Naumann v. Central Admixture Pharmacy Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Naumann
Defendant: Central Admixture Pharmacy Services, Inc., B. Braun Medical Inc., Aesculap, Inc. and Does 1-50
Case Number: 3:2024cv00356
Filed: February 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: M James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 lr Diversity - Labor
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2024 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by B. Braun Medical Inc., Central Admixture Pharmacy Services, Inc.. (Nader, Michael)
April 22, 2024 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Remand Action to State Court PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND ACTION TO STATE COURT filed by Joseph Naumann. (Zakay, Shani)
April 17, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel N. Newman on behalf of Joseph Naumann (Newman, Rachel) (dim).
April 15, 2024 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6) or, in the Alternative Strike Class Claims filed by Joseph Naumann. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Zakay, Shani) (dim).
April 15, 2024 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Remand Action to State Court filed by B. Braun Medical Inc., Central Admixture Pharmacy Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Nader, #2 Declaration of Aishwarya Kanthappan, #3 Request for Judicial Notice)(Nader, Michael) (dim).
March 22, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand Action to State Court by Joseph Naumann. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Zakay, Shani) (dim).
March 22, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE Regarding Exhibit Attachment by B. Braun Medical Inc., Central Admixture Pharmacy Services, Inc. re #14 MOTION to Dismiss [14-1] Decl of Michael J. Nader ISO Motion to Dismiss (Nader, Michael) (dim).
March 22, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by B. Braun Medical Inc., Central Admixture Pharmacy Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration)(Nader, Michael) (dim).
March 19, 2024 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand JOSEPH NAUMANN against All Defendants, filed by Joseph Naumann. (Lapuyade, Jean-Claude) (dim).
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: (1) Granting Leave to Amend (2) Granting Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Aesculap, Inc. Without Prejudice re ECF #10 . Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/19/2024. (dim) (sjt).
March 18, 2024 Filing 11 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Chambers of the Honorable James Lorenz Accepting re #10 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Amend and Requesting Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Aesculap, Inc. Without Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2), from Plaintiff Joseph Naumann. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. Loc. R. 7.2(c): Failure to comply with the following: Upon the filing of a joint motion, the filing party must also submit a proposed order to the assigned judicial officer. The proposed order must be a document separate from the joint motion. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is accepted despite the discrepancy noted above. Any further non-compliant documents may be stricken from the record. If a Proposed Order is not Submitted to the E-File Inbox of the Presiding Judge by 3/21/2024, the Motion will be Stricken From the Record(dim)(sjt).
March 15, 2024 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Amend and Requesting Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Aesculap, Inc. Without Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) by Joseph Naumann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT)(Lapuyade, Jean-Claude) (dim).
February 27, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Compliance with 28 USC 1446(d) by Aesculap, Inc., B. Braun Medical Inc., Central Admixture Pharmacy Services, Inc. (Smith, Paul) (dim).
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 6/10/2024 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Joint Discovery Plan due 5/24/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 2/26/2024.(dim) (sjt).
February 23, 2024 Filing 7 DECLARATION re #1 Notice of Removal,, of Morten Rasmussen by Defendants Aesculap, Inc., B. Braun Medical Inc., Central Admixture Pharmacy Services, Inc.. (Nader, Michael) (dim).
February 23, 2024 Filing 6 DECLARATION re #1 Notice of Removal,, of Juanita Harris by Defendants Aesculap, Inc., B. Braun Medical Inc., Central Admixture Pharmacy Services, Inc.. (Nader, Michael) (dim).
February 23, 2024 Filing 5 DECLARATION re #1 Notice of Removal,, of Gwen Kohl by Defendants Aesculap, Inc., B. Braun Medical Inc., Central Admixture Pharmacy Services, Inc.. (Nader, Michael) (dim).
February 23, 2024 Filing 4 DECLARATION re #1 Notice of Removal,, of Aishwarya Kanthappan by Defendants Aesculap, Inc., B. Braun Medical Inc., Central Admixture Pharmacy Services, Inc.. (Nader, Michael) (dim).
February 23, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aesculap, Inc., B. Braun Medical Inc., Central Admixture Pharmacy Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent B. Braun of America, Inc. for Aesculap, Inc., B. Braun Medical Inc., Central Admixture Pharmacy Services, Inc... (Nader, Michael) (dim).
February 22, 2024 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Aesculap, Inc., B. Braun Medical Inc., Central Admixture Pharmacy Services, Inc. (ggv) (sjt).
February 22, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18609297.), filed by Central Admixture Pharmacy Services, Inc., B. Braun Medical Inc., Aesculap, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - File-Endored Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Other Case Initiating Documents, #4 Exhibit C - Proofs of Service, #5 Exhibit D - File-Endorsed Answer to Complaint)The new case number is 3:24-cv-356-L-BGS. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case.(ggv) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naumann v. Central Admixture Pharmacy Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Naumann
Represented By: Jackland K. Hom
Represented By: Jean-Claude Lapuyade
Represented By: Julieann Alvarado
Represented By: Rachel Newman
Represented By: Shani Or Zakay
Represented By: Rachel N. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Admixture Pharmacy Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael John Nader
Represented By: Paul M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Braun Medical Inc.
Represented By: Michael John Nader
Represented By: Paul M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aesculap, Inc.
Represented By: Michael John Nader
Represented By: Paul M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?