Dennis v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Harry Dennis
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, Affinia Default Services, LLC and Does 1-50, inclusive
Case Number: 3:2023cv01089
Filed: June 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: William V Gallo
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
2 Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
3 Judge: Ruth Bermudez Montenegro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 fc Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice)(Mase, Andrew) (jpp).
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #14 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro on 8/1/2023. (jpp)
July 28, 2023 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Restrain Foreclosure Sale of Property filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Request for Judicial Notice)(Mase, Andrew) (jpp).
July 26, 2023 Filing 14 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Restrain Foreclosure Sale of Property by Harry Dennis. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration)(Shapero, Sarah) (jpp).
July 21, 2023 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand First Amended Complaint against Affinia Default Services, LLC, Does 1-50, inclusive, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, filed by Harry Dennis. (Shapero, Sarah) (jpp).
July 12, 2023 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER - Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLCs Joint Motion to Extent Time for Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint (Doc. 11) is GRANTED. Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC shall file an answer to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before July 26, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. (no document attached) (jpp)
July 12, 2023 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Rader, Steven)Attorney Steven L. Rader added to party Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC(pty:dft) (jpp).
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #3 ex parte application for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro on 6/21/2023. (jpp)
June 16, 2023 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's TRO application (Doc. #3 ) and Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC's opposition (Docs. #7 , #8 ). The Court takes the matter under submission and without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro.(no document attached) (rmc)
June 14, 2023 Filing 8 DECLARATION re #7 Response in Opposition to Motion by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Mase, Andrew) (jpp).
June 14, 2023 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order as to retrain the trustee sale scheduled for June 26, 2023 filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Mase, Andrew) (jpp).
June 14, 2023 Filing 6 DECLARATION re #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order as to retrain the trustee sale scheduled for June 26, 2023 Intent to Oppose Ex Parte Motion by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Mase, Andrew) (jpp).
June 13, 2023 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge M. James Lorenz is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro for all further proceedings. The new case number is 23cv1089-RBM-WVG.(no document attached) (sjt)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo for all further proceedings. Judge Linda Lopez, Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:23-cv-00435-L-WVG. The new case number is 23cv1089-L-WVG. Signed by Judge Linda Lopez on 06/13/2023. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 06/13/2023.(cxl1)
June 12, 2023 Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order as to retrain the trustee sale scheduled for June 26, 2023 by Harry Dennis. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Adair, #3 Declaration of Dennis, #4 Supplement Proposed Order)(Shapero, Sarah) QC Mailer re Proposed orders should not be attached (ddf).
June 12, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (ggv) (sjt).
June 12, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Affinia Default Services, LLC, Does 1-50, inclusive, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BCASDC-17924123.), filed by Harry Dennis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:23-cv-1089-LL-BLM. Judge Linda Lopez and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Shapero, Sarah)(ggv) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dennis v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Dennis
Represented By: Jessica Diane Adair
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Shapero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Mase
Represented By: Steven L. Rader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affinia Default Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?