Madera v. Comenity Capital Bank et al
Plaintiff: Carolina Madera
Defendant: Comenity Capital Bank and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv02124
Filed: November 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Ruth Bermudez Montenegro
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2024 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Comenity Capital Bank.(Searles, Nathan) (jpp).
January 9, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carolina Madera. Comenity Capital Bank served. (Loker, Matthew) (jpp).
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE AND ORDER: for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/26/2024 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2024 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Joint Discovery Plan due 2/12/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 1/9/24.(aas) (jms).
January 8, 2024 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(O'Connor, Cheryl)Attorney Cheryl L. O'Connor added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft) (aas).
December 15, 2023 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER - Plaintiff filed her Complaint on November 17, 2023. (Doc. 1.) Plaintiff and Defendant Comenity Capital Bank filed a Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant Comenity Capital Bank to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint on December 12, 2023, one day after the deadline to respond had expired. (Doc. 7.) The Joint Motion is GRANTED. Defendant Comenity must answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before January 10, 2024. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. (no document attached) (jpp)
December 12, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Comenity Capital Bank . Identifying Corporate Parent Bread Financial Holdings, Inc, Other Affiliate Bread Financial Payments, Inc. for Comenity Capital Bank. (Searles, Nathan) (jpp).
December 12, 2023 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Comenity Capital Bank. (Searles, Nathan)Attorney Nathan Andrew Searles added to party Comenity Capital Bank(pty:dft) (jpp).
December 8, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. . Identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc., Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Billeci, Matthew) (dim).
December 8, 2023 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff filed her Complaint on November 17, 2023. (Doc. 1.) Plaintiff and Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. filed a Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint on December 7, 2023. (Doc. 4.) The Joint Motion is GRANTED. Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. must answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint by January 8, 2024. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. (no document attached) (jpp)
December 7, 2023 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Billeci, Matthew)Attorney Matthew Thomas Billeci added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft)
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carolina Madera. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served. (Loker, Matthew)
November 17, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dim) (anh).
November 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Comenity Capital Bank, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-18360480.), filed by Carolina Madera. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:23-cv-2124-RBM-BGS. Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Loker, Matthew)(dim) (anh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madera v. Comenity Capital Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolina Madera
Represented By: Matthew M. Loker
Represented By: Sara F. Khosroabadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comenity Capital Bank
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Searles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Cheryl L. O'Connor
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Billeci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?