SEC v. Tambone, et al

Plaintiff - Appellant: US SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Defendant - Appellee: JAMES TAMBONE and ROBERT HUSSEY
Amicus Curiae: CHAMBER OF COMMERCE, of the United States of America, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, of Shareholder and Consumer Attorneys (NASCAT), CENTER FOR AUDIT QUALITY, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF CERTIFIED PUBLIC ACCOUNTANTS, SECURITIES INDUSTRY, and Financial Markets Association, NEW ENGLAND LEGAL FOUNDATION and ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES OF MA
Case Number: 07-1384
Filed: March 8, 2007
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchange

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
December 3, 2008 SEC v. Tambone, et al
February 23, 2009 SEC v. Tambone, et al
February 23, 2009 SEC v. Tambone, et al
July 22, 2009 SEC v. Tambone, et al
March 9, 2010 SEC v. Tambone, et al
March 23, 2010 SEC v. Tambone, et al

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2010 920100323 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion
March 9, 2010 920100309 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion
July 22, 2009 920090722 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion
February 23, 2009 920090223 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion
December 3, 2008 920081203 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion
Search for this case: SEC v. Tambone, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: US SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Represented By: Luke T. Cadigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: JAMES TAMBONE
Represented By: Paula J. DeGiacomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: ROBERT HUSSEY
Represented By: John J. Commisso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHAMBER OF COMMERCE, of the United States of America
Represented By: Barry P. Barbash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, of Shareholder and Consumer Attorneys (NASCAT)
Represented By: Salvatore J. Graziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CENTER FOR AUDIT QUALITY
Represented By: Douglas R. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF CERTIFIED PUBLIC ACCOUNTANTS
Represented By: Lawrence S. Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SECURITIES INDUSTRY, and Financial Markets Association
Represented By: Kevin M. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NEW ENGLAND LEGAL FOUNDATION
Represented By: John Pagliaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES OF MA
Represented By: John Pagliaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?