Taylor Made Golf Company, Inc. v. Costco Wholesale Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Taylor Made Golf Company, Inc.
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corp. and Southern California Design Company doing business as Indi Golf
Case Number: 3:2024cv00212
Filed: January 31, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Andrew G Schopler
2 Judge: Valerie E Torres
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 0271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Christopher Lorenzo Lewis, re #30 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 3/29/2024.(rmc)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER (AGS): The joint motion to continue (ECF #31 ) is granted. The hearing on defendant's motion to compel arbitration (ECF #20 ) is continued to May 3, 2024, at 2:30 p.m. By April 12, 2024, plaintiff must file its response. By April 26, 2024, defendant must file its reply. Signed by District Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 3/29/2024. (no document attached) (raw)
March 29, 2024 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Makinde on behalf of Southern California Design Company (Makinde, Hannah)Attorney Hannah Makinde added to party Southern California Design Company (pty:dft)
March 29, 2024 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Tamara D. Fraizer on behalf of Southern California Design Company (Fraizer, Tamara)Attorney Tamara D. Fraizer added to party Southern California Design Company (pty:dft)
March 29, 2024 Filing 32 NOTICE DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA DESIGN COMPANYS WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICES OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Southern California Design Company re #23 Notice of Appearance, #25 Notice of Appearance (Bernstein, Frank)
March 29, 2024 Filing 31 Joint MOTION to Continue hearing date on Motion to Compel Arbitration #20 and Order for a new briefing schedule by Taylor Made Golf Company, Inc.. (Pagnanelli, Karin)
March 28, 2024 Filing 30 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-18714550.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Lewis, Christopher) (rmc).
March 28, 2024 Filing 29 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Lewis, Christopher) QC mail sent re missing fee (rmc).
March 28, 2024 Filing 28 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Southern California Design Company Defendant Southern California Design Company's Notice of Party with Financial Interest Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 40.2. No Parties With Financial Interest. (Bernstein, Frank)(jms).
March 28, 2024 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern California Design Company. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Bernstein, Frank)(jms).
March 28, 2024 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Southern California Design Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES BY DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA DESIGN COMPANY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6), #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF ROBERT LANG, #3 Declaration DECLARATION OF HANNAH MAKINDE)(Bernstein, Frank) (jms).
March 28, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL OF HANNAH MAKINDE by Frank Lovett Bernstein on behalf of Southern California Design Company (Bernstein, Frank) QC mailer sent re incorrect signing attorney/account. Attorney not added. (jms).
March 28, 2024 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Taylor Made's Willful Infringement Claim by Costco Wholesale Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Alsalam, Ramsey) (jms).
March 28, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL OF TAMARA D. FRAIZER by Frank Lovett Bernstein on behalf of Southern California Design Company (Bernstein, Frank) QC mailer sent re incorrect signing attorney/account. Attorney not added. (jms).
March 28, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL OF FRANK L. BERNSTEIN by Frank Lovett Bernstein on behalf of Southern California Design Company (Bernstein, Frank)Attorney Frank Lovett Bernstein added to party Southern California Design Company (pty:dft) (jms).
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of John Christopher Rozendaal, re #11 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 3/20/2024.(rmc)
March 18, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Claims in Interim by Costco Wholesale Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Claims in Interim, #2 Declaration of Eric R. Maas, #3 Exhibit A to Maas Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Maas Declaration)(Alsalam, Ramsey) (jms).
March 1, 2024 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to District Judge Andrew G. Schopler for all further proceedings. The new case number is 24cv212-AGS-VET.(no document attached) (ddf)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting Joint Motion For Extension Of Time To Respond To Complaint [ECF No. #17 ]. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 2/22/2024. (ddf)
February 22, 2024 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Complaint for Defendants Costco Wholesale Corp. and Southern California Design Company d/b/a Indi Golf by Costco Wholesale Corp.. (Bernstein, Matthew) (ddf).
February 22, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Costco Wholesale Corp. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Bernstein, Matthew) (ddf).
February 22, 2024 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Costco Wholesale Corp.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Bernstein, Matthew) (ddf).
February 22, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Ramsey M. Alsalam on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corp. (Alsalam, Ramsey)Attorney Ramsey M. Alsalam added to party Costco Wholesale Corp.(pty:dft) (ddf).
February 22, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Rockwell Maas on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corp. (Maas, Eric)Attorney Eric Rockwell Maas added to party Costco Wholesale Corp.(pty:dft) (ddf).
February 22, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C Bernstein on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corp. (Bernstein, Matthew)Attorney Matthew C Bernstein added to party Costco Wholesale Corp.(pty:dft) (ddf).
February 8, 2024 Filing 11 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $224.00 receipt number ACASDC-18570373.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Rozendaal, John)(jrd)
February 7, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taylor Made Golf Company, Inc.. Southern California Design Company served. (Pagnanelli, Karin) (ddf).
February 7, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taylor Made Golf Company, Inc.. Costco Wholesale Corp. served. (Pagnanelli, Karin) (ddf).
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Byron L. Pickard, re #6 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 2/7/2024.(rmc)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Robert E. Niemeier, re #5 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 2/7/2024.(rmc)
February 5, 2024 Filing 6 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-18558435.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Pickard, Byron) (rmc).
January 31, 2024 Filing 5 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-18548636.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Niemeier, Robert) (rmc).
January 31, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (ggv) (anh).
January 31, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Taylor Made Golf Company, Inc. Identifying Corporate Parent TaylorMade Holdings, Inc. for Taylor Made Golf Company, Inc. Identifying Corporate Parent Centroid Investment Partners for Taylor Made Golf Company, Inc. (ggv) (anh). Modified on 2/1/2024 to add a corporate party(ggv).
January 31, 2024 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *RE47,653*, *10,953,293*, *11,351,426*, *11,420,097*, *11,559,727* cc:USPTO (ggv) (anh).
January 31, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Costco Wholesale Corp., Southern California Design Company ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18548014.), filed by Taylor Made Golf Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-10)The new case number is 3:24-cv-212-BEN-VET. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres are assigned to the case. (Pagnanelli, Karin)(ggv) (anh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor Made Golf Company, Inc. v. Costco Wholesale Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Made Golf Company, Inc.
Represented By: Karin Pagnanelli
Represented By: Byron L. Pickard
Represented By: John Christopher Rozendaal
Represented By: Robert E. Niemeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corp.
Represented By: Ramsey M. Alsalam
Represented By: Eric Rockwell Maas
Represented By: Matthew C Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern California Design Company doing business as Indi Golf
Represented By: Christopher Lorenzo Lewis
Represented By: Frank Lovett Bernstein
Represented By: Hannah Makinde
Represented By: Tamara D. Fraizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?