US v. Lopez-Soto

Appellee: UNITED STATES
Defendant - Appellant: MIZAURY LOPEZ-SOTO, a/k/a Misaury
Case Number: 05-2627
Filed: October 28, 2005
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
July 7, 2006 US v. Lopez-Soto
August 16, 2006 US v. Lopez-Soto
May 31, 2007 US v. Lopez-Soto
July 7, 2008 US v. Lopez-Soto

Search for this case: US v. Lopez-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Irene C. Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: MIZAURY LOPEZ-SOTO, a/k/a Misaury
Represented By: Raymond John Rigat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?