McKusick v. San Diego County Sheriff et al
Plaintiff: John McKusick and Alexander Jacome
Defendant: - San Diego County Sheriff, Sheriff Deputies, San Diego County Sheriff Medical Provider and Staff and California Department of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2021cv02087
Filed: December 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael S Berg
Referring Judge: John A Houston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 cv
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Exhibit in Support of Complaint (forwarded from Northern District of California) by Alexander Jacome. (smy1)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg assigned to transfer case from California Northern District. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached)(jms)(jrd)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Case transferred in from the Northern District of California (San Francisco); Case Number 3:21-cv-07392-EMC. Original file received electronically.
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case transferred to Southern District of California. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/10/2021. (afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2021.]
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John McKusick. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2021.]
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against San Diego County Sheriff, San Diego County Sheriff Medical Provider and Staff, California Department of Corrections. Filed by John McKusick and Alexander Jacome. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2021) Modified on 12/7/2021 (anj, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2021.]
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against San Diego County Sheriff, San Diego County Sheriff Medical Provider and Staff, Sheriff Deputies. Filed by Alexander Jacome. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2021) Modified on 12/5/2021 (lmd, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2021.]
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Plaintiff's Acceptance to Request For Video Recording Form By The Cameras in the Courtroom Proceedings and Request For Existing Briefing Scheduling filed by Alexander Jacome. Responses due by 12/15/2021. Replies due by 12/29/2021. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2021.]
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Letter from John Mckusick requesting corrections. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2021.]
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by CLERK on 11/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2021.]
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2021.]
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST to Amend Complaint by Second Named Plaintiff. Filed by Alexander Jacome. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2021) Modified on 11/2/2021 (ljf, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2021.]
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2021.]
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 11/1/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2021.]
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE Complaint on Form due by 11/1/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2021.]
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against San Diego County Sheriff, San Diego County Sheriff Medical Provider and Staff, Sheriff Deputies. Filed by John McKusick. Consent/Declination due by 10/25/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKusick v. San Diego County Sheriff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McKusick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Jacome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - San Diego County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Deputies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego County Sheriff Medical Provider and Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?