Silverman v. Tri-City Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Nicola Silverman
Defendant: Tri-City Medical Center, Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC and States Recovery Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv00292
Filed: February 14, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Referring Judge: David D Leshner
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order re: Stipulation to Set Aside Default (ECF No. #16 ). Defendant States Recovery Systems, Inc., shall file its response to the Complaint on or before 4/5/24. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/26/24. (jmo)
March 26, 2024 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Set Aside Default (JOINT MOTION TO SET ASIDE CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT [FRCP 55(c)]) by States Recovery Systems, Inc.. (Felipe, June) (jmo).
March 26, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by States Recovery Systems, Inc. re #12 MOTION to Set Aside Default (Defendant States Recovery Systems, Inc.s Unopposed Motion to Set Aside Clerks Entry Of Default) filed by States Recovery Systems, Inc. . (Felipe, June) (jmo).
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint (ECF No. #13 ). Tri-City Medical Center answer due 4/8/2024. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/26/24. (jmo)
March 25, 2024 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Nicola Silverman. (Hammoud, Youssef) (jmo).
March 21, 2024 Filing 12 **DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN BY FILER PER #15 **MOTION to Set Aside Default (Defendant States Recovery Systems, Inc.s Unopposed Motion to Set Aside Clerks Entry Of Default) by States Recovery Systems, Inc.. (Felipe, June)Attorney June Grace Felipe added to party States Recovery Systems, Inc.(pty:dft) QC mailer sent re missing hearing date and time (jms). Modified on 3/26/2024 to term. (jmo).
March 12, 2024 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to States Recovery Systems, Inc. (jmo)
March 12, 2024 Filing 10 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against States Recovery Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Youssef H. Hammoud in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Entry of Clerk's Default, #2 Supplement Proposed Entry of Clerk's Default)(Hammoud, Youssef) (jmo).
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Granting Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond to the Initial Complaint by no More Than 30 Days (ECF No. #8 ). Tri-City Medical Center answer due 3/26/2024. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/8/24. (jmo)
March 8, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Nicola Silverman. (Hammoud, Youssef) (jmo).
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting the Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer the Complaint [ECF No. #6 ]. Defendant Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC answer due 4/8/2024. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 03/01/2024. (mjw)
March 1, 2024 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC. (Johnson, Timothy)Attorney Timothy P. Johnson added to party Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC(pty:dft) (mjw).
February 21, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicola Silverman. Tri-City Medical Center served. (Hammoud, Youssef) (jmo).
February 21, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicola Silverman. States Recovery Systems, Inc. served. (Hammoud, Youssef) (jmo).
February 21, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicola Silverman. Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC served. (Hammoud, Youssef) (jmo).
February 14, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (stn) (anh).
February 14, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC, States Recovery Systems, Inc., Tri-City Medical Center ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18585865.), filed by Nicola Silverman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:24-cv-292-GPC-DDL. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner are assigned to the case. (Youssef Hammoud)(stn) (anh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silverman v. Tri-City Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicola Silverman
Represented By: Youssef Hussein Hammoud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-City Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC
Represented By: Timothy P. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: States Recovery Systems, Inc.
Represented By: June Grace Felipe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?