Tabarez et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Pompeyo Jr. Tabarez, Yolanda Tabarez and Pompeyo Tabarez, Jr.
Defendant: Ford Motor Company, Does 1 through 10 and Doe 1 through Doe 10
Case Number: 3:2022cv00972
Filed: July 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Michael S Berg
2 Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bw Diversity -Breach of Warranty
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting Joint Motion For Dismissal With Prejudice [ECF No. #16 ]. Signed by Judge Linda Lopez on 2/9/2023. (ddf)
February 8, 2023 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Pompeyo Tabarez, Jr, Yolanda Tabarez. (Youssefi, Joshua) (ddf).
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Linda Lopez Rejecting re #14 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice, from Plaintiffs Pompeyo Tabarez, Jr, Yolanda Tabarez. Non-compliance with local rule(s), ECF 2(h): Includes a proposed order or requires judges signature. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties (Attachments: #1 Rejected Document)(ddf)
February 1, 2023 Filing 14 ***Stricken Per #15 *** Modified on 2/2/2023 (ddf). (Main Document 14 replaced on 2/2/2023) (ddf).
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting Joint Motion To Continue Settlement Disposition Conference [ECF No. #12 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 12/1/2022. (ddf)
November 29, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Continue Settlement Disposition Conference by Pompeyo Tabarez, Jr, Yolanda Tabarez. (Youssefi, Joshua) (ddf).
November 29, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Jordan Youssefi on behalf of Pompeyo Tabarez, Jr, Yolanda Tabarez (Youssefi, Joshua) (ddf).
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting Joint Motion To Continue Settlement Disposition Conference [ECF No. #9 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 10/4/2022. (ddf)
October 4, 2022 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Continue Settlement Disposition Conference on October 6, 2022 by Ford Motor Company. (Do, Hang) (ddf).
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Confirming Settlement And Setting Deadline To File Joint Motion To Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 8/2/2022.(ddf)
August 2, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement by Ford Motor Company (Do, Hang) (ddf).
July 6, 2022 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Linda Lopez for all further proceedings. The new case number is 22cv972-LL-MSB.(no document attached) (ddf)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference And Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 7/5/2022.(ddf)
July 1, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ford Motor Company. (exs)(jrd)
July 1, 2022 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ford Motor Company. (exs)(jrd)
July 1, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Ford Motor Company. Identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate Black Rock, Inc., Other Affiliate State Street Bank and Trust Company for Ford Motor Company. (exs)(jrd)
July 1, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL With Jury Demand (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-16962223.), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Declaration)The new case number is 3:22-cv-972-BEN-MSB. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case.(exs) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/1/2022) (exs). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/1/2022) (exs). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/5/2022: #9 Proof of Service Proof of Service) (exs) (Attachment 4 replaced on 7/6/2022) (exs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tabarez et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pompeyo Jr. Tabarez
Represented By: Brian J. Bickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Tabarez
Represented By: Brian J. Bickel
Represented By: Jordan Kathleen Wager
Represented By: Joshua Jordan Youssefi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pompeyo Tabarez, Jr.
Represented By: Brian J. Bickel
Represented By: Jordan Kathleen Wager
Represented By: Joshua Jordan Youssefi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Hang Thi Alexandra Do
Represented By: Robert A Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 1 through Doe 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?