Commonwealth of Massachusetts v. US Department of Health
Amicus Curiae: EASTERN BANK, NATIONAL GRID USA, NATIONAL LEGAL FOUNDATION, OGILVY GROUP, INC, CBS INC., INTERNATIONAL PENTECOSTAL HOLINESS CHURCH, BRIAN BIX, HENRY WAXMAN, JAMES A. HIMES, GOULSTON & STORRS, P.C., JOHN F. TIERNEY, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION, LOCAL 509, CARLOS BALL, MASSACHUSETTS BIOTECHNOLOGY COUNCIL, INC., BRIAN HIGGINS, AGUDATH ISRAEL OF AMERICA, NIKE, INC., LESLIE HARRIS, MICHAEL F. DOYLE, JESSE L. JACKSON, JR., ESTELLE B. FREEDMAN, MARCIA L. FUDGE, MAXINE WATERS, ROBERT C. SCOTT, KATHARINE K. BAKER, JANA SINGER, JAY INSLEE, EQUAL JUSTICE SOCIETY, MCCARTER & ENGLISH LLP, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TELEVISION AND RADIO ARTISTS, NATIONAL ASIAN PACIFIC AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION, HENRY C. JOHNSON, JR., NEW ENGLAND CRYOGENIC CENTER, INC., NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, EARL BLUMENAUER, TIMOTHY RYAN, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS, ANNA ESHOO, JOE COURTNEY, FREEDOM TO MARRY, UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION, DORIS O. MATSUI, AMERICAN GUILD OF MUSICAL ARTISTS, SHERIF GIRGIS, CAROL SANGER, CHARLES P. KINDREGAN, III, PAUL TONKO, EMANUEL CLEAVER, NATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR MARRIAGE, CALVERT INVESTMENTS, INC., ZIPCAR, INC., CONSERVATIVE CONGREGATIONAL CHRISTIAN CONFERENCE, JOSE E. SERRANO, GAMMELGARDEN, LLC, EVANGELICAL PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, STATE OF INDIANA, MICHAEL E. CAPUANO, FRANK PALLONE, HINDU AMERICAN FOUNDATION, NYDIA VELAZQUEZ, MARTIN HEINRICH, INTEGRATED ARCHIVE SYSTEMS, INC., CONSTELLATION ENERGY COMMODITIES GROUP, INC., ROBERT P. GEORGE, KATHARINE SILBAUGH, WILLIAM LACY CLAY, CHANGE TO WIN, MICHAEL GROSSBERG, NIKI TSONGAS, NANCY PELOSI, HISPANIC NATIONAL BAR ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, ED PASTOR, DENNIS KUCINICH, AMERICAN PSYCHOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION, COMMUNISPACE CORPORATION, CHUBB CORPORATION, STEVE ISRAEL, MIKE QUIGLEY, ROSA DELAURO, NIXON PEABODY LLP, LEVI STRAUSS & CO., LOIS CAPPS, GOOGLE, INC., CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST OF LATTER-DAY SAINTS, EDWARD J. MARKEY, BOBBY RUSH, INTERNATIONAL UNION, UAW, JOHN A. YARMUTH, RETAILERS RETAILERS ASSOCIATION OF MASSACHUSETTS, UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY, RUBBER, MANUFACTURING, ENERGY, ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVICE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION, CALIFORNIA FAITH FOR EQUALITY, ABT ASSOCIATES, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MASSACHUSETTS, EDDIE JOHNSON, LAURA F. EDWARDS, CHRIS VAN HOLLEN, ANNE C. DAILEY, RYAN T. ANDERSON, DIAGEO PLC., UNION FOR REFORM JUDAISM, CAMBRIDGE, MA, RAUL GRIJALVA, ELAINE TYLER MAY, CENTRAL CONFERENCE OF AMERICAN RABBIS, XEROX CORP., STEPHANIE COONTZ, UNITARIAN UNIVERSALIST MINISTERS ASSOCIATION, CONCERNED WOMEN FOR AMERICA, NANCY DOWD, GOODWIN PROCTER LLP, LINDA T. SANCHEZ, BRAD MILLER, DANNY K. DAVIS, AMY DRU STANLEY, HUMAN RIGHTS CAMPAIGN, CHRISTOPHER S. MURPHY, ELEANOR NORTON, CALIFORNIA COUNCIL OF CHURCHES, NITA LOWEY, FAMILY RESEARCH COUNCIL, M STRASSER, MELANIE JACOBS, HADASSAH, THE WOMEN'S ZIONIST ORGANIZATION OF AMERICA, LOUISE SLAUGHTER, EQUALITY FEDERATION, SALERA CONSULTING, CAROLE SHAMMAS, EAGLE FORUM EDUCATION & LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, TIMOTHY J. WALZ, NOA BEN-ASHER, XAVIER BECERRA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SOCIAL WORKERS AND ITS MASSACHUSETTS CHAPTER, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES, MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATIONAL FUND, W/S DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATES LLC, GRACE GANZ BLUMBERG, KAREN BASS, CYNTHIA GRANT BOWMAN, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, BOSTON BAR ASSOCIATION, LUCILLE ROYBALL-ALLARD, ROPES & GRAY LLP, LORETTA SANCHEZ, UNION OF ORTHODOX JEWISH CONGREGATIONS OF AMERICA, TRANSPORT WORKERS TRANSPORT WORKERS UNION OF AMERICA, JEWISH ALLIANCE FOR LAW AND SOCIAL ACTION, NANCY F. COTT, MARTHA L. MINOW, ANN LAQUER ESTIN, JUDY CHU, KATHY HOCHUL, TIME WARNER, INC., NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF LETTER CARRIERS, PR BAR ASSOCIATION PUERTO RICAN BAR ASSOCIATION, ZOE LOFGREN, NATIONAL GAY AND LESBIAN TASK FORCE FOUNDATION, YVETTE D. CLARKE, STATE OF COLORADO, MA CATHOLIC CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY, STATE OF MICHIGAN, LORING, WOLCOTT & COOLIDGE TRUST, LLC, CAROLYN MALONEY, HERMA HILL KAY, ANDOVER NEWTON THEOLOGICAL SCHOOL, JAMES P. MCGOVERN, LAURA A. ROSENBURY, KAREN CZAPANSKIY, LAURA RICHARDSON, ARIELA R. DUBLER, GARY C. PETERS, DEBBIE WASSERMAN SCHULTZ, RICHARD NEAL, MASSACHUSETTS ENVELOPE COMPANY, INC., CHARLES GONZALEZ, SCREEN ACTORS GUILD, ELIZABETH H. PLECK, DOUGLAS NEJAIME, BARBARA YOUNG WELKE, MAURICE D. HINCHEY, NAOMI CAHN, SUSAN DAVIS, LAWYERS COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS, SANDER LEVIN, MASSACHUSETTS LGBTQ BAR ASSOCIATION, GRACE NAPOLITANO, UNITARIAN THE UNITARIAN UNIVERSALIST ASSOCIATION, EVANGELICAL FREE CHURCH OF AMERICA, GEORGE CHAUNCEY, BURNS & LEVINSON, LLP, AMERICAN PSYCHIATRIC ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, GARY ACKERMAN, NEW BALANCE ATHLETIC SHOE INC., BARNEY FRANK, ANDREW KOPPELMAN, MASSACHUSETTS BAR ASSOCIATION, LLOYD DOGGETT, GENERAL SYNOD OF THE UNITED CHURCH OF CHRIST, KRISTINE S. KNAPLUND, PARTHENON GROUP LLC, JOHN CULHANE, MA CONFERENCE OF THE UNITED CHURCH OF CHRIST, JOHN P. SARBANES, JERROLD NADLER, ALERE INC., NATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR WOMEN FOUNDATION, ANDRE CARSON, BARBARA BENNETT WOODHOUSE, DAVID N. CICILLINE, SULLIVAN & WORCESTER, JOHN LEWIS, INTERFAITH ALLIANCE FOUNDATION, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PEDIATRICIANS, ALICE KESSLER-HARRIS, MARY L. SHANLEY, LEGAL MOMENTUM, JOHN LARSON, STEVEN ROTHMAN, UNITED TRANSPORTATION UNION, ROBERT A. BRADY, EXELON CORP., CHARLES RANGEL, MASSACHUSETTS MUTUAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, JACKIE SPEIER, PETER W. BARDAGLIO, FORTNEY STARK, MARION CRAIN, EDWARDS WILDMAN PALMER LLP, NATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER, JOHN GARAMENDI, JUNE CARBONE, NATIONAL EDUCATION ASSOCIATION, MIKE THOMPSON, WESLEYAN CHURCH, BRUCE L. BRALEY, HANSEN CLARKE, AKAMAI TECHNOLOGIES, INC., MISSIONARY CHURCH, STEVEN MINTZ, HENDRIK HARTOG, SEYFARTH SHAW LLP, JERRY MCNERNEY, GWEN MOORE, JIM MCDERMOTT, GEORGE MILLER, BRETHREN IN CHRIST CHURCH, NATIONAL LGBT BAR ASSOCIATION, JOHN OLVER, CAROLYN MCCARTHY, ASIAN AMERICAN INSTITUTE, BETTY MCCOLLUM, SHELLEY BERKLEY, MICHAEL S. WALD, BARBARA LEE, JOANNA L. GROSSMAN, SAM FARR, LAMBDA LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, INC., KEITH ELLISON, ONYX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., UNITED BRETHREN IN CHRIST CHURCH, MAYA MANIAN, MARTHA HODES, WOMEN'S BAR ASSOCATION OF MASSACHUSETTS, WOMEN OF REFORM JUDAISM, PETER WELCH, SUN LIFE FINANCIAL, INC., AMERICAN FEDERATION OF MUSICIANS OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA, KERMIT ROOSEVELT, ADAM SCHIFF, REPRODUCTIVE SCIENCE CENTER OF NEW ENGLAND, BOSTON FOUNDATION, SUSAN APPLETON, BARBARA COX, LIBERTY COUNSEL, BOSTON MEDICAL CENTER, JARED POLIS, AETNA, INC., DONALD PAYNE, DAVID PRICE, STEVE COHEN, MICHAEL HONDA, JENNIFER B. WRIGGINS, PACIFIC JUSTICE INSTITUTE, MAXINE EICHNER, ASSOCIATION OF FLIGHT ATTENDANTS, SOCIETY FOR HUMANISTIC JUDAISM, PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY FOUNDATION, ADAM SMITH, LUIS GUTIERREZ, COURTNEY JOSLIN, NATIONAL CENTER FOR LESBIAN RIGHTS, TRILLIUM ASSET MANAGEMENT CORP., CHAKA FATTAH, JEWISH SOCIAL POLICY ACTION NETWORK, NORMA BASCH, JEWISH RECONSTRUCTIONIST FEDERATION, FITCORP HEALTHCARE CENTERS, INC., ASIAN AMERICAN JUSTICE CENTER, SHELLEY SAXER, FOUNDATION FOR MORAL LAW, STENY HOYER, IRA MARK ELLMAN, BRAD SHERMAN, ANTI-DEFAMATION LEAGUE, JAMES MORAN, LYNN C. WOOLSEY, JOSEPH CROWLEY, GREGORY MEEKS, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF EVANGELICALS, ROBERT E. ANDREWS, SKYWORKS SOLUTIONS, INC., MASSACHUSETTS FINANCIAL SERVICES COMPANY, JANICE HAHN, INTERNATIONAL CHURCH OF THE FOURSQUARE GOSPEL, ASIAN PACIFIC AMERICAN LEGAL CENTER, GREATER BOSTON CHAMBER OF COMMERCE, THEODORE E. DEUTCH, DONNA F. EDWARDS, JAPANESE AMERICAN CITIZENS LEAGUE, WILLIAM KEATING, BANK OF NEW YORK, LINDA MCCLAIN, TIMOTHY BISHOP, ZANITA E. FENTON, JENNIER A. DROBAC, MA FAMILY INSTITUTE, LUTHERAN CHURCH-MISSOURI SYNOD, KIMPTON HOTEL & RESTAURANT GROUP, LLC, ELIOT ENGEL, STONYFIELD FARM, INC., STATE OF UT, WILLIAM L. OWENS, BOSTON COMMUNITY CAPITAL, INC., CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON, DIANA DEGETTE, JOHN CONYERS, BOB FILNER, MASSACHUSETTS PSYCHOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION, MAZIE K. HIRONO, BOSTON, MA, OPEN BIBLE CHURCHES [USA], JANICE SCHAKOWSKY, SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER, ELLEN HERMAN, HUMAN RIGHTS CAMPAIGN FOUNDATION, HOWARD L. BERMAN, JOAN HEIFETZ HOLLINGER, SARAH BARRINGER GORDON, ALCEE HASTINGS, COMMUNICATIONS WORKERS OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE RESEARCH AND THERAPY OF HOMOSEXUALITY, LISA IKEMOTO, BIOGEN INC., GEORGE I. GOVERMAN, PARTNERS HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., LINDA K. KERBER, OUT & EQUAL WORKPLACE ADVOCATES, ETHICS AND RELIGIOUS LIBERTY COMMISSION OF THE SOUTHERN BAPTIST CONVENTION and TOBY L. DITZ
Defendant / Appellant: UNITED STATES (DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS), KATHLEEN SEBELIUS, in her official capacity as the Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services, THOMAS E. PRICE, ERIC K. SHINSEKI, in his official capacity as the Secretary of the United States Department of Veterans Affairs and UNITED STATES
Plaintiff / Appellee: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS
Intervenor: BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Case Number: 10-2204
Filed: October 20, 2010
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2013 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Christopher F. Stoll for Amicus Curiae National Center for Lesbian Rights in 10-2204. Copy of 7/1/13 Judgment and Mandate. Forwarding address unknown. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 10/21/2013 11:35 AM]
July 1, 2013 MANDATE issued. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 07/01/2013 02:09 PM]
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge granting motion to expedite issuance of mandate filed by Appellee Commonwealth of Massachusetts. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 07/01/2013 02:07 PM]
July 1, 2013 RESPONSE filed by Intervenor Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives in 10-2204, Movant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives in 10-2207, 10-2214 to motion to expedite [ # 5744469-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 07/01/2013. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (PDC) [Entered: 07/01/2013 12:28 PM]
July 1, 2013 RESPONSE filed by Appellants Kathleen Sebelius, Eric K. Shinseki, US Department of Health & Human Services, US Dept of Veterans Affairs and US in 10-2204, Appellants/Cross-Appellees Michael J. Astrue, Patrick R. Donahoe, Eric H. Holder, Jr., US Office of Personnel Management, US and United States Postal Service in 10-2207, 10-2214 to motion to expedite [ # 5744469-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 07/01/2013. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (MJS) [Entered: 07/01/2013 10:45 AM]
June 27, 2013 U.S. SUPREME COURT ORDER entered on 06/27/2013. The petition for a writ of certiorari was denied. [10-2207, 10-2204, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 06/27/2013 03:05 PM]
June 27, 2013 U.S. SUPREME COURT ORDER entered on 06/27/2013. The petition for a writ of certiorari was denied. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 06/27/2013 03:00 PM]
June 27, 2013 U.S. SUPREME COURT ORDER entered on 06/27/2013. The petition for a writ of certiorari was denied. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 06/27/2013 02:58 PM]
June 27, 2013 MOTION to expedite issuance of the mandate filed by Appellee Commonwealth of Massachusetts in 10-2204. Certificate of service dated 06/27/2013. [10-2214, 10-2204, 10-2207] (MTH) [Entered: 06/27/2013 01:48 PM]
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to withdraw Attorney Conor B. Dugan as counsel filed by Intervenor Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 03/05/2013 03:26 PM]
February 28, 2013 MOTION for Attorney Conor B. Dugan to withdraw as counsel filed by Intervenor Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives in 10-2204. Certificate of service dated 02/28/2013. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (HCB) [Entered: 02/28/2013 09:49 AM]
July 30, 2012 U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE advising a petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on 07/20/2012 and assigned case number 12-97. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 07/30/2012 09:55 AM]
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Michael Boudin, Appellate Judge granting motion to withdraw as counsel filed by attorney Brian Boyle for Appellee Commonwealth of Massachusetts. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 07/25/2012 12:36 PM]
July 24, 2012 MOTION for Attorney Brian Boyle to withdraw as counsel filed by Appellee Commonwealth of Massachusetts in 10-2204. Certificate of service dated 07/24/2012. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (FHE) [Entered: 07/24/2012 10:24 AM]
July 6, 2012 U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE advising a petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on 07/03/2012 and assigned case number 12-15. [10-2204] (GAK) [Entered: 07/06/2012 09:19 AM]
June 7, 2012 ERRATA to opinion (published) [ # 5645268-2 ] filed . [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (SBT) [Entered: 06/07/2012 08:07 AM]
May 31, 2012 JUDGMENT entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge; Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge and Michael Boudin, Appellate Judge. Affirmed. The mandate is stayed, maintaining the district court's stay of its injunctive judgment, pending further order of this court. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (GAK) [Entered: 05/31/2012 10:05 AM]
May 31, 2012 OPINION issued by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge; Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge and Michael Boudin, Appellate Judge. Published. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]. (GAK) [Entered: 05/31/2012 09:59 AM]
May 25, 2012 CITATION of supplemental authorities pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) filed by Appellees Melba Abreu, Dorene Bowe-Shulman, Mary Bowe-Shulman, Herbert Burtis, Kathleen Bush, James Fitzgerald, Nancy Gill, Bette Jo Green, Beatrice Hernandez, Jonathan Knight, Martin Koski, Marcelle Letourneau, Randell Lewis-Kendell, Marlin Nabors, Mary Ritchie, Jo Ann Whitehead and Appellee/Cross-Appellant Dean Hara in 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 05/25/2012. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (MLB) [Entered: 05/25/2012 04:52 PM]
April 4, 2012 CASE argued. Panel: Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge; Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge and Michael Boudin, Appellate Judge. Arguing attorneys: Maura T. Healey for Commonwealth of Massachusetts and Paul D Clement for Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives in 10-2204, Mary Lisa Bonauto for Nancy Gill, Marcelle Letourneau, Martin Koski, James Fitzgerald, Mary Ritchie, Kathleen Bush, Melba Abreu, Beatrice Hernandez, Jo Ann Whitehead, Bette Jo Green, Randell Lewis-Kendell, Herbert Burtis, Marlin Nabors, Jonathan Knight, Dorene Bowe-Shulman, Mary Bowe-Shulman, Dean Hara and Keith Toney and Albert Toney, III and Mary Lisa Bonauto for Dean Hara and Keith Toney and Albert Toney, III in 10-2207, Stuart F. Delery for US, United States Postal Service, Michael J. Astrue, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Office of Personnel Management and Patrick R. Donahoe in 10-2214. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (LM) [Entered: 04/04/2012 04:05 PM]
March 26, 2012 NOTICE of appearance filed by Attorney Stuart F. Delery for Appellants US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs, Kathleen Sebelius and Eric K. Shinseki in 10-2204, Attorney Stuart F. Delery for Appellants/Cross-Appellees US, United States Postal Service, Michael J. Astrue, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Office of Personnel Management and Patrick R. Donahoe in 10-2207, 10-2214. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (LM) [Entered: 03/28/2012 11:01 AM]
March 26, 2012 DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Stuart F. Delery for Appellants US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs, Kathleen Sebelius and Eric K. Shinseki in 10-2204, Attorney Stuart F. Delery for Appellants/Cross-Appellees US, United States Postal Service, Michael J. Astrue, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Office of Personnel Management and Patrick R. Donahoe in 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 03/26/2012. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (SFD) [Entered: 03/26/2012 02:17 PM]
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion for leave to file notice of appearance filed by Appellants/Cross-Appellees US, United States Postal Service, Michael J. Astrue, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Office of Personnel Management and Patrick R. Donahoe in 10-2207. [10-2207, 10-2204, 10-2214] (LM) [Entered: 03/26/2012 11:45 AM]
March 26, 2012 MOTION requesting leave for Attorney Stuart F. Delery to enter an appearance filed by Appellants Kathleen Sebelius, Eric K. Shinseki, US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs and US in 10-2204, Appellants/Cross-Appellees Michael J. Astrue, Patrick R. Donahoe, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Office of Personnel Management, US and United States Postal Service in 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 03/26/2012. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (SFD) [Entered: 03/26/2012 10:55 AM]
March 13, 2012 DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Benjamin Seth Kingsley for Appellants US, US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs, Kathleen Sebelius and Eric K. Shinseki in 10-2204, Attorney Benjamin Seth Kingsley for Appellants/Cross-Appellees US, United States Postal Service, Michael J. Astrue, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Office of Personnel Management and Patrick R. Donahoe in 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 03/13/2012. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (BSK) [Entered: 03/13/2012 05:17 PM]
March 13, 2012 DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Maura T. Healey for Appellee Commonwealth of Massachusetts in 10-2204. Certificate of service dated 03/13/2012. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (MTH) [Entered: 03/13/2012 01:59 PM]
March 8, 2012 DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Mary Lisa Bonauto for Appellee/Cross-Appellant Dean Hara and Not Parties Keith Toney and Albert Toney, III in 10-2207. Certificate of service dated 03/08/2012. [10-2207, 10-2204, 10-2214] (MLB) [Entered: 03/08/2012 12:37 PM]
March 7, 2012 RESPONSE to citation of supplemental authorities pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) [ # 5623029-2 ] filed by Intervenor Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives in 10-2204, Movant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives in 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2012. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (PDC) [Entered: 03/07/2012 06:41 PM]
March 7, 2012 DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Paul D. Clement for Intervenor Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives in 10-2204, Attorney Paul D. Clement for Movant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives in 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2012. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (PDC) [Entered: 03/07/2012 06:26 PM]
March 2, 2012 CITATION of supplemental authorities pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) filed by Appellees Melba Abreu, Dorene Bowe-Shulman, Mary Bowe-Shulman, Herbert Burtis, Kathleen Bush, James Fitzgerald, Nancy Gill, Bette Jo Green, Beatrice Hernandez, Jonathan Knight, Martin Koski, Marcelle Letourneau, Randell Lewis-Kendell, Marlin Nabors, Mary Ritchie, Jo Ann Whitehead and Appellee/Cross-Appellant Dean Hara in 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 03/02/2012. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GDB) [Entered: 03/02/2012 03:03 PM]
February 28, 2012 CASE calendared: Wednesday, 04/04/2012 Boston, MA En Banc Courtroom. Designation form due 03/13/2012. [10-2207, 10-2204, 10-2214] (LM) [Entered: 02/28/2012 09:20 AM]
February 22, 2012 CITATION of supplemental authorities pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) filed by Intervenor Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives in 10-2204. Certificate of service dated 02/22/2012. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (PDC) [Entered: 02/22/2012 06:00 PM]
February 10, 2012 CITATION of supplemental authorities pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) filed by Appellees Melba Abreu, Dorene Bowe-Shulman, Mary Bowe-Shulman, Herbert Burtis, Kathleen Bush, James Fitzgerald, Nancy Gill, Bette Jo Green, Beatrice Hernandez, Jonathan Knight, Martin Koski, Marcelle Letourneau, Randell Lewis-Kendell, Marlin Nabors, Mary Ritchie, Jo Ann Whitehead and Appellee/Cross-Appellant Dean Hara in 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 02/10/2012. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (MLB) [Entered: 02/10/2012 09:47 AM]
February 9, 2012 CITATION of supplemental authorities pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) filed by Appellees Melba Abreu, Dorene Bowe-Shulman, Mary Bowe-Shulman, Herbert Burtis, Kathleen Bush, James Fitzgerald, Nancy Gill, Bette Jo Green, Beatrice Hernandez, Jonathan Knight, Martin Koski, Marcelle Letourneau, Randell Lewis-Kendell, Marlin Nabors, Mary Ritchie, Jo Ann Whitehead and Appellee/Cross-Appellant Dean Hara in 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 02/09/2012. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 02/10/2012 by GK] CLERK'S NOTE: The signature on the document does not match the name of the ECF filer under whose login and password the document was filed. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS (2/14/2012). (GDB) [Entered: 02/09/2012 06:06 PM]
January 6, 2012 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 5604545-2 ] submitted by Amicus Curiae American Civil Liberties Union in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 01/06/2012 08:45 AM]
January 3, 2012 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 5606709-2 ] submitted by Amici Curiae Andover Newton Theological School, Anti-Defamation League, California Council of Churches, California Faith for Equality, Central Conference of American Rabbis, General Synod of the United Church of Christ, Hadassah, the Women's Zionist Organization of America, Interfaith Alliance Foundation, Japanese American Citizens League, Japanese American Citizens League, Jewish Allicance Jewish Alliance for Law and Social Action, Jewish Reconstructionist Federation, MA Conference of the United Church of Christ, National Council for National Council of Jewish Women, People for the Am People for the American Way Foundation, Society for Humanistic Judaism, Union for Reform Judaism, Unitarian The Unitarian Universalist Association, Unitarian Universalist Legislative Ministry California, Unitarian Universalist Ministers Association, Universal Fellowship of Metropolitan Community Churches and Women of Reform Judaism in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 01/03/2012 01:37 PM]
January 3, 2012 SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX filed by Amici Curiae (70 Business, Professional & Municipal Employers, and Professional, Trade & Civic Organizations) ABT Associates, Aetna, Inc., Akamai Technologies, Inc., Alere Inc., Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Biogen Idec Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Boston Community Capital, Inc., Boston Foundation, Boston Medical Center, Bright Horizons Childrens Centers LLC, Burns & Levinson, LLP, CBS, Calvert Investments, Inc., Cambridge, MA, Chubb Corporation, City of Boston, Communispace Corporation, Constellation Energy Commodities Group, Inc., Diageo Plc., Eastern Bank, Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP, Exelon Corp., FitCorp Healthcare Centers, Inc., Foley Hoag LLP, Gammelgarden, LLC, Goodwin Procter LLP, Google, Inc., Goulston & Storrs, P.C., Greater Boston Chamber of Commerce, Integrated Archive Systems, Inc., Kimpton Hotel & Restaurant Group, LLC, Levi Strauss & Co., Loring, Wolcott & Coolidge Trust, LLC, Massachusetts Association of Health Plans, Massachusetts Envelope Company, Inc., Massachusetts Financial Services Company, Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company, McCarter & English LLP, Microsoft Corporation, National Fire Protection Association, National Grid USA, Nationwide Mutual In Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, New Balance Athletic Shoe Inc., New England Cryogenic Center, Inc., New York, NY, Nike, Inc., Nixon Peabody LLP, Ogilvy Group, Inc, Onyx Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Out & Equal Workplace Advocates, Parthenon Group LLC, Partners Healthcare System, Inc., Reproductive Science Center of New England, Retailers Retailers Association of Massachusetts, Ropes & Gray LLP, Salera Consulting, Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Skyworks Solutions, Inc., Starbucks Corporation, State Street Bank and Trust Company, Stonyfield Farm, Inc., Sullivan & Worcester, Sun Life Financial, Inc., Time Warner, Inc., Trillium Asset Management Corp., W/S Development Associates LLC, Xerox Corp. and Zipcar, Inc. in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Number of volumes: 1. Number of copies: 6. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 01/03/2012 10:46 AM]
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting partially assented-to motion for leave to file a supplemental appendix filed by Amici Curiae (70 Business, Professional & Municipal Employers, and Professional, Trade & Civic Organizations) Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Starbucks Corporation, New Balance Athletic Shoe Inc., Google, Inc., Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company, Aetna, Inc., Burns & Levinson, LLP, Cambridge, MA, Retailers Retailers Association of Massachusetts, New York, NY, State Street Bank and Trust Company, Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Biogen Idec Inc., Ropes & Gray LLP, Sullivan & Worcester, Partners Healthcare System, Inc., Nike, Inc., Eastern Bank, National Grid USA, Constellation Energy Commodities Group, Inc., Massachusetts Financial Services Company, Microsoft Corporation, Diageo Plc., CBS, Foley Hoag LLP, Time Warner, Inc., Boston Medical Center, Sun Life Financial, Inc., City of Boston, Xerox Corp., Chubb Corporation, ABT Associates, Akamai Technologies, Inc., Alere Inc., Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Boston Community Capital, Inc., Bright Horizons Childrens Centers LLC, Calvert Investments, Inc., Communispace Corporation, FitCorp Healthcare Centers, Inc., Gammelgarden, LLC, Integrated Archive Systems, Inc., Kimpton Hotel & Restaurant Group, LLC, Levi Strauss & Co., Loring, Wolcott & Coolidge Trust, LLC, Massachusetts Envelope Company, Inc., New England Cryogenic Center, Inc., Ogilvy Group, Inc, Onyx Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Reproductive Science Center of New England, Skyworks Solutions, Inc., Stonyfield Farm, Inc., Trillium Asset Management Corp., W/S Development Associates LLC, Zipcar, Inc., Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP, Goodwin Procter LLP, Goulston & Storrs, P.C., McCarter & English LLP, Nixon Peabody LLP, Parthenon Group LLC, Salera Consulting, Greater Boston Chamber of Commerce, Boston Foundation, Massachusetts Association of Health Plans, Massachusetts Biotechnology Council, Inc., National Fire Protection Association and Out & Equal Workplace Advocates. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 01/03/2012 10:28 AM]
December 30, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Andover Newton Theological School, Anti-Defamation League, California Council of Churches, California Faith for Equality, Central Conference of American Rabbis, General Synod of the United Church of Christ, Hadassah, the Women's Zionist Organization of America, Hindu American Foundation, Interfaith Alliance Foundation, Japanese American Citizens League, Jewish Alliance for Law and Social Action, Jewish Reconstructionist Federation, MA Conference of the United Church of Christ, National Council for National Council of Jewish Women, People for the Am People for the American Way Foundation, Society for Humanistic Judaism, Union for Reform Judaism, Unitarian The Unitarian Universalist Association, Unitarian Universalist Legislative Ministry California, Unitarian Universalist Ministers Association, Universal Fellowship of Metropolitan Community Churches and Women of Reform Judaism in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214 in support of Appellees for affirmance. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 01/06/2012. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 12/30/2011 02:49 PM]
December 30, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion for leave to file oversized amicus curiae brief filed by Anti-Defamation League, et al.. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 12/30/2011 02:40 PM]
December 20, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 5603311-2 ] submitted by. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 12/20/2011 01:38 PM]
December 20, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Asian American Institute, Asian American Justice Center, Boston Bar Association, Equal Justice Society, Equality Federation, Freedom to Marry, Hispanic National Bar Association, Human Rights Campaign, Human Rights Campaign Foundation, Japanese American Citizens League, Jewish Alliance for Law and Social Action, Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Lawyers Committe for Civil Rights, Legal Momentum, Massachusetts Bar Association, Massachusetts LGBTQ Bar Association, Mexican American Legal Defense and Educational Fund, National Asian Pacific American Bar Association, National Black Justice Coalition, National Center for Lesbian Rights, National Gay and Lesbian Task Force Foundation, National LGBT Bar Association, National Organization for Women Foundation, National Womens Law Center, Out & Equal Workplace Advocates, PR Bar Association Puerto Rican Bar Association, Southern Poverty Law Center, Womens Bar Association of Massachusetts and Movants Japanese American Citizens League and Out & Equal Workplace Advocates in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214 in support of Appellees for affirmance. Certificate of service dated 11/14/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 12/27/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 12/20/2011 12:50 PM]
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER granting American Civil Liberties Union LGBT Project, et al.'s motion for leave to file an oversized amicus brief in support of plaintiffs-appellees. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 12/20/2011 12:38 PM]
December 19, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of reply brief [ # 5603969-2 ] submitted by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Dean Hara in 10-2214, 10-2207. [10-2214, 10-2204, 10-2207] (RL) [Entered: 12/19/2011 12:35 PM]
December 19, 2011 REPLY BRIEF filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Dean Hara in 10-2214, 10-2207. Certificate of service dated 12/16/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 12/27/2011. [10-2214, 10-2204, 10-2207] (RL) [Entered: 12/19/2011 09:08 AM]
December 16, 2011 BRIEF tendered by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Dean Hara in 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 12/16/2011. [10-2214, 10-2204, 10-2207] (GDB) [Entered: 12/16/2011 03:35 PM]
December 15, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Jewish Social Policy Action Network in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214 in support of Appellee for affirmance. Certificate of service dated 11/09/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 12/22/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 12/15/2011 10:20 AM]
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief filed by Jewish Social Policy Action Network. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 12/15/2011 10:13 AM]
December 12, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of reply brief [ # 5600357-2 ] submitted by Intervenor Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives in 10-2204, Movant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives in 10-2207, 10-2214. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 12/12/2011 11:54 AM]
December 8, 2011 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by 19 Major National and International Labor Organizations. Certificate of service dated 12/08/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (JLL) [Entered: 12/08/2011 03:36 PM]
December 7, 2011 NOTICE Corporate Disclosure filed by Amicus Curiae Pacific Justice Institute in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 12/07/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (KTS) [Entered: 12/07/2011 04:00 PM]
December 7, 2011 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Amici Curiae American Academy of Pediatrics, American Medical Association, American Psychiatric Association and American Psychological Association in 10-2204, Amici Curiae Massachusetts Psychological Association and National Association of Social Workers and its Massachusetts Chapter in 10-2207. Certificate of service dated 12/07/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (WFS) [Entered: 12/07/2011 12:25 PM]
December 7, 2011 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Amicus Curiae Salera Consulting in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 12/07/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (PSW) [Entered: 12/07/2011 11:34 AM]
December 6, 2011 CROSS-APPEAL briefing schedule updated. Reply Brief due 12/19/2011 for Appellee/Cross - Appellant Dean Hara. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 12/06/2011 02:04 PM]
December 6, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of reply brief [ # 5599894-2 ] submitted by Appellants Kathleen Sebelius, Eric K. Shinseki, US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs and US in 10-2204, Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-2207, 10-2214. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 12/06/2011 11:40 AM]
December 5, 2011 REPLY BRIEF filed by Intervenor Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives in 10-2204, Movant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives in 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 12/01/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 12/12/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 12/05/2011 10:51 AM]
December 2, 2011 BRIEF tendered by Movant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives in 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 12/01/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (PDC) [Entered: 12/02/2011 09:47 AM]
December 1, 2011 BRIEF tendered by Intervenor Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives in 10-2204. Certificate of service dated 12/01/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (PDC) [Entered: 12/01/2011 07:32 PM]
December 1, 2011 REPLY BRIEF filed by Appellants. Certificate of service dated 12/01/2011. Reply brief due 12/19/2011 for appellee. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 12/08/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 12/01/2011 04:44 PM]
December 1, 2011 BRIEF tendered by Appellants Kathleen Sebelius, Eric K. Shinseki, US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs and US in 10-2204, Appellants/Cross-Appellees Michael J. Astrue, Patrick R. Donahoe, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Office of Personnel Management, US and United States Postal Service in 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 12/01/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (BSK) [Entered: 12/01/2011 04:03 PM]
November 22, 2011 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Clinton J. Miller for Amicus Curiae United Transportation Union, in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Copy of 11/8/11 Orders. Forwarded to United Transportation Union, 24950 Country Club Blvd, Suite 340, N Olmstead, OH 44070-5333. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 11/22/2011 12:06 PM]
November 17, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 5596179-2 ] submitted by Amici Curiae Peter W. Bardaglio, Norma Basch, George Chauncey, Stephanie Coontz, Nancy F. Cott, Toby L. Ditz, Ariela R. Dubler, Laura F. Edwards, Estelle B. Freedman, Sarah Barringer Gordon, Michael Grossberg, Hendrik Hartog, Ellen Herman, Martha Hodes, Linda K. Kerber, Alice Kessler-Harris, Elaine Tyler May, Steven Mintz, Elizabeth H. Pleck, Carole Shammas, Mary L. Shanley, Amy Dru Stanley and Barbara Young Welke in 10-2204. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 11/17/2011 10:54 AM]
November 16, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by (Historians) Peter W. Bardaglio, Norma Basch, George Chauncey, Stephanie Coontz, Nancy F. Cott, Toby L. Ditz, Ariela R. Dubler, Laura F. Edwards, Estelle B. Freedman, Sarah Barringer Gordon, Michael Grossberg, Hendrik Hartog, Ellen Herman, Martha Hodes, Linda K. Kerber, Alice Kessler-Harris, Elaine Tyler May, Steven Mintz, Elizabeth H. Pleck, Carole Shammas, Mary L. Shanley, Amy Dru Stanley and Barbara Young Welke in support of affirmance in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 11/23/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 11/16/2011 12:33 PM]
November 15, 2011 TEN (10) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 5595755-2 ] submitted by Amici Curiae (Nineteen Major National and International Labor Organizations) American Federation of Government Employees AFL-CIO, American Federation of Musicians of the United States and Canada, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, American Federation of Teachers, American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, American Guild of Musical Artists, Association of Flight Attendants, Change To Win, Communications Workers of America, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, International Union, UAW, National Association of Letter Carriers, National Education Association, Screen Actors Guild, Service Employees International Union, Transport Workers Transport Workers Union of America, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union and United Transportatio United Transportation Union, in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 11/15/2011 03:25 PM]
November 15, 2011 NOTICE of appearance filed by Attorney Michael Branch Kimberly for Amici Curiae (133 Members of the U.S. House of Representatives) Joseph Crowley, Edward J. Markey, Jerrold Nadler, Rush Holt, Bob Filner, David Price, Bobby Rush, James P. McGovern, Alcee Hastings, Maxine Waters, Earl Blumenauer, Nita Lowey, John Conyers, Adam Smith, Michael Honda, Charles Rangel, Susan Davis, Chaka Fattah, Rosa Delauro, Richard Neal, John Lewis, Frank Pallone, Xavier Becerra, Steny Hoyer, Carolyn McCarthy, James Moran, Loretta Sanchez, Steven Rothman, Maurice D. Hinchey, Barney Frank, Eleanor Norton, Diana Degette, Adam Schiff, Sam Farr, Robert E. Andrews, Charles Gonzalez, Mike Thompson, Tammy Baldwin, Edolphus Towns, Brad Miller, Jay Inslee, William Keating, Gary Ackerman, Raul Grijalva, Henry Waxman, Donald Payne, Ed Pastor, Michael Capuano, Anna Eshoo, Timothy Bishop, Brad Sherman, Betty McCollum, Gregory Meeks, Barbara Lee, Janice Schakowsky, Fortney Stark, Lynn C. Woolsey, Grace Napolitano, Zoe Lofgren, Lloyd Doggett, Eddie Johnson, Nancy Pelosi, Lucille Royball-Allard, Nydia Velazquez, Luis Gutierrez, Carolyn Maloney, John Olver, Danny K. Davis, Louise Slaughter, Lois Capps, Jim McDermott, David N. Cicilline, Timothy Ryan, John Larson, James Clyburn, Dennis Kucinich, Steve Israel, Sander Levin, John F. Tierney, Jose E. Serrano, Eliot Engel, Niki Tsongas, Jared Polis, Janice Hahn, Colleen W. Hanabusa, William L. Owens, Karen Bass, Martin Heinrich, Shelley Berkley, Brian Higgins, Howard L. Berman, James A. Himes, Gary C. Peters, Chellie Pingree, Mazie K. Hirono, Robert A. Brady, Kathy Hochul, Mike Quigley, Bruce L. Braley, Laura Richardson, Andre Carson, Judy Chu, Jesse L. Jackson, Jr., Hansen Clarke, Yvette D. Clarke, Linda T. Sanchez, William Lacy Clay, Henry C. Johnson, Jr., Emanuel Cleaver, John P. Sarbanes, Steve Cohen, Gerald E. Connolly, Joe Courtney, Robert C. Scott, Jackie Speier, Theodore E. Deutch, Doris O. Matsui, Michael F. Doyle, Donna F. Edwards, Paul Tonko, Keith Ellison, Jerry McNerney, Chris Van Hollen, Timothy J. Walz, George Miller, Debbie Wasserman Schultz, Marcia L. Fudge, Gwen Moore, John Garamendi, Christopher S. Murphy, Peter Welch and John A. Yarmuth in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 11/15/2011 02:41 PM]
November 15, 2011 NOTICE of appearance filed by Attorney Miriam R. Nemetz for Amici Curiae (133 Members of the U.S. House of Representatives) Joseph Crowley, Edward J. Markey, Jerrold Nadler, Rush Holt, Bob Filner, David Price, Bobby Rush, James P. McGovern, Alcee Hastings, Maxine Waters, Earl Blumenauer, Nita Lowey, John Conyers, Adam Smith, Michael Honda, Charles Rangel, Susan Davis, Chaka Fattah, Rosa Delauro, Richard Neal, John Lewis, Frank Pallone, Xavier Becerra, Steny Hoyer, Carolyn McCarthy, James Moran, Loretta Sanchez, Steven Rothman, Maurice D. Hinchey, Barney Frank, Eleanor Norton, Diana Degette, Adam Schiff, Sam Farr, Robert E. Andrews, Charles Gonzalez, Mike Thompson, Tammy Baldwin, Edolphus Towns, Brad Miller, Jay Inslee, William Keating, Gary Ackerman, Raul Grijalva, Henry Waxman, Donald Payne, Ed Pastor, Michael Capuano, Anna Eshoo, Timothy Bishop, Brad Sherman, Betty McCollum, Gregory Meeks, Barbara Lee, Janice Schakowsky, Fortney Stark, Lynn C. Woolsey, Grace Napolitano, Zoe Lofgren, Lloyd Doggett, Eddie Johnson, Nancy Pelosi, Lucille Royball-Allard, Nydia Velazquez, Luis Gutierrez, Carolyn Maloney, John Olver, Danny K. Davis, Louise Slaughter, Lois Capps, Jim McDermott, David N. Cicilline, Timothy Ryan, John Larson, James Clyburn, Dennis Kucinich, Steve Israel, Sander Levin, John F. Tierney, Jose E. Serrano, Eliot Engel, Niki Tsongas, Jared Polis, Janice Hahn, Colleen W. Hanabusa, William L. Owens, Karen Bass, Martin Heinrich, Shelley Berkley, Brian Higgins, Howard L. Berman, James A. Himes, Gary C. Peters, Chellie Pingree, Mazie K. Hirono, Robert A. Brady, Kathy Hochul, Mike Quigley, Bruce L. Braley, Laura Richardson, Andre Carson, Judy Chu, Jesse L. Jackson, Jr., Hansen Clarke, Yvette D. Clarke, Linda T. Sanchez, William Lacy Clay, Henry C. Johnson, Jr., Emanuel Cleaver, John P. Sarbanes, Steve Cohen, Gerald E. Connolly, Joe Courtney, Robert C. Scott, Jackie Speier, Theodore E. Deutch, Doris O. Matsui, Michael F. Doyle, Donna F. Edwards, Paul Tonko, Keith Ellison, Jerry McNerney, Chris Van Hollen, Timothy J. Walz, George Miller, Debbie Wasserman Schultz, Marcia L. Fudge, Gwen Moore, John Garamendi, Christopher S. Murphy, Peter Welch and John A. Yarmuth in 10-2204. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 11/15/2011 02:33 PM]
November 15, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by (133 Members of the United States House of Representatives) Gary Ackerman, Robert E. Andrews, Tammy Baldwin, Karen Bass, Xavier Becerra, Shelley Berkley, Howard L. Berman, Timothy Bishop, Earl Blumenauer, Robert A. Brady, Bruce L. Braley, Lois Capps, June Carbone, Andre Carson, Judy Chu, David N. Cicilline, Hansen Clarke, Yvette D. Clarke, William Lacy Clay, Emanuel Cleaver, James Clyburn, Steve Cohen, Gerald E. Connolly, John Conyers, Joe Courtney, Joseph Crowley, Susan Davis, Diana Degette, Rosa Delauro, Theodore E. Deutch, Lloyd Doggett, Michael F. Doyle, Donna F. Edwards, Keith Ellison, Eliot Engel, Anna Eshoo, Sam Farr, Chaka Fattah, Bob Filner, Barney Frank, Marcia L. Fudge, John Garamendi, Charles Gonzalez, Raul Grijalva, Luis Gutierrez, Janice Hahn, Colleen W. Hanabusa, Alcee Hastings, Martin Heinrich, Brian Higgins, James A. Himes, Maurice D. Hinchey, Mazie K. Hirono, Kathy Hochul, Rush Holt, Michael Honda, Steny Hoyer, Jay Inslee, Steve Israel, Jesse L. Jackson, Jr., Eddie Johnson, Henry C. Johnson, Jr., William Keating, Dennis Kucinich, John Larson, Barbara Lee, Sheila Jackson Lee, Sander Levin, John Lewis, Zoe Lofgren, Nita Lowey, Carolyn Maloney, Edward J. Markey, Doris O. Matsui, Carolyn McCarthy, Betty McCollum, Jim McDermott, James P. McGovern, Jerry McNerney, Gregory Meeks, Brad Miller, George Miller, Gwen Moore, James Moran, Christopher S. Murphy, Jerrold Nadler, Grace Napolitano, Richard Neal, Eleanor Norton, John Olver, William L. Owens, Frank Pallone, Ed Pastor, Donald Payne, Nancy Pelosi, Gary C. Peters, Chellie Pingree, Jared Polis, David Price, Mike Quigley, Charles Rangel, Laura Richardson, Steven Rothman, Lucille Royball-Allard, Bobby Rush, Timothy Ryan, Linda T. Sanchez, Loretta Sanchez, John P. Sarbanes, Janice Schakowsky, Adam Schiff, Debbie Wasserman Schultz, Robert C. Scott, Jose E. Serrano, Brad Sherman, Louise Slaughter, Adam Smith, Jackie Speier, Fortney Stark, Mike Thompson, John F. Tierney, Paul Tonko, Edolphus Towns, Niki Tsongas, Chris Van Hollen, Nydia Velazquez, Timothy J. Walz, Maxine Waters, Henry Waxman, Peter Welch, Lynn C. Woolsey and John A. Yarmuth in suppport of affirmance in10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Number of copies: 9. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 11/15/2011 02:23 PM]
November 15, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by American Federation of Government Employees AFL-CIO, American Federation of Musicians of the United States and Canada, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, American Federation of Teachers, American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, American Guild of Musical Artists, Association of Flight Attendants, Change To Win, Communications Workers of America, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, International Union, UAW, National Association of Letter Carriers, National Education Association, Screen Actors Guild, Service Employees International Union, Transport Workers Transport Workers Union of America, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union and United Transportatio United Transportation Union, in support of affirmance in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 11/11/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 11/22/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 11/15/2011 11:20 AM]
November 14, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by Nineteen Major National and International Labor Organizations. Certificate of service dated 11/11/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (JLL) [Entered: 11/14/2011 12:42 PM]
November 14, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts and 29 others. Certificate of service dated 11/14/2011. [10-2207, 10-2204, 10-2214] (RGY) [Entered: 11/14/2011 10:37 AM]
November 14, 2011 MOTION for leave to file amicus curiae brief in support of Appellee filed by Movant(s) American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts and 29 others. Certificate of service dated 11/14/2011. [10-2207, 10-2204, 10-2214] (RGY) [Entered: 11/14/2011 10:36 AM]
November 11, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by Nineteen Major National and International Labor Organizations. Certificate of service dated 11/11/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 11/15/2011 by GK]. CLERK'S NOTE: Electronic access to this brief was restricted by the clerk's office because a corrected brief has been filed. (JLL) [Entered: 11/11/2011 04:55 PM]
November 10, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) Brief Of Amici Curiae Historians Peter W. Bardaglio, Norma Basch, George Chauncey, Stephanie Coontz, Nancy F. Cott, Toby L. Ditz, Ariela Dubler, Laura F. Edwards, Estelle B. Freedman, et al. filed by Attorney Frank H. Bishop, Jr.. Certificate of service dated 11/10/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (FHB) [Entered: 11/10/2011 03:03 PM]
November 10, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) Brief Of Amici Curiae Historians Peter W. Bardaglio, Norma Basch, George Chauncey, Stephanie Coontz, Nancy F. Cott, Toby L. Ditz, Ariela Dubler, Laura F. Edwards, Estelle B. Freedman, et al. filed by Attorney Frank H. Bishop, Jr.. Certificate of service dated 11/10/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 11/10/2011 by GK] CLERK'S NOTE: The signature on the document (Frank H. Bishop, Jr.) does not match the name of the ECF filer under whose login and password the document was filed. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS (11/14/2011). (CRC) [Entered: 11/10/2011 10:42 AM]
November 10, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) Brief Of Amici Curiae Historians Peter W. Bardaglio, Norma Basch, George Chauncey, Stephanie Coontz, Nancy F. Cott, Toby L. Ditz, Ariela Dubler, Laura F. Edwards, Estelle B. Freedman, et al. filed by Attorney Catherine R. Connors. Certificate of service dated 11/10/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (CRC) [Entered: 11/10/2011 10:40 AM]
November 10, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) Brief of Amici Curiae Historians Peter W. Bardaglio, Norma Basch, George Chauncey, Stephanie Coontz, Nancy F. Cott, Toby L. Ditz, Ariela Dubler, Laura F. Edwards, Estelle B. Freedman, Sarah Barringer Gordon, et al. filed by Attorney Clifford H.Ruprecht. Certificate of service dated 11/10/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (CHR) [Entered: 11/10/2011 10:14 AM]
November 10, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 5594318-2 ] submitted by Amicus Curiae Citizens For Responsibility and Ethics in Washington in 10-2204. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 11/10/2011 09:38 AM]
November 9, 2011 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Amici Curiae (70 Business, Professional & Municipal Employers, and Professional, Trade & Civic Organizations) ABT Associates, Aetna, Inc., Akamai Technologies, Inc., Alere Inc., Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Biogen Idec Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Boston Community Capital, Inc., Boston Foundation, Boston Medical Center, Bright Horizons Childrens Centers LLC, CBS, Calvert Investments, Inc., Chubb Corporation, Communispace Corporation, Constellation Energy Commodities Group, Inc., Diageo Plc., Eastern Bank, Exelon Corp., FitCorp Healthcare Centers, Inc., Gammelgarden, LLC, Google, Inc., Greater Boston Chamber of Commerce, Integrated Archive Systems, Inc., Kimpton Hotel & Restaurant Group, LLC, Levi Strauss & Co., Loring, Wolcott & Coolidge Trust, LLC, Massachusetts Association of Health Plans, Massachusetts Biotechnology Council, Inc., Massachusetts Envelope Company, Inc., Massachusetts Financial Services Company, Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company, Microsoft Corporation, National Fire Protection Association, National Grid USA, Nationwide Mutual In Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, New Balance Athletic Shoe Inc., New England Cryogenic Center, Inc., Nike, Inc., Ogilvy Group, Inc, Onyx Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Out & Equal Workplace Advocates, Parthenon Group LLC, Partners Healthcare System, Inc., Reproductive Science Center of New England, Retailers Retailers Association of Massachusetts, Skyworks Solutions, Inc., State Street Bank and Trust Company, Stonyfield Farm, Inc., Sun Life Financial, Inc., Time Warner, Inc., Trillium Asset Management Corp., W/S Development Associates LLC, Xerox Corp., Zipcar, Inc. and Movant Out & Equal Workplace Advocates in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 12/13/2011 12:08 PM]
November 9, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by Jewish Social Policy Action Netowrk. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (JCC) [Entered: 11/09/2011 02:52 PM]
November 9, 2011 NOTICE of appearance filed by Attorney Beth I.Z. Boland for Amici Curiae Nationwide Mutual In Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Starbucks Corporation, New Balance Athletic Shoe Inc., Google, Inc., Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company, Aetna, Inc., Burns & Levinson, LLP, Cambridge, MA, Retailers Retailers Association of Massachusetts, New York, NY, State Street Bank and Trust Company, Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Biogen Idec Inc., Ropes & Gray LLP, Sullivan & Worcester, Partners Healthcare System, Inc., Nike, Inc., Eastern Bank, National Grid USA, Constellation Energy Commodities Group, Inc., MA Financial Service Massachusetts Financial Services Company t, Microsoft Corporation, Diageo Plc., CBS, Foley Hoag LLP, Time Warner, Inc., Boston Medical Center, Sun Life Financial, Inc., City of Boston, Xerox Corp., Chubb Corporation, Exelon Corp., ABT Associates, Akamai Technologies, Inc., Alere Inc., Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Boston Community Capital, Inc., Bright Horizons Childrens Centers LLC, Calvert Investments, Inc., Communispace Corporation, FitCorp Healthcare Centers, Inc., Gammelgarden, LLC, Integrated Archive Systems, Inc., Kimpton Hotel & Restaurant Group, LLC, Levi Strauss & Co., Loring, Wolcott & Coolidge Trust, LLC, Massachusetts Envelope Company, Inc., New England Cryogenic Center, Inc., Ogilvy Group, Inc, Onyx Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Reproductive Science Center of New England, Skyworks Solutions, Inc., Stonyfield Farm, Inc., Trillium Asset Management Corp., W/S Development Associates LLC, Zipcar, Inc., Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP, Goodwin Procter LLP, Goulston & Storrs, P.C., McCarter & English LLP, Nixon Peabody LLP, Parthenon Group LLC, Salera Consulting, Greater Boston Chamber of Commerce, Boston Foundation, Massachusetts Association of Health Plans, Massachusetts Biotechnology Council, Inc., National Fire Protection Association and Out & Equal Workplace Advocates in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 11/09/2011 02:48 PM]
November 9, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by (70 Business, Professional & Municipal Employers, and Professional, Trade & Civic Organizations) ABT Associates, Aetna, Inc., Akamai Technologies, Inc., Alere Inc., Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Biogen Idec Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Boston Community Capital, Inc., Boston Foundation, Boston Medical Center, Bright Horizons Childrens Centers LLC, Burns & Levinson, LLP, CBS, Calvert Investments, Inc., Cambridge, MA, Chubb Corporation, City of Boston, Communispace Corporation, Constellation Energy Commodities Group, Inc., Diageo Plc., Eastern Bank, Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP, Exelon Corp., FitCorp Healthcare Centers, Inc., Foley Hoag LLP, Gammelgarden, LLC, Goodwin Procter LLP, Google, Inc., Goulston & Storrs, P.C., Greater Boston Chamber of Commerce, Integrated Archive Systems, Inc., Kimpton Hotel & Restaurant Group, LLC, Levi Strauss & Co., Loring, Wolcott & Coolidge Trust, LLC, MA Financial Service Massachusetts Financial Services Company t, Massachusetts Association of Health Plans, Massachusetts Biotechnology Council, Inc., Massachusetts Envelope Company, Inc., Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company, McCarter & English LLP, Microsoft Corporation, National Grid USA, Nationwide Mutual In Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, New Balance Athletic Shoe Inc., New England Cryogenic Center, Inc., New York, NY, Nike, Inc., Nixon Peabody LLP, Ogilvy Group, Inc, Onyx Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Out & Equal Workplace Advocates, Parthenon Group LLC, Partners Healthcare System, Inc., Reproductive Science Center of New England, Retailers Retailers Association of Massachusetts, Ropes & Gray LLP, Salera Consulting, Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Skyworks Solutions, Inc., Starbucks Corporation, State Street Bank and Trust Company, Stonyfield Farm, Inc., Sullivan & Worcester, Sun Life Financial, Inc., Time Warner, Inc., Trillium Asset Management Corp., W/S Development Associates LLC, Xerox Corp. and Zipcar, Inc. in 10-2204, Movants ABT Associates, Aetna, Inc., Akamai Technologies, Inc., Alere Inc., Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Biogen Idec Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Boston Community Capital, Inc., Boston Foundation, Boston Medical Center, Bright Horizons Childrens Centers LLC, Burns & Levinson, LLP, CBS, Calvert Investments, Inc., Cambridge, MA, Chubb Corporation, City of Boston, Communispace Corporation, Constellation Energy Commodities Group, Inc., Diageo Plc., Eastern Bank, Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP, FitCorp Healthcare Centers, Inc., Foley Hoag LLP, Gammelgarden, LLC, Goodwin Procter LLP, Google, Inc., Goulston & Storrs, P.C., Greater Boston Chamber of Commerce, Integrated Archive Systems, Inc., Kimpton Hotel & Restaurant Group, LLC, Levi Strauss & Co., Loring, Wolcott & Coolidge Trust, LLC, MA Financial Service Massachusetts Financial Services Company t, Massachusetts Association of Health Plans, Massachusetts Biotechnology Council, Inc., Massachusetts Envelope Company, Inc., Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company, McCarter & English LLP, Microsoft Corporation, National Fire Protection Association, National Grid USA, Nationwide Mutual In Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, New Balance Athletic Shoe Inc., New England Cryogenic Center, Inc., New York, NY, Nike, Inc., Nixon Peabody LLP, Ogilvy Group, Inc, Onyx Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Out & Equal Workplace Advocates, Parthenon Group LLC, Partners Healthcare System, Inc., Reproductive Science Center of New England, Retailers Retailers Association of Massachusetts, Ropes & Gray LLP, Salera Consulting, Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Skyworks Solutions, Inc., Starbucks Corporation, State Street Bank and Trust Company, Stonyfield Farm, Inc., Sullivan & Worcester, Sun Life Financial, Inc., Time Warner, Inc., Trillium Asset Management Corp., W/S Development Associates LLC, Xerox Corp. and Zipcar, Inc. in support of affirmance in 10-2207, 10-2214. Number of copies: 10. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 11/09/2011 by GK]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (GAK) [Entered: 11/09/2011 02:27 PM]
November 8, 2011 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Amicus Curiae Citizens For Responsibility and Ethics in Washington in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 11/07/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 12/13/2011 12:26 PM]
November 8, 2011 PLEADING tendered: (9) paper copies of Amici Curiae Brief of The US House of Representatives. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 11/09/2011 08:12 AM]
November 8, 2011 TEN (10) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 5594392-2 ] submitted by Amici Curiae (Family and Child Welfare Law Professors) Susan Appleton, Carlos Ball, Brian Bix, Cynthia Grant Bowman, Naomi Cahn, Marion Crain, Nancy Dowd, Joanna L. Grossman, Joan Heifetz Hollinger, Lisa Ikemoto, Melanie Jacobs, Courtney Joslin, Herma Hill Kay, Charles P. Kindregan, Kristine S. Knaplund, Andrew Koppelman, Maya Manian, Linda McClain, Martha L. Minow, Douglas Nejaime, Kermit Roosevelt, Laura A. Rosenbury, Shelley Saxer, Katharine Silbaugh, Michael S. Wald and Barbara Bennett Woodhouse in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 11/08/2011 04:49 PM]
November 8, 2011 NOTICE of appearance filed by Attorney William L. Chapman for Amici Curiae (Family and Child Welfare Law Professors) Cynthia Grant Bowman, Charles P. Kindregan, Carlos Ball, Brian Bix, Naomi Cahn, Marion Crain, Nancy Dowd, Joanna L. Grossman, Andrew Koppelman, Maya Manian, Linda McClain, Martha L. Minow, Douglas Nejaime, Kermit Roosevelt, Laura A. Rosenbury, Joan Heifetz Hollinger, Lisa Ikemoto, Melanie Jacobs, Courtney Joslin, Herma Hill Kay, Kristine S. Knaplund, Shelley Saxer, Katharine Silbaugh, Michael S. Wald and Barbara Bennett Woodhouse in 10-2204. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 11/08/2011 04:29 PM]
November 8, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by (Family and Child Welfare Law Professors ) Susan Appleton, Carlos Ball, Brian Bix, Cynthia Grant Bowman, Naomi Cahn, Nancy Dowd, Joanna L. Grossman, Joan Heifetz Hollinger, Lisa Ikemoto, Melanie Jacobs, Courtney Joslin, Herma Hill Kay, Charles P. Kindregan, Kristine S. Knaplund, Andrew Koppelman, Maya Manian, Linda McClain, Martha L. Minow, Douglas Nejaime, Kermit Roosevelt, Laura A. Rosenbury, Shelley Saxer and Katharine Silbaugh in support of affirmance in 10-2204. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 11/15/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 11/08/2011 04:26 PM]
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER directing Movant American Federation of Government Employees and other Major National and International Labor Organizations in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214 to file a conforming brief. Brief due 11/14/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 11/08/2011 03:21 PM]
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER directing Movant Jewish Social Policy Action Network in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214 to file a conforming brief. Brief due 11/14/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 11/08/2011 03:14 PM]
November 8, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Movant Citizens For Responsibility and Ethics in Washington in support of affirmance in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 11/15/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 11/08/2011 by GK]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (GAK) [Entered: 11/08/2011 03:03 PM]
November 8, 2011 PLEADING tendered: Amicus brief filed by Movant Jewish Social Policy Action Network in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 11/08/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 11/08/2011 02:50 PM]
November 8, 2011 MOTION for leave to file amicus curiae brief in support of Appellee filed by Movant(s) Jewish Social Policy Action Network. Certificate of service dated 11/08/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (JCC) [Entered: 11/08/2011 12:47 PM]
November 8, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) Jewish Social Policy Action Network filed by Attorney Jacob C. Cohn. Certificate of service dated 11/08/2011. [10-2204]--[Edited 12/15/2011 by GK] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should have been filed in additional cases (10-2207 & 10-2214). Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (JCC) [Entered: 11/08/2011 12:43 PM]
November 8, 2011 PLEADING tendered: 9 Paper Copies of Amici Curiae Brief filed by 133 Members of the United States House of Representatives. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 11/09/2011 by GK]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (BLC) [Entered: 11/08/2011 10:49 AM]
November 8, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 5593784-2 ] submitted by Amici Curiae American Academy of Pediatrics, American Medical Association, American Psychiatric Association, American Psychological Association and National Association of Social Workers and its Massachusetts Chapter in 10-2204. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (BLC) [Entered: 11/08/2011 10:42 AM]
November 7, 2011 PLEADING tendered: (10) Paper brief copies of Amici Curiae Labor Organizations filed by. Certificate of service dated 11/04/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 11/07/2011 04:20 PM]
November 7, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant Citizens For Responsibility and Ethics in Washingon in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214 filed by Attorney Alan B. Morrison. Certificate of service dated 11/07/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (ABM) [Entered: 11/07/2011 01:54 PM]
November 7, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. Certificate of service dated 11/07/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (ABM) [Entered: 11/07/2011 01:51 PM]
November 7, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Medical Association, American Psychiatric Association, American Psychological Association, Massachusetts Psychological Association and National Association of Social Workers and its Massachusetts Chapter in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 11/14/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 11/07/2011 12:00 PM]
November 7, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 5593203-2 ] submitted by Amicus Curiae Family Law Professors in 10-2204. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 11/07/2011 10:53 AM]
November 7, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) the American Psychological Assn., the Massachusetts Psychological Assn., the American Psychiatric Assn., the National Assn. of Social Workers and its Massachusetts Chapter, the American Medical Assn., and the American Academy of Pediatrics filed by Attorney William F. Sheehan. Certificate of service dated 11/07/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (WFS) [Entered: 11/07/2011 10:00 AM]
November 4, 2011 PLEADING tendered: (10) paper copies of Amici Curiae Family and Child Welfare Law Professors. Certificate of service dated 11/04/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 11/07/2011 04:26 PM]
November 4, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by NINETEEN MAJOR NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL LABOR ORGANIZATIONS. Certificate of service dated 11/04/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 11/07/2011 by GK]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to replace an attachment. (JLL) [Entered: 11/04/2011 05:31 PM]
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER directing Movant Jewish Social Policy Action Network in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214 to file a conforming brief. Brief due 11/09/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 11/04/2011 03:11 PM]
November 4, 2011 PLEADING tendered: (10) paper copies of Amici Curiae Brief filed by Family and Child Welfare Law Professors. Certificate Service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 11/04/2011 10:58 AM]
November 3, 2011 Pleading tendered: NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) Family and Child Welfare Law Professors filed by Attorney William L. Chapman,. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 11/08/2011 by GK]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (GAK) [Entered: 11/08/2011 11:11 AM]
November 3, 2011 PLEADING tendered: (10) Paper copies of Amici Curiae 70 Business, Professional & Municipal Employers, and Professional, Trade & Civic Organizations. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 11/07/2011 04:24 PM]
November 3, 2011 NOTICE of Consent By All Parties To File Amicus Brief filed by (70 Business, Professional and Municipal Employers, and Professional, Trade, and Civic Organizations) Movants ABT Associates, Aetna, Inc., Akamai Technologies, Inc., Alere Inc., Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Biogen Idec Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Boston Community Capital, Inc., Boston Foundation, Boston Medical Center, Bright Horizons Childrens Centers LLC, Burns & Levinson, LLP, CBS, Calvert Investments, Inc., Cambridge, MA, Chubb Corporation, City of Boston, Communispace Corporation, Constellation Energy Commodities Group, Inc., Diageo Plc., Eastern Bank, Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP, FitCorp Healthcare Centers, Inc., Foley Hoag LLP, Gammelgarden, LLC, Goodwin Procter LLP, Google, Inc., Goulston & Storrs, P.C., Greater Boston Chamber of Commerce, Integrated Archive Systems, Inc., Kimpton Hotel & Restaurant Group, LLC, Levi Strauss & Co., Loring, Wolcott & Coolidge Trust, LLC, MA Financial Service Massachusetts Financial Services Company t, Massachusetts Association of Health Plans, Massachusetts Biotechnology Council, Inc., Massachusetts Envelope Company, Inc., Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company, McCarter & English LLP, Microsoft Corporation, National Fire Protection Association, National Grid USA, Nationwide Mutual In Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, New Balance New Balance Athletic Shoe Inc., New England Cryogenic Center, Inc., New York, NY, Nike, Inc., Nixon Peabody LLP, Ogilvy Group, Inc, Onyx Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Out & Equal Workplace Advocates, Parthenon Group LLC, Partners Healthcare System, Inc., Reproductive Science Center of New England, Retailers Retailers Association of Massachusetts, Ropes & Gray LLP, Salera Consulting, Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Skyworks Solutions, Inc., Starbucks Corporation, State Street Bank and Trust Company, Stonyfield Farm, Inc., Sullivan & Worcester, Sun Life Financial, Inc., Time Warner, Inc., Trillium Asset Management Corp., W/S Development Associates LLC, Xerox Corp. and Zipcar, Inc. in 10-2204, Movants ABT Associates, Aetna, Inc., Akamai Technologies, Inc., Alere Inc., Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Biogen Idec Inc., Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Boston Community Capital, Inc., Boston Foundation, Boston Medical Center, Bright Horizons Childrens Centers LLC, Burns & Levinson, LLP, CBS, Calvert Investments, Inc., Cambridge, MA, Chubb Corporation, City of Boston,Citizens Communispace Corporation, Constellation Energy Commodities Group, Inc., Diageo Plc., Eastern Bank, Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP, FitCorp Healthcare Centers, Inc., Foley Hoag LLP, Gammelgarden, LLC, Goodwin Procter LLP, Google, Inc., Goulston & Storrs, P.C., Greater Boston Chamber of Commerce, Integrated Archive Systems, Inc., Kimpton Hotel & Restaurant Group, LLC, Levi Strauss & Co., Loring, Wolcott & Coolidge Trust, LLC, MA Financial Service Massachusetts Financial Services Company t, Massachusetts Association of Health Plans, Massachusetts Biotechnology Council, Inc., Massachusetts Envelope Company, Inc., Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company, McCarter & English LLP, Microsoft Corporation, National Fire Protection Association, National Grid USA, Nationwide Mutual In Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, New Balance New Balance Athletic Shoe Inc., New England Cryogenic Center, Inc., New York, NY, Nike, Inc., Nixon Peabody LLP, Ogilvy Group, Inc, Onyx Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Out & Equal Workplace Advocates, Parthenon Group LLC, Partners Healthcare System, Inc., Reproductive Science Center of New England, Retailers Retailers Association of Massachusetts, Ropes & Gray LLP, Salera Consulting, Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Skyworks Solutions, Inc., Starbucks Corporation, State Street Bank and Trust Company, Stonyfield Farm, Inc., Sullivan & Worcester, Sun Life Financial, Inc., Time Warner, Inc., Trillium Asset Management Corp., W/S Development Associates LLC, Xerox Corp. and Zipcar, Inc. in 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 11/07/2011 an 11/08/2011 by GK]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (GAK) [Entered: 11/07/2011 11:27 AM]
November 3, 2011 PARTIAL ASSENTED TO MOTION for leave to file supplemental appendix filed by Movants (70 Business, Professional and Municipal Employers, and Professional, Trade, and Civic Organizations) ABT Associates, Aetna, Inc., Akamai Technologies, Inc., Alere Inc., Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Biogen Idec Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Boston Community Capital, Inc., Boston Foundation, Boston Medical Center, Bright Horizons Childrens Centers LLC, Burns & Levinson, LLP, CBS, Calvert Investments, Inc., Cambridge, MA, Chubb Corporation, City of Boston, Communispace Corporation, Constellation Energy Commodities Group, Inc., Diageo Plc., Eastern Bank, Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP, FitCorp Healthcare Centers, Inc., Foley Hoag LLP, Gammelgarden, LLC, Goodwin Procter LLP, Google, Inc., Goulston & Storrs, P.C., Greater Boston Chamber of Commerce, Integrated Archive Systems, Inc., Kimpton Hotel & Restaurant Group, LLC, Levi Strauss & Co., Loring, Wolcott & Coolidge Trust, LLC, MA Financial Service Massachusetts Financial Services Company t, Massachusetts Association of Health Plans, Massachusetts Biotechnology Council, Inc., Massachusetts Envelope Company, Inc., Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company, McCarter & English LLP, Microsoft Corporation, National Fire Protection Association, National Grid USA, Nationwide Mutual In Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, New Balance New Balance Athletic Shoe Inc., New England Cryogenic Center, Inc., New York, NY, Nike, Inc., Nixon Peabody LLP, Ogilvy Group, Inc, Onyx Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Out & Equal Workplace Advocates, Parthenon Group LLC, Partners Healthcare System, Inc., Reproductive Science Center of New England, Retailers Retailers Association of Massachusetts, Ropes & Gray LLP, Salera Consulting, Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Skyworks Solutions, Inc., Starbucks Corporation, State Street Bank and Trust Company, Stonyfield Farm, Inc., Sullivan & Worcester, Sun Life Financial, Inc., Time Warner, Inc., Trillium Asset Management Corp., W/S Development Associates LLC, Xerox Corp. and Zipcar, Inc. in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 11/07/2011 by GK]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (GAK) [Entered: 11/07/2011 11:06 AM]
November 3, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by NINETEEN MAJOR NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL LABOR ORGANIZATIONS. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 11/04/2011 by RL] CLERK'S NOTE: It appears the document was scanned rather than created by converting the original word processing document into a PDF file. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS. Re-file due 11-07-11. (JLL) [Entered: 11/03/2011 11:45 PM]
November 3, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) NINETEEN NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL LABOR ORGANIZATIONS filed by Attorney James L. Linsey. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (JLL) [Entered: 11/03/2011 11:05 PM]
November 3, 2011 MOTION for leave to file amicus curiae brief filed by Movant(s) Anti-Defamation League et. al.. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (HJW) [Entered: 11/03/2011 05:39 PM]
November 3, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by The American Psychological Assn., The Massachusetts Psychological Assn., The American Psychiatric Assn., The National Assn. of Social Workers and its Massachusetts Chapter, The American Medical Assn., and the American Academy of Pediatrics. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (WFS) [Entered: 11/03/2011 05:24 PM]
November 3, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by ANTI-DEFAMATION LEAGUE et. al. (please see attachment to appearance for complete list). Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (HJW) [Entered: 11/03/2011 05:17 PM]
November 3, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) ANTI-DEFAMATION LEAGUE et.al. (please see attachment to appearance for complete list) filed by Attorney Harvey J. Wolkoff. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (HJW) [Entered: 11/03/2011 05:11 PM]
November 3, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by Jewish Social Policy Action Network. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (AMF) [Entered: 11/03/2011 04:20 PM]
November 3, 2011 MOTION for leave to file amicus curiae brief in support of Appellee filed by Movant(s) Jewish Social Policy Action Network. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 11/09/2011 by GK]. CLERK'S NOTE: Electronic access to this motion was restricted by the clerk's office because a corrected motion has been filed. (AMF) [Entered: 11/03/2011 04:19 PM]
November 3, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by American Civil Liberties Union LGBT Project, American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, and others.. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 11/16/2011 by GK]. CLERK'S NOTE: Electronic access to this brief was restricted by the clerk's office because a corrected brief has been filed. (RGY) [Entered: 11/03/2011 04:14 PM]
November 3, 2011 MOTION for leave to file amicus curiae brief in support of Appellee filed by Movant(s) American Civil Liberties Union LGBT Project, American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, and others.. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 11/16/2011 by GK]. CLERK'S NOTE: Electronic access to this motion was restricted by the clerk's office because a corrected motion has been filed. (RGY) [Entered: 11/03/2011 04:13 PM]
November 3, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) American Civil Liberties Union LGBT Project, American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts and others filed by Attorney Daryl J. Lapp. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 11/10/2011 by GK] CLERK'S NOTE: The signature on the document (Daryl J. Lapp) does not match the name of the ECF filer under whose login and password the document was filed. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS (11/14/2011). (RGY) [Entered: 11/03/2011 04:11 PM]
November 3, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) American Civil Liberties Union LGBT Project, American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts and others filed by Attorney Robert G. Young. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RGY) [Entered: 11/03/2011 04:10 PM]
November 3, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by Family and Child Welfare Law Professors. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 11/08/2011 by GK]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to replace an attachment. (WLC) [Entered: 11/03/2011 03:34 PM]
November 3, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by Historians Peter W. Bardaglio, Norma Basch, George Chauncey, Stephanie Coontz, Nancy F. Cott, Toby L. Ditz, Ariela Dubler, Laura F. Edwards, Estelle B. Freedman, Sarah Barringer Gordon, Michael Grossberg, Hendrik Hartog, Ellen Herman, et al.. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (CHR) [Entered: 11/03/2011 03:30 PM]
November 3, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by (Family Law Professors) Katharine K. Baker, Noa Ben-Asher, June Carbone, Barbara Cox, John Culhane, Karen Czapanskiy, Anne C. Dailey, Jennier A. Drobac, Maxine Eichner, Ira Mark Ellman, Zanita E. Fenton, Grace Ganz Blumberg, Leslie Harris, Ann Laquer Estin, Carol Sanger, Jana Singer, M Strasser and Jennifer B. Wriggins in support of affirmance. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 11/10/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 11/03/2011 03:19 PM]
November 3, 2011 PLEADING tendered: NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) 70 Business, Professional, and Municipal Employers, and Professional, Trade, and Civic Organizations Representing Employers filed by Beth I.Z. Boland. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 11/03/2011 03:08 PM]
November 3, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) 70 Business, Professional, and Municipal Employers, and Professional, Trade, and Civic Organizations Representing Employers filed by Attorney P. Sabin Willett. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 11/03/2011 by GK] CLERK'S NOTE: Additional attachments must be filed separately. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (PSW) [Entered: 11/03/2011 02:49 PM]
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER directing Movant Citizens For Responsibility and Ethics in Washingon in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214 to file a conforming brief. Brief due 11/08/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 11/03/2011 02:08 PM]
November 3, 2011 PLEADING tendered: (5) PAPER COPIES OF AMICUS CURIAE SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX by Amici Curiae 70 Business, Professional, and Municipal Employers, and Professional, Trade, and Civic Organizations Representing Employers in Support of Appellees. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 11/03/2011 12:29 PM]
November 3, 2011 PLEADING tendered: (10) PAPER COPIES OF AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Amici Curiae 70 Business, Professional, and Municipal Employers, and Professional, Trade, and Civic Organizations Representing Employers in Support of Appellees. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 11/03/2011 12:26 PM]
November 3, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by Amici Curiae 70 Business, Professional, and Municipal Employers, and Professional, Trade, and Civic Organizations Representing Employers. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 11/04/2011 by GK]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to replace an attachment. (PSW) [Entered: 11/03/2011 12:19 PM]
November 3, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by Family Law Professors. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (PAP) [Entered: 11/03/2011 12:06 PM]
November 3, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) Family Law Professors filed by Attorney Patricia A. Peard. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (PAP) [Entered: 11/03/2011 12:05 PM]
November 3, 2011 PLEADING tendered: Appeance forms filed by Attorney Michael B. Kimberly and Miriam R. Nemetz for Amicus 133 Members of the U.S. House of Representatives. Certificate of Service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204] (GAK) [Entered: 11/03/2011 11:47 AM]
November 3, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by 133 Members of the United States House of Representitives. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207]--[Edited 11/03/2011 by RL]--[Edited 11/03/2011 & 11/15/2011 by GK] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should have been filed in additional case (10-2214). Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. Docket entry was edited to replace an attachment. (MBK) [Entered: 11/03/2011 10:57 AM]
November 3, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (ABM) [Entered: 11/03/2011 10:49 AM]
October 31, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of appellee/respondent brief [ # 5591538-2 ] submitted by Appellee Commonwealth of Massachusetts in 10-2204. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 10/31/2011 11:22 AM]
October 28, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of appellee/respondent brief [ # 5591520-2 ] submitted by Appellees. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 10/28/2011 11:39 AM]
October 28, 2011 BRIEFING schedule updated. Reply brief due 12/01/2011 for appellant Kathleen Sebelius, Eric K. Shinseki, US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs and United States. [10-2204] (RL) [Entered: 10/28/2011 09:48 AM]
October 28, 2011 APPELLEE'S BRIEF filed by Appellee Commonwealth of Massachusetts in 10-2204. Certificate of service dated 10/27/2011. Reply brief due 12/01/2011 for appellants. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 11/04/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 10/28/2011 09:40 AM]
October 28, 2011 APPELLEE'S BRIEF filed by Appellees. Certificate of service dated 10/27/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 11/04/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 10/28/2011 09:29 AM]
October 27, 2011 BRIEF tendered by Appellees Melba Abreu, Dorene Bowe-Shulman, Mary Bowe-Shulman, Herbert Burtis, Kathleen Bush, James Fitzgerald, Nancy Gill, Bette Jo Green, Beatrice Hernandez, Jonathan Knight, Martin Koski, Marcelle Letourneau, Randell Lewis-Kendell, Marlin Nabors, Mary Ritchie, Jo Ann Whitehead and Appellee/Cross-Appellant Dean Hara in 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 10/27/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GDB) [Entered: 10/27/2011 06:54 PM]
October 27, 2011 BRIEF tendered by Appellee Commonwealth of Massachusetts in 10-2204. Certificate of service dated 10/27/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (MTH) [Entered: 10/27/2011 03:31 PM]
October 19, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Melba Abreu, Dorene Bowe-Shulman, Herbert Burtis, Kathleen Bush, James Fitzgerald, Nancy Gill, Bette Jo Green, Beatrice Hernandez, Jonathan Knight, Martin Koski, Marcelle Letourneau, Randell Lewis-Kendell,Marlin Nabors, Mary Ritchie, Jo Ann Whitehead and Appellee/Cross-Appellant Dean Hara in 10-2207,10-2214 filed by Attorney Luke C. Platzer. Certificate of service dated 10/18/2011. [10-2204] (GAK) [Entered: 10/19/2011 10:24 AM]
October 18, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Commonwealth of Massachusetts in 10-2204 filed by Attorney Brian J. Boyle Jr.. Certificate of service dated 10/18/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (BJB) [Entered: 10/18/2011 07:30 PM]
October 18, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Commonwealth of Massachusetts filed by Attorney Felicia H. Ellsworth. Certificate of service dated 10/18/2011. [10-2204]--[Edited 10/18/2011 by GK] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should have been filed in additional cases (10-2207 & 10-2214). Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (FHE) [Entered: 10/18/2011 01:13 PM]
October 18, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Commonwealth of Massachusetts filed by Attorney Alan E. Schoenfeld. Certificate of service dated 10/18/2011. [10-2204]--[Edited 10/18/2011 by GK] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should have been filed in additional cases (10-2207 & 10-2214). Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (AES) [Entered: 10/18/2011 11:58 AM]
October 18, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Commonwealth of Massachusetts filed by Attorney Mark C. Fleming. Certificate of service dated 10/18/2011. [10-2204]--[Edited 10/18/2011 by GK] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should have been filed in additional cases (10-2207 & 10-2214). Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (MCF) [Entered: 10/18/2011 09:49 AM]
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER substituting parties pursuant to FRAP 43(c)(2). Appellant/Cross-Appellee John E. Potter substituted by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Patrick R. Donahoe in 10-2207 and 10-2214. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 10/17/2011 01:48 PM]
September 29, 2011 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Gregory F. Zoeller for Amicus Curiae State of Indiana in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Copy of 9/23/11 Appellees' Briefing Notice. Forwarded to Office of the Indiana Attorney General, IN Govt Center South-Fifth Floor, 302 W. Washington Street, Indianapolis, IN 46204. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 09/29/2011 01:50 PM]
September 28, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of intervenor's brief [ # 5582138-2 ] submitted by Intervenor Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives in 10-2204, Movant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives in 10-2207, 10-2214. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 09/28/2011 10:31 AM]
September 26, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of appellant/petitioner brief [ # 5582118-2 ] submitted by Appellants Kathleen Sebelius, Eric K. Shinseki, US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs and US in 10-2204, Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-2207, 10-2214. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 09/26/2011 11:05 AM]
September 23, 2011 INTERVENOR BRIEF filed by Intervenor Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives. Certificate of service dated 09/22/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 09/30/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 09/23/2011 09:49 AM]
September 23, 2011 APPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellants 10-2204, Appellants/Cross-Appellees in 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 09/22/2011. Brief due 10/27/2011 for appellees. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 09/30/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 09/23/2011 09:09 AM]
September 22, 2011 BRIEF tendered by Intervenor Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives in 10-2204. Certificate of service dated 09/22/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (PDC) [Entered: 09/22/2011 10:43 PM]
September 22, 2011 BRIEF tendered by Appellants Kathleen Sebelius, Eric K. Shinseki, US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs and US in 10-2204, Appellants/Cross-Appellees Michael J. Astrue, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Office of Personnel Management, John E. Potter, US and United States Postal Service in 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 09/22/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (BSK) [Entered: 09/22/2011 05:30 PM]
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge; Juan R. Torruella*, Appellate Judge; Michael Boudin, Appellate Judge; Kermit V. Lipez*, Appellate Judge; Jeffrey R. Howard, Appellate Judge and Rogeriee Thompson*, Appellate Judge. The plaintiffs-appellees in Gill v. Office of Personnel Mgmt., Nos. 10-2207, 10-2214, seek initial hearing en banc in these three consolidated appeals from the district court's decision striking down Section 3 of the Defense of Marriage Act. The petition for initial hearing en banc, having been considered by the judges of the court in regular active service and a majority of said judges not having voted to order that the matter be heard en banc, is denied. In order to give the parties an appropriate interval in which to present their arguments, the briefing order entered by this court on June 16, 2011, as amended by the court's July 11 and 28 orders extending the due dates for opening and superseding briefs, is hereby further amended. The trigger date for the computation of time to file briefs contained in this court's June 16 order shall be the date this order issues. The motion of amicus Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund for leave to submit a response to the petition for initial hearing en banc is denied. So ordered. * TORRUELLA, LIPEZ, and THOMPSON, Circuit Judges, dissenting without comment as to the denial of the petition for initial hearing en banc. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 08/23/2011 03:42 PM]
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER entered. Upon consideration of intervenor-appellant The Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives' extension motion, the deadline for filing the House's opening brief and the superseding brief of the Department of Justice is extended to September 9, 2011, without prejudice to a renewed motion if necessary. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 07/28/2011 02:59 PM]
July 28, 2011 MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Intervenor Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives in 10-2204. Certificate of service dated 07/28/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (CBD) [Entered: 07/28/2011 12:29 PM]
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER entered. Upon consideration of intervenor-appellant The Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives' extension motion, the deadline for filing the House's opening brief and the superseding brief of the Department of Justice is extended to August 8, 2011, without prejudice to a renewed motion if necessary. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 07/11/2011 09:12 AM]
July 9, 2011 RESPONSE filed by Intervenor Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives in 10-2204 to petition for hearing en banc [ # 5559480-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 07/09/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (CBD) [Entered: 07/09/2011 01:12 PM]
July 9, 2011 LETTER regarding Corrected Response to Petition for Hearing En Banc filed by Attorney Conor Brendan Dugan for Intervenor Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives in 10-2204. Certificate of service dated 07/09/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (CBD) [Entered: 07/09/2011 01:09 PM]
July 7, 2011 MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Intervenor Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives in 10-2204, Movant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives in 10-2207. [10-2204, 10-2207]--[Edited 07/08/2011 by GK] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should have been filed in additional case (10-2214). Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (CBD) [Entered: 07/07/2011 05:26 PM]
July 7, 2011 RESPONSE filed by Intervenor Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives in 10-2204, Movant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives in 10-2207 to petition for hearing en banc [ # 5559480-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 07/07/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207]--[Edited 07/08/2011 by GK] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should have been filed in additional case (10-2214). Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (CBD) [Entered: 07/07/2011 05:21 PM]
July 7, 2011 RESPONSE filed by Appellants Kathleen Sebelius, Eric K. Shinseki, US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs and US in 10-2204, Appellants/Cross-Appellees Michael J. Astrue, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Office of Personnel Management, John E. Potter, US and United States Postal Service in 10-2207, 10-2214 to petition for hearing en banc [ # 5559480-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 07/07/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (BSK) [Entered: 07/07/2011 05:19 PM]
July 6, 2011 MOTION for leave to file Response to Petition for Hearing En Banc filed by Amicus Curiae Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund in 10-2204. Certificate of service dated 07/06/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (LJJ) [Entered: 07/06/2011 08:03 AM]
June 29, 2011 RESPONSE filed by Appellee Commonwealth of Massachusetts in 10-2204 to petition for hearing en banc [ # 5559480-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 06/29/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (MTH) [Entered: 06/29/2011 05:48 PM]
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge. The other parties to these consolidated appeals are directed to file a response, not to exceed 15 pages, within 14 days of the date of this order, to the petition for hearing en banc filed by the plaintiffs-appellees in No. 10-2207. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 06/23/2011 11:30 AM]
June 21, 2011 PETITION for hearing en banc filed by Appellees Melba Abreu, Dorene Bowe-Shulman, Mary Bowe-Shulman, Herbert Burtis, Kathleen Bush, James Fitzgerald, Nancy Gill, Bette Jo Green, Beatrice Hernandez, Jonathan Knight, Martin Koski, Marcelle Letourneau, Randell Lewis-Kendell, Marlin Nabors, Mary Ritchie, Jo Ann Whitehead and Appellee/Cross-Appellant Dean Hara in 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 06/21/2011. [10-2207, 10-2204, 10-2214] (GDB) [Entered: 06/21/2011 10:18 AM]
June 16, 2011 CROSS-APPEAL briefing schedule updated. Opening Brief due 07/18/2011 for Intervenor Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the United States House of Representatives and Superseding brief due 07/18/2011 appellants (the federal defendants) Kathleen Sebelius, Eric K. Shinseki, US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs, United States, Michael J. Astrue, Eric H. Holder Jr., Office of Personnel Management, John E. Potter and United States Postal Service. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 06/16/2011 12:57 PM]
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge. The motion of the Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the United States House of Representatives ("the House") to intervene as a party appellant is granted. The federal defendants' motion to withdraw their opening brief is denied; however, the federal defendants may file a superseding brief. Briefing shall proceed on the following schedule: 30 days after order allowing intervention: Opening brief of intervenor (the House) in Nos. 10-2204 and 10-2207 Superseding brief of appellants (the federal defendants) in Nos. 10-2204 and 10-2207 30 days from above filings: Response brief of appellee (Commonwealth of Massachusetts) in No. 10-2204 Response brief of appellees (the Gill plaintiffs) in No. 10-2207 combined with opening brief of cross-appellant (Dean Hara) in No. 10-2214 30 days from above filings: Reply brief of intervenor (the House) in Nos. 10-2204 and 10-2207 Reply brief of appellants (the federal defendants) in Nos. 10-2204 and 10-2207, combined with response brief of cross-appellees (the federal defendants) in No. 10-2214 14 days from above filings: Reply brief of cross-appellant (Dean Hara) in No. 10-2214 So ordered. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 06/16/2011 11:14 AM]
June 15, 2011 REPLY filed by Movant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214 to motion for leave to intervene [ # 5552128-2 ], [ # 5552656-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 06/10/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 06/15/2011 12:00 PM]
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion for leave to file reply instanter to the motion for leave to intervene filed by Movant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 06/15/2011 11:54 AM]
June 10, 2011 ASSENTED TO MOTION for leave to file Reply in Support of Motion to Intervene instanter filed by Movant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives in 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 06/10/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (KWK) [Entered: 06/10/2011 04:54 PM]
June 10, 2011 MOTION for leave to file Reply Brief instanter filed by Movant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives in 10-2204. Certificate of service dated 06/10/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 06/10/2011 by GK]. CLERK'S NOTE: Electronic access to this motion was restricted by the clerk's office because a corrected motion has been filed. (KWK) [Entered: 06/10/2011 04:34 PM]
June 6, 2011 RESPONSE filed by Movant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives in 10-2204 to motion to withdraw document [ # 5555054-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 06/06/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (KWK) [Entered: 06/06/2011 11:39 AM]
June 2, 2011 RESPONSE filed by Appellee Commonwealth of Massachusetts in 10-2204 to motion to intervene [ # 5552656-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 06/02/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (MTH) [Entered: 06/02/2011 08:49 PM]
June 2, 2011 RESPONSE filed by Appellants Kathleen Sebelius, Eric K. Shinseki, US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs and US in 10-2204, Appellants/Cross-Appellees Michael J. Astrue, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Office of Personnel Management, John E. Potter, US and United States Postal Service in 10-2207, 10-2214 to motion to intervene [ # 5552656-2 ], motion for leave to intervene [ # 5552128-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 06/02/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (BSK) [Entered: 06/02/2011 05:26 PM]
June 2, 2011 MOTION to withdraw opening brief filed by Appellants Kathleen Sebelius, Eric K. Shinseki, US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs and US in 10-2204, Appellants/Cross-Appellees Michael J. Astrue, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Office of Personnel Management, John E. Potter, US and United States Postal Service in 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 06/02/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (BSK) [Entered: 06/02/2011 05:23 PM]
June 1, 2011 STATUS report filed by Appellants Kathleen Sebelius, Eric K. Shinseki, US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs and US in 10-2204, Appellants/Cross-Appellees Michael J. Astrue, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Office of Personnel Management, John E. Potter, US and United States Postal Service in 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 06/01/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (BSK) [Entered: 06/01/2011 04:14 PM]
May 26, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives filed by Attorney Paul D. Clement. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (PDC) [Entered: 05/26/2011 10:17 AM]
May 25, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives filed by Attorney Conor B. Dugan. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (CBD) [Entered: 05/25/2011 02:33 PM]
May 20, 2011 MOTION for leave to intervene filed by Movant(s) Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives. Certificate of service dated 05/20/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207]--[Edited 05/24/2011 by GK] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should have been filed in additional case (10-2214). Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (KWK) [Entered: 05/20/2011 04:40 PM]
May 20, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives filed by Attorney Kirsten W. Konar. Certificate of service dated 05/20/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207]--[Edited 05/24/2011 by GK] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should have been filed in additional case (10-2214). Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (KWK) [Entered: 05/20/2011 04:37 PM]
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge These cases will be held in abeyance until further order of this court. The government has represented to the court that the Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the United States House of Representatives has informed the Executive Branch of its intention to participate in these consolidated cases to defend the constitutionality of section 3 of the Defense of Marriage Act. To date, that Group has not filed an appearance or otherwise sought to participate in these cases. Until such action is taken, if it be taken, the present view of the court is that it would be premature to set schedules for any filings by that group. Rather, we direct the Executive Branch, by the government, to file a status report by June 1, 2011. That status report should address: (1) whether and, if so, when the Attorney General submitted a report to both houses of Congress, under 28 U.S.C. 530D(a)(2); (2) what action, if any, has been taken by the required recipients in response to any such report; and (3) any information as to the timing of proposed submissions to the court on behalf of the Congress or either house thereof. The Clerk is directed to send copies of this order to the Speaker, Minority Leader, and General Counsel of the United States House of Representatives. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (LB) [Entered: 03/30/2011 09:44 AM]
March 18, 2011 RESPONSE filed by Appellants Kathleen Sebelius, Eric K. Shinseki, US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs, US and Appellee Commonwealth of Massachusetts in 10-2204, Appellants/Cross-Appellees Michael J. Astrue, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Office of Personnel Management, John E. Potter, US, United States Postal Service, Appellees Melba Abreu, Dorene Bowe-Shulman, Mary Bowe-Shulman, Herbert Burtis, Kathleen Bush, James Fitzgerald, Nancy Gill, Bette Jo Green, Beatrice Hernandez, Jonathan Knight, Martin Koski, Marcelle Letourneau, Randell Lewis-Kendell, Marlin Nabors, Mary Ritchie, Jo Ann Whitehead and Appellee/Cross-Appellant Dean Hara in 10-2207, 10-2214 to order [ # 5529006-4 ], to extend time to file response [ # 5529006-3 ], to vacate briefing schedule [ # 5529006-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 03/18/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (MJS) [Entered: 03/18/2011 05:06 PM]
March 8, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 5530449-2 ] submitted by Amicus Curiae Liberty Counsel in 10-2204. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 03/08/2011 10:41 AM]
March 3, 2011 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Amicus Curiae Liberty Counsel in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 02/25/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 12/13/2011 12:21 PM]
March 3, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Liberty Counsel in support of Appellants. Certificate of service dated 02/25/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 03/10/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 03/03/2011 10:27 AM]
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion for leave to file Corrected Amicus Brief Out of Time filed by Movant Liberty Counsel. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 03/03/2011 10:19 AM]
March 2, 2011 MOTION for leave to file Corrected Amicus Brief Out of Time filed by Movant Liberty Counsel in 10-2204, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 03/02/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (MEM) [Entered: 03/02/2011 06:42 PM]
February 28, 2011 Original copy of LETTER regarding Defense of Marriage Act Litigation filed by Attorney Benjamin Seth Kingsley for Appellants US, US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs, Kathleen Sebelius and Eric K. Shinseki in 10-2204, Attorney Benjamin Seth Kingsley for Appellants/Cross-Appellees US, United States Postal Service, John E. Potter, Michael J. Astrue, Eric H. Holder, Jr. and Office of Personnel Management in 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 02/24/2011.. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 02/28/2011 by GK]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (GAK) [Entered: 02/28/2011 11:55 AM]
February 25, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by Liberty Counsel. Certificate of service dated 02/25/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (MEM) [Entered: 02/25/2011 08:49 PM]
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER entered. On or before March 18, 2011, the parties are to confer and file a joint proposal as to how these cases should proceed in light of the government's letter of February 24, 2011. The proposal shall address, among other things, whether the government needs to clarify its litigation stance by filing a new brief. The government shall also inform us, at that time, when we should expect to learn that Congress will or will not seek to intervene or otherwise participate, as well as whether in its view this matter should be held in abeyance pending that Congressional decision. The government shall also address whether, in its view, the government appeals should be dismissed in light of the government's position. Appellant Dean Hara shall also address whether the government's letter affects whether his own appeal should proceed. The present briefing schedule is vacated pending consideration of the further filings. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 02/25/2011 03:12 PM]
February 24, 2011 LETTER regarding Defense of Marriage Act Litigation filed by Attorney Benjamin Seth Kingsley for Appellants US, US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs, Kathleen Sebelius and Eric K. Shinseki in 10-2204, Attorney Benjamin Seth Kingsley for Appellants/Cross-Appellees US, United States Postal Service, John E. Potter, Michael J. Astrue, Eric H. Holder, Jr. and Office of Personnel Management in 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 02/24/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (BSK) [Entered: 02/24/2011 08:52 PM]
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER directing Movant Liberty Counsel in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214 to file a conforming brief. Amicus brief due 02/28/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 02/23/2011 09:40 AM]
February 17, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 5526179-2 ] submitted by Amici Curiae Brethren in Christ Church, Christian and Missionary Alliance, Conservative Congregational Christian Conference, Evangelical Free Church of America, Evangelical Presbyterian Church, International Church of the Foursquare Gospel, International Pentecostal Holiness Church, Missionary Church, Open Bible Churches [USA], United Brethren in Christ Church and Wesleyan Church in 10-2204, Amici Curiae Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Ethics and Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention, Lutheran Church-Missouri Synod, MA Catholic Conference, National Association of Evangelicals, US Conference of Catholic Bishops and Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America in 10-2214. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 02/17/2011 10:58 AM]
February 15, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 5524871-2 ] submitted by Amicus Curiae Agudath Israel of America in 10-2204. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 02/15/2011 11:57 AM]
February 14, 2011 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Amici Curiae Brethren in Christ Church, Christian and Missionary Alliance, Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Conservative Congregational Christian Conference, Ethics and Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention, Evangelical Free Church of America, Evangelical Presbyterian Church, International Church of the Foursquare Gospel, International Pentecostal Holiness Church, Lutheran Church-Missouri Synod, MA Catholic Conference, Missionary Church, National Association of Evangelicals, Open Bible Churches [USA], US Conference of Catholic Bishops, Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America, United Brethren in Christ Church and Wesleyan Church in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 01/28/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 12/13/2011 12:00 PM]
February 14, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Brethren in Christ Church, Christian and Missionary Alliance, Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Conservative Congregational Christian Conference, Ethics and Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention, Evangelical Free Church of America, Evangelical Presbyterian Church, International Church of the Foursquare Gospel, International Pentecostal Holiness Church, Lutheran Church-Missouri Synod, MA Catholic Conference, Missionary Church, National Association of Evangelicals, Open Bible Churches [USA], US Conference of Catholic Bishops, Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America, United Brethren in Christ Church and Wesleyan Church in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214 in support of Appellants. Certificate of service dated 01/28/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 02/22/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 02/14/2011 11:59 AM]
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion for leave to file oversized amicus brief filed by Movants MA Catholic Conference, US Conference of Catholic Bishops, Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, National Association of Evangelicals, Ethics and Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention, Lutheran Church-Missouri Synod, Brethren in Christ Church, Christian and Missionary Alliance, Conservative Congregational Christian Conference, Evangelical Free Church of America, Evangelical Presbyterian Church, International Church of the Foursquare Gospel, International Pentecostal Holiness Church, Missionary Church, Open Bible Churches [USA], United Brethren in Christ Church, Wesleyan Church and Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 02/14/2011 11:48 AM]
February 9, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant Liberty Counsel filed by Attorney Rena M. Lindevaldsen. Certificate of service dated 02/09/2011. [10-2204]--[Edited 03/03/2011 by GK] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should have been filed in additional cases (10-2207 & 10-2214). Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (RML) [Entered: 02/09/2011 04:50 PM]
February 9, 2011 NOTICE of appearance filed by George I. Goverman. Certificate of service was not included. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 02/09/2011 12:56 PM]
February 9, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by George I. Goverman in support of Appellants. Number of copies: 9. Certificate of service dated 01/20/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 02/09/2011 12:52 PM]
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to file amicus curiae brief filed by George I. Goverman. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 02/09/2011 12:43 PM]
February 9, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant Liberty Counsel in 10-2204 filed by Attorney Mary E. McAlister. Certificate of service dated 02/09/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (MEM) [Entered: 02/09/2011 10:00 AM]
February 9, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by Liberty Counsel. Certificate of service dated 02/09/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (MEM) [Entered: 02/09/2011 09:59 AM]
February 8, 2011 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Amicus Curiae Agudath Israel of America in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 02/04/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 12/13/2011 12:19 PM]
February 8, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Agudath Israel of America in support of Appellants. Certificate of service dated 02/04/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 02/15/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 02/08/2011 03:44 PM]
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief construed as motion to file brief instanter filed by Movant Agudath Israel of America. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 02/08/2011 03:40 PM]
February 8, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 5523405-2 ] submitted by Amicus Curiae National Association for the Research and Therapy of Homosexuality in 10-2204. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 02/08/2011 12:47 PM]
February 7, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 5522483-2 ] submitted by National Legal Foundation. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 02/07/2011 by GK]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (RL) [Entered: 02/07/2011 02:13 PM]
February 7, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 5522626-2 ] submitted by Amicus Curiae MA Family Institute in 10-2204. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 02/07/2011 10:36 AM]
February 7, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 5522507-2 ] submitted by Amicus Curiae Concerned Women for America in 10-2204. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 02/07/2011 10:34 AM]
February 7, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 5522499-2 ] submitted by Amicus Curiae Lamar S. Smith in 10-2204. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 02/07/2011 09:38 AM]
February 4, 2011 MOTION for leave to file oversized brief filed by Movants Brethren in Christ Church, Christian and Missionary Alliance, Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Conservative Congregational Christian Conference, Ethics and Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention, Evangelical Free Church of America, Evangelical Presbyterian Church, International Church of the Foursquare Gospel, International Pentecostal Holiness Church, Lutheran Church-Missouri Synod, MA Catholic Conference, Missionary Church, National Association of Evangelicals, Open Bible Churches [USA], US Conference of Catholic Bishops, Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America, United Brethren in Christ Church and Wesleyan Church in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 02/04/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (ARP) [Entered: 02/04/2011 09:11 PM]
February 4, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 5522404-2 ] submitted by Amicus Curiae American College of Pediatricians in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 02/04/2011 02:08 PM]
February 4, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by Agudath Israel of America. Certificate of service dated 02/04/2011. [10-2204] (RDR) [Entered: 02/04/2011 01:18 PM]
February 4, 2011 MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Movant Agudath Israel of America. Certificate of service dated 02/04/2011. [10-2204]--[Edited 02/08/2011 by GK] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should have been filed in additional cases (10-2207 & 10-2214). Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (RDR) [Entered: 02/04/2011 01:15 PM]
February 3, 2011 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Amicus Curiae National Association for the Research and Therapy of Homosexuality in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 01/25/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 12/13/2011 11:55 AM]
February 3, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 5522636-2 ] submitted by Amicus Curiae Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 02/03/2011 12:48 PM]
February 3, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 5523418-2 ] submitted by Amicus Curiae Pacific Justice Institute in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 02/03/2011 12:43 PM]
February 3, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 5522518-2 ] submitted by Amici Curiae Ryan T. Anderson, Robert P. George and Sherif Girgis in 10-2204. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 02/03/2011 12:41 PM]
February 3, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Pacific Justice Institute in support of Appellants. Certificate of service dated 01/26/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 02/10/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 02/03/2011 10:10 AM]
February 3, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by National Association for the Research and Therapy of Homosexuality in support of Appellants. Certificate of service dated 01/25/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 02/10/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 02/03/2011 09:52 AM]
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER directing Movant Liberty Counsel to file a conforming brief. Brief due 02/07/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 02/03/2011 09:14 AM]
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER directing Movant Agudath Israel of America in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214 to file a conforming brief. Brief due 02/07/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 02/01/2011 01:58 PM]
February 1, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 5522468-2 ] submitted by Amici Curiae State of Colorado, State of Indiana, State of Michigan, State of South Carolina and Movant State of UT in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 02/01/2011 10:07 AM]
January 31, 2011 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Amicus Curiae Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 01/26/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 12/13/2011 12:16 PM]
January 31, 2011 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Amicus Curiae MA Family Institute in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 01/28/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 12/13/2011 11:53 AM]
January 31, 2011 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Amicus Curiae Concerned Women for America in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 01/27/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 12/13/2011 11:51 AM]
January 31, 2011 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Amicus Curiae National Legal Foundation in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 01/27/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 12/13/2011 11:48 AM]
January 31, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant National Association for the Research and Therapy of Homosexuality in 10-2204 filed by Attorney Gary G. Kreep. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GGK) [Entered: 01/31/2011 05:41 PM]
January 31, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant Pacific Justice Institute in 10-2204 filed by Attorney Kevin T. Snider. Certificate of service dated 01/31/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (KTS) [Entered: 01/31/2011 01:55 PM]
January 31, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund in support of Appellants. Certificate of service dated 01/26/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 02/07/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 01/31/2011 01:50 PM]
January 31, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by MA Family Institute in support of Appellants. Certificate of service dated 01/28/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 02/07/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 01/31/2011 by GK]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (GAK) [Entered: 01/31/2011 01:41 PM]
January 31, 2011 NOTICE of appearance filed by Attorney Kristen K. Waggoner for Amici Curiae Robert P. George, Sherif Girgis and Ryan T. Anderson in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 01/27/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 01/31/2011 10:07 AM]
January 31, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Ryan T. Anderson, Robert P. George and Sherif Girgis in support of Appellants. Certificate of service dated 01/27/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 02/07/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 01/31/2011 10:04 AM]
January 31, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Concerned Women for America in support of Appellants. Certificate of service dated 01/27/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 02/07/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 01/31/2011 09:53 AM]
January 31, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Lamar S. Smith in support of Appellants. Certificate of service dated 01/28/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 02/07/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 01/31/2011 09:48 AM]
January 31, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by National Legal Foundation in support of Appellants. Certificate of service dated 01/27/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 02/07/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 01/31/2011 09:18 AM]
January 31, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by State of Colorado, State of Indiana, State of Michigan, State of South Carolina and State of UT in support of Appellants. Certificate of service dated 01/25/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 02/07/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 01/31/2011 09:05 AM]
January 28, 2011 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Amicus Curiae American College of Pediatricians in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 01/25/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 12/13/2011 11:47 AM]
January 28, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by Massachusetts Family Institute. Certificate of service dated 01/28/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (SCW) [Entered: 01/28/2011 08:38 PM]
January 28, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant National Legal Foundation in 10-2204 filed by Attorney Steven W. Fitschen. Certificate of service dated 01/28/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (SWF) [Entered: 01/28/2011 05:19 PM]
January 28, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by Representative Lamar Smith. Certificate of service dated 01/28/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (DAN) [Entered: 01/28/2011 04:45 PM]
January 28, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant National Legal Foundation in 10-2204 filed by Attorney Steven W. Fitschen. Certificate of service dated 01/28/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 01/28/2011 by GK] CLERK'S NOTE: The name of the ECF Filer must be preceded by an "s/" and typed in the space where the signature would otherwise appear. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS (2/1/11). (SWF) [Entered: 01/28/2011 04:28 PM]
January 28, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by American College of Pediatricians in support of Appellants. Certificate of service dated 01/25/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 02/04/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 01/28/2011 03:48 PM]
January 28, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movants State of Colorado State of Colorado Natural Resources & Environment Section, State of Indiana, State of Michigan, State of South Carolina and State of UT in 10-2204 filed by Attorney Thomas M. Fisher. Certificate of service dated 01/28/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (TMF) [Entered: 01/28/2011 01:35 PM]
January 28, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movants Brethren in Christ Church, Christian and Missionary Alliance, Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Conservative Congregational Christian Conference, Ethics and Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention, Evangelical Free Church of America, Evangelical Presbyterian Church, International Church of the Foursquare Gospel, International Pentecostal Holiness Church, Lutheran Church-Missouri Synod, MA Catholic Conferen Massachusetts Catholic Conference, Missionary Church, National Association of Evangelicals, Open Bible Churches [USA], US Conference of Cat United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, Union of American Union of American Hebrew Congregations, United Brethren in Christ Church and Wesleyan Church in 10-2204 filed by Attorney Anthony R. Picarello, Jr.. Certificate of service dated 01/28/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (ARP) [Entered: 01/28/2011 01:07 PM]
January 28, 2011 TEN (10) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 5520949-2 ] submitted by Amicus Curiae Foundation for Moral Law in 10-2204. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (BLC) [Entered: 01/28/2011 12:26 PM]
January 28, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant Agudath Israel of America in 10-2204 filed by Attorney Russell D. Raskin. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 01/28/2011 by GK] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional cases (10-2207 & 10-2214). Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (RDR) [Entered: 01/28/2011 12:18 PM]
January 28, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by Agudath Israel of America. Certificate of service dated 01/27/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RDR) [Entered: 01/28/2011 10:52 AM]
January 28, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by Agudath Israel of America. Certificate of service dated 11-27-11. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 01/28/2011 by GK]. CLERK'S NOTE: Electronic access to this brief was restricted by the clerk's office because this is a duplicate brief. (RDR) [Entered: 01/28/2011 10:51 AM]
January 28, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by Agudath Israel of America. Certificate of service dated 11-27-11. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 01/28/2011 by GK]. CLERK'S NOTE: Electronic access to this brief was restricted by the clerk's office because this is a duplicate brief. (RDR) [Entered: 01/28/2011 10:49 AM]
January 27, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by Representative Lamar Smith. Certificate of service dated 01/27/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 01/28/2011 by BLC] CLERK'S NOTE: Briefs must be submitted in a single PDF file. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS. RE-FILE DUE DATE 1/31/11. (DAN) [Entered: 01/27/2011 09:57 PM]
January 27, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) Representative Lamar Smith filed by Attorney David Austin R. Nimocks. Certificate of service dated 01/27/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (DAN) [Entered: 01/27/2011 09:52 PM]
January 27, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by Massachusetts Family Institute. Certificate of service dated 01/27/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 01/28/2011 by BLC] CLERK'S NOTE: Briefs must be submitted in a single PDF file. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS. RE-FILE DUE DATE 1/31/11. (SCW) [Entered: 01/27/2011 09:43 PM]
January 27, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) Massachusetts Family Institute filed by Attorney Stephen C. Whiting. Certificate of service dated 01/27/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (SCW) [Entered: 01/27/2011 09:34 PM]
January 27, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by Concerned Women for America. Certificate of service dated 01/27/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (ECB) [Entered: 01/27/2011 09:28 PM]
January 27, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) Concerned Women for America filed by Attorney Eric C. Bohnet. Certificate of service dated 01/27/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (ECB) [Entered: 01/27/2011 09:21 PM]
January 27, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by Robert P. George, Sherif Girgis, Ryan T. Anderson. Certificate of service dated 01/27/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 01/28/2011 by BLC & GK] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to remove a clerk's note regarding additional attachments. Filing was entered correctly. (KKW) [Entered: 01/27/2011 08:52 PM]
January 27, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by U.S. Conference of Catholic Bishops; National Association of Evangelicals; Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints; Ethics and Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention; Lutheran Church-Missouri Synod; and 13 others. Certificate of service dated 01/27/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (ARP) [Entered: 01/27/2011 05:53 PM]
January 27, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by The National Legal Foundation. Certificate of service dated 01/27/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (SWF) [Entered: 01/27/2011 04:47 PM]
January 27, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR RESEARCH & THERAPY OF HOMOSEXUALITY. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GGK) [Entered: 01/27/2011 02:36 PM]
January 26, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund. Certificate of service dated 01/26/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (LJJ) [Entered: 01/26/2011 11:25 PM]
January 26, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by Pacific Justice Institute. Certificate of service dated 01/26/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 01/27/2011 by GK]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (KTS) [Entered: 01/26/2011 04:30 PM]
January 26, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by Liberty Counsel. Certificate of service dated 01/26/2011. [10-2207, 10-2204, 10-2214] (MEM) [Entered: 01/26/2011 02:21 PM]
January 26, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant American College of Pediatricians in 10-2204 filed by Attorney David Ramos-Pagan. Certificate of service dated 01/25/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (DR) [Entered: 01/26/2011 08:18 AM]
January 25, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by States of Indiana, Colorado, Michigan, South Carolina and Utah. Certificate of service dated 01/25/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (TMF) [Entered: 01/25/2011 04:24 PM]
January 25, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by American College of Pediatricians. Certificate of service dated 01/25/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (JAS) [Entered: 01/25/2011 02:20 PM]
January 25, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) American College of Pediatricians filed by Attorney John Anthony Simmons, Sr.. Certificate of service dated 01/25/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (JAS) [Entered: 01/25/2011 02:15 PM]
January 24, 2011 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Amicus Curiae Foundation for Moral Law in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 01/31/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 12/13/2011 11:43 AM]
January 24, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 5520188-2 ] submitted by Amicus Curiae Family Research Family Research Council in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 01/24/2011 01:20 PM]
January 24, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of appellant/petitioner brief [ # 5520092-2 ] submitted by Appellants in 10-2204. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 01/24/2011 01:15 PM]
January 24, 2011 PLEADING tendered: Appearance form filed by Movant George I. Goverman in 10-2204. Certificate of service was not included. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 01/24/2011 01:02 PM]
January 24, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Amicus Curiae Foundation for Moral Law in support of Appellants. Certificate of service dated 01/21/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 01/31/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 01/24/2011 11:51 AM]
January 21, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by Foundation for Moral Law. Certificate of service dated 01/21/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (JAE) [Entered: 01/21/2011 04:37 PM]
January 21, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 5519928-2 ] submitted by Amicus Curiae National Organization For Marriage, Inc. in 10-2204. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 01/21/2011 11:53 AM]
January 20, 2011 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Amicus Curiae Family Research Council in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 01/18/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 12/13/2011 11:45 AM]
January 20, 2011 MOTION for leave to file amicus curiae brief in support of filed by Movant George I. Goverman in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 01/20/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 01/21/2011 03:28 PM]
January 20, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by Foundation for Moral Law. [10-2204]--[Edited 01/21/2011 by GK] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should have been filed in additional cases (10-2207 & 10-2214). Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (JAE) [Entered: 01/20/2011 04:58 PM]
January 20, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) Foundation for Moral Law filed by Attorney John A. Eidsmoe. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (JAE) [Entered: 01/20/2011 04:14 PM]
January 20, 2011 PLEADING tendered: Amicus Curiae (10 copies ) filed by George I. Goverman in support of Federal Defendants. Certificate of service dated 01/20/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 01/20/2011 02:23 PM]
January 20, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Amicus Curiae Family Research Council in support of Appellants in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 01/18/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 01/27/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 01/21/2011 by GK]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (GAK) [Entered: 01/20/2011 11:29 AM]
January 20, 2011 APPELLANTS BRIEF filed by Appellants/Cross-Appellees in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 01/19/2011. Brief due 03/1/2011 for Appellees/cross-appellants. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 01/27/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 01/20/2011 by GK]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text and update an attachment. (RL) [Entered: 01/20/2011 08:52 AM]
January 19, 2011 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Amicus Curiae National Organization For Marriage in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 01/19/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 12/13/2011 11:41 AM]
January 19, 2011 BRIEF tendered by Appellants Kathleen Sebelius, Eric K. Shinseki, US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs and US in 10-2204, Appellants/Cross-Appellees Michael J. Astrue, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Office of Personnel Management, John E. Potter, US and United States Postal Service in 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 01/19/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (AEF) [Entered: 01/19/2011 05:46 PM]
January 19, 2011 LETTER regarding Corrected Brief for the United States filed by Attorney August E. Flentje for Appellants US, US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs, Kathleen Sebelius and Eric K. Shinseki in 10-2204, Attorney August E. Flentje for Appellants/Cross-Appellees US, United States Postal Service, John E. Potter, Michael J. Astrue, Eric H. Holder, Jr. and Office of Personnel Management in 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 01/19/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (AEF) [Entered: 01/19/2011 05:43 PM]
January 19, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Amicus Curiae National Organization For Marriage, Inc. in 10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214 in support of Appellants. Certificate of service dated 01/19/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 01/26/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 01/19/2011 02:28 PM]
January 19, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by National Organization for Marriage. Certificate of service dated 01/19/2011. [10-2204]--[Edited 01/19/2011 by GK] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should have been filed in additional cases (10-2207 & 10-2214). Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (WCD) [Entered: 01/19/2011 10:28 AM]
January 18, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by Family Research Council. Certificate of service dated 01/18/2011. [10-2204, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 01/19/2011 11:19 AM]
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER directing Movant National Organization For Marriage, Inc. to file a conforming brief. Amicus brief due 01/28/2011 for Movant National Organization For Marriage, Inc.. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 01/19/2011 09:21 AM]
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER directing Appellants Kathleen Sebelius, Eric K. Shinseki, US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs and US in 10-2204, Appellants/Cross-Appellees Michael J. Astrue, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Office of Personnel Management, John E. Potter, US and United States Postal Service in 10-2207, 10-2214 to file a conforming brief. Brief due 02/01/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 01/18/2011 01:48 PM]
January 17, 2011 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by National Organization for Marriage. Certificate of service dated 01/17/2011. [10-2204]--[Edited 01/19/2011 by GK] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should have been filed in additional cases (10-2207 & 10-2214). Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (WCD) [Entered: 01/17/2011 01:30 PM]
January 14, 2011 APPENDIX filed by Appellants Kathleen Sebelius, Eric K. Shinseki, US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs and US in 10-2204, Appellants/Cross-Appellees Michael J. Astrue, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Office of Personnel Management, John E. Potter, US and United States Postal Service in 10-2207, 10-2214. Number of volumes: 2. Number of copies: 5. Certificate of service dated 01/13/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (RL) [Entered: 01/14/2011 10:49 AM]
January 13, 2011 BRIEF tendered by Appellants Kathleen Sebelius, Eric K. Shinseki, US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs and US in 10-2204, Appellants/Cross-Appellees Michael J. Astrue, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Office of Personnel Management, John E. Potter, US and United States Postal Service in 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 01/13/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (BSK) [Entered: 01/13/2011 05:57 PM]
January 13, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed by Attorney Lawrence J. Joseph. Certificate of service dated 01/13/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (LJJ) [Entered: 01/13/2011 03:03 PM]
January 11, 2011 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed by Attorney Lawrence J. Joseph. Certificate of service dated 01/11/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (LJJ) [Entered: 01/11/2011 03:46 PM]
December 30, 2010 Public docket note: Original copy of Tendered NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) National Organization for Marriage filed by Attorney William C. Duncan. [10-2204] (GAK) [Entered: 12/30/2010 11:49 AM]
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER granting unopposed motion to extend time to file brief and/or appendix filed by Federal Appellants. Brief and joint appendix due 01/13/2011. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (GAK) [Entered: 12/23/2010 08:49 AM]
December 21, 2010 ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Kathleen Sebelius, Eric K. Shinseki, US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs and US in 10-2204, Appellants/Cross-Appellees Michael J. Astrue, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Office of Personnel Management, John E. Potter, US and United States Postal Service in 10-2207, 10-2214. Certificate of service dated 12/21/2010. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (BSK) [Entered: 12/21/2010 04:23 PM]
December 21, 2010 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) National Organization for Marriage filed by Attorney William C. Duncan. Certificate of service dated 12/21/2010. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214] (WCD) [Entered: 12/21/2010 01:59 PM]
December 14, 2010 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) Family Research Council filed by Attorney Paul Benjamin Linton. Certificate of service dated 12/14/2010. [10-2204] (GAK) [Entered: 12/15/2010 10:06 AM]
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Michael Boudin, Appellate Judge granting motion to consolidate cases filed by Appellants US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs, Kathleen Sebelius, Eric K. Shinseki and United States of America in 10-2204 and Appellants/Cross-Appellees US, United States Postal Service, John E. Potter, Michael J. Astrue, Eric H. Holder, Jr. and Office of Personnel Management in 10-2207, 10-2214; setting modified briefing schedule; Brief and appendix due 12/23/2010 for Federal Appellants. [10-2204, 10-2207, 10-2214]--[Edited 12/08/2010 by GK]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to attach a missing document. (GAK) [Entered: 11/24/2010 03:53 PM]
November 18, 2010 NOTICE of appearance filed by Attorney Jonathan B. Miller for Appellee Commonwealth of Massachusetts. Certificate of service dated 11/09/2010. [10-2204] (TS) [Entered: 11/18/2010 03:11 PM]
November 18, 2010 ASSENTED TO MOTION to consolidate cases, to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Kathleen Sebelius, Eric K. Shinseki, US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs and United States of America. Certificate of service dated 11/18/2010. [10-2204] (BSK) [Entered: 11/18/2010 03:01 PM]
November 3, 2010 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 12/13/2010 for Appellants Kathleen Sebelius, Eric K. Shinseki, US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs and United States of America. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 14 days following service of appellee's brief. [10-2204] (TS) [Entered: 11/03/2010 03:19 PM]
November 3, 2010 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Commonwealth of Massachusetts filed by Attorney Maura T. Healey. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2010. [10-2204] (MTH) [Entered: 11/03/2010 11:39 AM]
October 25, 2010 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Kathleen Sebelius, Eric K. Shinseki, US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs and United States of America indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 10/25/2010. [10-2204] (BSK) [Entered: 10/25/2010 12:26 PM]
October 25, 2010 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Kathleen Sebelius, Eric K. Shinseki, US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs and United States of America. Certificate of service dated 10/25/2010. [10-2204] (BSK) [Entered: 10/25/2010 12:25 PM]
October 21, 2010 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Kathleen Sebelius, Eric K. Shinseki, US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs and United States of America filed by Attorney Michael Jay Singer. Certificate of service dated 10/21/2010. [10-2204] (MJS) [Entered: 10/21/2010 05:54 PM]
October 21, 2010 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Kathleen Sebelius, Eric K. Shinseki, US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs and United States of America filed by Attorney Benjamin S. Kingsley. Certificate of service dated 10/21/2010. [10-2204] (BSK) [Entered: 10/21/2010 05:15 PM]
October 21, 2010 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Kathleen Sebelius, Eric K. Shinseki, US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs and United States of America filed by Attorney August E. Flentje. Certificate of service dated 10/21/2010. [10-2204] (AEF) [Entered: 10/21/2010 05:10 PM]
October 20, 2010 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #71) filed by Appellants Kathleen Sebelius, Eric K. Shinseki, US Department of Health & Human Services, US Department of Veterans Affairs and United States of America. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form and Appearance form due 11/03/2010. [10-2204] (TS) [Entered: 10/20/2010 02:40 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Commonwealth of Massachusetts v. US Department of Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EASTERN BANK
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL GRID USA
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL LEGAL FOUNDATION
Represented By: Steven W. Fitschen
Represented By: Douglas E. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: OGILVY GROUP, INC
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CBS INC.
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INTERNATIONAL PENTECOSTAL HOLINESS CHURCH
Represented By: Carl H. Esbeck
Represented By: Anthony R. Picarello Jr.
Represented By: R. Shawn Gunnarson
Represented By: Alexander Dushku
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRIAN BIX
Represented By: Emily Gray Rice
Represented By: William L. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HENRY WAXMAN
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JAMES A. HIMES
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GOULSTON & STORRS, P.C.
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JOHN F. TIERNEY
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION, LOCAL 509
Represented By: Nicole G. Berner
Represented By: Judith A. Scott
Represented By: James Leon Linsey
Represented By: Laurel R. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CARLOS BALL
Represented By: Emily Gray Rice
Represented By: William L. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MASSACHUSETTS BIOTECHNOLOGY COUNCIL, INC.
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRIAN HIGGINS
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AGUDATH ISRAEL OF AMERICA
Represented By: Abba Cohen
Represented By: Mordechai Biser
Represented By: Russell D. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NIKE, INC.
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LESLIE HARRIS
Represented By: Patricia A. Peard
Represented By: Ronald W. Schneider Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICHAEL F. DOYLE
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JESSE L. JACKSON, JR.
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ESTELLE B. FREEDMAN
Represented By: Catherine R. Connors
Represented By: Clifford H. Ruprecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MARCIA L. FUDGE
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MAXINE WATERS
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ROBERT C. SCOTT
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KATHARINE K. BAKER
Represented By: Patricia A. Peard
Represented By: Katharine K. Baker
Represented By: Ronald W. Schneider Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JANA SINGER
Represented By: Patricia A. Peard
Represented By: Ronald W. Schneider Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JAY INSLEE
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EQUAL JUSTICE SOCIETY
Represented By: Robert George Young II
Represented By: Daryl J. Lapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MCCARTER & ENGLISH LLP
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TELEVISION AND RADIO ARTISTS
Represented By: James Leon Linsey
Represented By: Thomas R. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL ASIAN PACIFIC AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Robert George Young II
Represented By: Daryl J. Lapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HENRY C. JOHNSON, JR.
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NEW ENGLAND CRYOGENIC CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EARL BLUMENAUER
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TIMOTHY RYAN
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS
Represented By: James Leon Linsey
Represented By: Bradley Thomas Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ANNA ESHOO
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JOE COURTNEY
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FREEDOM TO MARRY
Represented By: Robert George Young II
Represented By: Daryl J. Lapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION
Represented By: James Leon Linsey
Represented By: Nick Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DORIS O. MATSUI
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN GUILD OF MUSICAL ARTISTS
Represented By: Deborah Allton-Maher
Represented By: James Leon Linsey
Represented By: Alan S. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SHERIF GIRGIS
Represented By: Kristen K. Waggoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CAROL SANGER
Represented By: Patricia A. Peard
Represented By: Ronald W. Schneider Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHARLES P. KINDREGAN, III
Represented By: Emily Gray Rice
Represented By: William L. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PAUL TONKO
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EMANUEL CLEAVER
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR MARRIAGE
Represented By: Joshua K. Baker
Represented By: William C. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CALVERT INVESTMENTS, INC.
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ZIPCAR, INC.
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CONSERVATIVE CONGREGATIONAL CHRISTIAN CONFERENCE
Represented By: Carl H. Esbeck
Represented By: Anthony R. Picarello Jr.
Represented By: R. Shawn Gunnarson
Represented By: Alexander Dushku
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JOSE E. SERRANO
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GAMMELGARDEN, LLC
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EVANGELICAL PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH
Represented By: Carl H. Esbeck
Represented By: Anthony R. Picarello Jr.
Represented By: R. Shawn Gunnarson
Represented By: Alexander Dushku
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF INDIANA
Represented By: Gregory F. Zoeller
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICHAEL E. CAPUANO
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FRANK PALLONE
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HINDU AMERICAN FOUNDATION
Represented By: Russell Patrick Plato
Represented By: Samuel P. Bickett
Represented By: Robert Owen Trestan
Represented By: Harvey J. Wolkoff
Represented By: Steven C. Sheinberg
Represented By: Steven M. Freeman
Represented By: Deborah Bensinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NYDIA VELAZQUEZ
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MARTIN HEINRICH
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INTEGRATED ARCHIVE SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CONSTELLATION ENERGY COMMODITIES GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ROBERT P. GEORGE
Represented By: Kristen K. Waggoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KATHARINE SILBAUGH
Represented By: Katharine Silbaugh
Represented By: Emily Gray Rice
Represented By: William L. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WILLIAM LACY CLAY
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHANGE TO WIN
Represented By: Patrick J. Szymanski
Represented By: James Leon Linsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICHAEL GROSSBERG
Represented By: Catherine R. Connors
Represented By: Clifford H. Ruprecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NIKI TSONGAS
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NANCY PELOSI
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HISPANIC NATIONAL BAR ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Robert George Young II
Represented By: Daryl J. Lapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS
Represented By: David Strom
Represented By: James Leon Linsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ED PASTOR
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DENNIS KUCINICH
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN PSYCHOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: William F. Sheehan
Represented By: Nathalie F.P. Gilfoyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COMMUNISPACE CORPORATION
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHUBB CORPORATION
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STEVE ISRAEL
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MIKE QUIGLEY
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ROSA DELAURO
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NIXON PEABODY LLP
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LEVI STRAUSS & CO.
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LOIS CAPPS
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GOOGLE, INC.
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST OF LATTER-DAY SAINTS
Represented By: Carl H. Esbeck
Represented By: Michael F. Moses
Represented By: Anthony R. Picarello Jr.
Represented By: R. Shawn Gunnarson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EDWARD J. MARKEY
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BOBBY RUSH
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INTERNATIONAL UNION, UAW
Represented By: James Leon Linsey
Represented By: Michael Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JOHN A. YARMUTH
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RETAILERS RETAILERS ASSOCIATION OF MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY, RUBBER, MANUFACTURING, ENERGY, ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVICE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION
Represented By: Richard J. Brean
Represented By: James Leon Linsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CALIFORNIA FAITH FOR EQUALITY
Represented By: Russell Patrick Plato
Represented By: Samuel P. Bickett
Represented By: Robert Owen Trestan
Represented By: Harvey J. Wolkoff
Represented By: Steven C. Sheinberg
Represented By: Steven M. Freeman
Represented By: Deborah Bensinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ABT ASSOCIATES
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: Robert George Young II
Represented By: Daryl J. Lapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EDDIE JOHNSON
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LAURA F. EDWARDS
Represented By: Catherine R. Connors
Represented By: Clifford H. Ruprecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHRIS VAN HOLLEN
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ANNE C. DAILEY
Represented By: Patricia A. Peard
Represented By: Ronald W. Schneider Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RYAN T. ANDERSON
Represented By: Kristen K. Waggoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DIAGEO PLC.
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNION FOR REFORM JUDAISM
Represented By: Russell Patrick Plato
Represented By: Samuel P. Bickett
Represented By: Robert Owen Trestan
Represented By: Harvey J. Wolkoff
Represented By: Steven C. Sheinberg
Represented By: Steven M. Freeman
Represented By: Deborah Bensinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CAMBRIDGE, MA
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RAUL GRIJALVA
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ELAINE TYLER MAY
Represented By: Catherine R. Connors
Represented By: Clifford H. Ruprecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CENTRAL CONFERENCE OF AMERICAN RABBIS
Represented By: Russell Patrick Plato
Represented By: Samuel P. Bickett
Represented By: Robert Owen Trestan
Represented By: Harvey J. Wolkoff
Represented By: Steven C. Sheinberg
Represented By: Steven M. Freeman
Represented By: Deborah Bensinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: XEROX CORP.
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STEPHANIE COONTZ
Represented By: Catherine R. Connors
Represented By: Clifford H. Ruprecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNITARIAN UNIVERSALIST MINISTERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Russell Patrick Plato
Represented By: Samuel P. Bickett
Represented By: Robert Owen Trestan
Represented By: Harvey J. Wolkoff
Represented By: Steven C. Sheinberg
Represented By: Steven M. Freeman
Represented By: Deborah Bensinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CONCERNED WOMEN FOR AMERICA
Represented By: Eric Christian Bohnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NANCY DOWD
Represented By: Emily Gray Rice
Represented By: William L. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GOODWIN PROCTER LLP
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LINDA T. SANCHEZ
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRAD MILLER
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DANNY K. DAVIS
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMY DRU STANLEY
Represented By: Catherine R. Connors
Represented By: Clifford H. Ruprecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HUMAN RIGHTS CAMPAIGN
Represented By: Robert George Young II
Represented By: Daryl J. Lapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHRISTOPHER S. MURPHY
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ELEANOR NORTON
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CALIFORNIA COUNCIL OF CHURCHES
Represented By: Russell Patrick Plato
Represented By: Samuel P. Bickett
Represented By: Robert Owen Trestan
Represented By: Harvey J. Wolkoff
Represented By: Steven C. Sheinberg
Represented By: Steven M. Freeman
Represented By: Deborah Bensinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NITA LOWEY
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FAMILY RESEARCH COUNCIL
Represented By: Christopher M. Gacek
Represented By: Thomas Brejcha
Represented By: Paul Benjamin Linton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: M STRASSER
Represented By: Patricia A. Peard
Represented By: Ronald W. Schneider Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MELANIE JACOBS
Represented By: Emily Gray Rice
Represented By: William L. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HADASSAH, THE WOMEN'S ZIONIST ORGANIZATION OF AMERICA
Represented By: Russell Patrick Plato
Represented By: Samuel P. Bickett
Represented By: Robert Owen Trestan
Represented By: Harvey J. Wolkoff
Represented By: Steven C. Sheinberg
Represented By: Steven M. Freeman
Represented By: Deborah Bensinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LOUISE SLAUGHTER
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EQUALITY FEDERATION
Represented By: Robert George Young II
Represented By: Daryl J. Lapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SALERA CONSULTING
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CAROLE SHAMMAS
Represented By: Catherine R. Connors
Represented By: Clifford H. Ruprecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EAGLE FORUM EDUCATION & LEGAL DEFENSE FUND
Represented By: Lawrence John Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO
Represented By: David A. Borer
Represented By: James Leon Linsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TIMOTHY J. WALZ
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NOA BEN-ASHER
Represented By: Patricia A. Peard
Represented By: Ronald W. Schneider Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: XAVIER BECERRA
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SOCIAL WORKERS AND ITS MASSACHUSETTS CHAPTER
Represented By: William F. Sheehan
Represented By: Nathalie F.P. Gilfoyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES
Represented By: John C. Dempsey
Represented By: James Leon Linsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATIONAL FUND
Represented By: Robert George Young II
Represented By: Daryl J. Lapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: W/S DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATES LLC
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GRACE GANZ BLUMBERG
Represented By: Patricia A. Peard
Represented By: Ronald W. Schneider Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KAREN BASS
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CYNTHIA GRANT BOWMAN
Represented By: Emily Gray Rice
Represented By: William L. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Represented By: Alan Wilson
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BOSTON BAR ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Robert George Young II
Represented By: Daryl J. Lapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LUCILLE ROYBALL-ALLARD
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ROPES & GRAY LLP
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LORETTA SANCHEZ
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNION OF ORTHODOX JEWISH CONGREGATIONS OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jeffrey Hunter Moon
Represented By: Carl H. Esbeck
Represented By: Michael F. Moses
Represented By: Anthony R. Picarello Jr.
Represented By: Von G. Keetch
Represented By: R. Shawn Gunnarson
Represented By: Alexander Dushku
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TRANSPORT WORKERS TRANSPORT WORKERS UNION OF AMERICA
Represented By: James Leon Linsey
Represented By: David Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JEWISH ALLIANCE FOR LAW AND SOCIAL ACTION
Represented By: Robert George Young II
Represented By: Daryl J. Lapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NANCY F. COTT
Represented By: Catherine R. Connors
Represented By: Clifford H. Ruprecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MARTHA L. MINOW
Represented By: Emily Gray Rice
Represented By: William L. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ANN LAQUER ESTIN
Represented By: Patricia A. Peard
Represented By: Ronald W. Schneider Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JUDY CHU
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KATHY HOCHUL
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TIME WARNER, INC.
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF LETTER CARRIERS
Represented By: James Leon Linsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PR BAR ASSOCIATION PUERTO RICAN BAR ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Robert George Young II
Represented By: Daryl J. Lapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ZOE LOFGREN
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL GAY AND LESBIAN TASK FORCE FOUNDATION
Represented By: Robert George Young II
Represented By: Daryl J. Lapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: YVETTE D. CLARKE
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF COLORADO
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Represented By: John W. Suthers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MA CATHOLIC CONFERENCE
Represented By: Carl H. Esbeck
Represented By: Anthony R. Picarello Jr.
Represented By: R. Shawn Gunnarson
Represented By: Alexander Dushku
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NEW YORK, NY
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MICHIGAN
Represented By: Bill Schuette
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LORING, WOLCOTT & COOLIDGE TRUST, LLC
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CAROLYN MALONEY
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HERMA HILL KAY
Represented By: Emily Gray Rice
Represented By: William L. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ANDOVER NEWTON THEOLOGICAL SCHOOL
Represented By: Russell Patrick Plato
Represented By: Samuel P. Bickett
Represented By: Robert Owen Trestan
Represented By: Harvey J. Wolkoff
Represented By: Steven C. Sheinberg
Represented By: Steven M. Freeman
Represented By: Deborah Bensinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JAMES P. MCGOVERN
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LAURA A. ROSENBURY
Represented By: Emily Gray Rice
Represented By: William L. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KAREN CZAPANSKIY
Represented By: Patricia A. Peard
Represented By: Ronald W. Schneider Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LAURA RICHARDSON
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ARIELA R. DUBLER
Represented By: Catherine R. Connors
Represented By: Clifford H. Ruprecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GARY C. PETERS
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DEBBIE WASSERMAN SCHULTZ
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RICHARD NEAL
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MASSACHUSETTS ENVELOPE COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHARLES GONZALEZ
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SCREEN ACTORS GUILD
Represented By: Duncan Crabtree-Ireland
Represented By: Danielle S. Van Lier
Represented By: James Leon Linsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ELIZABETH H. PLECK
Represented By: Catherine R. Connors
Represented By: Clifford H. Ruprecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DOUGLAS NEJAIME
Represented By: Emily Gray Rice
Represented By: William L. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BARBARA YOUNG WELKE
Represented By: Catherine R. Connors
Represented By: Clifford H. Ruprecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MAURICE D. HINCHEY
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NAOMI CAHN
Represented By: Emily Gray Rice
Represented By: William L. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SUSAN DAVIS
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LAWYERS COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS
Represented By: Robert George Young II
Represented By: Daryl J. Lapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SANDER LEVIN
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MASSACHUSETTS LGBTQ BAR ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Robert George Young II
Represented By: Daryl J. Lapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GRACE NAPOLITANO
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Kathleen Connery Dawe
Represented By: Heather C. Sawyer
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNITARIAN THE UNITARIAN UNIVERSALIST ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Russell Patrick Plato
Represented By: Samuel P. Bickett
Represented By: Robert Owen Trestan
Represented By: Harvey J. Wolkoff
Represented By: Steven C. Sheinberg
Represented By: Steven M. Freeman
Represented By: Deborah Bensinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EVANGELICAL FREE CHURCH OF AMERICA
Represented By: Carl H. Esbeck
Represented By: Anthony R. Picarello Jr.
Represented By: R. Shawn Gunnarson
Represented By: Alexander Dushku
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GEORGE CHAUNCEY
Represented By: Catherine R. Connors
Represented By: Clifford H. Ruprecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BURNS & LEVINSON, LLP
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN PSYCHIATRIC ASSOCIATION
Represented By: William F. Sheehan
Represented By: Nathalie F.P. Gilfoyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS
Represented By: William F. Sheehan
Represented By: Nathalie F.P. Gilfoyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Beth I.Z. Boland
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web |