Reyes v. Rugloski et al
Plaintiff: Angelina Marie Reyes
Defendant: Richard Lawrence Rugloski, ATS Specialized and Does 1-10
Case Number: 3:2024cv00378
Filed: February 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 mv Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2024 Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER: A Joint Motion for Dismissal shall be electronically filed on or before May 29, 2024. If a Joint Motion for Dismissal and proposed order for dismissal are not submitted on or before May 29, 2024, then a telephonic, counsel-only Settlement Disposition Conference shall be held on May 31, 2024, at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. If a Joint Motion for Dismissal and proposed order for dismissal are received on or before May 29, 2024, the Settlement Disposition Conference shall be vacated without further court order.(ddf)
April 15, 2024 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 4/15/2024. Case settled. Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Gregory B. Selarz). (Defendant Attorney Joe M. Yelda). (Angelina Marie Reyes; Richard Lawrence Rugloski; Dacia Lenz; Mehdi Arradizadeh). (no document attached) (mjsn)
April 12, 2024 Filing 20 Defendants Richard Lawrence Rugloski and ATS Specialized, Inc.'s ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint by ATS Specialized, Richard Lawrence Rugloski.(Yelda, Joe) (ddf).
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Pursuant to paragraph 4(c) of the Court's #10 Order setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference (ENE), ENE statements must include a list of all attorney and non-attorney conference participants, including the name and title of parties/party representatives, and the contact information for each attendee. The Court is not in receipt this information from Defendants. Accordingly, no later than 4/10/2024, Defendants shall lodge a supplement to their ENE statement that includes the information set forth in paragraph 4(c). (mjsn)
April 8, 2024 Filing 18 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by ATS Specialized, Richard Lawrence Rugloski Joint Rule 26(F) Report and Discovery Plan (Yelda, Joe) (ddf).
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CONSENT Order Granting Substitution Of Attorney. Signed by Judge Linda Lopez on 4/5/2024.(ddf) .
April 4, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney by Angelina Marie Reyes (Selarz, Gregory) (ddf).
April 4, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Docket #14 by Angelina Marie Reyes (Selarz, Gregory) (ddf).
April 4, 2024 Filing 14 ***Withdrawn Per #15 ***NOTICE Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney by Angelina Marie Reyes (Selarz, Gregory)Attorney Gregory B. Selarz added to party Angelina Marie Reyes(pty:pla) QC Mailer re Document missing signature (ddf).
March 29, 2024 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand First Amended Complaint for Damages against All Defendants, filed by Angelina Marie Reyes. (Macioce, Daniel) (ddf).
March 29, 2024 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint Defendant Richard Lawrence Rugloski's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Richard Lawrence Rugloski.(Yelda, Joe)Attorney Joe M. Yelda added to party Richard Lawrence Rugloski(pty:dft) (ddf).
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Linda Lopez on 3/15/24.(aas)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Notice and Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conferences. Video conference Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2024 at 01:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Joint Discovery Plan due 4/8/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 3/13/24.(jmo)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Consent Order Granting Substitution Of Attorney #8 . Signed by Judge Linda Lopez on 3/7/2024. (ddf)
March 7, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Mitchell E. Berman, Esq. by Angelina Marie Reyes. (Macioce, Daniel)Attorney Daniel Louis Macioce added to party Angelina Marie Reyes(pty:pla) (ddf).
March 4, 2024 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Status Conference held on 3/4/2024. (Plaintiff Attorney Mitchell Evan Berman). (Defendant Attorney Joe M. Yelda). (no document attached) (mjsn)
March 1, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joe M. Yelda on behalf of ATS Specialized (Yelda, Joe) (ddf).
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: A telephonic, counsel-only Status Conference is hereby SET for 3/4/2024, at 11:00 AM before Judge Burkhardt. For purposes of the Conference, all participating counsel shall call the Court's teleconference line at 619-657-0677 and use conference ID number 931-551-268. (mjsn)
February 26, 2024 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by ATS Specialized. (ggv) (jmo).
February 26, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by ATS Specialized. Identifying Other Affiliate ATS Specialized, Inc. for ATS Specialized. (ggv) (jmo).
February 26, 2024 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ATS Specialized. (ggv) (jmo).
February 26, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18619413.), filed by ATS Specialized. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Supporting Docs to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Answer to Complaint, #5 Declaration of Nicholas D. Brauns, #6 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:24-cv-378-LL-JLB. Judge Linda Lopez and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(ggv) (jmo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyes v. Rugloski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelina Marie Reyes
Represented By: Mitchell Evan Berman
Represented By: Daniel Louis Macioce
Represented By: Gregory B. Selarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Lawrence Rugloski
Represented By: Joe M. Yelda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATS Specialized
Represented By: Joe M. Yelda
Represented By: Nicholas D. Brauns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?