Augustine v. Lenovo (United States), Inc.
Plaintiff: Ophelia Augustine
Defendant: Lenovo (United States), Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv02027
Filed: December 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison H Goddard
Referring Judge: M James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 2511 Wiretapping - Injunctive Relief or Civil Fine
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting #32 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 11/17/2023. (hmw)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Ophelia Augustine. (Travis, Ben)(cxl1).
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Ophelia Augustine re #30 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Ophelia Augustine . (Shay, Daniel) (cxl1).
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 **DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER NOTICE #31 ** MOTION for Protective Order by Ophelia Augustine. (Shay, Daniel) QC Mailer 11/16/2023- Proposed orders should not be attached. (cxl1). Modified to withdraw on 11/16/2023 (cxl1).
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Resetting Settlement Conference. Time Change Only. Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the one-hour settlement conference set for 11/27/2023 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard is RESET for 9:15 AM on the same date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 11/7/2023.(no document attached) (hmw)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference and Setting Settlement Conference. One-hour, counsel-only Settlement Conference set for 11/27/2023 a 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 10/20/2023.(hmw)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 10/20/2023. The case did not settle, but the Court will continue to facilitate settlement discussions. The parties will negotiate a protective order so they can exchange a key contract at issue. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's offer is due 11/24/2023 via email (not filed). The deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's discovery requests is extended to 1/10/2024. Counsel-only settlement conference set for 11/27/2023. Written order to issue. (Plaintiff Attorneys Joshua Brandon Swigart and Ben Travis). (Defendant Attorney Paul W. Sweeney Jr.). (no document attached) (hmw)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul W Sweeney, Jr on behalf of Lenovo (United States), Inc. (Sweeney, Paul)Attorney Paul W Sweeney, Jr added to party Lenovo (United States), Inc.(pty:dft) (cxl1).
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STATUS REPORT - Joint Case Management Statement by Ophelia Augustine. (Shay, Daniel) (cxl1).
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Ophelia Augustine re #23 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Shay, Daniel) (cxl1).
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 **DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER NOTICE #24 ** REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Shay, Daniel) QC Mailer 10/10/2023- Document Contains Wrong s/(cxl1). Modified to withdraw on 10/11/2023 (cxl1).
October 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Lenovo (United States), Inc. . Identifying Corporate Parent Lenovo Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Lenovo Group Limited, Other Affiliate Legend Holdings Corporation for Lenovo (United States), Inc. (Robinson, Kelsi) (cxl1).
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference ("ENE") and Case Management Conference ("CMC"). ENE set for 10/20/2023 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. In the event the case does not settle at the ENE, the Court will immediately thereafter hold a CMC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 8/17/2023.(hmw)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Lenovo (United States), Inc.(Timm, Zachary) (cxl1).
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (ECF No. #12 ). Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 08/02/2023. (cxl1)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Lenovo (United States), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration of Kelsi E. Robinson, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Robinson, Kelsi) (cxl1).
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Lenovo (United States), Inc. re #16 Reply - Other, filed by Lenovo (United States), Inc. . (Robinson, Kelsi) (cxl1).
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY - Other re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Lenovo (United States), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration of Kelsi E. Robinson)(Robinson, Kelsi) QC Mailer-Document Contains Wrong s/ (cxl1).
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ophelia Augustine. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice Opposition to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice)(Swigart, Joshua) (cxl1).
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #13 ). Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 04/18/2023. (cxl1)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Ophelia Augustine. (Shay, Daniel) (cxl1).
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lenovo (United States), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice)(Timm, Zachary) (cxl1).
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying Motion to Dismiss as Moot (ECF No. #8 ). Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 04/03/2023. Defendant shall file a response to the amended complaint, if any, no later than the time provided for in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(3). (cxl1)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsi Robinson on behalf of Lenovo (United States), Inc. (Robinson, Kelsi)Attorney Kelsi Robinson added to party Lenovo (United States), Inc.(pty:dft) (cxl1).
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Lenovo (United States), Inc., filed by Ophelia Augustine. (Shay, Daniel) (cxl1).
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lenovo (United States), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Timm, Zachary) (cxl1).
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Nelson on behalf of Ophelia Augustine (Nelson, John)Attorney John J. Nelson added to party Ophelia Augustine(pty:pla) (cxl1).
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint.The deadline for Defendants to respond to the complaint is 2/27/2023. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 01/12/2023. (cxl1)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Lenovo (United States), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Timm, Zachary)Attorney Zachary Timm added to party Lenovo (United States), Inc.(pty:dft) (cxl1).
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel G. Shay on behalf of Ophelia Augustine (Shay, Daniel)(cxl1).
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ophelia Augustine. Lenovo (United States), Inc. served. (Swigart, Joshua) (alns).
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (ggv) (sjt).
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Lenovo (United States), Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-17442525.), filed by Ophelia Augustine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:22-cv-2027-L-AHG. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Swigart, Joshua)(ggv) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Augustine v. Lenovo (United States), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ophelia Augustine
Represented By: Ben Travis
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Represented By: John J. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenovo (United States), Inc.
Represented By: Zachary Timm
Represented By: Kelsi Robinson
Represented By: Paul W Sweeney, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?