Adame et al v. National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Myrna Adame, Sidney Aguilar, Jason Albert, Alex Alvarez, Jeffery Baker, Angelica Barrera, Maria Veronica Blea, Janai Bruce, Lisette Carrillo, Tori Castrejon, Angelet Castro, Jesus Castro Ozuna, Cathy Clancy, Christina Eith, Sofia Espinoza, Monica Fernandez Gonzalez, Toni Freeman, Brenda Garcia, Herbert George, Julia Gonzalez, Arlene Lalanne, Robert Magallanes, Miguel Matie, Paulino Morales, Aaron Ramos, Michael Rodgers, Magdalena Rodriguez, Nelchina Sky, Alyce Smith Cooper, Darrell Stearman, Robert Stovall, Taotafa Tanoi-Punefu, Luisa Trejo, Lourdes Valle, Rostislav Vayner, Liliana Villarreal, Kimbery Walker, Milarca Whatley-Kruse, Sheryl Wood, Jamie Yates, Alma Avila, Rob Campbell, Michael Corbett, Angela Davis, Billy Dodd, Brenda Figueroa, John Garduno, Gregory Gregory, Dagobert Justin Kunkler, Gilverto Lara, Sandra Macias, Olga Maldonado Vazquez, Ramses Mena, Michael O'Brien, Liliana Orozco, Christian Tyrone Posadas, Shannon Rodriguez, Annahi Ruano, Vaenkeo Sanvichith, Heriberto Vazquez, Sr., Heriberto Vazquez, Jr., Pedro Daniel Vazquez, Christopher Wright, Ana Gutierrez, Thomas Blea, Melissa Cortes, Rosario Manuel Castro, Schellon Castro, Jessemine Aparicio, Robert Araujo, Ekaterina Vayner, Alyssa Taytte, Jeannie Nhothsiri, Andrea Brea, Christian Blea, Veronica Garcia, Thomas Blea, Jr., Mike Garcia, Marco Barrera, Josclyn Davis, Kayla Davis, Collin Sanvichith, Michael Reynoso, Angelina Rosette, Arturo Bruno, Ernie Salgado, Obed Aquino, Roes 1-5000 and Tony Freeman
Defendant: National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, Inc., General Dynamics NASSCO, General Dynamics Nassco Holding, LLC, United Support Services, Inc. and Does 1-250
Case Number: 3:2024cv00297
Filed: February 15, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Valerie E Torres
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 aaf Petition for Removal - Agst members of armed forces
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Zahed Amin on behalf of United Support Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Re Appearance of Counsel)(Amin, Zahed)Attorney Zahed Amin added to party United Support Services, Inc. (pty:dft) (maq).
March 29, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2024 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. (no document attached) (sc)
March 25, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Myrna Adame, Sidney Aguilar, Jason Albert, Alex Alvarez, Jessemine Aparicio, Obed Aquino, Robert Araujo, Alma Avila, Jeffery Baker, Angelica Barrera, Marco Barrera, Christian Blea, Maria Veronica Blea, Thomas Blea, Jr, Thomas Blea, Andrea Brea, Janai Bruce, Arturo Bruno, Rob Campbell, Lisette Carrillo, Tori Castrejon, Angelet Castro, Rosario Manuel Castro, Schellon Castro, Jesus Castro Ozuna, Cathy Clancy, Michael Corbett, Melissa Cortes, Angela Davis, Josclyn Davis, Kayla Davis, Billy Dodd, Christina Eith, Sofia Espinoza, Monica Fernandez Gonzalez, Brenda Figueroa, Tony Freeman, Brenda Garcia, Mike Garcia, Veronica Garcia, John Garduno, Herbert George, Julia Gonzalez, Gregory Gregory, Ana Gutierrez, Dagobert Justin Kunkler, Arlene Lalanne, Gilverto Lara, Sandra Macias, Robert Magallanes, Miguel Matie, Ramses Mena, Paulino Morales, Jeannie Nhothsiri, Michael O'Brien, Liliana Orozco, Christian Tyrone Posadas, Aaron Ramos, Michael Reynoso, Michael Rodgers, Magdalena Rodriguez, Shannon Rodriguez, Roes 1-5000, Angelina Rosette, Annahi Ruano, Ernie Salgado, Collin Sanvichith, Vaenkeo Sanvichith, Nelchina Sky, Alyce Smith Cooper, Darrell Stearman, Robert Stovall, Taotafa Tanoi-Punefu, Alyssa Taytte, Luisa Trejo, Lourdes Valle, Ekaterina Vayner, Rostislav Vayner, Olga Maldonado Vazquez, Pedro Daniel Vazquez, Heriberto Vazquez, Jr., Heriberto Vazquez, Sr., Liliana Villarreal, Kimbery Walker, Milarca Whatley-Kruse, Sheryl Wood, Christopher Wright, Jamie Yates. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Cristina Murillo, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Proposed Order)(Murillo, Cristina) Modified on 3/26/2024 to send QC Mailer re: Proposed Orders; Pursuant to the Admin Policies & Procedures Manual, section II.h, proposed orders are to be E-mailed to the official E-mail address of the Judge assigned to the case (maq).
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Consolidate Related Cases and Set Briefing Schedule RE: Motion to Remand and Responsive Pleadings or Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/22/2024. (maq)
March 22, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Cristina Murillo on behalf of Myrna Adame, Sidney Aguilar, Jason Albert, Alex Alvarez, Jessemine Aparicio, Obed Aquino, Robert Araujo, Alma Avila, Jeffery Baker, Angelica Barrera, Marco Barrera, Christian Blea, Maria Veronica Blea, Thomas Blea, Jr, Thomas Blea, Andrea Brea, Janai Bruce, Arturo Bruno, Rob Campbell, Lisette Carrillo, Tori Castrejon, Angelet Castro, Rosario Manuel Castro, Schellon Castro, Jesus Castro Ozuna, Cathy Clancy, Michael Corbett, Melissa Cortes, Angela Davis, Josclyn Davis, Kayla Davis, Billy Dodd, Christina Eith, Sofia Espinoza, Monica Fernandez Gonzalez, Brenda Figueroa, Tony Freeman, Brenda Garcia, Mike Garcia, Veronica Garcia, John Garduno, Herbert George, Julia Gonzalez, Gregory Gregory, Ana Gutierrez, Dagobert Justin Kunkler, Arlene Lalanne, Gilverto Lara, Sandra Macias, Robert Magallanes, Miguel Matie, Ramses Mena, Paulino Morales, Jeannie Nhothsiri, Michael O'Brien, Liliana Orozco, Christian Tyrone Posadas, Aaron Ramos, Michael Reynoso, Michael Rodgers, Magdalena Rodriguez, Shannon Rodriguez, Roes 1-5000, Angelina Rosette, Annahi Ruano, Ernie Salgado, Collin Sanvichith, Vaenkeo Sanvichith, Nelchina Sky, Alyce Smith Cooper, Darrell Stearman, Robert Stovall, Taotafa Tanoi-Punefu, Alyssa Taytte, Luisa Trejo, Lourdes Valle, Ekaterina Vayner, Rostislav Vayner, Olga Maldonado Vazquez, Pedro Daniel Vazquez, Heriberto Vazquez, Jr., Heriberto Vazquez, Sr., Liliana Villarreal, Kimbery Walker, Milarca Whatley-Kruse, Sheryl Wood, Christopher Wright, Jamie Yates (Murillo, Cristina)Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Myrna Adame(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Sidney Aguilar(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Jason Albert(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Alex Alvarez(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Jessemine Aparicio(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Obed Aquino(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Robert Araujo(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Alma Avila (pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Jeffery Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Angelica Barrera(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Marco Barrera(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Christian Blea(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Maria Veronica Blea(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Thomas Blea, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Thomas Blea(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Andrea Brea(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Janai Bruce(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Arturo Bruno(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Rob Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Lisette Carrillo(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Tori Castrejon(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Angelet Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Rosario Manuel Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Schellon Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Jesus Castro Ozuna(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Cathy Clancy(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Michael Corbett(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Melissa Cortes(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Angela Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Josclyn Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Kayla Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Billy Dodd(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Christina Eith(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Sofia Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Monica Fernandez Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Brenda Figueroa(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Tony Freeman(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Brenda Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Mike Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Veronica Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party John Garduno(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Herbert George(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Julia Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Gregory Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Ana Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Dagobert Justin Kunkler(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Arlene Lalanne(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Gilverto Lara(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Sandra Macias(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Robert Magallanes(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Miguel Matie(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Ramses Mena(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Paulino Morales(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Jeannie Nhothsiri(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Michael O'Brien(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Liliana Orozco(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Christian Tyrone Posadas(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Aaron Ramos(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Michael Reynoso(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Michael Rodgers(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Magdalena Rodriguez(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Shannon Rodriguez(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Roes 1-5000(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Angelina Rosette(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Annahi Ruano(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Ernie Salgado(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Collin Sanvichith(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Vaenkeo Sanvichith(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Nelchina Sky(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Alyce Smith Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Darrell Stearman(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Robert Stovall(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Taotafa Tanoi-Punefu(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Alyssa Taytte(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Luisa Trejo(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Lourdes Valle(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Ekaterina Vayner(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Rostislav Vayner(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Olga Maldonado Vazquez(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Pedro Daniel Vazquez(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Heriberto Vazquez, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Heriberto Vazquez, Sr.(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Liliana Villarreal(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Kimbery Walker(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Milarca Whatley-Kruse(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Sheryl Wood(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Christopher Wright(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina Murillo added to party Jamie Yates(pty:pla) (maq).
March 21, 2024 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Set Briefing Schedule re Motion to Remand and Responsive Pleadings of Motions to Dismiss by General Dynamics Corporation, Inc., General Dynamics NASSCO, General Dynamics Nassco Holding, LLC, National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rory K. Pendergast)(Toral, Todd) (maq).
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: granting in part and denying in part #4 Joint Motion to Set Briefing Schedule re Motion to Remand and Responsive Pleadings or Motions to Dismiss. The Court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART the parties joint motion to extend certain motion deadlines and briefing schedules in this case. Should Plaintiffs file a motion to remand, they must do so no later than March 25, 2024. To streamline briefing and avoid duplication, any motion to remand must be a consolidated filing addressing all notices of removal, not to exceed 30 pages. Any response must be a consolidated filing addressing all defendants opposition, not to exceed 30 pages and filed no later than April 8, 2024. Any reply must be a consolidated filing, not to exceed 20 pages and filed no later than April 22, 2024. The Court hereby stays defendants deadline to file an answer or motion to dismiss until April 8, 2024, or 14 days after resolution of any motion to remand, whichever is later. (no document attached) (sc)
February 21, 2024 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by General Dynamics Corporation, Inc., General Dynamics NASSCO, General Dynamics Nassco Holding, LLC, National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Inc. re #5 Notice of Related Case, #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Joint MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule re Motion to Remand and Responsive Pleadings or Motions to Dismiss (Toral, Todd) (maq).
February 21, 2024 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Dynamics Corporation, Inc., General Dynamics NASSCO, General Dynamics Nassco Holding, LLC, National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Inc. (Toral, Todd) (maq).
February 21, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by General Dynamics Corporation, Inc., General Dynamics NASSCO, General Dynamics Nassco Holding, LLC, National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Inc. of case(s) 3:24-cv-00306-AJB-JLB . (Toral, Todd) (maq).
February 21, 2024 Filing 4 Joint MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule re Motion to Remand and Responsive Pleadings or Motions to Dismiss by General Dynamics Corporation, Inc., General Dynamics NASSCO, General Dynamics Nassco Holding, LLC, National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd C. Toral)(Toral, Todd) (maq).
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Matthew S. Hellman (Re: ECF No. #2 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 2/16/2024.(jrd)
February 16, 2024 Filing 2 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $224.00 receipt number ACASDC-18594022.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Hellman, Matthew)(jrd)
February 15, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18591195.), filed by United Support Services, Inc., General Dynamics Nassco Holding, LLC, General Dynamics NASSCO, Maria Veronica Blea, National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration, #3 Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit C - Part 2, #10 Exhibit C - Part 3, #11 Exhibit C - 2, #12 Exhibit C - 3)The new case number is 3:24-cv-297-AJB-VET. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres are assigned to the case.(stn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adame et al v. National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrna Adame
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidney Aguilar
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Albert
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Alvarez
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Baker
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelica Barrera
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Veronica Blea
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janai Bruce
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisette Carrillo
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tori Castrejon
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelet Castro
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Castro Ozuna
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Clancy
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Eith
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sofia Espinoza
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Fernandez Gonzalez
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni Freeman
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Garcia
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert George
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Gonzalez
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Lalanne
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Magallanes
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Matie
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paulino Morales
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Ramos
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Rodgers
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magdalena Rodriguez
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelchina Sky
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyce Smith Cooper
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Stearman
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Stovall
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taotafa Tanoi-Punefu
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luisa Trejo
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lourdes Valle
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rostislav Vayner
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liliana Villarreal
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimbery Walker
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milarca Whatley-Kruse
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl Wood
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Yates
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Avila
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rob Campbell
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Corbett
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Davis
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Dodd
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Figueroa
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Garduno
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Gregory
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dagobert Justin Kunkler
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilverto Lara
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Macias
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga Maldonado Vazquez
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramses Mena
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael O'Brien
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liliana Orozco
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Tyrone Posadas
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Rodriguez
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annahi Ruano
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vaenkeo Sanvichith
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heriberto Vazquez, Sr.
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heriberto Vazquez, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Daniel Vazquez
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Wright
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Gutierrez
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Blea
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Cortes
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosario Manuel Castro
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schellon Castro
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessemine Aparicio
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Araujo
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ekaterina Vayner
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Taytte
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannie Nhothsiri
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Brea
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Blea
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Garcia
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Blea, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Garcia
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Barrera
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josclyn Davis
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Davis
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Collin Sanvichith
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Reynoso
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelina Rosette
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Bruno
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernie Salgado
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Obed Aquino
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roes 1-5000
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Freeman
Represented By: Rory Pendergast
Represented By: Cristina Murillo
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Inc.
Represented By: Sati Harutyunyan
Represented By: Todd C. Toral
Represented By: Clark Ray Hudson
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: Clark Ray Hudson
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Represented By: Sati Harutyunyan
Represented By: Todd C. Toral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics NASSCO
Represented By: Clark Ray Hudson
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Represented By: Sati Harutyunyan
Represented By: Todd C. Toral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics Nassco Holding, LLC
Represented By: Clark Ray Hudson
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Represented By: Sati Harutyunyan
Represented By: Todd C. Toral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Support Services, Inc.
Represented By: Zahed Amin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-250
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?