Cranton v. Grossmont Hospital Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn Cranton
Defendant: Grossmont Hospital Corporation and Does 1 through 50
Case Number: 3:2022cv00443
Filed: April 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #14 Joint Motion to Continue the Hearing Date on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand from June 2,2022 to July 7, 2022 and taking Motion to Remand under Submission on the Papers without Oral Argument Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1) (ECF No. #12 ). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/9/2022. (tcf)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #13 Joint Motion to Continue the May 18, 2022 ENE/CMC: Plaintiff filed a motion to remand #12 and has requested a hearing after July 7, 2022 regarding that motion. Upon due consideration, and for good cause shown, the Court will vacate the May 18, 2022 ENE/CMC, and all dates associated with that hearing. The Court will reset the ENE/CMC, if appropriate, after a ruling on the pending motions. IT IS SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 5/6/2022. (no document attached) (smd)
May 5, 2022 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Continue the Hearing Date on Plaintiff's Motion o Remand (Dkt. No. 12) From June 2, 2022 to July 7, 2022 by Grossmont Hospital Corporation. (Landry, Jody) (tcf).
May 5, 2022 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Continue the May 18, 2022 Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference by Grossmont Hospital Corporation. (Landry, Jody) (tcf).
May 4, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by Jacquelyn Cranton. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 [Proposed] [Order)(Herman, Jeffrey) QC mailer sent re: proposed order attached (tcf).
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Denying Joint Motion to Vacate the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference: The parties' Joint Motion is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 04/19/2022. (no document attached) (smd)
April 19, 2022 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Vacate #3 Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation conference, Joint Motion to Vacate The May 18, 2022 ENE Conference and Proceed with Case Management Conference by Grossmont Hospital Corporation. (Weaver, Krystal) (tcf).
April 6, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Bree Rivapalacio on behalf of Jacquelyn Cranton (Rivapalacio, Victoria)Attorney Victoria Bree Rivapalacio added to party Jacquelyn Cranton(pty:pla) (tcf).
April 6, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sergio Julian Puche on behalf of Jacquelyn Cranton (Puche, Sergio)Attorney Sergio Julian Puche added to party Jacquelyn Cranton(pty:pla) (tcf).
April 6, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Scott Herman on behalf of Jacquelyn Cranton (Herman, Jeffrey)Attorney Jeffrey Scott Herman added to party Jacquelyn Cranton(pty:pla) (tcf).
April 6, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Aparajit Bhowmik on behalf of Jacquelyn Cranton (Bhowmik, Aparajit) (tcf).
April 5, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Grossmont Hospital Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal,, Defendant's Certification as to Interested Parties. Identifying Other Affiliate Jacquelyn Cranton for Grossmont Hospital Corporation. (Landry, Jody) (tcf).
April 5, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grossmont Hospital Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Sharp HealtchCare for Grossmont Hospital Corporation. (Landry, Jody) (tcf).
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation Case Management Conference will be held on 5/18/2022 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin via VIDEOCONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 4/5/2022. (tcf)
April 4, 2022 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Grossmont Hospital Corporation. (ggv) (sjt).
April 4, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand (FEE DUE) filed by Grossmont Hospital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-3 to Notice of Removal, #3 Declaration of Jody Landry In Support of Removal, #4 Declaration of Rachel Davis In Support of Removal, #5 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:22-cv-443-JLS-MDD. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case.(ggv) Modified on 4/5/2022 to reflect filing fee due. (jrd). (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cranton v. Grossmont Hospital Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn Cranton
Represented By: Aparajit Bhowmik
Represented By: Kyle Nordrehaug
Represented By: Nicholas James De Blouw
Represented By: Norman B Blumenthal
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Herman
Represented By: Sergio Julian Puche
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grossmont Hospital Corporation
Represented By: Jody A Landry
Represented By: Krystal Norris Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?