Coronado v. General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ana Coronado
Defendant: General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc., Does 1 through 50 and Escalante Hector
Case Number: 3:2023cv02123
Filed: November 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen S Crawford
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 cv Fed. Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2023 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint, by General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc..(Atkinson, Keia) (ddf).
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER For Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance; And Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 12/5/2023.(ddf)
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Ana Coronado. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Hector Escalante, #2 Summons to General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc, #3 Proof of Service)New Summons Requested. (Belong, Tyler) QC Mailer re Document contains wrong signature (ddf).
November 17, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc.. (jms)
November 17, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc.. Identifying Corporate Parent General Dynamics Corporation for General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc.(jms)
November 17, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc.. Identifying Corporate Parent General Dynamics Corporation for General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc.. (jms)
November 17, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACASDC-18359759), filed by General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration)The new case number is 3:23-cv-2123-LL-KSC. Judge Linda Lopez and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.(jms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coronado v. General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Coronado
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Hogue
Represented By: Julie A. Kearns
Represented By: Tyler Jay Belong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Danielle Hultenius Moore
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Nellis
Represented By: Keia James Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Escalante Hector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?