Reiner v. American Arbitration Association Inc et al
Plaintiff: Wayne Reiner
Respondent: American Arbitration Association Inc and Cox Communications California LLC Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv01247
Filed: July 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: Karen S Crawford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2023 Filing 53 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by American Arbitration Association Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Counsel)(Dye, Stephen) (anh).
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint [Doc. No. #49 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/10/2023. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
August 9, 2023 Filing 51 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to First Amended Complaint by American Arbitration Association Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Stephen H. Dye in Support of Ex Parte Application to Extend Time To Respond to First Amended Complaint)(Harlow, Charles)Attorney Charles Harlow added to party American Arbitration Association Inc(pty:res) (anh).
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Denying Motion to Dismiss as Moot [Doc. No. #46 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 7/31/2023. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
July 31, 2023 Filing 49 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against American Arbitration Association Inc, filed by Wayne Reiner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (anh)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule [Doc. No. #46 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 7/10/2023.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
July 7, 2023 Filing 45 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cox Communications California LLC Inc. Notice of Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a) or (c) (signed by W. Reiner) (Ficks, Gregg) (anh).
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 7/6/2023.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
July 6, 2023 Filing 43 Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford assigned to transfer case from Cental District of California. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (jpp)
July 6, 2023 Filing 42 Case transferred in from the Central District of California; Case Number 8:22-cv-01743-CJC-DFM. Original file received electronically.
July 3, 2023 Filing 41 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Denying #39 MOTION to Move Case and Vacating Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Because the Court has already granted the motion to transfer, the supplement to the motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and the purported notice of voluntary dismissal is VACATED and may be refiled in the Southern District of California to the extent that Plaintiff deems doing so appropriate. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
June 29, 2023 Filing 40 [VACATED PURSUANT TO #41] Notice of Dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a) or (c) filed by plaintiff Wayne Reiner. (twdb) Modified on 7/5/2023 (twdb). [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
June 29, 2023 Filing 39 MOTION to Move Case From United States District Court to United States District Court San Diego- Supplement filed by plaintiff Wayne Reiner. Motion set for hearing on 7/10/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
June 26, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Defendant Cox Communications Cox Communications California LLC Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) (filing signed by Plaintiff Wayne Reiner) as to Cox Communications California LLC Inc.. (Ficks, Gregg) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA #27 by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #27 MOTION to Transfer Case. Case transferred to the Southern District of California. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (rolm) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
June 23, 2023 Filing 36 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Cox Communications California LLC Inc., re Order Extending Answer Due Deadline, #35 Proof of Service of Order Approving Stipulation to Further Extend Time for Defendant Cox Communications California, LLC to Respond to Initial Complaint served on 6/23/2023. (Ficks, Gregg) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO FURTHER EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT COX COMMUNICATIONS CALIFORNIA, LLC TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #34 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The deadline for Defendant Cox to respond to the Complaint in this action is extended to and including July 31, 2023. (rolm) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
June 21, 2023 Filing 34 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Cox Communications California LLC Inc. answer now due 7/31/2023, re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Defendant Cox Communications California LLC Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Ficks, Gregg) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
June 16, 2023 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Cox Communications California LLC Inc., re Request for Judicial Notice, #32 , Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #31 served on June 16, 2023. (Bruggebrew, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
June 16, 2023 Filing 32 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California, San Diego #27 filed by Defendant Cox Communications California LLC Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant Cox's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer Venue)(Bruggebrew, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
June 16, 2023 Filing 31 Defendant Cox's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer Venue Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California, San Diego #27 filed by Defendant Cox Communications California LLC Inc.. (Bruggebrew, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
June 7, 2023 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen H Dye counsel for Defendant American Arbitration Association Inc. Adding Stephen H. Dye as counsel of record for Defendant American Arbitration Association, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant American Arbitration Association, Inc.. (Dye, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
June 2, 2023 Filing 29 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Defendant American Arbitration Association Inc.(Attorney Stephen H Dye added to party American Arbitration Association Inc(pty:dft))(Dye, Stephen)[Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
May 31, 2023 Filing 28 (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Cormac J. Carney. On the Court's own motion, the MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California, San Diego #27 is set for hearing on 7/10/2023 at 1:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
May 30, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California, San Diego filed by plaintiff Wayne Reiner. (rolm) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
May 26, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Katharine T Van Dusen on behalf of Defendant Cox Communications California LLC Inc. (Van Dusen, Katharine) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
May 26, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel Mark Bruggebrew on behalf of Defendant Cox Communications California LLC Inc. (Attorney Daniel Mark Bruggebrew added to party Cox Communications California LLC Inc.(pty:dft))(Bruggebrew, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
May 26, 2023 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Cox Communications California LLC Inc. identifying CoxCom, LLC; Cox Communications Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Ficks, Gregg) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
May 25, 2023 Filing 23 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Cox Communications California LLC Inc. answer now due 7/5/2023, re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Defendant Cox Communications California LLC Inc..(Attorney Gregg M Ficks added to party Cox Communications California LLC Inc.(pty:dft))(Ficks, Gregg) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
May 18, 2023 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Wayne Reiner, upon Defendant Cox Communications California LLC Inc. served on 5/15/2023, answer due 6/5/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers registered agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
May 18, 2023 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Wayne Reiner, upon Defendant American Arbitration Association Inc served on 5/15/2023, answer due 6/5/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers registered agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
May 18, 2023 Filing 20 Proof of service Cox Communication California American Arbitration Association / NOTICE of Change of address Changing address to 7275 Mission Bay Drive Unit 453, Pacific Beach, CA 92109 Filed by Plaintiff Wayne Reiner. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
May 15, 2023 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Wayne Reiner, upon Defendant Cox Communications California LLC Inc. served on 5/12/2023, answer due 6/2/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rebecca Vang authorized to accept in compliance with statute not specified by personal service. Change of address (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
April 11, 2023 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant American Arbitration Association Inc. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
March 29, 2023 Filing 17 REPLY filed by Plaintiff Wayne Reiner to Order to show cause filed by court March 15, 2023 #15 (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
March 27, 2023 Filing 16 REPLY filed by Plaintiff Wayne Reiner to Order to show cause filed by court March 15, 2023 Supplement #15 (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Cormac J. Carney: ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE. Accordingly, the Court hereby ORDERS Plaintiff to file proof of service by no later than March 28, 2023. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of the action without prejudice. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
January 9, 2023 Filing 14 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Wayne Reiner to Order to Show Cause filed by Court 12/29/22 #13 (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Cormac J. Carney. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 1/9/2023. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
October 13, 2022 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 as to Defendant Cox Communications California LLC Inc. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (NON-PRISONER CASE) #2 #9 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: The Request is GRANTED. (rolm) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (rrp) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
October 12, 2022 Filing 9 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Wayne Reiner. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (NON-PRISONER CASE) #2 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court has reviewed the Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ("the Request") and the documents submitted with it. On the question of indigency, the Court finds that the party who filed the Request: has not submitted enough information for the Court to tell if the filer is able to pay the filing fees. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Ruling on the Request is POSTPONED for 30 days so that the filer may provide additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge James V. Selna. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge James V. Selna to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:22-cv-01743-CJC-(DFMx). (dve) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
September 23, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
September 23, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
September 23, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
September 22, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Wayne Reiner. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
September 22, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, filed by plaintiff Wayne Reiner. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]
September 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants American Arbitration Association Inc, Cox Communications California LLC Inc. Case assigned to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Wayne Reiner. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (ghap) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2022: #2 Summons) (ghap). [Transferred from California Central on 7/6/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reiner v. American Arbitration Association Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Reiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: American Arbitration Association Inc
Represented By: Stephen H. Dye
Represented By: Charles Harlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cox Communications California LLC Inc.
Represented By: Katharine T Van Dusen
Represented By: Daniel Mark Bruggebrew
Represented By: Gregg M Ficks
Represented By: Katharine Tracy Van Dusen
Represented By: Gregg M. Ficks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?