Tibrio, LLC v. Flex Marketing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tibrio, LLC
Defendant: Flex Marketing, LLC, Michael Held, Paul Lieberman and Does 1-100
Case Number: 3:2023cv01167
Filed: June 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Linda Lopez
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 0501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2023 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Does 1-100, Flex Marketing, LLC, filed by Tibrio, LLC. (Gillick, Jacob) (ddf).
July 25, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Michael Held, Flex Marketing, LLC, Paul Lieberman re #9 Notice of Appearance filed by Flex Marketing, LLC, Paul Lieberman, Michael Held . (Newman, Derek) (ddf).
July 20, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey Lee Pierce on behalf of Flex Marketing, LLC, Michael Held, Paul Lieberman (Pierce, Lindsey)Attorney Lindsey Lee Pierce added to party Flex Marketing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Lindsey Lee Pierce added to party Michael Held(pty:dft), Attorney Lindsey Lee Pierce added to party Paul Lieberman(pty:dft) (ddf).
July 20, 2023 Filing 9 ***Withdrawn Per #11 ***NOTICE of Appearance of Lindsey Pierce by Derek Alan Newman on behalf of Flex Marketing, LLC, Michael Held, Paul Lieberman (Newman, Derek) QC Mailer re Document contains wrong signature (ddf).
July 20, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek Alan Newman on behalf of Flex Marketing, LLC, Michael Held, Paul Lieberman (Newman, Derek)Attorney Derek Alan Newman added to party Flex Marketing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Derek Alan Newman added to party Michael Held(pty:dft), Attorney Derek Alan Newman added to party Paul Lieberman(pty:dft) (ddf).
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting Joint Motion To Amend Complaint And Continue Time To File Responsive Pleading [ECF No. #6 ]. Signed by Judge Linda Lopez on 7/19/2023. (ddf)
July 19, 2023 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint, Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint by Tibrio, LLC. (Gillick, Jacob) (ddf).
July 7, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tibrio, LLC. Paul Lieberman served. (Gillick, Jacob) (ddf).
July 7, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tibrio, LLC. Michael Held served. (Gillick, Jacob) (ddf).
July 7, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tibrio, LLC. Flex Marketing, LLC served. (Gillick, Jacob) (ddf).
June 23, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Tibrio, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. , Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dim) (anh).
June 23, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Flex Marketing, LLC, Michael Held, Paul Lieberman ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-17959459.), filed by Tibrio, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:23-cv-1167-LL-BGS. Judge Linda Lopez and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Gillick, Jacob)(dim) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/23/2023: #2 Copyright Report) [Copyright Report Mailed] (dim). (anh). .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tibrio, LLC v. Flex Marketing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tibrio, LLC
Represented By: Jacob Asher Gillick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flex Marketing, LLC
Represented By: Derek Alan Newman
Represented By: Lindsey Lee Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Held
Represented By: Derek Alan Newman
Represented By: Lindsey Lee Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Lieberman
Represented By: Derek Alan Newman
Represented By: Lindsey Lee Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?