Kauffman v. Lend-A-Loan, LLC
Plaintiff: David Kauffman
Defendant: Lend-A-Loan, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv01911
Filed: December 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Daniel E Butcher
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting Joint Motion To Dismiss [ECF No. #22 ]. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 5/10/2023.(ddf)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Vacating Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference ("ENE/CMC"). In light of the parties' Joint Motion to Dismiss this action #22 , the Court VACATES the ENE/CMC set on 4/25/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 4/24/2023.(no document attached) (smd)
April 21, 2023 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Action Without Prejudice by David Kauffman. (Shay, Daniel) (ddf).
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Alexander A. Ayar, re #20 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/5/2023.(rmc)
April 3, 2023 Filing 20 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Ayar, Alexander)
March 30, 2023 Filing 19 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-17716200.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Ayar, Alexander) QC mailer sent re missing signature on 3/30/2023 (jrm).
March 22, 2023 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher: The Court held an Early Neutral Evaluation Conference ("ENE") on 3/22/2023. (Plaintiff's Attorney Daniel Shay). (Defendant's Attorney Stephen Boren). The Court sets a follow up ENE for 4/25/2023 at 9:30 A.M. The Court also reschedules the Case Management Conference ("CMC") to 4/25/2023 at 9:30 AM. The Court will send the Zoom invitation to participate to the same individuals who participated in the prior ENE unless a party requests otherwise. If the case does not settle, the CMC will be held immediately following the ENE. (no document attached) (yyk)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting Motion To Substitute Attorney [ECF No. #16 ]. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 3/20/2023. (ddf)
March 10, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Lend-A-Loan, LLC. (Okelberry, Nathan) (ddf).
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Continue: In light of Defendant's substitution of attorneys, the parties' Joint Motion to Continue the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference ("ENE") and Case Management Conference ("CMC") (Dkt. No. 14) is GRANTED. Defendant must file a notice of substitution of counsel and a notice of appearance of new counsel on or before March 16, 2023. The ENE is rescheduled to March 22, 2023 at 2:00 P.M. The Court will send the invitation to participate to the same individuals unless a party requests otherwise. If the case does not settle, the CMC will be held immediately following the ENE. (no document attached) (yyk)
March 8, 2023 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation by Lend-A-Loan, LLC. (Okelberry, Nathan) (ddf).
March 2, 2023 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Shay, Daniel) (ddf).
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance; And Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 2/3/2023.(ddf)
February 3, 2023 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lend-A-Loan, LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Okelberry, Nathan) (ddf).
February 3, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Lend-A-Loan, LLC.(Okelberry, Nathan) (ddf).
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Joint Motion For Extension Of Time To Respond To Complaint [ECF No. #8 ]. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 12/30/2022. (ddf)
December 28, 2022 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Lend-A-Loan, LLC. (Okelberry, Nathan)Attorney Nathan Okelberry added to party Lend-A-Loan, LLC(pty:dft) (ddf).
December 12, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by David Kauffman re #4 Summons Returned Executed filed by David Kauffman . (Shay, Daniel) (ddf).
December 12, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by David Kauffman re #3 Summons Returned Executed filed by David Kauffman . (Shay, Daniel) (ddf).
December 9, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Kauffman. Lend-A-Loan, LLC served. (Shay, Daniel) (ddf).
December 9, 2022 Filing 4 ***Withdrawn Per #7 ***SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Kauffman. David Kauffman served. (Shay, Daniel) QC Mailer re Duplicate Entry (ddf).
December 9, 2022 Filing 3 ***Withdrawn Per #6 ***SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Kauffman. Lend-A-Loan, LLC served. (Shay, Daniel) QC Mailer re Incorrect document filed (ddf).
December 2, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jms)
December 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Lend-A-Loan, LLC (Filing fee $402 - receipt number ACASDC-17393218), filed by David Kauffman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:22-cv-1911-BEN-DEB. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case. (Swigart, Joshua)(jms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kauffman v. Lend-A-Loan, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Kauffman
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Spencer L. Pfeiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lend-A-Loan, LLC
Represented By: Nathan Okelberry
Represented By: Stephen Z. Boren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?