Price v. Carnival Corporation
Plaintiff: India Price, Erica Mikulsky, Marilyn Hernandez, Ariel Oliver and Daniel Rubridge
Defendant: Carnival Corporation
Case Number: 3:2023cv00236
Filed: February 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael S Berg
Referring Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
2 Judge: William V Gallo
3 Judge: Allison H Goddard
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order Setting Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #23 ). Any opposition shall be filed on or before by 12/6/2023. Any reply shall be filed on or before 12/20/2023. A hearing on this matter is scheduled for 1/12/24, at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/7/23.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Carnival Corporation. (Heath, Jacob)(jmo).
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand re: First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint against Carnival Corporation, filed by India Price, Marilyn Hernandez, Ariel Oliver, Daniel Rubridge, Erica Mikulsky. (Pollock-Avery, Elizabeth) (jmo).
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order Granting Joint Motion to Modify Case Schedule (ECF No. #18 , #20 ). Plaintiffs amended complaint shall be due by 10/6/23. The Court denies the pending motion to dismiss, ECF No. #18 , as moot. Defendant shall have thirty (30) days to file an answer or other responsive pleading. If Defendant files a motion to dismiss, Plaintiffs shall have thirty (30) days to file their Opposition, and Defendant shall have fourteen (14) days to file its Reply. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/19/23. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Modify Case Schedule by Marilyn Hernandez, Erica Mikulsky, Ariel Oliver, India Price, Daniel Rubridge. (Pollock-Avery, Elizabeth) (jmo).
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order Setting Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #18 ). Any opposition due by 9/27/2023. Any reply due by 10/11/2023. A hearing on this matter is scheduled for 11/3/23 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/11/23.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Carnival Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jacob M. Heath, #2 Exhibit A)(Heath, Jacob) (jmo).
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRO HAC APPROVED: Elizabeth L. Pollock-Avery appearing for Plaintiffs Marilyn Hernandez, Erica Mikulsky, Ariel Oliver, India Price, Daniel Rubridge (no document attached) (rmc)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-18083933.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Pollock-Avery, Elizabeth) (rmc).
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand re: Consolidated Class Action Complaint against Carnival Corporation, filed by India Price, Marilyn Hernandez, Ariel Oliver, Daniel Rubridge, Erica Mikulsky. (Carpenter, Todd) (jmo).
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRO HAC APPROVED: Brian C. Gudmundson appearing for Plaintiff Daniel Rubridge. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (jrd)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $213.00 receipt number ACASDC-18032765.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Gudmundson, Brian)(jrd)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Consolidating Cases. Cases Consolidated, 23-cv-236-GPC-MSB. All future docketing will be done in the lead case. the Court FURTHER ORDERS that Plaintiffs shall file a consolidated complaint on or before 8/7/23. Defendant shall have until 9/6/23 to respond to the consolidated complaint. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/15/23.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRO HAC APPROVED: Jonathan M. Jagher appearing for Plaintiff Marilyn Hernandez (no document attached) (jrm)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-17926124.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Jagher, Jonathan)(jrm).
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Granting Joint Motion to Consolidate Cases and Setting Briefing Schedule (ECF No. #8 ). The Court DESIGNATES Price v. Carnival Corporation, Case No. 3:23-cv-00236-GPC-MSB, as the lead case. Plaintiffs shall file a consolidated complaint on or before 8/7/23. Defendant shall have until 9/6/23 to respond to the consolidated complaint. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/9/23. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases Related and Set Case Deadlines by Carnival Corporation. (Heath, Jacob) (jmo).
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Granting in Part Joint Motion to Modify Case Schedule (ECF No. #6 ). Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 6/8/23. The Court declines to set a briefing schedule at this time on a potential motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/9/23. (jmo)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Modify Case Schedule by Carnival Corporation. (Heath, Jacob)Attorney Jacob Marcus Heath added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft) (jmo).
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo is no longer assigned. Case randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg for all further proceedings. The new case number is 23-cv-236-GPC-MSB.(no document attached) (mjw)(jrd)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Minute Order of Recusal. Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo for all further proceedings. The new case number is 23cv00236-GPC-WVG.(jmo)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by India Price, as to Carnival Corporation. (Carpenter, Todd) (jmo).
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (aas) (jms).
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Carnival Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-1757014.), filed by India Price. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:23-cv-236-GPC-AHG. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Carpenter, Todd)(aas) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Carnival Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: India Price
Represented By: Todd D. Carpenter
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Pollock-Avery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Mikulsky
Represented By: James Pizzirusso
Represented By: Steven Nathan
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Pollock-Avery
Represented By: Todd D. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Hernandez
Represented By: James Pizzirusso
Represented By: Jonathan M. Jagher
Represented By: Steven Nathan
Represented By: Todd D. Carpenter
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Pollock-Avery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariel Oliver
Represented By: Gary F Lynch
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Pollock-Avery
Represented By: Todd D. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Rubridge
Represented By: Brian C Gudmundson
Represented By: Anja Rusi
Represented By: Carey Alexander
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Ethan Samuel Binder
Represented By: Joseph P. Guglielmo
Represented By: Michael J Laird
Represented By: Rachel Kristine Tack
Represented By: Brian C. Gudmundson
Represented By: Todd D. Carpenter
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Pollock-Avery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation
Represented By: Jacob Marcus Heath
Represented By: Aravind Swaminathan
Represented By: Jonathan Adler Direnfeld
Represented By: Rebecca C. Harlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?