Connolly v. US

Respondent - Appellee: UNITED STATES
Petitioner - Appellant: JOHN J. CONNOLLY
Case Number: 05-2773
Filed: December 1, 2005
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
March 23, 2006 Connolly v. US
June 14, 2006 Connolly v. US
September 7, 2006 Connolly v. US
October 16, 2007 Connolly v. US
October 16, 2008 Connolly v. US
October 29, 2008 Connolly v. US

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2007 920071016 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion
September 7, 2006 920060907 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion
June 14, 2006 920060614 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion
March 23, 2006 920060323 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion
Search for this case: Connolly v. US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent - appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: John H. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner - appellant: JOHN J. CONNOLLY
Represented By: Edward J. Lonergan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?