Dale Sundby et al v. Fidelity National Title Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Dale Sundby and Edith Littlefield Sundby
Respondent: - Fidelity National Title Insurance Company, Does 1-X, inclusive, Fidelity National Title Insurance Company and Does I-X
Case Number: 3:2023cv01239
Filed: July 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Referring Judge: Allison H Goddard
2 Judge: Janis L Sammartino
3 Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 ct Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Granting Motion for Leave to File Electronically [ECF No. #92 ]. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/11/2023. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
August 10, 2023 Filing 92 MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Documents, by Edith Littlefield Sundby. (maq)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Order Denying Motion for Leave to Electronically File Documents with Leave to Refile (ECF No. #90 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/8/23. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
August 8, 2023 Filing 90 MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Documents by Edith Littlefield Sundby. (jmo)
August 7, 2023 Filing 89 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Dale Sundby re #79 MOTION to Disqualify Judge Curiel . (Sundby, Dale) (jmo).
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Order Granting Request to Extend Briefing Deadlines and Continue Motion Hearing (ECF No. #85 ). Responses due by 9/15/2023. Replies due by 9/29/2023. Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify, ECF No. #79 , is continued to 10/16/2023 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. The deadline to submit briefing on whether the proceedings should be stayed is extended to 9/29/2023. Replies due by 10/13/2023. Briefs shall still be limited to 15 pages and replies to 7 pages. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/4/23.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
August 4, 2023 Filing 87 DECLARATION re #85 Order Setting Briefing Schedule,, Request(s) and Declaration by Plaintiff Dale Sundby. (Sundby, Dale) (jmo).
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Order Denying Leave to Electronically File Documents Without Prejudice (ECF No. #83 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/4/23. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Order: (1) Vacating Hearing on Motion to Amend Complaint (ECF No. #70 ); (2) Setting Briefing Schedule and Continuing Haring on Motion to Disqualify (ECF No. #79 ); and (3) for Briefing on Ordering Stay of Proceedings. The hearing on the matter, previously scheduled for 9/8/23, is hereby continued to Monday, 9/11/23 at 3:00 pm in Courtroom 2D. any response shall be filed on or before 8/18/23. Any reply due 8/25/23. On or before 8/25/23, each party shall file a brief of no more than 15 pages containing arguments in support of or against a stay of the proceedings. Replies due 9/1/23. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/4/23.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
August 3, 2023 Filing 84 OBJECTION by Dale Sundby re #82 Order . (Sundby, Dale) (jmo).
August 3, 2023 Filing 83 MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Documents by Edith Littlefield Sundby. (Sundby, Dale) **QC mailer re: not allowed to file documents on behalf of another filer 8/4/2023 (jmo).
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Overruling Objection to Transfer Pursuant to Low Number Rule (ECF No. #78 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 08/03/2023.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cxl1)
August 2, 2023 Filing 81 REPLY to Response to Motion re #70 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Dale Sundby. (Sundby, Dale)
August 2, 2023 Filing 80 NOTICE of Challenge by Dale Sundby re #65 Transfer Document, (Sundby, Dale)
August 2, 2023 Filing 79 MOTION to Disqualify Judge Curiel by Dale Sundby. (Sundby, Dale)
July 28, 2023 Filing 78 OBJECTION by Dale Sundby re #77 Order of Transfer Pursuant to Low Number Rule,, . (Sundby, Dale) (jmo).
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE, re #68 Notice of Related Case. Case reassigned to Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard for all further proceedings. Judge Janis L. Sammartino, Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit no longer assigned to case. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge(s) have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge(s). Create association to 3:19-cv-00390-GPC-AHG. The new case number is 23-cv-1239-GPC-AHG. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/27/23. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/26/23. Motions set before Allison H. Goddard.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aas)
July 26, 2023 Filing 76 MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit for all further proceedings. The new case number is 23-cv-1239-JLS-MMP.(no document attached) (aas)
July 25, 2023 Filing 75 RESPONSE in Opposition re #70 MOTION for Leave to File AN AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Owen, David) (aas).
July 21, 2023 Filing 74 NOTICE OF CLOSURE OF CASE No. 19cv390-GPC-AHG by Dale Sundby re #72 Objection, #68 Notice of Related Case, #73 Supplemental Document (Sundby, Dale)
July 21, 2023 Filing 73 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Dale Sundby re #72 Objection, #68 Notice of Related Case . (Sundby, Dale)
July 17, 2023 Filing 72 OBJECTION by Dale Sundby re #68 Notice of Related Case . (Sundby, Dale)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Granting #69 Plaintiff Dale Sundby's Motion to Allow Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/12/23. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aas)
July 10, 2023 Filing 70 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Dale Sundby, Edith Littlefield Sundby. (Attachments: #1 part 2, #2 part 3, #3 part 4, #4 part 5, #5 part 6, #6 part 7, #7 part 8)(aas)
July 10, 2023 Filing 69 MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Documents by Dale Sundby, Edith Littlefield Sundby. (aas)
July 10, 2023 Filing 68 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) of case(s) 19cv390-GPC-AHG. (aas) (jms).
July 5, 2023 Filing 67 Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal assigned to transfer case from Cental District of California. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (jpp)
July 5, 2023 Filing 66 Case transferred in from the Central District of California; Case Number 8:22-cv-02005-JWH-KES. Original file received electronically.
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER ON MOTION TO TRANSFER #57 by Judge John W. Holcomb. Granting #57 MOTION to Transfer Case. Case transferred to the Southern District of California. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (rolm) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
June 29, 2023 Filing 64 Notice June 29, 2023 Order re Motion For Disqualification of Honorable Gonzalo P. Curiel filed by plaintiff Dale Sundby. (Sundby, Dale) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court finds that the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 29] and Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue [ECF No. 57] are appropriate for resolution without a hearing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the hearing set on May 12, 2023. The motions stand submitted on the papers timely filed. The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing on May 12, 2023 is not necessary. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
May 2, 2023 Filing 62 Notice MAY 1, 2023 FILING OF MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION OF HONORABLE GONZALO P. CURIEL filed by Plaintiff Dale Sundby. (Sundby, Dale) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
April 28, 2023 Filing 61 Notice MISSING PAGE IN ECF No. 59 DECLARATION EXHIBIT filed by Plaintiff Dale Sundby. (Sundby, Dale) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
April 26, 2023 Filing 60 REPLY filed by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company (Rousso, Mary) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
April 21, 2023 Filing 59 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA #57 filed by Plaintiff Dale Sundby. (Sundby, Dale) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
March 17, 2023 Filing 58 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA #57 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or untimely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
March 16, 2023 Filing 57 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Rousso, Mary) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
March 7, 2023 Filing 56 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 2/22/23 2:00 P.M. to 3:34 P.M. re Transcript #55 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (apr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
March 7, 2023 Filing 55 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 2/22/23 2:00 P.M. to 3:34 P.M.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: JAMS CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPTION, phone number (661) 609-4528. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/28/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/7/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/5/2023. (apr) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
February 23, 2023 Filing 54 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Dale Sundby for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Dale Sundby at dale@sundby.email with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Sundby, Dale) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
February 23, 2023 Filing 52 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mary Ann Rousso counsel for Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. Adding David B. Owen as counsel of record for Fidelity National Tile Insurance Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Rousso, Mary) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
February 22, 2023 Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER OF VIDEO HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS CASE #29 ; SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge John W. Holcomb. The parties are DIRECTED to meet and confer per L.R. 7-3 regarding Defendants anticipated Motion to Transfer Venue to the Southern District of California. (See document for further details) Court Recorder: Courtsmart. (yl) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
February 21, 2023 Filing 51 DECLARATION of Dale H. Sundby (Declaration 2) filed by Plaintiff Dale Sundby. (Sundby, Dale) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
February 21, 2023 Filing 50 DECLARATION of Dale H. Sundby filed by Plaintiff Dale Sundby. (Sundby, Dale) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: On its own motion, the Court CONTINUES the hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Case [ECF No. 29], Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Sur-Reply [ECF No. 43] and Scheduling Conference from February 17, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. to February 22, 2023 at 2:00 p.m., via video conference. To obtain the video conference link for the scheduled hearing, the parties are directed to Judge Holcombs Procedures and Schedules page on the Courts website: http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-john-w-holcomb. Please follow the instructions listed under Zoom Webinar Hearings. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: On its own motion, the Court CONTINUES the hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Case [ECF No. 29], Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Sur-Reply [ECF No. 43] and Scheduling Conference from February 10, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. to February 17, 2023 at 11:00 a.m., via video conference. To obtain the video conference link for the scheduled hearing, the parties are directed to Judge Holcombs Procedures and Schedules page on the Courts website: http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-john-w-holcomb. Please follow the instructions listed under Zoom Webinar Hearings. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION [ECF NO. #43 ] (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge John W. Holcomb. After considering the papers filed in support and in opposition, the Court orders that the Application is DENIED. (See document for further details) (yl) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Case [ECF No. 29], Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Sur-Reply [ECF No. 43] and Scheduling Conference are ordered CONTINUED from February 3, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. to February 10, 2023 at 11:00 a.m., via video conference. To obtain the video conference link for the scheduled hearing, the parties are directed to Judge Holcombs Procedures and Schedules page on the Courts website: http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-john-w-holcomb. Please follow the instructions listed under Zoom Webinar Hearings. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
January 24, 2023 Filing 45 REPLY to Opposition EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Sur-reply ; Alternatively to Strike Reply paragraphs II.B, II.C, and II.E #43 filed by Plaintiff Dale Sundby. (Sundby, Dale) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
January 24, 2023 Filing 44 OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE A SUR REPLY re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Sur-reply ; Alternatively to Strike Reply paragraphs II.B, II.C, and II.E #43 filed by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Rousso, Mary) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
January 23, 2023 Filing 43 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Sur-reply ; Alternatively to Strike Reply paragraphs II.B, II.C, and II.E filed by Plaintiff Dale Sundby. (Sundby, Dale) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
January 19, 2023 Filing 42 REPLY filed by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company to Response in Opposition to Motion #37 (Rousso, Mary) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
January 18, 2023 Filing 41 DECLARATION of Dale H. Sundby filed by Plaintiff Dale Sundby. (Sundby, Dale) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The hearing on Defendants Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 29] and the Scheduling Conference will be held via video conference on February 3,2023 at 11:00 a.m. To obtain the video conference link for the scheduled hearing, the parties are directed to Judge Holcombs Procedures and Schedules page on the Courts website: http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-john-w-holcomb. Please follow the instructions listed under Zoom Webinar Hearings. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: In view of Defendants filing of its Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 29], Plaintiffs Request for Default [ECF No. 28] is hereby DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: On its own motion, the Court CONTINUES the Scheduling Conference from January 13, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. to February 3, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. and the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 29] from January 20, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. to February 3, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are DIRECTED to appear in person in Courtroom 9D, on the 9th Floor of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and United States Courthouse at 411 W. Fourth Street Santa Ana, CA 92701. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
January 8, 2023 Filing 37 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #29 filed by Plaintiff Dale Sundby. (Sundby, Dale) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
January 3, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company #28 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Answer and/or Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Motion to Dismiss on file. (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
January 3, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #29 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or untimely. Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): The motion hearing date was not included in the final text of the docket entry. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
December 30, 2022 Filing 34 OBJECTIONS to REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company #28 , Deficiency - Default /Default Judgment (CV-52b) - optional html form, #33 , Objection #32 OBJECTION to OBJECTION filed by Plaintiff Dale Sundby. (Sundby, Dale) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
December 29, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company #28 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Motion to Dismiss was filed the next day, on 12/29/22 by defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. Request for Entry of Default has been forwarded to the assigned Judge. (bm) Modified on 12/29/2022 (bm). [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
December 29, 2022 Filing 32 OBJECTIONS filed by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Rousso, Mary) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
December 29, 2022 Filing 31 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #29 filed by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Rousso, Mary) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
December 29, 2022 Filing 30 JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Plaintiff Dale Sundby. (Sundby, Dale) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
December 29, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Rousso, Mary) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
December 28, 2022 Filing 28 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company filed by Plaintiff Dale Sundby. (Sundby, Dale) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
December 14, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Change of other firm name or address information Changing Email. Filed by Plaintiffs Edith Littlefield Sundby, Edith Littlefield Sundby. (Sundby, Dale) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTES: ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S EX PAZRTE APPLICATION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS [ECF No. 21] (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge John W. Holcomb. For the foregoing reasons, the Court hereby ORDERS as follows: To the extent that the Sundbys seek the denial of the underlying Motion, the Sundbys' Application is GRANTED. Fidelity's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice. The hearing on the Motion to Dismiss, currently set for January 13, 2023, is VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
December 6, 2022 Filing 25 REPLY SUPPLEMENT TO OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Motion to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #14 For Failure to Comply with Local Rule 7-3 #21 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #14 filed by Plaintiff Dale Sundby. (Sundby, Dale) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
December 6, 2022 Filing 24 REPLY to FALSE STATEMENTS in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Motion to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #14 For Failure to Comply with Local Rule 7-3 #21 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #14 filed by Plaintiff Dale Sundby. (Sundby, Dale) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
December 6, 2022 Filing 23 OBJECTIONS filed by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Rousso, Mary) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
December 5, 2022 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Dale Sundby, re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Motion to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #14 For Failure to Comply with Local Rule 7-3 #21 Supplemental Certificate of Service served on December 5, 2022. (Sundby, Dale) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
December 5, 2022 Filing 21 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Motion to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #14 For Failure to Comply with Local Rule 7-3 filed by Plaintiff Dale Sundby. (Sundby, Dale) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
November 29, 2022 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company, re Notice (Other), #17 served on 11/29/22. (Rousso, Mary) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
November 29, 2022 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company, re Request for Judicial Notice #15 served on 11/28/22. (Rousso, Mary) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
November 29, 2022 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #14 served on 11/28/22. (Rousso, Mary) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
November 29, 2022 Filing 17 Notice filed by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Companys Notice of Corrected Hearing Date for Its Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities Filed in Support Thereof; and Request for Judicial Notice Filed in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint (Rousso, Mary) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 1/13/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. The parties are DIRECTED to appear in person in Courtroom 9D, on the 9th Floor of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and United States Courthouse at 411 W. Fourth Street Santa Ana, CA 92701. IT IS SO ORDERED. (cla) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
November 28, 2022 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #14 filed by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Rousso, Mary) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
November 28, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Attorney Mary Ann Rousso added to party Fidelity National Title Insurance Company(pty:dft)) (Rousso, Mary) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
November 10, 2022 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dale Sundby, upon Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company served on 11/7/2022, answer due 11/28/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sundby, Dale) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. One or more of the parties to this action has elected to appear pro se; that is, without a lawyer. If you are a party and you are not represented in this case by a lawyer, this Order is addressed to you. You, as well as all individuals appearing before this Court, are not required to retain the services of a lawyer or to obtain the advice of counsel. Individual litigants may represent themselves pro se, but corporations and associations must be represented by counsel. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: granting #8 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (rolm) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: granting #7 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (rolm) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
November 4, 2022 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Dale Sundby. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
November 4, 2022 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Edith Littlefield Sundby. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
November 4, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
November 4, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
November 4, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
November 1, 2022 Filing 3 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
November 1, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Dale Sundby, Dale Sundby(Trustee), Edith Littlefield Sundby (Trustee ), Edith Littlefield Sundby (car) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]
November 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Case assigned to Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott.(Filing fee $ 402 PAID) Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Edith Littlefield Sundby (Trustee ), Dale Sundby, Dale Sundby(Trustee), Edith Littlefield Sundby. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (car) [Transferred from California Central on 7/5/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dale Sundby et al v. Fidelity National Title Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Sundby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edith Littlefield Sundby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: - Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Represented By: David B. Owen
Represented By: Mary Ann Rousso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Does 1-X, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Mary Ann Rousso
Represented By: David B. Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?