Hanson v. Theranest, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Laura Hanson
Defendant: Theranest, LLC, Therapy Brands Holdings, LLC, KKR & Co, Inc., Jennifer Wolfe and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 3:2024cv00086
Filed: January 11, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Referring Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 ed Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-trial Proceedings: Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 1/25/2025 1:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 4/18/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/9/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/16/2025 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5C before District Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 3/1/2024.(jms)
March 1, 2024 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Status Conference re Scheduling Order held on 3/1/2024. Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorneys Cecilia Nora Brennan; Rebecca Rojas). (Defendant TheraNest Attorneys Michelle Nicole Gonzalez; Tracie Lynn Childs). (Defendant KKR Attorneys Jennifer B. Rubin; Nicole Rivers). (no document attached) (mjsn)
February 29, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance of Cecilia Brennan and Rebecca Rojas by Cecilia Nora Brennan on behalf of Laura Hanson (Brennan, Cecilia) (jms).
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: A telephonic, counsel-only Status Conference re Scheduling Order is hereby SET for 3/1/2024, at 10:00 AM, before Judge Burkhardt. For purposes of the Conference, all participating counsel shall call the Court's teleconference line at (619) 657-0677 and use conference ID number 299-169-803. (mjsn)
February 26, 2024 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 2/26/2024. Case did not settle. Case Management Conference also held on 2/26/2024. Scheduling order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorneys Cecilia Nora Brennan; Rebecca Rojas - Notice of Appearance Required). (Defendant TheraNest Attorneys Michelle Nicole Gonzalez; Tracie Lynn Childs). (Defendant KKR Attorneys Jennifer B. Rubin; Amanda Asaro - Notice of Appearance Required). (Laura Hanson; Jennifer Wolfe; Henry Pickens; John Fisher; Ellen Frye). (no document attached) (mjsn)
February 16, 2024 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Childs, Tracie) (jms).
February 16, 2024 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KKR & Co, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Rubin, Jennifer) (jms).
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: On 2/8/2024, Defendant KKR & Co. Inc. (KKR) filed #11 Ex Parte Motion to Excuse Appearance of Company Representative at Early Neutral Evaluation Conference (ENE). Good cause appearing, #11 Ex Parte Motion is GRANTED in part. KKR's representative is excused from appearing but should be available to be contacted by telephone as needed for the duration of the ENE. (no document attached) (mjsn)
February 8, 2024 Filing 11 Ex Parte MOTION to Excuse Appearance of Company Representative at Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, by KKR & Co, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer B. Rubin)(Rubin, Jennifer) (jms).
February 1, 2024 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint against Laura Hanson, filed by Laura Hanson. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service) (Brennan, Cecilia) (jms).
February 1, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Rivers on behalf of KKR & Co, Inc. (Rivers, Nicole)Attorney Nicole Rivers added to party KKR & Co, Inc.(pty:dft)(jms).
February 1, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer B. Rubin on behalf of KKR & Co, Inc. (Rubin, Jennifer)Attorney Jennifer B. Rubin added to party KKR & Co, Inc.(pty:dft) (jms).
January 31, 2024 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Laura Hanson, as to KKR & Co, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Brennan, Cecilia) (jms).
January 31, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Laura Hanson (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Brennan, Cecilia) (jms).
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2024 09:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Joint Discovery Plan due 2/16/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 1/22/2024.(jms)
January 11, 2024 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Theranest, LLC, Therapy Brands Holdings, LLC, Jennifer Wolfe. (ggv)(sjt).
January 11, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Theranest, LLC, Therapy Brands Holdings, LLC, Jennifer Wolfe. No Parties With Financial Interest. (ggv) (sjt).
January 11, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Theranest, LLC, Therapy Brands Holdings, LLC, Jennifer Wolfe identifying Corporate Parent Thrive Purchaser, LLC for Therapy Brands Holdings, LLC; Corporate Parent TB Holdings Guarantor, LLC for Theranest, LLC. (ggv) (sjt).
January 11, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18494922.), filed by Jennifer Wolfe, Therapy Brands Holdings, LLC, Theranest, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #3 Declaration of Tracie Childs in support of Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Tracie Childs in support of Notice of Removal)The new case number is 3:24-cv-86-AGS-JLB. Judge Andrew G. Schopler and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(ggv) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanson v. Theranest, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Hanson
Represented By: Cecilia Nora Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theranest, LLC
Represented By: Michelle Nicole Gonzalez
Represented By: Tracie Lynn Childs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Therapy Brands Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Michelle Nicole Gonzalez
Represented By: Tracie Lynn Childs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KKR & Co, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer B. Rubin
Represented By: Nicole Rivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Wolfe
Represented By: Michelle Nicole Gonzalez
Represented By: Tracie Lynn Childs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?