Brown v. Sweetwater Union High School District et al
Plaintiff: Lateefah Brown
Defendant: Sweetwater Union High School District, Dr. Moises Aguirre, Dr. Karen Janney, Nicholas Segura, Adrian Arancibia, Marti Emerald, Elva Lopez-Zepeda, Arturo Solis, Anna Pedroza and Mary Rose Peralta
Case Number: 3:2024cv00493
Filed: March 13, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Michelle M Pettit
2 Judge: Thomas J Whelan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 ra Race Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2024 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lateefah Brown, as to Anna Pedroza. (McKenzie, Michele) (exs).
April 18, 2024 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lateefah Brown, as to Sweetwater Union High School District. (McKenzie, Michele) (aas).
April 18, 2024 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lateefah Brown, as to Mary Rose Peralta. (McKenzie, Michele) (aas).
April 18, 2024 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lateefah Brown, as to Marti Emerald. (McKenzie, Michele) (aas).
April 18, 2024 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lateefah Brown, as to Elva Lopez-Zepeda. (McKenzie, Michele) (aas).
April 18, 2024 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lateefah Brown, as to Moises Aguirre. (McKenzie, Michele) (aas).
April 18, 2024 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lateefah Brown, as to Karen Janney. (McKenzie, Michele) (aas).
April 18, 2024 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lateefah Brown, as to Arturo Solis. (McKenzie, Michele) (aas).
April 18, 2024 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lateefah Brown, as to Adrian Arancibia. (McKenzie, Michele) (aas).
April 4, 2024 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas J. Whelan for all further proceedings. The new case number is 24-cv-493-W-MMP.(no document attached) (dim)
April 3, 2024 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER - This Court exercises its discretionary perogative as a senior district judge to decline the assignment of this case and without commenting on the merits or demerits of any pending motion directs the case be reassigned to another randomly selected district judge.. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey T. Miller for all further proceedings. The new case number is 24CV0493-JM-MMP.(no document attached) (jpp)
March 26, 2024 Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION for Recusal by Lateefah Brown. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Counsel)(McKenzie, Michele) (ddf).
March 13, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (ggv) (jms).
March 13, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Moises Aguirre, Adrian Arancibia, Marti Emerald, Karen Janney, Elva Lopez-Zepeda, Anna Pedroza, Mary Rose Peralta, Nicholas Segura, Arturo Solis, Sweetwater Union High School District ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18668051.), filed by Lateefah Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:24-cv-493-BEN-MMP. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit are assigned to the case. (McKenzie, Michele)(ggv) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Sweetwater Union High School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lateefah Brown
Represented By: Nicolas O. Jimenez Lopez
Represented By: Timothy A. Scott
Represented By: Michele Akemi McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweetwater Union High School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Moises Aguirre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Karen Janney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Arancibia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marti Emerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elva Lopez-Zepeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arturo Solis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Pedroza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Rose Peralta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?