Hamilton v. Albertson's Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Linda Hamilton
Defendant: Albertson's Companies, Inc. and Does 1 through 50
Case Number: 3:2024cv00462
Filed: March 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Referring Judge: D Thomas Ferraro
2 Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 ed Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2024 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Linda Hamilton. (Hilaire, Mika)
May 1, 2024 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge D. Thomas Ferraro for all further proceedings. The new case number is 24cv00462-GPC-DTF.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (jmo)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for Relief and Resetting Briefing Schedule. Responses due by 5/6/2024 Replies due by 5/13/2024.Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/26/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rxc) (exs).
April 26, 2024 Filing 6 Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for Relief and the Setting of a New Date to File Her Opposition Defendants Motion to Dismiss; Declaration of Chloe Banker; Declaration of Mika Hilaire (Hilaire, Mika) (rxc).
April 26, 2024 Filing 5 Albertsons LLCs Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service 04.26.2024)(Kalt, Michael) (rxc).
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #3 ). Opposition due by 4/12/2024. Reply due by 4/26/2024. Hearing set for 6/7/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/18/24.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
March 15, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Albertson's Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Michael Kalt, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Michael Kalt, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Michael Kalt, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Michael Kalt, #6 Request for Judicial Notice, #7 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, #8 Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Exhibit 3 to Request for Judicial Notice)(Kalt, Michael) (jmo).
March 8, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Albertson's Companies, Inc. . Identifying Corporate Parent Albertsons Companies, Inc., Other Affiliate Cerberus Capital Management, L.P., Other Affiliate Linda Hamilton for Albertson's Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Solano, Jennifer) (anh).
March 8, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18654014.), filed by Albertson's Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Declaration of Jennifer Solano, #5 Declaration of Maria Fernandez, #6 Declaration of Crystal Maving, #7 Certificate of Service)The new case number is 3:24-cv-462-GPC-BGS. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case.(rxc) (anh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. Albertson's Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Hamilton
Represented By: Chloe Banker
Represented By: Mika Marie Hilaire
Represented By: Chloe C. Banker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertson's Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Erik Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer B. Solano
Represented By: Michael Saul Kalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?