Walker v. Stryker Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Kyle Walker
Defendant: Stryker Corporation, Stryker Employment Company, LLC, Does 1 to 20 and Howmedica Osteonics Corp.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00264
Filed: February 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael M Anello
Referring Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
2 Judge: David D Leshner
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 lm Removal- Labor/Mgmt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Minute Order following Status Conference. A Status Conference was held on September 14, 2022. For the reasons discussed at the conference, and good cause appearing, the Court hereby ORDERS that: (1) The parties must bring any dispute regarding defendants' responses to plaintiff's first set of interrogatories and first set of requests for production to the Court's attention on or before October 7, 2022; (2) the parties must exchange the expert disclosures required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) on or before October 14, 2022; (3) all fact witness depositions must be completed by November 7, 2022; and (4) all expert witness depositions must be completed by November 14, 2022. No further written discovery may be propounded by either party except as may relate to expert witnesses. The deadline for filing dispositive motions remains as previously set (December 15, 2022) and will not be continued. The parties are to meet and confer and, if mutually agreed by the parties, contact Judge Leshner's chambers with proposed dates for a Mandatory Settlement Conference to occur before the end of the year. (Plaintiff Attorney Noam Glick).(Defendant Attorney Michele Beilke). (no document attached) (src)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Videoconference Information for September 14, 2022 Status Conference. (tcf)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Motion Extension of Time. Good cause appearing, the parties' Joint Motion to extend the deadline to raise a discovery dispute is GRANTED. The parties must bring any dispute regarding defendants' responses to plaintiff's first set of interrogatories and first set of requests for production to the Court's attention on or before September 26, 2022. This deadline will not be further extended. No other pretrial dates are affected by this Order. The parties are directed to follow the procedures outlined in Judge Leshner's Chambers Rules with regard to any dispute that is not resolved by further good faith meet and confer efforts. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 9/8/22. (no document attached) (src)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Joint MOTION To Extend Deadline to Contact the Court with an Unresolved Discovery Dispute on Plaintiff's Interrogatories, Set One, and Request for Production, Set One re 42 Status Conference by Stryker Employment Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration M. Pearlson)(Beilke, Michele) (tcf).
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #39 Motion for Extension of Discovery Dispute Deadline. For the reasons discussed during the August 29, 2022 Status Conference, the parties' Joint Motion is granted in part and denied in part. The Court hereby continues the deadline to bring any dispute related to defendants' responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production to the Court's attention to September 12, 2022. The parties are directed to follow the procedures outlined in Judge Leshner's Chambers Rules with respect to any discovery dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 8/29/22. (no document attached) (src)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Minute Entry and Order Setting Further Status Conference. A Status Conference re Pretrial Deadlines was held on August 29, 2022. The Court hereby sets a further status conference for September 14, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. The Court further orders as follows: The parties shall have until September 12, 2022 to raise any disputes concerning defendants' responses to plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production. The parties must designate their respective experts on or before September 9, 2022. The parties must exchange expert reports as early as is feasible. The Court will address the continuation of the expert report deadline, if any, at the September 14, 2022 Status Conference. The parties are encouraged to continue to work diligently to meet all existing pretrial deadlines. (Status Conference set for 9/14/2022 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner.). (Plaintiff Attorney Noam Glick, Vanessa Ruggles).(Defendant Attorney Michele Beilke, Michael Pearlson). (no document attached) (src)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Videoconference Information for August 29, 2022 Discovery Conference. (tcf)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Minute Order Setting Discovery Conference. The Court hereby sets a counsel-only Discovery Conference on August 29, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel should be prepared to discuss the parties' joint motion for an extension of time and other discovery matters. The conference will be held by videoconference with instructions for appearance to follow by separate notice. Any questions regarding this Order or the Discovery Conference may be directed to the Court's staff at 619-837-6526. (Discovery Conference set for 8/29/2022 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner.)(no document attached) (src)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Joint MOTION for Discovery Deadline Extension by Kyle Walker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service)(Ruggles, Vanessa) (tcf).
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge. The new case number is 22-cv-00264-MMA-DDL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 8/22/2022.(smy1)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: (1) Granting Extension of Time to Bring Discovery Disputes; (2) Granting Joint Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order; and (3) Issuing Amended Scheduling Order [ECF Nos. #30 ; #35 ]. The Mandatory Settlement Conference is rescheduled to 1/25/2023 at 1:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt and will occur by video conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 7/29/2022. (tcf)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Discovery Conference held on 7/28/2022 before Judge Burkhardt. (See ECF No. #34 .) Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Noam Glick; Vanessa Ruggles) (Defendant Attorney Michele Beilke; Michael Pearlson) (no document attached) (lkg)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #30 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Joint Motion to Amend the Amended Scheduling Order by Stryker Corporation, Stryker Employment Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Noam Glick)(Pearlson, Michael) (jms).
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER: The deadline to contact the Court with any dispute regarding Defendant Howmedica's supplemental responses is extended to 8/13/2022. A counsel-only Discovery Conference shall be held by video on 7/28/2022 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. (tcf)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa Ruggles on behalf of Kyle Walker (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Ruggles, Vanessa)Attorney Vanessa Ruggles added to party Kyle Walker(pty:pla) (tcf).
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Good cause appearing, the parties' Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Contact the Court with an Unresolved Discovery Dispute #31 is GRANTED. Accordingly, the parties shall contact the Court with any remaining discovery disputes related to set one of Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Requests For Production no later than July 15, 2022. (no document attached) (lkg)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Deadline to Contact the Court with an Unresolved Discovery Dispute on Plaintiff's Interrogatories, Set One, and Requests for Production, Set One by Kyle Walker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Contact the Court with an Unresolved Discovery Dispute)(Glick, Noam) (tcf).
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: (1) Granting Joint Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order; (2) Issuing Amended Scheduling Order; and (3) Converting Mandatory Settlement Conference to Video [ECF Nos. #15 ; #29 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 6/9/2022. (tcf)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #15 Scheduling Order by Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Stryker Employment Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael A. Pearlson)(Beilke, Michele) (tcf).
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: On 6/1/2022, the parties lodged a Joint Discovery Statement regarding Plaintiff's deposition in accordance with V.B. of Judge Burkhardt's Civil Chambers Rules. At the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference on 6/6/2022 (ECF No. 27), the parties indicated that they now believe they can resolve their dispute without further assistance from the Court. (lkg)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 6/6/2022. The case did not settle. (Plaintiff Attorney Noam Glick) (Defendant Attorney Michele J. Beilke; Michael Pearlson) (Kyle Walker; Laci Resendiz) (no document attached) (lkg)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ANSWER to #23 Amended Complaint DEFENDANTS HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP. AND STRYKER EMPLOYMENT COMPANY, LLCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Stryker Employment Company, LLC.(Beilke, Michele)Attorney Michele J. Beilke added to party Howmedica Osteonics Corp.(pty:dft) (tcf).
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kyle Walker. Howmedica Osteonics Corp. served. (Glick, Noam) (tcf).
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Summons Issued as to First Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (tcf)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Stryker Employment Company, LLC, Howmedica Osteonics Corp., filed by Kyle Walker. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)New Summons Requested. (Glick, Noam) (tcf).
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting #21 Joint Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff must file and serve his First Amended Complaint on or before 5/11/2022. Defendants must respond to the First Amended Complaint no later than thirty (30) days after the filing of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 5/4/2022. (tcf)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Kyle Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Glick, Noam) (tcf).
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #19 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 4/21/2022. (tcf)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Joint Motion for Stipulated Protective Order by Stryker Corporation, Stryker Employment Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A to Joint Motion for Stipulated Protective Order)(Beilke, Michele) (tcf).
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: The parties' proposed stipulated protective order does not contain the language required by VI.B. of Judge Burkhardt's Civil Chambers Rules. Accordingly, the parties' Joint Motion for Protective Order #17 is hereby DENIED without prejudice. (no document attached) (lkg)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Joint Motion for Stipulated Protective Order by Stryker Corporation, Stryker Employment Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Joint Motion for Stipulated Protective Order)(Beilke, Michele) (tcf).
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Pursuant to the Court's Minute Order (ECF No. 14), the parties left a joint voicemail with Judge Burkhardt's Chambers indicating 6/6/2022 as their agreed upon continued Early Neutral Evaluation ("ENE") Conference date. Accordingly, the Court hereby RESETS the ENE to 6/6/2022, at 9:15 AM, before Judge Burkhardt. Additionally, the deadline to lodge updated ENE statements with the Court at efile_burkhardt@casd.uscourts.gov is extended to 6/1/2022. All other directions and requirements regarding the ENE set forth in the Court's 3/1/2022 Order remain in effect (ECF No. #5 ). (lkg)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings. A Mandatory Settlement Conference is set for 11/16/2022 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 4/18/2022. (tcf)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Telephonic, counsel-only Case Management Conference held on 4/18/2022. As discussed in the Conference, Defendants shall provide Plaintiff with the declaration regarding the information requested by Plaintiff no later than Monday, 4/25/2022. Additionally, the parties shall leave a joint voicemail with Judge Burkhardt's Chambers by tomorrow, 4/19/2022, at 5:00 PM, indicating their agreed upon continued Early Neutral Evaluation Conference date. Scheduling Order to follow. (Plaintiff's Attorney Noam Glick) (Defendants' Attorney Michele J. Beilke; Michael A. Pearlson) (no document attached) (lkg)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: For good cause shown, the parties' #11 Joint Motion to Reschedule Early Neutral Evaluation ("ENE") and Case management Conferences ("CMC") is granted in part. Accordingly, the CMC will remain on 4/18/2022, at 9:00 AM, as scheduled, and is hereby CONVERTED to a telephonic, counsel-only CMC before Judge Burkhardt. For purposes of the CMC, all participating counsel shall call the Court's teleconference line at (877) 873-8018 and use access code 9930765. The Court hereby CONTINUES the video conference ENE to 5/23/2022, at 9:00 AM, before Judge Burkhardt. Additionally, updated ENE statements shall be lodged with the Court by 5/16/2022 at efile_burkhardt@casd.uscourts.gov. All other requirements set forth in the Court's 3/1/2022 Order remain in effect (ECF No. #5 ). (no document attached) (lkg)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Beilke, Michele) (tcf).
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Joint MOTION Reschedule Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference re 10 MINUTE ORDER by Stryker Corporation, Stryker Employment Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration M. Beilke)(Beilke, Michele) (tcf).
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Good cause appearing, the parties' Joint Motion #9 is GRANTED. Accordingly, the Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conferences currently scheduled for 4/11/2022 are hereby RESET to 4/18/2022, at 9:00 AM. This Order does not otherwise amend the Court's 3/1/2022 Order (ECF No. #5 ). (no document attached) (lkg)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Joint MOTION RESCHEDULE EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION CONFERENCE AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #5 Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation conference, Joint Motion to Reschedule Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference by Stryker Corporation, Stryker Employment Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration M. Pearlson)(Beilke, Michele) (zda).
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Noam Glick on behalf of Kyle Walker (Glick, Noam) (tcf).
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint DEFENDANT STRYKER CORPORATION AND STRYKER EMPLOYMENT COMPANY, LLCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by Stryker Corporation, Stryker Employment Company, LLC.(Beilke, Michele) (tcf).
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stryker Corporation, Stryker Employment Company, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Notice of Party With Financial Interest, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Beilke, Michele) (tcf).
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation will be held by video conference on 4/11/2022 at 1:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. A Case Management Conference will be held at the conclusion of the ENE. The Joint Discovery Plan is due on or before 4/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 2/28/2022. (tcf)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Stryker Corporation, Stryker Employment Company, LLC. (ave)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stryker Corporation, Stryker Employment Company, LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (ave) (rmc).
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Stryker Corporation, Stryker Employment Company, LLC. Identifying Other Affiliate Howmedica Osteonics Corp. for Stryker Corporation, Stryker Employment Company, LLC. (ave) (rmc).
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-16600950.), filed by Stryker Corporation, Stryker Employment Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibits, #4 Declaration)The new case number is 3:22-cv-264-MMA-JLB. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(ave) Modified on 2/28/2022 to correct file date(ave). (rmc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Stryker Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Walker
Represented By: Noam Glick
Represented By: Vanessa Ruggles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Corporation
Represented By: Julia Yenha Trankiem
Represented By: Michael A. Pearlson
Represented By: Michele J. Beilke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Employment Company, LLC
Represented By: Julia Yenha Trankiem
Represented By: Michael A. Pearlson
Represented By: Michele J. Beilke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corp.
Represented By: Michele J. Beilke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?