marc Aaron Shapp added to party Juan De La Cruz(pty:dft), Attorney Marc Aaron Shapp added to party Sonia Delen(pty:dft), Attorney Marc Aaron Shapp added to party Ruben Duran(pty:dft), Attorney Marc Aaron Shapp added to party Christine Gonong(pty:dft), Attorney Marc Aaron Shapp added to party Vanessa Holton(pty:dft), Attorney Marc Aaron Shapp added to party Joshua Perttula(pty:dft), Attorney Marc Aaron Shapp added to party Jennifer Pinney(pty:dft), Attorney Marc Aaron Shapp added to party Catherine Purcell(pty:dft), Attorney Marc Aaron Shapp added to party Sean Selegue(pty:dft), Attorney Marc Aaron Shapp added to party Melanie Shelby(pty:dft), Attorney Marc Aaron Shapp added to party Arnold Sowell, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Marc Aaron Shapp added to party Brandon Stallings(pty:dft), Attorney Marc Aaron Shapp added to party Sean Strauss(pty:dft), Attorney Marc Aaron Shapp added to party The State Bar of California(pty:dft), Attorney Marc Aaron Shapp added to party Mark Toney(pty:dft) (ddf).
April 4, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Joinder by Steven Yee re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint and Vexatious Litigant Motion (Sorkin, William) (ddf).
April 4, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Joinder by Manuel Graiwer, Gary Kaplan, Susan Kaplan re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint and Vexatious Litigant Motion (Yee, Steven) (ddf).
March 29, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Joinder by Ronnie Caplane re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint and Vexatious Litigant Motion Jndr in Motion re Vexatious Litigant (Marsh, Susan) (ddf). Modified text on 4/12/2022 to correct spelling of Defendant name (lao).
March 28, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint and Vexatious Litigant Motion by John Barber, John Haubrich, Jr, Craig Holden, Bryan Leifer, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard Smith, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Proof of Service)(Leifer, Bryan)Attorney Bryan M. Leifer added to party John Barber(pty:dft), Attorney Bryan M. Leifer added to party John Haubrich, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Bryan M. Leifer added to party Craig Holden(pty:dft), Attorney Bryan M. Leifer added to party Bryan Leifer(pty:dft), Attorney Bryan M. Leifer added to party Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard Smith, LLP(pty:dft) *Motion under submission, no appearances are required unless ordered by the Court(ddf).
March 25, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Martin Reiner. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Statement of Facts) *Motion under submission, no appearances are required unless ordered by the Court(ddf) .
March 21, 2022 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Martin Reiner, as to Mark Broughton, Michael Chavez, Hailyn Chen, Jose Cisneros, Juan De La Cruz, Sonia Delen, Ruben Duran, Christine Gonong, Vanessa Holton, Joshua Perttula, Jennifer Pinney, Catherine Purcell, Sean Selegue, Melanie Shelby, Arnold Sowell, Jr, Brandon Stallings, Sean Strauss, Mark Toney. (ddf)
March 21, 2022 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Martin Reiner, as to The State Bar of California. (ddf)
March 21, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martin Reiner. Craig Holden served. (ddf)
March 21, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martin Reiner. Gary Kaplan served. (ddf)
March 21, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martin Reiner. John Barber served. (ddf)
March 21, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martin Reiner. John Haubrich, Jr served. (ddf)
March 21, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martin Reiner. Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard Smith, LLP served. (ddf)
March 21, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martin Reiner. Manuel Graiwer served. (ddf)
March 21, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martin Reiner. Steven Yee served. (ddf)
March 21, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martin Reiner. Bryan Leifer served. (ddf)
March 10, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Martin Reiner. (ddf)
March 10, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Martin Reiner, as to Tani Cantil-Sakauye, Carol Corrigan, Mariano-Florentino Cuellar, Cummings McClorey & Acho P.L.C., Leondra Kruger, Goodwin Liu, Tayuan Ma, Jorge Navarette, Sarah Overton, Tom Zhang. (axc) .
March 10, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Martin Reiner, as to Ronnie Caplane. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(axc) . Modified text on 4/12/2022 to correct spelling of Defendant name (lao).
March 9, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan M. Marsh on behalf of Ronnie Caplane (Marsh, Susan)Attorney Susan M. Marsh added to party Ronnie Caplane(pty:dft) (ddf). Modified text on 4/12/2022 to correct spelling of Defendant name (lao).
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER: This case is transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Dana M. Sabraw to the calendar of the Honorable Linda Lopez. All dates currently set before Judge Sabraw remain as scheduled before Judge Lopez. Dates before the Magistrate Judge are unaffected by this Order. The new case number is 21cv2077 LL (MSB). Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 01/07/2022.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jcj)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg for all further proceedings. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel, Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:21-cv-01454-DMS- MSB and 21-cv-0219-DMS-MSB. The new case number is 21-cv-2077-DMS-MSB.. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/17/21. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/16/21.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
December 15, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (ggv) (dsn) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/16/2021) (ggv)
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number CAS134623.), filed by Mark Reiner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-5, #3 Rico Case Statement)The new case number is 3:21-cv-2077-GPC-JLB. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Reiner, Martin)(ggv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reiner v. Navarette et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Reiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Reiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Navarette
Represented By: Sarah L Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Zhang
Represented By: Sarah L Overton
Represented By: Lindsay N. Frazier-Krane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tani Cantil-Sakauye
Represented By: Sarah L Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Corrigan
Represented By: Sarah L Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodwin Liu
Represented By: Sarah L Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leondra Kruger
Represented By: Sarah L Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariano-Florentino Cuellar
Represented By: Sarah L Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State Bar of California
Represented By: James Jou Chang
Represented By: Marc Aaron Shapp
Represented By: Rita Kathryn Himes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa Holton
Represented By: James Jou Chang
Represented By: Marc Aaron Shapp
Represented By: Rita Kathryn Himes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Strauss
Represented By: James Jou Chang
Represented By: Marc Aaron Shapp
Represented By: Rita Kathryn Himes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Pinney
Represented By: James Jou Chang
Represented By: Marc Aaron Shapp
Represented By: Rita Kathryn Himes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Chavez
Represented By: James Jou Chang
Represented By: Marc Aaron Shapp
Represented By: Rita Kathryn Himes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Purcell
Represented By: Marc Aaron Shapp
Represented By: James Jou Chang
Represented By: Rita Kathryn Himes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Selegue
Represented By: James Jou Chang
Represented By: Marc Aaron Shapp
Represented By: Rita Kathryn Himes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Duran
Represented By: James Jou Chang
Represented By: Marc Aaron Shapp
Represented By: Rita Kathryn Himes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonia Delen
Represented By: James Jou Chang
Represented By: Marc Aaron Shapp
Represented By: Rita Kathryn Himes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Broughton
Represented By: James Jou Chang
Represented By: Marc Aaron Shapp
Represented By: Rita Kathryn Himes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hailyn Chen
Represented By: James Jou Chang
Represented By: Marc Aaron Shapp
Represented By: Rita Kathryn Himes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Cisneros
Represented By: James Jou Chang
Represented By: Marc Aaron Shapp
Represented By: Rita Kathryn Himes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan De La Cruz
Represented By: James Jou Chang
Represented By: Marc Aaron Shapp
Represented By: Rita Kathryn Himes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Gonong
Represented By: James Jou Chang
Represented By: Marc Aaron Shapp
Represented By: Rita Kathryn Himes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Perttula
Represented By: James Jou Chang
Represented By: Marc Aaron Shapp
Represented By: Rita Kathryn Himes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie Shelby
Represented By: Marc Aaron Shapp
Represented By: James Jou Chang
Represented By: Rita Kathryn Himes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Toney
Represented By: James Jou Chang
Represented By: Marc Aaron Shapp
Represented By: Rita Kathryn Himes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Stallings
Represented By: James Jou Chang
Represented By: Marc Aaron Shapp
Represented By: Rita Kathryn Himes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Carplane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Graiwer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Holden
Represented By: Bryan M. Leifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Leifer
Represented By: Bryan M. Leifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Barber
Represented By: Bryan M. Leifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Belilove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosely George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Alarcon
Represented By: Sarah L Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Beckloff
Represented By: Sarah L Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard Smith, LLP
Represented By: Bryan M. Leifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tayuan Ma
Represented By: Sarah L Overton
Represented By: Lindsay N. Frazier-Krane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Sowell, Jr.
Represented By: James Jou Chang
Represented By: Marc Aaron Shapp
Represented By: Rita Kathryn Himes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Haubrich, Jr.
Represented By: Bryan M. Leifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 Through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Kim
Represented By: Sarah L Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Overton
Represented By: Sarah L Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummings McClorey & Acho P.L.O.
Represented By: Sarah L Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Perluss
Represented By: Sarah L Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Segal
Represented By: Sarah L Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Caplane
Represented By: Susan M. Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?