In Re: Pharmaceutical Case, et al
Not Classified By Court: PURDUE PHARMA COMPANY, PARMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BEN VENUE LABORATORIES INC., T. MARK JONES, TOGETHER RX DEFENDENTS, ORTHO MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MILBERG LLP, OREGON HEALTH ACTION CAMPAIGN, NEW JERSEY CITIZEN ACTION, GENSIA SICOR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS PLC, Z.L.B. BEHRING, COUNTY OF ORANGE, FUJISAWA HEALTHCARE, INC., DEY, INC., BIOGEN, INC., IVAX CORPORATION, GENSIA INC., BETTY SICHER, ACTION ALLIANCE OF SENIOR CITIZENS OF GREATER PHILADELPHIA, SANDOZ, INC., NOVO NORDISK INC., GENZYME CORPORATION, MALLINCKRODT, INC., NATIONAL HERITAGE INSURANCE COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA L.P., ROXANNE LABORATORIES, INC., FUJISAWA USA, INC., SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ZENECA HOLDINGS INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, CITY OF NEW YORK AND CAPTIONED NEW YORK COUNTIES, THE, SHIRLEY GELLER, OREGON STATE PUBLIC INTEREST RESEARCH GROUP, ESSEX SUPERIOR COURT JUDGE, BAXTER HEALTHCARE CORPORATION, HAROLD BEAN, WATSON PHARMA, INC., STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, MERCK-LIPHA SA, GREENSTONE LTD, MERCK & COMPANY, INCORPORATED, JOHN B. RICE, ROCHE LABORATORIES, INC., PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF OH, JONATHAN MARKS, STATE OF MT, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, AMERICAN HOME PRODUCTS CORP., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS HOLDINGS INC., BAYER CORPORATION, COUNTY OF ONTARIO, JOHNSON & JOHNSON HEALTH CARE SYSTEMS, INC., NEW YORK, NY, COUNTY OF CORTLAND, GLAXO WELLCOME PLC, STATE OF ILLINOIS, DONALD E. HAVILAND, JR., DAVID AARONSON, AGOURON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., STATE OF DELAWARE, CHIRON, PEARL MUNIC, CAREFIRST BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD, MEDIMMUNE, INC., AMGEN, INC, TUFTS ASSOCIATED HEALTH MAINTENANCE ORGANIZATION, INC., ENDO GEN. PROD., PATRICIA K MORGAN, NATIONAL AUTOMATIC SPRINKLER INDUSTRY WELFARE FUND, NASSAU COUNTY, KING RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, ABBOTT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., COUNTY OF SCHUYLER, AMERICAN BIOSCIENCE, INC., FIRST DATABANK, INC., SHIRE PLC, EMD, INC., JACK DOUGLAS, EMD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MASSPIRG, BIOVAIL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM CORP., STATE OF TENNESSEE, TAP PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS, INC., SERONO LABORATORIES, INC., ROXANE INC, WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., AMERISOURCEBERGEN, SERONO, INC., EMPIRE BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD, ALL DEFENDANTS, KREMERS URBAN DEV. CO., BAXTER INTERNATIONAL, INC., SHIRE US INC., JOHN BENNETT, SCHWARZPHARMA HOLDINGS, INC., JOHN V. DIGEL, ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ANDRX CORPORATION, JOAN S. LEE, EDWARD WEST, TARO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.,, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., C H BOEHRINGER SOHN, OXFORD HEALTH PLANS, LLC, SEPRACOR INC., CHIRON CORPORATION, IMMUNEX CORPORATION, RICE & THOMPSON, COUNTY OF LEWIS, MAINE CONSUMERS FOR AFFORDABLE HEALTH CARE, RONALD E. TURNER, BAXTER PHARMACEUTICAL., STATE OF IOWA, SANOFI-AVENTIS, JOHN DOES 1-200, FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., HEALTH ACTION OF NEW MEXICO, FALLON COMMUNITY HEALTH PLAN, INC., NOVAPHARM USA, INC., STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, BAYER, AG, COUNTY OF NASSAU, STATE OF ARIZONA, HEALTH NET, INC., IVAX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FAULDING PHARMACEUTICALS, CONGRESS OF CALIFORNIA SENIORS, ROXANE LABORATORIES, INC., ERIC GREEN, DEMRA JORDAN, EXCELLUS BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD, PHARMA-INVESTMENT LIMITED, HEATLH CARE SERVICE CORPORATION, GLAXOSMITHKLINE, GILEAD SCIENCES, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS PRODUCTS, L.P., ESSEX COUNTY, PROCTOR & GAMBLE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ALPHA THERAPEUTICS CORPORATION, DOES 1-100, ETHEL WALTERS, MONSANTO COMPANY, MUTUAL OF OMAHA INSURANCE COMPANY, AVENTIS S.A., COUNTY OF ORLEANS, TYCO HEALTHCARE, MERCK KGAA, COUNTY OF WYOMING, TAP HOLDINGS, INC., ALLERGAN WORLDWIDE, ONCOLOGY THERAPEUTICS NETWORK CORP., HOESCHT MARION ROUSSEL, INC., COUNTY OF ERIE, ETHEX CORPORATION, DEY L.P., RHONE-POULENC, INC., Rhone-Poulenc Rorer, S.A, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL, Teva Pharmaceutical USA, MANAGED HEALTH CARE ASSOCIATES, INC., SERONO INTERNATIONAL, S.A., ROCKLAND COUNTY, APOTEX, INC., SCHEIN PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., ALZA CORPORATION, PHARAMACEUTICAL IND, Pharamaceutical Industry Average Wholesale Price Litigation, STATE OF TX, ALCON LABORATORIES, INC., STATE OF IDAHO, MINNESOTA SENIOR FEDERATION, B.BRAUN OF AMERICA, B. BRAUN MCGAW, AVENTIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC., DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, EISAI, INC., KIMBERLY K. HOOVER, COUNTY OF CHAUTAUQUA, PLAINTIFFS' STEERING COMMITTEE, LIPHA, S.A., CITY OF NEW YORK AND CAPTIONED NEW YORK COUNTIES, HOWARD A. SMITHLINE, COUNTY OF ROCKLAND, CONNECTICUT GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE CO., WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BEDFORD LABORATORIES, DOES 101-125, RELIANT PHARMACEAUTICALS, LLC, ETHICON, INC., MCNEIL-PPC, INC., UNITED STATES, BAYER PHARMACEUTICAL, MCGAW, INC., GRAY PANTHERS OF SACRAMENTO, COUNTY OF ULSTER, DOES 126-150, AVENTIS BEHRING LLC, PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, THE, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, ALLERGAN, INC., B. BRAUN MEDICAL INC., BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HOECHST MARION ROUSSEL, INC., SANOFI-SYNTHELABO, INC., BERLAX LABORATORIES, INC., STATE OF CALIFORNIA, WARRICK PHARMACEUTICALS CORPORATION, SUFFOLK COUNTY (NY), CENTOCOR, INC., PHARMA INVESTMENT LTD., STATE OF VA, ROBERTA S. STARKS, ASTRAZENECA US, ORGANON PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC, STATE OF CT, COUNTY OF WESTCHESTER, ROBERT J. SWANSTON, COUNTY OF ONONDAGA, COUNTY OF DUTCHESS, NOVAPHARM LTD., ICN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ANDRX PHARMACEUTICAL, ZACHARY T. BENTLEY, CONNECTICUT CITIZEN ACTION GROUP, RUDOLPH J. LIEDTKE, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, MCKESSON CORPORATION, BAYER HEALTHCARE, LLC,, AGOURAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM ROXANE, INC, ROCHE LABS, EUGENIA K. GLESSNER, RJL SYSTEMS, INC., ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, WEST VIRGINIA CITIZEN ACTION, COUNTY OF SENECA, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS, LOCAL NO. 68 WELFARE FUND, PHARMACIA & UPJOHN, INC., DERMIK LABORATORIES, INC., VEN-A-CARE OF THE FLORIDA KEYS, INC., UDL LABORATORIES, INC., COUNTY OF CHENANGO, STATE OF HAWAII, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ONONDAGA COUNTY, PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, UNITED HEALTHCARE, UnitedHealthcare, Inc. & United HealthCare Insurance Company, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, by Thomas W. Borbett, Jr. in his capacity as Attorney General of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, OTSUKA AMERICA, INC., AETNA, INC., PHARMACIA CORPORATION, NEIGHBORHOOD HEALTH PLAN, INC., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., STATE OF NV, STATE OF MINNESOTA, HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE, INC., HAWAII MEDICAL SERVICE ASSOCIATION, NOVARTIS AG, HENRY D. MCMASTER, in his official capacity as Attorney General for the State of South Carolina, MCNEIL CONSUMER, MASSACHUSETTS SENIOR ACTION COUNCIL, UCB PHARMA, DOES 151-200, a, SICOR, INC., PENNSYLVANIA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., NORTH CAROLINA FAIR SHARE, STANLEY C. HOPKINS, ASTELLAS PHARMA US, INC., APOTHECON, INC., PUREPAC PHARMACEUTICAL, CO., UNITED SENIOR ACTION OF INDIANA, INC., STATE OF NEW YORK, PFIZER, INC., KING PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SUE MILES, MONARCH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., STATE OF FLORIDA, NOVARTIS CORPORATION, COUNTY OF OSWEGO, BARR LABORATORIES, INC., FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL, HUMANA INSURANCE OF PUERTO RICO, INC., ALPHARMA, INC., GENEVA PHARAMACEUTICALS, INC., ORGANON USA, SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP., ORTHO NEUTROGENA, ORTHO BIOTECH PRODUCTS, LP, GENENTECH, INC., COUNTY OF COLUMBIA, THE, HOSPIRA, INC., Hospira, Inc., COLORADO PROGRESSIVE COALITION, UCB, S.A., CONSTANCE THOMPSON, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., BIOGEN IDEC U.S., SCHERING PLOUGH CORP, ZENECA, INC. and COUNTY OF SCHENECTADY
Plaintiff / Appellee: KENNETH VANDERWAL, VERMONT PUBLIC INTEREST RESEARCH GROUP, LEROY TOWNSEND, Individually and on behalf of other similarly situated, CHERYL BARRECA, CITIZENS FOR CONSUMER JUSTICE, HEALTH CARE FOR ALL, TWIN CITIES BAKERY WORKERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, DONNA KENDALL, MARDOLYN VESCOVI, SUSAN AARONSON, HUNTER G. WALTERS, WISCONSIN CITIZEN ACTION, MURIEL TONACCHIO, LARRY YOUNG, VIRGINIA NEWELL, JAMES MONK, JOSEPH MILLER, NEW YORK STATE WIDE SENIOR ACTION COUNCIL, CYNTHIA BYRSKI, CARPENTERS & MILLWRIGHTS OF HOUSTON AND VICINITY WELFARE TRUST FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED, Carpenters & Millwrights of Houston and Vicinity Welfare Trust Fund, Board of Trustees, Individually, KATHLEEN WEAVER-ZECH, BLUE CROSS/BLUE SHIELD OF MASSACHUSETTS, MAN-U SERVICE CONTRACT TRUST FUND, UNITED FOOD & COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNIONS AND EMPLOYERS MIDWEST HEALTH BENEFITS FUND, SCOTT TELL, ROBERT HOWE, PIRELLI ARMSTRONG RETIREE MEDICAL BENEFITS TRUST, ROGER CLARK, SUSAN WESSELS, CONSTANCE NELSON, REGINA SHOEMAKER, THERESE SHEPLEY, GEORGE BAKER THOMAS, ORAL RAY ROOTS, ANDREA PALENCIA, ANNA CHOICE, PHILADELPHIA FEDERATION OF TEACHERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, HAROLD L. CARTER, MARY CAUBLE, SANDRA LEEF, CITIZEN ACTION OF NEW YORK, REBECCA HOPKINS, JOYCE DISON, LEROY TOWNSEND, PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 537 TRUST FUNDS, SHEET METAL WORKERS UNION NATIONAL HEALTH FUND, TEAMSTERS HEALTH & WELFARE FUND OF PHILADELPHIA AND VICINITY, WILLIAM BARNEWOLT and TRACY GARCIA
Defendant / Appellant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Plaintiff / Appellant: M. JOYCE HOWE
Defendant / Appellee: ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICAL LP and GLAXOWELLCOME, INC.
Case Number: 09-1196
Filed: March 18, 2009
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2012 Archives location information. Transfer Number: PT-276-12-0009. Box Number: 25/193. The Court of Appeals record is held at the Federal Records Center in Waltham, MA. Copies of the record can be ordered online at # http://www.archives.gov/research/court-records/bankruptcy.html . [09-1196] (BS) [Entered: 07/30/2012 02:19 PM]
April 6, 2010 NOTICE of Filing Transcript by Court Reporter Valerie A. O'Hara: Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 03/26/2010, Type of Proceeding: Status Conference. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 04/06/2010 01:32 PM]
December 29, 2009 CORRECTED ORDER granting in part and denying in part bill of costs filed by Appellee Leroy Townsend; denying motion to award fees and costs filed by Plaintiff-Appellee. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 12/29/2009 03:43 PM]
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge; Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge and Jeffrey R. Howard, Appellate Judge granting in part and denying in part bill of costs filed by Appellees Leroy Townsend. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 12/28/2009 04:01 PM]
December 22, 2009 NOTICE of Filing Transcript. Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 12/11/2009, Type of Proceeding: Settlement Hrg, Court Reporter: Marzilli, Lee Alice. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript(s) will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court.. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 12/22/2009 03:52 PM]
December 21, 2009 ERRATA to opinion (published) [ # 5394968-2 ]. [09-1196] (SBT) [Entered: 12/21/2009 11:43 AM]
December 18, 2009 MANDATE Issued. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 12/18/2009 09:57 AM]
December 14, 2009 DECLARATION of Steve W. Berman in Support of Plaintiffs-Appellees' Reply in Support of Their Motion For Sanctions Under FED. R. App. P. 38 and 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1912. [ # 5400954-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 12/14/2009. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 12/14/2009 04:46 PM]
December 14, 2009 REPLY filed by Plaintiffs-Appellees in support of their motion for sanctions under Fed. R. App. P. 38 and 28 U.S.C Sec. 1912. [ # 5399725-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 12/14/2009. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 12/14/2009 04:43 PM]
December 9, 2009 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed by Appellant M. Joyce Howe to bill of costs [ # 5396229-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 12/08/2009. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 12/09/2009 02:22 PM]
December 9, 2009 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed by Appellant M. Joyce Howe to motion for sanctions [ # 5396232-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 12/08/2009. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 12/09/2009 02:25 PM]
November 25, 2009 BILL of Costs filed by Appellee Leroy Townsend requesting costs in the amount of $917.00. Certificate of service dated 11/25/2009. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 11/25/2009 03:50 PM]
November 25, 2009 MOTION filed by Plaintiffs-Appellees for Sanctions. Certificate of service dated 11/25/2009. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 11/25/2009 03:52 PM]
November 25, 2009 Declaration of Jennifer Fountain Connolly in Support of Plaintiffs-Appellees' Motion For Sanctions Under FED. R. APP. P. 38 and 28 U.S.C. Sec 1912. [ # 5396232-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 11/25/2009. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 11/25/2009 03:57 PM]
November 25, 2009 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of Plaintiffs-Appellees' Motion For Sanctions Under FED. R. APP. P. 38 and 28 U.S.C. Sec 1912. [ # 5396232-2 ] Certificate of service dated 11/25/2009. [09-1196]--[Edited 11/25/2009 by MM]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (MA) [Entered: 11/25/2009 03:54 PM]
November 20, 2009 OPINION issued by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge; Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge and Jeffrey R. Howard, Appellate Judge. Published. [09-1196] (FJP) [Entered: 11/20/2009 03:09 PM]
November 20, 2009 JUDGMENT entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge; Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge and Jeffrey R. Howard, Appellate Judge. Affirmed [09-1196] (FJP) [Entered: 11/20/2009 03:12 PM]
October 27, 2009 NOTICE of Filing Transcript. Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 10/20/2009, Type of Proceeding: Motion Hearing, Court Reporter: Marzilli, Lee Alice. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript(s) will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court.. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 10/27/2009 02:34 PM]
October 8, 2009 Case argued. Panel: Lynch Chief Appellate Judge, Torruella Appellate Judge, Howard Appellate Judge Arguing Person Information Updated for: Steve W. Berman arguing for Appellees Pipefitters Local 537 Trust Funds and Leroy Townsend; Arguing Person Information Updated for: Donald E. Haviland arguing for Appellant M. Joyce Howe. [09-1196] (LM) [Entered: 10/08/2009 03:33 PM]
October 2, 2009 NOTICE of Filing Transcript. Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 09/14/2009, Type of Proceeding: Motion Hrg, Court Reporter: Young, Maryanne. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript(s) will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court.. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 10/02/2009 03:26 PM]
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge: The appellant's motion to reconsider and vacate this court's prior order that volume III of the appendix remain sealed is denied. Because the appellant's reply brief, which was filed provisionally under seal, contains numerous references to and quotations from volume III of the appendix, the reply brief shall remain sealed as well. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 10/01/2009 12:28 PM]
September 29, 2009 Public docket note: Appellant's Original motion requesting leave to file reply brief instanter has a rrived today via US mail. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 09/29/2009 09:34 AM]
September 29, 2009 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Appellee Leroy Townsend to motion to reconsider order [ # 5378913-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 09/29/2009. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 09/29/2009 04:36 PM]
September 29, 2009 DECLARATION of Jennifer Fountain Connolly. Certificate of service dated 09/29/2009. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 09/29/2009 04:37 PM]
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to file reply brief instanter filed by Appellant M. Joyce Howe. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 09/28/2009 02:52 PM]
September 28, 2009 REPLY BRIEF filed by Appellant M. Joyce Howe (******UNDER SEAL******). Number of paper copies: 9. Certificate of service dated 09/23/2009. [09-1196]--[Edited 10/01/2009 by MM]. CLERK'S NOTE: This docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (MA) [Entered: 09/28/2009 03:27 PM]
September 28, 2009 CERTIFICATE of Service regarding September 23, 2009 Filings filed by Attorney Donald E. Haviland for Appellant M. Joyce Howe. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 09/29/2009 08:41 AM]
September 24, 2009 PLEADING Tendered: "PROVISIONALLY TENDERED UNDER SEAL" Reply Brief (9 paper copies, 1 CD-ROM) provisionally filed under seal filed by Appellant M. Joyce Howe. Certificate of service was not included. [09-1196] (BLC) [Entered: 09/24/2009 11:58 AM]
September 24, 2009 MOTION filed by Appellant M. Joyce Howe to file reply brief instanter. Certificate of service dated 09/24/2009. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 09/24/2009 02:20 PM]
September 24, 2009 MOTION filed by Appellant M. Joyce Howe to reconsider and vacate this court's sealing order dated September 14, 2009, and for order of unsealing. Certificate of service dated 09/23/2009. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 09/24/2009 12:06 PM]
September 24, 2009 MOTION filed by Appellant M. Joyce Howe for determination of propriety of filing under seal. Certificate of service dated 09/23/2009. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 09/24/2009 02:28 PM]
September 24, 2009 CERTIFICATE of Service regarding Appellant's Reply Brief filed by Attorney Donald E. Haviland for Appellant M. Joyce Howe. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 09/24/2009 02:30 PM]
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to file supplemental appendix filed by Appellees Leroy Townsend. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 09/17/2009 08:58 AM]
September 17, 2009 SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX filed by Appellee Leroy Townsend. Volumes: 3. Copies: 5. Certificate of service dated 09/14/2009. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 09/17/2009 09:01 AM]
September 16, 2009 MOTION filed by Appellee Leroy Townsend to file supplemental appendix. Certificate of service dated 09/16/2009. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 09/17/2009 08:50 AM]
September 14, 2009 BRIEF filed by Appellee Leroy Townsend. Length: 63 pages, 14,000 words. Copies: 11. Certificate of service (mailed) dated 09/14/2009.. [09-1196] (BLC) [Entered: 09/15/2009 02:56 PM]
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge: After the appellant filed volume III of her appendix "provisionally under seal," we ordered class counsel or any other party that seeks to have volume III sealed to file a motion to that effect. In response to that order, class counsel asked that most of the documents contained in volume III be stricken from the appellate record on the ground that they contain attorney work product. Alternatively, class counsel requested that the documents containing attorney work product be filed under seal. The request to strike documents contained in volume III is denied. All of the documents contained therein are part of the district court record and are therefore properly part of the record on appeal. See Fed. R. App. P. 10(a)(1). However, as far as we have been able to determine, all of the documents contained in volume III were either heavily redacted or filed under seal in the district court. Therefore, volume III shall remain sealed in this court. See 1st Cir. R. 11.0(c)(1). [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 09/14/2009 02:35 PM]
September 14, 2009 PLEADING Tendered: Supplemental Appendix (3 volumes, 5 copies) filed by Appellee Leroy Townsend. Certificate of service (mailed) dated 09/14/2009. [09-1196] (BLC) [Entered: 09/15/2009 03:00 PM]
September 14, 2009 ELECTRONIC Document containing Appellee's Brief filed by Appellees Leroy Townsend. [09-1196] (BLC) [Entered: 09/15/2009 02:57 PM]
September 14, 2009 INFORMATIVE NOTICE filed by the US Court of Appeals For the Federal Circuit. Certificate of service was not included. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 09/18/2009 11:48 AM]
September 14, 2009 APPENDIX filed by Appellant M. Joyce Howe. Volume 3. Copies: 5. (****Filed UNDER SEAL*****) Certificate of service dated 08/21/2009. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 09/30/2009 03:48 PM]
September 8, 2009 MOTION filed by the Class appellee, requesting that Appendix Volume 3 be filed under seal. Certificate of service dated 09/08/2009. [09-1196] (LB) [Entered: 09/10/2009 02:11 PM]
September 8, 2009 DESIGNATION form filed. Arguing Person Information Updated for: Donald E. Haviland arguing for Appellant M. Joyce Howe. [09-1196] (LM) [Entered: 09/10/2009 08:26 PM]
September 3, 2009 DESIGNATION form filed. Arguing Person Information Updated for: Steve W. Berman arguing for Class Plaintiffs, Appellees. [09-1196] (LM) [Entered: 09/03/2009 01:57 PM]
August 31, 2009 ELECTRONIC Document containing Appellant's Brief filed by Appellant M. Joyce Howe. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 09/01/2009 09:46 AM]
August 28, 2009 Case calendared: 10/08/2009 Boston, MA Panel Courtroom. Designation form due 09/11/2009. [09-1196] (LM) [Entered: 08/28/2009 11:25 AM]
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order ORDER: The appellant, M. Joyce Howe, filed volume III of her appendix "provisionally under seal" along with a "Motion for a Determination of Propriety of Filing Under Seal." Documents may not be filed under seal in this court without a motion to seal, explaining the basis for sealing and specifying the desired duration of the sealing order. 1st Cir. R. 11.0(c)(2). The appellant, who does not believe that the documents contained in volume III of the appendix need to be sealed, instead filed a motion for a determination of the propriety of sealing the documents so that class counsel or others could have an opportunity to be heard on that issue. Accordingly, class counsel, or any other party that seeks to have volume III sealed, is ordered to file a motion to that effect, in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 11.0(c), within 14 days of this order. In the absence of such a motion by that date, appendix volume III will be unsealed. So ordered. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 08/27/2009 09:55 AM]
August 24, 2009 APPENDIX filed by Appellant M. Joyce Howe. Volumes: 2. Copies: 5. Certificate of service (mailed) dated 08/21/2009. [09-1196] (RL) [Entered: 08/25/2009 08:42 AM]
August 24, 2009 BRIEF filed by Appellant M. Joyce Howe. Length: 46 pages, 10,741 words. Copies: 10. Certificate of service (mailed) dated 08/21/2009.. [09-1196] (RL) [Entered: 08/25/2009 08:40 AM]
August 24, 2009 PLEADING Tendered: appendix (volume number 3; provisionally filed "UNDER SEAL") filed by Appellant M. Joyce Howe. Certificate of service (mailed) dated 08/21/2009. [09-1196] (RL) [Entered: 08/25/2009 08:44 AM]
August 24, 2009 MOTION filed by Appellant M. Joyce Howe for determination of propriety of filing under seal. Certificate of service dated 08/21/2009. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 08/25/2009 09:31 AM]
August 24, 2009 NON-CONFORMING ELECTRONIC DOCUMENT containing brief filed by Appellant M. Joyce Howe. [09-1196] (RL) [Entered: 08/25/2009 08:47 AM]
August 17, 2009 NOTICE of Filing Transcript. Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 08/10/2009, Type of Proceeding: Motion Hearing, Court Reporter: Marzilli, Lee Alice. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript(s) will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court.. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 08/17/2009 02:31 PM]
August 10, 2009 TRANSCRIPT filed. Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 08/27/2007, Type of Proceeding: Damages Hrg, Court Reporter: Marzilli, Lee Alice. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 08/10/2009 09:14 AM]
August 10, 2009 SUPPLEMENTAL Record filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Doc#4670 (Transcript). [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 08/10/2009 09:12 AM]
August 6, 2009 NOTICE of Filing Transcript. Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 06/24/2009, Type of Proceeding: Sched. Conf.. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript(s) will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court.. [08-1190, 09-1196] (****Filed in 09-1196***) (MA) [Entered: 08/06/2009 01:59 PM]
July 22, 2009 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 09/11/2009 for Appellee MDL Plaintiffs. Reply brief due 09/18/2009 for Appellant Joyce Howe. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 07/22/2009 04:01 PM]
July 22, 2009 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to expedite appeal filed by Appellees MDL Plaintiffs. Brief due 08/21/2009 for Appellant Bristol-Myers Squibb Company and Appellant M. Joyce Howe. Appendix due 08/21/2009 for Appellant Bristol-Myers Squibb Company and Appellant M. Joyce Howe. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 07/22/2009 03:06 PM]
July 15, 2009 MOTION filed by Appellees MDL Class Plaintiffs to expedite briefing. Certificate of service dated 07/15/2009. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 07/15/2009 02:28 PM]
July 14, 2009 NOTICE of Filing Transcript. Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 07/08/2009, Type of Proceeding: Motion Hrg. , Court Reporter: Marzilli, Lee Alice. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript(s) will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court.. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 07/14/2009 04:10 PM]
June 8, 2009 NOTICE of Filing Transcript. Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 05/28/2009, Type of Proceeding: Summary Jmt Hrg., Court Reporter: Marzilli, Lee Alice. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript(s) will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court.. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 06/08/2009 02:24 PM]
June 5, 2009 NOTICE of Filing Transcript. Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 05/28/2009, Type of Proceeding: Status Hearing, Court Reporter: Marzilli, Lee Alice. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript(s) will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court.. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 06/05/2009 02:31 PM]
May 26, 2009 INFORMATIVE MOTION filed by Attorney Kimberly D. Harris for Appellee Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP: Notice of withdrawal of appearance. Certificate of service was not included. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 05/27/2009 09:40 AM]
May 14, 2009 DESIGNATION OF COUNSEL: filed by Attorney Michael S. D'Orsi for Not Party Baxter International in 07-2664, 08-1002, 08-1046, 08-1054, 08-1055, 08-1056, 08-1190. Certificate of service was not included. [07-2664, 08-1002, 08-1046, 08-1054, 08-1055, 08-1056, 08-1190, 08-8001, 09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 05/20/2009 10:32 AM]
May 13, 2009 NOTICE of Filing Transcript. Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 04/27/2009, Type of Proceeding: Settlement Hearing , Court Reporter: Marzilli, Lee Alice. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript(s) will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court.. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 05/13/2009 09:18 AM]
April 27, 2009 NOTICE of Filing Transcript. Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 04/16/2009, Type of Proceeding: Motion Hearing, Court Reporter: Marzilli, Lee Alice. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript(s) will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court.. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 04/27/2009 09:01 AM]
April 21, 2009 Public docket note: Case Opening Forms sent on 3/18/09 for Attorney Jared D. Rodrigues and Stephen D. Libowsky returned. Forwarding Address is Unknown. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 04/21/2009 10:01 AM]
April 17, 2009 Public docket note: Attoreny Gavin G. Jangard: Mail Returned. No available fowarding address. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 04/17/2009 12:42 PM]
April 14, 2009 Mail returned as undeliverable to Evan D. Buxner for - All Plaintiffs and John A. McDonald for Not Party B. Braun Medical Inc.. Copy of 3/18/09 Case Opening Forms. Forwarding address unknown. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 04/14/2009 07:36 AM]
April 9, 2009 TRANSCRIPT Report/Order Form filed by Appellees Blue Cross/Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Pipefitters Local 537 Trust Funds, Sheet Metal Workers Union National Health Fund and Leroy Townsend. Transcript of 7/6/06 Hearing , 5/9/07 Status Conference already filed in district court. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 04/10/2009 08:53 AM]
April 8, 2009 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Attorney David S. Nalven for - Government Employees Hospital Association. New address: Hagen Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP, 1 Main Street, 4th Floor, Boston, MA 02142. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 04/14/2009 07:47 AM]
April 7, 2009 Mail returned as undeliverable to Anthony Bolognese for - United Food & Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midest Health Benefits Fund and Lisa Colcock Phelan for Not Parties Baxter Healthcare Corporation and Baxter Pharmaceutical Products, Inc.. Copy of 3/18/09 Case Opening Forms. Forwarding address unknown. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 04/07/2009 09:53 AM]
April 7, 2009 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney David S. Nalven for - Government Employees Hospital Association. Copy of 3/18/09 Case Opening Forms. Forwarding address unknown. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 04/07/2009 09:55 AM]
April 6, 2009 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Zoe Philippides for Not Party Immunex Corporation. Copy of 3/18/09 Case Opening Forms. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 04/06/2009 02:54 PM]
April 6, 2009 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Peter D. St. Phillip for Not Parties Aetna, Inc., Connecticut General Life Insurance Company and Humana, Inc.. Copy of 3/18/09 Case Opening Forms. Forwarding address unknown. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 04/06/2009 02:57 PM]
April 3, 2009 DESIGNATION OF COUNSEL filed by Attorney Michael DeMarco for Sanofi Aventis. Certificate of service dated 04/03/2009. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 04/07/2009 09:41 AM]
April 2, 2009 Public docket note: Dupicative Show Cause Response Filed by Attorney Donald E. Haviland on behalf of Appellant M. Joyce Howe has arrived today via US mail. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 04/02/2009 12:34 PM]
April 2, 2009 NOTICE given by Attorney R. James De Rose for Not Party Apotex, Inc. that an appearance will not be filed. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 04/02/2009 02:58 PM]
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order ORDER regarding Show Cause Response filed by Appellant M. Joyce Howe. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 04/02/2009 03:11 PM]
April 1, 2009 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Gejaa T. Gobena for Not Party US and George Bunsen Henderson, II for Not Party US. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 04/01/2009 03:04 PM]
April 1, 2009 NOTICE given by Attorney Eric Fleisig-Greene, Esq. for Not Party US that an appearance will not be filed. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 04/01/2009 12:09 PM]
April 1, 2009 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Mr. Thomas Jefferson Bone, III, Sarah E. Cooleybeck, Kimberly D. Harris, Donald R. Ware and D. Scott Wise for Appellee Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 04/02/2009 12:17 PM]
April 1, 2009 MOTION IN COMPLIACE with the court's 3/18/09 order filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceutical LP designating Attorney D. Scott Wise as lead counsel. Certificate of service dated 04/01/2009. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 04/02/2009 12:28 PM]
April 1, 2009 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Joshua Anderson, Mr. Thomas Jefferson Bone, III, Mark Edmonde Haddad and Nicholas C. Theodorou for Appellee Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 04/02/2009 12:24 PM]
March 31, 2009 NOTICE given by Attorney James C. Burling for Not Parties American Bioscience, Inc. and American Home Products Corp. that an appearance will not be filed. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 03/31/2009 02:11 PM]
March 31, 2009 Mail returned as undeliverable to Susan E. MacMenamin for - Twin Cities Bakery Workers Health and Welfare Fund and Appellee Pipefitters Local 537 Trust Funds, David Woodward for - Twin Cities Bakery Workers Health and Welfare Fund, Neil Alden for Not Party Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Curtis Bergen for Not Party Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Todd S. Garber for Not Parties Aetna, Inc., Connecticut General Life Insurance Company and Humana, Inc., Terry Klein for Not Party Fugisawa Healthcare, Inc., Nancy L. Newman for Not Party Alpha Therapeutics Corporation, Lisa Colcock Phelan for Not Parties Baxter Healthcare Corporation and Baxter Pharmaceutical Products, Inc., Paul J. Riehle for Not Party Oncology Therapeutics Network Corp., Robert Taylor-Manning for Not Party City of New York and Captioned New York Counties, The and Dana George Toole for Not Parties Schering Plough Corp and Warrick Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Copy of 3/18/09 Case Opening Forms. Forwarding address unknown. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 03/31/2009 09:55 AM]
March 31, 2009 Mail returned as undeliverable to Zachary N. Coseglia for Not Parties Berlax Laboratories, Inc. and Sepracor Inc. and Jeffrey A. Miller for Not Party Biovail Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Copy of 3/18/09 Case Opening Forms. Forwarding address unknown. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 03/31/2009 02:16 PM]
March 31, 2009 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Donald E. Haviland for Appellant M. Joyce Howe and Michael Lorusso for Appellant M. Joyce Howe. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 03/31/2009 02:57 PM]
March 31, 2009 DOCKETING Statement filed by Appellant M. Joyce Howe. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 03/31/2009 02:59 PM]
March 31, 2009 SHOW Cause Response filed by Appellant M. Joyce Howe. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2009. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 04/01/2009 08:46 AM]
March 30, 2009 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney M. James Lorenz for - State of CA. Copy of 3/18/09 Case Opening Forms. Forwarding address unknown. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 03/30/2009 10:04 AM]
March 30, 2009 Mail returned as undeliverable to Nicole Y. Brumsted for - Wisconsin Citizen Action, Masspirg, Massachusetts Senior Action Council, Health Care For All, Colorado Progressive Coalition, Citizens for Consumer Justice, New Jersey Citizen Action, Florida Alliance for Retired Americans, Vermont Public Interest Research Group, New York State Wide Senior Action Council, Minnesota Senior Federation, Pennsylvania Alliance For Retired Americans, West Virginia Citizen Action and Not Parties Minnesota Senior Federation, Wisconsin Citizen Action, New Jersey Citizen Action, New York State Wide Senior Action Council, Masspirg, Massachusetts Senior Action Council, Colorado Progressive Coalition, West Virginia Citizen Action, Florida Alliance for Retired Americans, Pennsylvania Alliance For Retired Americans and Vermont Public Interest Research Group, Daniel E. Gustafson for - Action Alliance of Senior Citizens of Greater Philadelphia and United Food & Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midest Health Benefits Fund, Samuel D. Heins for - Twin Cities Bakery Workers Health and Welfare Fund and Appellee Pipefitters Local 537 Trust Funds, Carol A. Mager for - Ven-A-Care of the Florida Keys, Inc., Brian L. Williams for - Twin Cities Bakery Workers Health and Welfare Fund, Melissa M. Longo for Not Party Ethex Corporation, Oliver Metzger for Not Party Purdue Pharma L.P., Michael R. Plummer for Not Party Mylan Laboratories, Inc., Carl Rychcik for Not Party Mylan Laboratories, Inc., Kent M. Williams for Not Party Susan Aaronson and Michelle L. Younkin for Not Party Oncology Therapeutics Network Corp.. Copy of 3/18/09 Case Opening Forms. Forwarding address unknown. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 03/30/2009 03:01 PM]
March 30, 2009 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Jennifer F. Connolly and Kenneth A. Wexler MDL Plaintiffs. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 03/31/2009 11:07 AM]
March 30, 2009 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Attorney Steve W. Berman for - MDL Plaintiffs (***Please See Attached List***) [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 03/31/2009 10:20 AM]
March 30, 2009 NOTICE given by Attorney Jeffrey L. Kodroff for Not Party Teamsters Health & Welfare Fund of Philadelphia and Vicinity that an appearance will not be filed. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 03/31/2009 02:22 PM]
March 30, 2009 MOTION IN COMPLIACE with the court's March 18, 2009 Order designating counsel Attorneys' Michael DeMarco, David M. Glynn , Michael L. Koon and James P. Muehlberger for Sanofi Aventis to recieve notice of all court notices and orders. Certificate of service dated 03/30/2009. [09-1196] Certificate of service dated 03/30/2009. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 04/01/2009 11:30 AM]
March 26, 2009 Notice of Designation of Counsel Puursuant to the court's 03/18/09 order filed by Attorney Donald E. Haviland for Appellant M. Joyce Howe. Certificate of service dated 03/23/2009. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 03/26/2009 02:12 PM]
March 25, 2009 Public docket note: Notice filed by Attorney Seughwan Kim informing the court that she will not be a participating party to this appeal but would like to liason counsel and receive notices for Dey Inc. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 03/26/2009 09:55 AM]
March 25, 2009 NOTICE given by Attorney Peter A. Mullin for Not Party Commonwealth of Massachusetts that an appearance will not be filed. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 03/26/2009 09:51 AM]
March 25, 2009 NOTICE given by Attorney Seunghwan W. Kim for Not Parties Dey, Inc. and Dey L.P. that an appearance will not be filed. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 03/26/2009 09:57 AM]
March 20, 2009 MOTION in Compliance with the court's 3/18/09 Orderfiled by Attorney Steve W. Berman for Class Action Plaintiffs. Attoreny Berman to receive notices and orders. Certificate of service dated 03/20/2009. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 03/24/2009 09:54 AM]
March 18, 2009 NOTICE of Filing Transcript. Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 02/12/2009, Type of Proceeding: Status Hearing, Court Reporter: Marzilli, Lee. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript(s) will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. Transcript(s) due 05/18/2009 from Court Reporter Lee Marzilli. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 03/18/2009 11:43 AM]
March 18, 2009 RECORD filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Docs#4879, 5218, 5219, 5221, 5222, 5223, 5624, 5775, 5854, 5802. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 03/18/2009 11:42 AM]
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order ORDER to Show Cause entered directing appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Show cause response due 04/01/2009. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 03/18/2009 01:31 PM]
March 18, 2009 TRANSCRIPT Report/Order Form filed by Appellant M. Joyce Howe. (****SEE ATTACHED LIST*****) Transcripts already filed in district court. [09-1196] (Pleading Originally filed on 02/09/2009) (MA) [Entered: 03/19/2009 09:54 AM]
March 18, 2009 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #5854) filed by Appellant M. Joyce Howe. Opening forms sent. Docketing Statement due 04/01/2009. Transcript Report/Order form due 04/01/2009. Appearance form due 04/01/2009. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 03/18/2009 10:21 AM]
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order ORDER: Dorecting parties to designate lead and/or liaison counsel upon whom all court notices and orders should be served. [09-1196] (MA) [Entered: 03/18/2009 01:37 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In Re: Pharmaceutical Case, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: PURDUE PHARMA COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: PARMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: BEN VENUE LABORATORIES INC.
Represented By: Maria Pellagrino Rivera
Represented By: Richard M. Goldstein
Represented By: Amanda J. Wong
Represented By: John E. DeWulf
Represented By: Brent Caslin
Represented By: Randal C. Teague
Represented By: Paul J. Coval
Represented By: Sasha K. Danna
Represented By: Darlene Marie Wauro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: T. MARK JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: TOGETHER RX DEFENDENTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ORTHO MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MILBERG LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: OREGON HEALTH ACTION CAMPAIGN
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman
Represented By: Edward Notargiacomo
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Represented By: J. Douglas Richards
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Represented By: Joseph Danis
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: NEW JERSEY CITIZEN ACTION
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman
Represented By: Robert G. Eisler
Represented By: Nicole Y. Brumsted
Represented By: J. Douglas Richards
Represented By: Michael J. Flannery
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: David J. Bershad
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: GENSIA SICOR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS PLC
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Represented By: David F. Engstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Z.L.B. BEHRING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: COUNTY OF ORANGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: FUJISAWA HEALTHCARE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: DEY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: BIOGEN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: IVAX CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: GENSIA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: BETTY SICHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ACTION ALLIANCE OF SENIOR CITIZENS OF GREATER PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SANDOZ, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: NOVO NORDISK INC.
Represented By: Kenneth W. Africano
Represented By: Karen R. Kaczmarski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: GENZYME CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MALLINCKRODT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: NATIONAL HERITAGE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: PURDUE PHARMA L.P.
Represented By: John Mackay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ROXANNE LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: FUJISAWA USA, INC.
Represented By: Andrew L. Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Alexander L. Karan
Represented By: Barak Cohen
Represented By: Edwin John U
Represented By: Karen Natalie Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ZENECA HOLDINGS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: Yumeka Burt Rushing
Represented By: Charles John Biro
Represented By: Asish Shanker Prasad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: CITY OF NEW YORK AND CAPTIONED NEW YORK COUNTIES, THE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SHIRLEY GELLER
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: OREGON STATE PUBLIC INTEREST RESEARCH GROUP
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman
Represented By: Edward Notargiacomo
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Represented By: J. Douglas Richards
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Represented By: Joseph Danis
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ESSEX SUPERIOR COURT JUDGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: BAXTER HEALTHCARE CORPORATION
Represented By: Tina D. Reynolds
Represented By: Matthew A. Rossi
Represented By: Vincent John Montell
Represented By: J. Andrew Jackson
Represented By: Merle Miller Delancey Jr.
Represented By: Alicia Insley
Represented By: Mark Joseph MacDougall
Represented By: Ruchi Jan
Represented By: Karl Angelo Fazio
Represented By: Peter E. Gelhaar
Represented By: Jill Brenner Meixel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: HAROLD BEAN
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Donald E. Haviland Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: WATSON PHARMA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: STATE OF MISSISSIPPI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MERCK-LIPHA SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: GREENSTONE LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MERCK & COMPANY, INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: JOHN B. RICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ROCHE LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: STATE OF OH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: JONATHAN MARKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: STATE OF MT
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED
Represented By: Anthony C. Porcelli
Represented By: Joseph L. Mooney
Represented By: Brandon L. Bigelow
Represented By: Neil A. Goldberg
Represented By: Katherine K. Smith
Represented By: Thomas J. Hennessey
Represented By: Nada Djordjevic
Represented By: Robert R. Stauffer
Represented By: J. Rheba Rutkowski
Represented By: John G. Corlew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: AMERICAN HOME PRODUCTS CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS HOLDINGS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: BAYER CORPORATION
Represented By: Michael P. Doss
Represented By: Paul E. Kalb
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dunne
Represented By: Richard D. Raskin
Represented By: Benjamin J. Keith
Represented By: Kenneth W. Africano
Represented By: Karen R. Kaczmarski
Represented By: Laci P. Frisbie
Represented By: Donald A. Lattin
Represented By: Dale Samuel Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: COUNTY OF ONTARIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: JOHNSON & JOHNSON HEALTH CARE SYSTEMS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: NEW YORK, NY
Represented By: Aaron D. Hovan
Represented By: John R. Low-Beer
Represented By: Roger W. Kirby
Represented By: Richard J. Costa
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Joanne M. Cicala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: COUNTY OF CORTLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: GLAXO WELLCOME PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: STATE OF ILLINOIS
Represented By: Lisa Madigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: DONALD E. HAVILAND, JR.
Represented By: Donald E. Haviland Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: DAVID AARONSON
Represented By: Donald E. Haviland Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: AGOURON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Represented By: Paul K. Dueffert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: STATE OF DELAWARE
Represented By: M. Jane Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: CHIRON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: PEARL MUNIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: CAREFIRST BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MEDIMMUNE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: AMGEN, INC
Represented By: Frank R. Emmerich
Represented By: Marc Marinaccio
Represented By: Andrew S. Gordon
Represented By: Brian Melber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: TUFTS ASSOCIATED HEALTH MAINTENANCE ORGANIZATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ENDO GEN. PROD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: PATRICIA K MORGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: NATIONAL AUTOMATIC SPRINKLER INDUSTRY WELFARE FUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: NASSAU COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: KING RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ABBOTT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: COUNTY OF SCHUYLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: AMERICAN BIOSCIENCE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: FIRST DATABANK, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SHIRE PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: EMD, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: JACK DOUGLAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: EMD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MASSPIRG
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman
Represented By: Robert G. Eisler
Represented By: Nicole Y. Brumsted
Represented By: J. Douglas Richards
Represented By: Michael J. Flannery
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: David J. Bershad
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: BIOVAIL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Michael T. Mervis
Represented By: Edwin Baum
Represented By: Lloyd B. Chinn
Represented By: Elise M. Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM CORP.
Represented By: Seth A. Gastwirth
Represented By: Miriam L. Lieberman
Represented By: John W. Reale
Represented By: Bruce A. Singal
Represented By: Jared T. Heck
Represented By: Eric Gortner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: STATE OF TENNESSEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: TAP PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SERONO LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ROXANE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: AMERISOURCEBERGEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SERONO, INC.
Represented By: Fred A. Kelly Jr.
Represented By: Daniel J. Hurteau
Represented By: David M. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: EMPIRE BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ALL DEFENDANTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: KREMERS URBAN DEV. CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: BAXTER INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Michael S. D'Orsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SHIRE US INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: JOHN BENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SCHWARZPHARMA HOLDINGS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: JOHN V. DIGEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ABBOTT LABORATORIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ANDRX CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: JOAN S. LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: EDWARD WEST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: TARO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: C H BOEHRINGER SOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: OXFORD HEALTH PLANS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SEPRACOR INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: CHIRON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: IMMUNEX CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: RICE & THOMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: COUNTY OF LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MAINE CONSUMERS FOR AFFORDABLE HEALTH CARE
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman
Represented By: Edward Notargiacomo
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Represented By: J. Douglas Richards
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: RONALD E. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: BAXTER PHARMACEUTICAL.
Represented By: Ruchi Jan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: STATE OF IOWA
Represented By: William L. Brauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SANOFI-AVENTIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: JOHN DOES 1-200
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: FOREST LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: HEALTH ACTION OF NEW MEXICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: FALLON COMMUNITY HEALTH PLAN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: NOVAPHARM USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: BAYER, AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: COUNTY OF NASSAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: STATE OF ARIZONA
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: HEALTH NET, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: IVAX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: FAULDING PHARMACEUTICALS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: CONGRESS OF CALIFORNIA SENIORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ROXANE LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: Nina I. Webb-Lawton
Represented By: Darrell A.H. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ERIC GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: DEMRA JORDAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: EXCELLUS BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: PHARMA-INVESTMENT LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: HEATLH CARE SERVICE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: GLAXOSMITHKLINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS PRODUCTS, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ESSEX COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: PROCTOR & GAMBLE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ALPHA THERAPEUTICS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ETHEL WALTERS
Represented By: Donald E. Haviland Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MONSANTO COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MUTUAL OF OMAHA INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: AVENTIS S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: COUNTY OF ORLEANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: TYCO HEALTHCARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MERCK KGAA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: COUNTY OF WYOMING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: TAP HOLDINGS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ALLERGAN WORLDWIDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ONCOLOGY THERAPEUTICS NETWORK CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: HOESCHT MARION ROUSSEL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: COUNTY OF ERIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ETHEX CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: DEY L.P.
Represented By: Sung W. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: RHONE-POULENC, INC., Rhone-Poulenc Rorer, S.A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL, Teva Pharmaceutical USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MANAGED HEALTH CARE ASSOCIATES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SERONO INTERNATIONAL, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ROCKLAND COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: APOTEX, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SCHEIN PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Represented By: Stephen A. Ecenia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ALZA CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: PHARAMACEUTICAL IND, Pharamaceutical Industry Average Wholesale Price Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: STATE OF TX
Represented By: Greg Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ALCON LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: Thomas V. Hagerty
Represented By: J. Gordon Cooney
Represented By: Alicia M. Freind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: STATE OF IDAHO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MINNESOTA SENIOR FEDERATION
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman
Represented By: Robert G. Eisler
Represented By: Nicole Y. Brumsted
Represented By: J. Douglas Richards
Represented By: Michael J. Flannery
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: David J. Bershad
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: B.BRAUN OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: B. BRAUN MCGAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: AVENTIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: Andrea Schillaci
Represented By: Jonathan S. Hickey
Represented By: Alan Mansfield
Represented By: Michael L. Koon
Represented By: Joseph G. Matye
Represented By: Aaron Schepler
Represented By: Michael F. Perley
Represented By: Pamela M. Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: EISAI, INC.
Represented By: Lynn M. Blake
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Miller
Represented By: Elizabeth Abimbola Thomas
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Represented By: Mary Clay W. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: KIMBERLY K. HOOVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: COUNTY OF CHAUTAUQUA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: PLAINTIFFS' STEERING COMMITTEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: LIPHA, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: CITY OF NEW YORK AND CAPTIONED NEW YORK COUNTIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: HOWARD A. SMITHLINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: COUNTY OF ROCKLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: CONNECTICUT GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: BEDFORD LABORATORIES
Represented By: Douglas L. Rogers
Represented By: Randal C. Teague
Represented By: Paul J. Coval
Represented By: Darrell A.H. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: DOES 101-125
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: RELIANT PHARMACEAUTICALS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ETHICON, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MCNEIL-PPC, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: UNITED STATES
Represented By: George Bunsen Henderson II
Represented By: Mark A. Lavine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: BAYER PHARMACEUTICAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MCGAW, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: GRAY PANTHERS OF SACRAMENTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: COUNTY OF ULSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: DOES 126-150
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: AVENTIS BEHRING LLC
Represented By: Michael DeMarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, THE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ALLERGAN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: B. BRAUN MEDICAL INC.
Represented By: Karin B. Torgerson
Represented By: C. Glenn Morris
Represented By: John P. McDonald
Represented By: Robert P. Simbro
Represented By: C. Michael Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: HOECHST MARION ROUSSEL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SANOFI-SYNTHELABO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: BERLAX LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: WARRICK PHARMACEUTICALS CORPORATION
Represented By: Lynn M. Blake
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Bennett
Represented By: Daniel P. Christmas
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Miller
Represented By: David C. Potter
Represented By: John P. Bueker
Represented By: Carisa A. Klemeyer
Represented By: Thomas Neal Jamerson
Represented By: Palmer G. Vance
Represented By: Robert Gregg Mayer
Represented By: Sheila L. Birnbaum
Represented By: Angela Marie Covington
Represented By: Ryan Michael DiSantis
Represented By: Christopher Robert Dillon
Represented By: John T. Montgomery
Represented By: Bryan R. Diederich
Represented By: Janna J. Hansen
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Represented By: Dana George Toole
Represented By: James D. Houston
Represented By: John P. McDonald
Represented By: Jobe Galope Danganan
Represented By: Kim B. Nemirow
Represented By: John R. Therien
Represented By: Eric Paul Christofferson
Represented By: C. Michael Moore
Represented By: Richard L. Scheff
Represented By: Adam Wright
Represented By: Crystal D. Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SUFFOLK COUNTY (NY)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: CENTOCOR, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: PHARMA INVESTMENT LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: STATE OF VA
Represented By: Jerry Kilgore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ROBERTA S. STARKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ASTRAZENECA US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ORGANON PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: STATE OF CT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: COUNTY OF WESTCHESTER
Represented By: Roger W. Kirby
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Joanne M. Cicala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ROBERT J. SWANSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: COUNTY OF ONONDAGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: COUNTY OF DUTCHESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: NOVAPHARM LTD.
Represented By: Jay B. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ICN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ANDRX PHARMACEUTICAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ZACHARY T. BENTLEY
Represented By: Jonathan Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: CONNECTICUT CITIZEN ACTION GROUP
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman
Represented By: Edward Notargiacomo
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Represented By: J. Douglas Richards
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Joseph Danis
Represented By: David J. Bershad
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: RUDOLPH J. LIEDTKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman
Represented By: Robert G. Eisler
Represented By: Nicole Y. Brumsted
Represented By: J. Douglas Richards
Represented By: Michael J. Flannery
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: BAYER HEALTHCARE, LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: AGOURAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM ROXANE, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ROCHE LABS
Represented By: Simeon E. Schopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: EUGENIA K. GLESSNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: RJL SYSTEMS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: WEST VIRGINIA CITIZEN ACTION
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman
Represented By: Robert G. Eisler
Represented By: Nicole Y. Brumsted
Represented By: J. Douglas Richards
Represented By: Michael J. Flannery
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: David J. Bershad
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: COUNTY OF SENECA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS, LOCAL NO. 68 WELFARE FUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: PHARMACIA & UPJOHN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: DERMIK LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: VEN-A-CARE OF THE FLORIDA KEYS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: UDL LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: COUNTY OF CHENANGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: STATE OF HAWAII
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ONONDAGA COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: UNITED HEALTHCARE, UnitedHealthcare, Inc. & United HealthCare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, by Thomas W. Borbett, Jr. in his capacity as Attorney General of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Donald E. Haviland Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: OTSUKA AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: AETNA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: PHARMACIA CORPORATION
Represented By: Ezra Dodd Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: NEIGHBORHOOD HEALTH PLAN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: STATE OF NV
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: STATE OF MINNESOTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: HAWAII MEDICAL SERVICE ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: NOVARTIS AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: HENRY D. MCMASTER, in his official capacity as Attorney General for the State of South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MCNEIL CONSUMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MASSACHUSETTS SENIOR ACTION COUNCIL
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman
Represented By: Robert G. Eisler
Represented By: Nicole Y. Brumsted
Represented By: J. Douglas Richards
Represented By: Michael J. Flannery
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: David J. Bershad
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: UCB PHARMA
Represented By: Colleen M. Hennessey
Represented By: Vivian M. Quinn
Represented By: Andrew C. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: DOES 151-200, a
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SICOR, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: PENNSYLVANIA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman
Represented By: Robert G. Eisler
Represented By: Nicole Y. Brumsted
Represented By: J. Douglas Richards
Represented By: Michael J. Flannery
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: David J. Bershad
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: NORTH CAROLINA FAIR SHARE
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman
Represented By: Edward Notargiacomo
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Represented By: J. Douglas Richards
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Represented By: Joseph Danis
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: STANLEY C. HOPKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ASTELLAS PHARMA US, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: APOTHECON, INC.
Represented By: Lyndon M. Tretter
Represented By: Jacob Elberg
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Marconi
Represented By: Steven M. Edwards
Represented By: George Ian Brandon
Represented By: Patricia K. Lundvall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: PUREPAC PHARMACEUTICAL, CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: UNITED SENIOR ACTION OF INDIANA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: STATE OF NEW YORK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: PFIZER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: KING PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SUE MILES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MONARCH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: STATE OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: NOVARTIS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: COUNTY OF OSWEGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: BARR LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: HUMANA INSURANCE OF PUERTO RICO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ALPHARMA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: GENEVA PHARAMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ORGANON USA
Represented By: Dawn M. Berhony
Represented By: William P. Campos
Represented By: Barry Gerstman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ORTHO NEUTROGENA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ORTHO BIOTECH PRODUCTS, LP
Represented By: Erik Haas
Represented By: Lucy Fowler Glasson
Represented By: Mark Gregory Young
Represented By: Niraj J. Parekh