Ewing v. Camus et al
Plaintiff: Anton A. Ewing
Defendant: Pablo Garces Camus and Dboss Funding, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv02154
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael M Anello
Referring Judge: Steve B Chu
2 Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2024 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Dboss Funding, LLC (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aas)
January 8, 2024 Filing 8 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against DBOSS Funding LLC (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aas)
December 26, 2023 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Pablo Garces Camus (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aas)(jms).
December 22, 2023 Filing 6 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against Pablo Garces Camus (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aas)(jms).
December 12, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anton A. Ewing. Pablo Garces Camus on behalf of Dboss Funding, LLC served. (aas)
December 11, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anton A. Ewing. Pablo Garces Camus served. (aas)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Michael M. Anello is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Janis L. Sammartino for all further proceedings. The new case number is 23cv2154-JLS-SBC.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (aas)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (jmo)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Pablo Garces Camus, Dboss Funding, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 149718.), filed by Anton A. Ewing. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)The new case number is 3:23-cv-2154-MMA-SBC. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu are assigned to the case.(jmo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ewing v. Camus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anton A. Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pablo Garces Camus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dboss Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?