Lynk Remote Technologies, LLC v. Sky Harbour, LLC
Plaintiff: Lynk Remote Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Sky Harbour, LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv00551
Filed: March 22, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison H Goddard
Referring Judge: Thomas J Whelan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Jeffrey J. White, re #9 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 5/16/2024.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(exs)
May 15, 2024 Filing 9 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-18851639.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (White, Jeffrey) (exs).
May 15, 2024 Filing 8 Notice of Motion to Dismiss and Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Attachments: #1 Declaration Squiccimarro Declaration)(Strella, Joseph) (exs).
May 13, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph W. Strella, Jr on behalf of Sky Harbour, LLC (Strella, Joseph)Attorney Joseph W. Strella, Jr added to party Sky Harbour, LLC(pty:dft) (exs).
May 3, 2024 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Christine Joy Gracco 608 Norwynn Lane Fallbrook, CA 92028. (exs)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #3 #4 Joint Motions for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint: Answer by Respondent due 5/17/2024. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 4/22/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(exs)
April 19, 2024 Filing 4 Parties' Joint Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Notice Joint Stipulation of parties to extend time to file response to complaint)(Crawford, Terri) (exs).
April 18, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Sky Harbour, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice Joint Stipulation of Parties to Extend time to file response to complaint, #2 Notice Notice of Appearance of Counsel)(Crawford, Terri)Attorney Terri L. Crawford added to party Sky Harbour, LLC(pty:dft) (aas).
March 22, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (axc1) (jms).
March 22, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Sky Harbour, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18696104.), filed by Lynk Remote Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:24-cv-551-W-AHG. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Dillon, Timothy P)(axc1) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynk Remote Technologies, LLC v. Sky Harbour, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynk Remote Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Christine Joy Gracco
Represented By: Timothy P. Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky Harbour, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey J. White
Represented By: Joseph W. Strella, Jr.
Represented By: Terri L. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?