In Re: Vazquez-Botet, et al

Petitioner: In re: RENE VAZQUEZ-BOTET
:
Case Number: 06-2230
Filed: August 18, 2006
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
September 20, 2006 In Re: Vazquez-Botet, et al
July 9, 2008 In Re: Vazquez-Botet, et al
August 6, 2008 In Re: Vazquez-Botet, et al
October 29, 2008 In Re: Vazquez-Botet, et al

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2006 920060920 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion
Search for this case: In Re: Vazquez-Botet, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: In re: RENE VAZQUEZ-BOTET
Represented By: Howard M. Srebnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Represented By: Mary K. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?