Dalavai v. University of California San Diego Health et al
Plaintiff: Randal Jerome Dalavai
Defendant: University of California San Diego Health, UC San Diego Health, Inland Valley Medical Center, Dr. Timothy M. Fernandes, Dr. Natalia Chavez Stewart, Dr. Alex Davila, Dr. Reuben Lakshmana, Dr. Norman Orr, Dr. Benjamin Tsai, Dr. Mohammed Suhail, Dr. Douglas A. Green, Dr. John C. Kim, Dr. Steven C. Howe, Dr. Stefan Sein, Dr. Alex Kristine Pearce, Dr. Gordon Lap-Kay Yung, Dr. Javier R. Rios, Dr. Patricia S. Juang, Dr. Kelsey Ann Luoma, Dr. Gregory David Middleton, Dr. Annen Cowell, Dr. Jejo D. Koola, Dr. Annie N. Cowell, Dr. Kira Anne Skavinski, Dr. Eric Jon Mlodzinski, Dr. Naveen Gupta, Dr. Daniel Calac, Dr. Laurence H. Boggeln, Dr. Jennifer M. Quartarolo, Dr. Abhishek Gadre, Dr. Michelle Pei Zhang, Dr. Jaswinder P. Bajwa, Dr. Sherry Shuyan Zhang, Doe and Reuben Lakshmanan
Case Number: 3:2022cv01471
Filed: September 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: William V Gallo
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395 Emergency Medical Treatment and Active Labor Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Rule 60 Relief re #15 Order Dismissing Case, MOTION to Amend Complaint by Randal Jerome Dalavai. (sjt)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISMISSING CASE With Prejudice and Closing Case. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 11/18/2022.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
November 18, 2022 Filing 14 Amended MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint by Randal Jerome Dalavai. (anh)
November 17, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint by Randal Jerome Dalavai. (anh)
November 17, 2022 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo: Order to Show Cause Hearing held on 11/17/2022. Written order from the court to follow. (Court Reporter/ECR Mauralee Ramirez). (Plaintiff Attorney Randal Dalavai, pro se). (no document attached) (lmh)
November 14, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause Article III filed by Randal Jerome Dalavai. (anh)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting Modification Motion to Continue To Show Cause Hearing [Doc. No. #9 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 11/1/2022. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
November 1, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Continue Order to Show Cause Hearing on November 3, 2022 at 2:00 PM or Any Other Available Dates After My New Probate Hearing of November 9, 2022 at 10:00 AM by Randal Jerome Dalavai. (anh)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Continuing Show Cause Hearing [Doc. No. #7 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/21/2022. (anh)
October 21, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Continuance of Order to Show Cause Hearing on October 31, 2022 at 10:00 AM to November 3, 2022 or any Other Available Dates/Times by Randal Jerome Dalavai. (anh)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Continuing Show Cause Hearing [Doc. No. #5 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/12/2022. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
October 11, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Continuance of Order to Show Cause Hearing on October 17,2022 at 2:00 PM to October 31, 2022 or any Other Available Dates by Randal Jerome Dalavai. (anh)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Show Cause Hearing. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/3/2022.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
October 3, 2022 Filing 3 Amended Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (ggv) (anh).
September 29, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (ggv) (anh).
September 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jaswinder P. Bajwa, Laurence H. Boggeln, Daniel Calac, Natalia Chavez Stewart, Anne N. Cowell, Annie N. Cowell, Alex Davila, Doe(2nd Physician Certifying Terminal illness At Elizabeth Hospice, an Individual), Doe(1st Physician Certifying Terminal illness at Elizabeth Hospice, an Individual), Timothy M. Fernandes, Abhishek Gadre, Douglas A. Green, Naveen Gupta, Steven C. Howe, Inland Valley Medical Center, Patricia S. Juang, John C. Kim, Jejo D. Koola, Reuben Lakshmanan, Kelsey Ann Luoma, Gregory David Middleton, Eric Jon Mlodzinski, Norman Orr, Alex Kristine Pearce, Jennifer M. Quartarolo, Javier R. Rios, Stefan Sein, Kira Anne Skavinski, Mohammed Suhail, Benjamin Tsai, University of California San Diego Health, Gordon Lap-Kay Yung, Michelle Pei Zhang, Sherry Shuyan Zhang ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number CAS140831.), filed by Randal Jerome Dalavai. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)The new case number is 3:22-cv-1471-CAB-WVG. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Dalavai, Randal Jerome)(ggv) (anh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dalavai v. University of California San Diego Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of California San Diego Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UC San Diego Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inland Valley Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Timothy M. Fernandes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Natalia Chavez Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Alex Davila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Reuben Lakshmana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Norman Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Benjamin Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Mohammed Suhail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Douglas A. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. John C. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Steven C. Howe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Stefan Sein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Alex Kristine Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Gordon Lap-Kay Yung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Javier R. Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Patricia S. Juang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Kelsey Ann Luoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Gregory David Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Annen Cowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jejo D. Koola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Annie N. Cowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Kira Anne Skavinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Eric Jon Mlodzinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Naveen Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Daniel Calac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Laurence H. Boggeln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jennifer M. Quartarolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Abhishek Gadre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Michelle Pei Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jaswinder P. Bajwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Sherry Shuyan Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reuben Lakshmanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randal Jerome Dalavai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?