Belangue v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Erlinda Belangue
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation a Washington corporation doing business as Costco Wholesale, Does 2 through 100 and Doe Employee
Case Number: 3:2023cv01850
Filed: October 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Referring Judge: Thomas J Whelan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 pi Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2023 Filing 12 Pretrial Disclosures by Costco Wholesale Corporation (Flock, John)
November 30, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance OF COUNSEL JULIE M. ROMERSA by John K. Flock on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation (Flock, John) (exs).
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Early Neutral Evaluation (ENE) statements were due to the Court by 11/29/2023. The Court has not received Plaintiff's ENE statement. Accordingly, no later than 12/1/2023, Plaintiff shall lodge an ENE statement that complies with paragraph 4 of #6 Order setting the ENE. Additionally, no later than 12/1/2023, Defendant shall lodge a supplement to its ENE statement that includes a specific and current offer in compliance with paragraph 4(b), and the information re Defendant's attendees that is required by paragraph 4(c). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (mjsn)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: The parties' #7 Motion for Protective Order is DENIED without prejudice for failure to comply with CivLR 7.2 and Section VI of Judge Burkhardt's Civil Chambers Rules. (no document attached) (mjsn)
November 30, 2023 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Flock, John) (exs).
November 29, 2023 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Flock, John) (exs).
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference: Early Neutral Evaluation set for 12/6/2023 01:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2023 01:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Joint Discovery Plan due 11/29/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 10/26/2023.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(exs)
October 25, 2023 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint on Behalf of Defendant, Costco Wholesale Corporation (Flock, John) (exs).
October 25, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF LODGING DEFENDANTS, COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATIONS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by Costco Wholesale Corporation re #3 Notice of Lodgment, (Flock, John) (exs).
October 19, 2023 Filing 3 ***Document withdrawn per ECF #4 ***NOTICE of Lodging Defendants, Costco Wholesale Corporation's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT, COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION)(Flock, John) (exs).(QC Mailer sent re: the lodging of the answer instead of filing it) Modified to withdraw on 10/26/2023 (exs).
October 9, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Costco Wholesale Corporation. No Parties With Financial Interest. (stn)(anh).
October 9, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-18248328.), filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits)The new case number is 3:23-cv-1850-W-JLB. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(stn) (anh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belangue v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erlinda Belangue
Represented By: Demetrios Papanikolas
Represented By: Genevieve Bourret-Roy
Represented By: Jubin J. Niamehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation a Washington corporation doing business as Costco Wholesale
Represented By: John K. Flock
Represented By: Julie M Romersa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 2 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Employee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?