Pamela Moyo et al v. The United States et al
Plaintiff: Pamela Moyo and Steven Moyo
Respondent: The United States, Marc Pierre and Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 3:2024cv00488
Filed: March 11, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Q Hayes
Referring Judge: Valerie E Torres
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 bc Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2024 Filing 20 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:23-cv-10259. Original file received electronically
March 11, 2024 Filing 21 District Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres assigned to transfer case from Cental District of California. (no document attached) (jpp)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: The Parties stipulation is GRANTED. Venue in this district is improper underthe Federal Torts Claim Act (FTCA) because actions under the FTCA may beprosecuted only in the judicial district where the plaintiff resides or wherein the act or omission complained of occurred. 28 U.S.C 1402(b). Plaintiffs action is transferred to the United States District Court for the SouthernDistrict of California. IT IS SO ORDERED. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 3/12/2024.]
March 8, 2024 Filing 18 STIPULATION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California filed by Defendant The United States. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Julian John Xu added to party The United States(pty:dft))(Xu, Julian) [Transferred from California Central on 3/12/2024.]
March 1, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint, #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. Local Rule 11-3.8 title page is missing, incomplete, or incorrect. Other error(s) with document(s): The case number is missing the judge initials. the complete case number is 2:23-cv-10259-DDP (DFMx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 3/12/2024.]
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. This matter is set for a Scheduling Conference on 4/15/2024 at 11:00 AM. The conference will be held pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 16(b). See Order for further details. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 3/12/2024.]
February 29, 2024 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Marc Pierre. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Notice of Interseted Parties)(Attorney Dave H Hitch added to party Marc Pierre(pty:dft))(Hitch, Dave) [Transferred from California Central on 3/12/2024.]
February 20, 2024 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Pamela Moyo, Steven Moyo. upon Marc Pierre waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/8/2024, answer due 3/8/2024. Waiver of Service signed by Dave H. Hitch. (Goldstein, Jamie) [Transferred from California Central on 3/12/2024.]
February 20, 2024 Filing 13 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c. (Goldstein, Jamie) [Transferred from California Central on 3/12/2024.]
January 26, 2024 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Pamela Moyo, Steven Moyo, upon Defendant The United States served on 1/8/2024, answer due 3/8/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Crystal Veloz, Legal Assistant. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Affidavit of Service (Goldstein, Jamie) [Transferred from California Central on 3/12/2024.]
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel must refer to the Central Districts website at http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov for Judge Dean D.Pregerson's Procedures and Schedules. Counsel must review the Court's Standing Order and CV Trial Order, and comply with the same. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing a motion. Counsel are required to comply with C.D. Cal. L.R. 5-4.4.1 through 5-4.4.2. See order for more information. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 3/12/2024.]
December 28, 2023 Filing 10 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiffs Pamela Moyo, Steven Moyo. Exhibit 1 ISO Complaint as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Goldstein, Jamie) [Transferred from California Central on 3/12/2024.]
December 15, 2023 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Marc Pierre, The United States. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 3/12/2024.]
December 13, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Attorney All Plaintiffs, (Goldstein, Jamie) [Transferred from California Central on 3/12/2024.]
December 13, 2023 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Pamela Moyo, Steven Moyo. (Goldstein, Jamie) [Transferred from California Central on 3/12/2024.]
December 7, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 3/12/2024.]
December 7, 2023 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 3/12/2024.]
December 7, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 3/12/2024.]
December 7, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 3/12/2024.]
December 6, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Pamela Moyo, Steven Moyo. (Goldstein, Jamie) [Transferred from California Central on 3/12/2024.]
December 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36527980 - Fee: $405, filed by plaintiff Pamela Moyo, Steven Moyo. (Attorney Jamie Greer Goldstein added to party Pamela Moyo(pty:pla), Attorney Jamie Greer Goldstein added to party Steven Moyo(pty:pla))(Goldstein, Jamie) [Transferred from California Central on 3/12/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pamela Moyo et al v. The United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Moyo
Represented By: Jamie Greer Goldstein
Represented By: Elise R Sanguinetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Moyo
Represented By: Jamie Greer Goldstein
Represented By: Elise R Sanguinetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The United States
Represented By: Julian John Xu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marc Pierre
Represented By: Dave H. Hitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?