Hall v. Val-Chris Investments, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Hall
Defendant: Val-Chris Investments, Inc., LoanCutters, Inc. a corporation doing business as Evoque Lending and Does 1-50, inclusive
Case Number: 3:2023cv01349
Filed: July 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Referring Judge: Todd W Robinson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Robert Hall (Shapero, Sarah) (cxl1).
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER (1) Dissolving Temporary Restraining Order, and (2) For Plaintiff TO SHOW CAUSE Why This Action Should Not Be Dismissed For Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction (ECF Nos. #10 , #11 , 17 ). Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 08/22/2023.(cxl1)
August 17, 2023 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Todd W. Robinson: Evidentiary Hearing held on 8/17/2023. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is withdrawn. Briefing Schedule to issue re OSC. (Court Reporter/ECR Cami Kircher). (Plaintiff Attorney Sarah Shapero). (Defendant Attorney James Ramos). (no document attached) (jao)
August 16, 2023 Filing 16 DECLARATION re #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Defendant Val-Chris Investments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James J. Ramos, #2 Proof of Service)(Ramos, James) (cxl1).
August 10, 2023 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Robert Hall (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adair, #2 Supplement Supplemental Brief)(Shapero, Sarah) (cxl1).
August 10, 2023 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Restrain Foreclosure Sale of Property filed by Val-Chris Investments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Declaration, #4 Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Proof of Service)(Ramos, James) (cxl1).
August 10, 2023 Filing 13 Exhibit List Joint Exhibit List for Evidentiary Hearing by Robert Hall. (Shapero, Sarah) (cxl1).
August 8, 2023 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert Hall re #11 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, (Shapero, Sarah) (cxl1).
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CORRECTED ORDER (1) Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining Order to Restrain a Trustee's Sale, and (2) Setting Evidentiary Hearing as to Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue (ECF No. #5 , #10 ). Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 08/01/2023.(cxl1)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (1) Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining Order to Restrain a Trustee's Sale, and (2) for Defendants to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue (ECF No. #5 ). Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 07/31/2023. (cxl1)
July 27, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ECF DOCKET NUMBER 6 by Val-Chris Investments, Inc. re #6 Notice (Other), (Ramos, James) (cxl1).
July 27, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Interested Parties (Certification and Notice) by Val-Chris Investments, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Ramos, James) (cxl1).
July 26, 2023 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Restrain Foreclosure Sale of Property filed by Val-Chris Investments, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service)(Ramos, James) (cxl1).
July 26, 2023 Filing 6 **DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER NOTICE #9 ** NOTICE of Interested Parties (Certification and Notice) by Val-Chris Investments, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Ramos, James)Attorney James Jose Ramos added to party Val-Chris Investments, Inc.(pty:dft) QC Mailer 7/27/2023- Blank Form (cxl1). Modified to withdraw on 7/27/2023 (cxl1).
July 26, 2023 Filing 5 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Restrain Foreclosure Sale of Property by Robert Hall. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration)(Shapero, Sarah) (cxl1).
July 26, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Withdrawal by Robert Hall re #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Restrain Foreclosure Sale of Property (Shapero, Sarah) (cxl1).
July 25, 2023 Filing 3 **DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER NOTICE #4 ** Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Restrain Foreclosure Sale of Property by Robert Hall. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)(Shapero, Sarah) QC Mailer 7/26/2023- Proposed orders should not be attached/Document Contains Wrong Signature (cxl1). Modified to withdraw on 7/26/2023 (cxl1).
July 25, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (ggv) (sjt).
July 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Does 1-50, inclusive, LoanCutters, Inc., Val-Chris Investments, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BCASDC-18043063.), filed by Robert Hall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:23-cv-1349-TWR-JLB. Judge Todd W. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Shapero, Sarah)(ggv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Val-Chris Investments, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hall
Represented By: Jessica Diane Adair
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Shapero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Val-Chris Investments, Inc.
Represented By: James Jose Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LoanCutters, Inc. a corporation doing business as Evoque Lending
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?