Jackson et al v. Pacific Union Financial LLC et al
Plaintiff: James R. Jackson Jr. and Suzette Jackson
Defendant: Pacific Union Financial, LLC doing business as Clearvision Funding, Fannie Mae as trustee for securitized trust guaranteed remic 2014-2019 trust, Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc. (MERS), Unknown Does 1 through 100, Nationstar Mortgage LLC also known as Pacific Union Financial doing business as Clearvision Funding and Pacific Union Financial
Case Number: 3:2023cv01285
Filed: July 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: William V Gallo
2 Judge: William Q Hayes
3 Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 fc Diversity - Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2023 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Unknown Does 1 through 100, filed by James R. Jackson Jr., Suzette Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18) (cxl1)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Re Motions to Dismiss and Ex Parte Application to Stop Trustee Sale. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/17/2023. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
August 17, 2023 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo: Motion Hearing held on 8/17/2023 re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Fannie Mae as trustee for securitized trust guaranteed remic 2014-2019 trust, Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc. (MERS). Order to follow.(Court Reporter/ECR Chari Bowery). (Plaintiff Attorney James and Suzette Jackson, pro se). (Defendant Attorney Robert Norman). (no document attached) (lmh)
August 4, 2023 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Suzette Jackson, James R. Jackson Jr. (anh)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo Rejecting Document: Filing Re Diversity Jurisdcition, from Plaintiffs Suzette Jackson, James R. Jackson Jr.. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(d) Supplemental pleadings require court order 23cv1103-CAB-BLM, Doc. No. 31- Any further documents framed as a proposed order or that do not contain both Plaintiffs signatures will be rejected.. Signed by the chambers of Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Rejected/Stricken Document)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
August 2, 2023 Filing 16 **Stricken Per Order #17 ** (anh).
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Re August 17,2023 Hearing.. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/1/2023.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE, re #3 Notice of Related Case. Case reassigned to Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major for all further proceedings. District Judge William Q. Hayes, Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo no longer assigned to case. The new case number is 23CV1285-CAB-BLM.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(alns)
July 31, 2023 Filing 13 REPLY - Other re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Suzette Jackson, James R. Jackson Jr.. (alns)
July 31, 2023 Filing 12 Plaintiff Reject Defendants Notice of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Complaint; Memorandum of Points & Authorities [Fed.R.Civ.P 12(b(1)] by Suzette Jackson, James R. Jackson Jr. (alns)
July 31, 2023 Filing 11 Plaintiff Rejects Defendants Request For Briefing Schedule On Ex Parte by Suzette Jackson, James R. Jackson Jr. (alns)
July 26, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE by Suzette Jackson (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(alns)
July 26, 2023 Filing 9 Consent Or Declination To Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction by Suzette Jackson (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(alns)
July 26, 2023 Filing 8 REPLY - Other re #5 Objection filed by Fannie Mae as trustee for securitized trust guaranteed remic 2014-2019 trust, Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc. (MERS). (Norman, Robert) (alns).
July 24, 2023 Filing 7 Opposition To Defendant Motion And Motion To Dismiss Complaint: Memorandum Of Points And Authorities by Suzette Jackson, James R. Jackson Jr.. (alns)
July 19, 2023 Filing 6 OBJECTION to the Defendants Request for Certificate of Interested Parties Under 28 U.S.C. S 1441(b) re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (alns)
July 19, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE Of Related Case Not To Be Transfered by Suzette Jackson, James R. Jackson Jr. re #3 Notice of Related Case (alns)
July 19, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Fannie Mae as trustee for securitized trust guaranteed remic 2014-2019 trust, Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc. (MERS). (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibits A-E)(Norman, Robert) (alns).
July 13, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) of case(s) 23CV1103-CAB-BLM. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(alns)
July 12, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Fannie Mae as trustee for securitized trust guaranteed remic 2014-2019 trust, Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc. (MERS). Identifying Corporate Parent MERSCORP Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent ICE Mortgage Services, LLC., Corporate Parent International Exchange, Inc. for Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc. (MERS); Other Affiliate Federal National Mortgage Association for Fannie Mae as trustee for securitized trust guaranteed remic 2014-2019 trust. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dim) (anh).
July 12, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-18007144.), filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc. (MERS), Fannie Mae as trustee for securitized trust guaranteed remic 2014-2019 trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:23-cv-1285-WQH-WVG. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case.(dim) (anh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. Pacific Union Financial LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Jackson Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzette Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Union Financial, LLC doing business as Clearvision Funding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fannie Mae as trustee for securitized trust guaranteed remic 2014-2019 trust
Represented By: Alexandra Coronado King
Represented By: Robert Wayne Norman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc. (MERS)
Represented By: Alexandra Coronado King
Represented By: Robert Wayne Norman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC also known as Pacific Union Financial doing business as Clearvision Funding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Union Financial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?