In Re: Pharmaceutical Industry
Defendant: ALPHA THERAPEUTIC CO, BAXTER HEMOGLOBIN THERAPEUTICS, NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS, PFIZER, INC., PHARMACIA CORPORATION, IVAX CORPORATION, ASTELLAS PHARMA US, INC., HOECHST MARION ROUSSEL, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., ALCON LABORATORIES, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS PRODUCTS, L.P., ICN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ORTHO MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ARMOUR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, BAYER PHARMACEUTICAL, GLAXOSMITHKLINE, PLC, CHIRON CORPORATION, MYLAN, INC., SCHWARZPHARMA HOLDINGS, INC., MERCK KGAA, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM ROXANE, INC, BAXTER INTERNATIONAL, INC., AGOURON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., B.BRAUN OF AMERICA, SANDOZ, INC., ORGANON PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC, C.H. BOEHRINGER SOHN GRUNDSTUCKSVERWALTUNG GMBH & COMPANY KG, PHARMA-INVESTMENT LIMITED, GENSIA SICOR, INC., ETHEX CORPORATION, BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, GLAXO WELLCOME PLC, SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP., d/b/a GlaxoSmithKline, FAULDING PHARMACEUTICALS, GREENSTONE LTD, MEDIMMUNE, INC., BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., DEY PHARMA, L.P., HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE, INC., BAXTER HEALTHCARE CORPORATION, JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, BEDFORD LABORATORIES, GENZYME CORPORATION, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, BIOGEN, INC., APOTHECON, INC., PURDUE PHARMA COMPANY, SHIRE US INC., DOES 151-200, PURDUE PHARMA L.P., ORTHO BIOTECH PRODUCTS, LP, ZENECA HOLDINGS INC., AVENTIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SEPRACOR INC., MALLINCKRODT, INC., UCB, S.A., IVAX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. and AMERICAN HOME PRODUCTS CORP.
Plaintiff / Appellee: STATE OF IOWA, COUNTY OF GREENE, ACTION ALLIANCE OF SENIOR CITIZENS OF GREATER PHILADELPHIA, COUNTY OF DUTCHESS, COUNTY OF ONEIDA, KIMBERLY K. HOOVER, COUNTY OF MADISON, STATE OF HAWAII, COUNTY OF CAYUGA, VERMONT PUBLIC INTEREST RESEARCH GROUP, STATE OF ARIZONA, COUNTY OF MONROE, NATIONAL AUTOMATIC SPRINKLER INDUSTRY WELFARE FUND, CONGRESS OF CALIFORNIA SENIORS, COUNTY OF JEFFERSON, MURIEL TONACCHIO, representative of the Estate of Wilma Mort, COUNTY OF FULTON, ROBERT J. SWANSTON, LEROY TOWNSEND, Individually and on behalf of other similarly situated, STATE OF TX, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, RICHARD WESSELS, as personal representative of the Estate of Susan Wessels, JOHN B. RICE, DONALD E. HAVILAND, JR., COLORADO PROGRESSIVE COALITION, COUNTY OF STEUBEN, MAINE CONSUMERS FOR AFFORDABLE HEALTH CARE, TWIN CITIES BAKERY WORKERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, CITIZENS FOR CONSUMER JUSTICE, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF DELAWARE, HEALTH CARE FOR ALL, COUNTY OF ONONDAGA, UNITED STATES, ex rel., COUNTY OF WARREN, STATE OF UT, COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, WEST VIRGINIA CITIZEN ACTION, COUNTY OF CATTARAUGUS, SUFFOLK COUNTY (NY), GRAY PANTHERS OF SACRAMENTO, ROCKLAND COUNTY, WISCONSIN CITIZEN ACTION, ZACHARY T. BENTLEY, STATE OF CT, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, MASSACHUSETTS SENIOR ACTION COUNCIL, COUNTY OF WESTCHESTER, NORTH CAROLINA FAIR SHARE, COUNTY OF WYOMING, COUNTY OF CORTLAND, JOHN M. LOCKWOOD, Officer and Director of Ven-A-Care of the Florida Keys, Inc., GREG HAMILTON, Realtor, COUNTY OF COLUMBIA, THE, VEN-A-CARE OF THE FLORIDA KEYS, INC., CONNECTICUT CITIZEN ACTION GROUP, MINNESOTA SENIOR FEDERATION, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS, LOCAL NO. 68 WELFARE FUND, COUNTY OF HERKIMER and COUNTY OF ALBANY
Interested Party: OXFORD HEALTH PLANS, LLC, EXCELLUS BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD, KLINE & SPECTER, PC, NATIONAL HERITAGE INSURANCE COMPANY, JONATHAN MARKS, HEALTH NET, INC., AMERISOURCEBERGEN, TUFTS ASSOCIATED HEALTH MAINTENANCE ORGANIZATION, INC., MCKESSON CORPORATION, DEMRA JORDAN, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, MILBERG WEISS BERSHAD & SCHULMAN, LLP, AETNA, INC., MILBERG LLP, HUMANA, INC., HAWAII MEDICAL SERVICE ASSOCIATION, FIRST DATABANK, INC. and CONNECTICUT GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE CO.
Not Classified By Court: M. JOYCE HOWE, COUNTY OF ORANGE, ESSEX SUPERIOR COURT JUDGE, MAN-U SERVICE CONTRACT TRUST FUND, BAXTER PHARMACEUTICAL. and JOHN DOES 1-200
Defendant / Appellee: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., KREMERS URBAN DEV. CO., STANLEY C. HOPKINS, ANDRX PHARMACEUTICAL, WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., ACTVIS, US, SCHEIN PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., MCNEIL CONSUMER, AG SCIENTIFIC, INC., ROXANE INC, ORGANON USA, AVENTIS BEHRING LLC, SERONO INTERNATIONAL, S.A., PHARMACIA & UPJOHN, INC., WARRICK PHARMACEUTICALS CORPORATION, ALL DEFENDANTS, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION, BIOVAIL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SICOR, INC., RELIANT PHARMACEAUTICALS, LLC, HOWARD A. SMITHLINE, NOVAPHARM LTD., SANOFI-SYNTHELABO, INC., ANDRX CORPORATION, TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC., PUREPAC PHARMACEUTICAL, CO., BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH, ELIZABETH M. BERGEN, RJL SYSTEMS, INC. and EMD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Petitioner / Appellant: CORINNA CONNICK
Case Number: 12-1067
Filed: February 23, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2012 MANDATE issued. [12-1067] (CMP) [Entered: 03/13/2012 01:57 PM]
March 12, 2012 JUDGMENT dismissing case pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). [12-1067] (CMP) [Entered: 03/13/2012 01:56 PM]
February 27, 2012 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Appellant Corinna Connick in 12-1067. Certificate of service dated 02/27/2012. [12-1067] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional case. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. [12-1067]--[Edited 02/29/2012 by CP] (TJC) [Entered: 02/27/2012 02:18 PM]
February 24, 2012 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Appellee Blue Cross/Blue Shield of Massachusetts in 12-1067, 11-2141. Certificate of service dated 01/19/2012. CLERK'S NOTE: This motion was filed on January 19, 2012. [12-1067, 11-2141] (CMP) [Entered: 02/24/2012 03:17 PM]
February 24, 2012 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Blue Cross/Blue Shield of Massachusetts in 12-1067 filed by Attorney Steve W. Berman. Certificate of service dated 02/24/2012. [12-1067, 11-2141] (SWB) [Entered: 02/24/2012 02:28 PM]
February 24, 2012 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #8026) filed by Appellant Corinna Connick. Docketing Statement due 03/09/2012. Transcript Report/Order form due 03/09/2012. Appearance form due 03/09/2012. [12-1067] (CMP) [Entered: 02/24/2012 10:30 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In Re: Pharmaceutical Industry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALPHA THERAPEUTIC CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAXTER HEMOGLOBIN THERAPEUTICS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS
Represented By: David J. Cerveny
Represented By: Mark D. Godler
Represented By: Rachel H. Yarkon
Represented By: Michelle W. Kesselman
Represented By: Karen F. Green
Represented By: Saul P. Morgenstern
Represented By: Benjamin M. Stern
Represented By: Jane W. Parver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER, INC.
Represented By: Ezra Dodd Church
Represented By: John C. Dodds
Represented By: Kimberly K. Heuer
Represented By: Mark D. Smith
Represented By: Scott A. Stempel
Represented By: John Clayton Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHARMACIA CORPORATION
Represented By: Gavin G. Jangard
Represented By: Ezra Dodd Church
Represented By: Jennifer B. Jordan
Represented By: Kathryn E. Potalivo
Represented By: Barry D. Halpern
Represented By: John C. Dodds
Represented By: Joseph G. Adams
Represented By: Stephanie Vithoulkas Hackett
Represented By: Michael N. Feder
Represented By: Mitchell Edwards
Represented By: Robert Alexander Pitcairn
Represented By: Scott A. Stempel
Represented By: Jason E. Baranski
Represented By: Joseph B.G. Fay
Represented By: Mark David Smith
Represented By: John Clayton Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IVAX CORPORATION
Represented By: Patrick M. Bryan
Represented By: Jennifer Gardner Levy
Represented By: Robert F. Stacy Jr.
Represented By: James W. Matthews
Represented By: Jason R. Parish
Represented By: Scott A. Barbour
Represented By: Jay P. Lefkowitz
Represented By: Theodore Reed Stephens
Represented By: Robert J. Muldoon Jr.
Represented By: Lauren M. Durity
Represented By: Michael C. Occhuizzo
Represented By: Daniel J. Gomez
Represented By: Matthew T. Richardson
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Alexander L. Berg
Represented By: Courtney Amber Clark
Represented By: Elizabeth I. Hack
Represented By: John B. Clark
Represented By: Crystal R. Brown
Represented By: John K. Crisham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASTELLAS PHARMA US, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOECHST MARION ROUSSEL, INC.
Represented By: Cable Matthew Frost
Represented By: Walker W. Jones III
Represented By: David Friederich Maron
Represented By: Jesse Mitchell III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Nada Djordjevic
Represented By: Anthony C. Porcelli
Represented By: Thomas J. Hennessey
Represented By: Robert R. Stauffer
Represented By: Brandon L. Bigelow
Represented By: J. Rheba Rutkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALCON LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: J. Gordon Cooney
Represented By: Thomas V. Hagerty
Represented By: Alicia M. Freind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS PRODUCTS, L.P.
Represented By: Yumeka Burt Rushing
Represented By: Jack M. Stover
Represented By: Erik Haas
Represented By: Carlton W. Reeves
Represented By: Andrew D. Schau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Christopher J. Cunio
Represented By: Martin F. Gaynor III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Scott R. Lassar
Represented By: Erik Haas
Represented By: Carlton W. Reeves
Represented By: Charles John Biro
Represented By: Scott David Stein
Represented By: Andrew D. Schau
Represented By: Jordan Samuel Ginsberg
Represented By: William F. Cavanaugh Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMOUR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER PHARMACEUTICAL
Represented By: Frank A. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLAXOSMITHKLINE, PLC
Represented By: Robert W. Shely
Represented By: Rodney Wayne Ott
Represented By: Frederick G. Herold
Represented By: Ralph T. Lepore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHIRON CORPORATION
Represented By: D. Jacques Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN, INC.
Represented By: David D. Bassett
Represented By: Clifford Katz
Represented By: Brendan Cyr
Represented By: Sung W. Kim
Represented By: William A. Escobar
Represented By: Philip D. Robben
Represented By: Neil Merkl
Represented By: Martin F. Murphy
Represented By: Thomas Jefferson Bone III
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Quinlan
Represented By: Christopher C. Palermo
Represented By: William N. Reed
Represented By: Marie E. Choi
Represented By: William C. Pentecost
Represented By: Jessica K. Shook
Represented By: Michael J. Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHWARZPHARMA HOLDINGS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK KGAA
Represented By: John M. Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM ROXANE, INC
Represented By: Lauren O. Casazza
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: Brian P. Kavanaugh
Represented By: Richard M. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAXTER INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Jill Brenner Meixel
Represented By: Paula W. Render
Represented By: Alicia Insley
Represented By: Kathryn L. Holloman
Represented By: Lisa A. Hall
Represented By: Robert J. Higgins
Represented By: Michael S. D'Orsi
Represented By: Kenneth Wellington Brothers
Represented By: Merle Miller Delancey Jr.
Represented By: Vincent John Montell
Represented By: Karl Angelo Fazio
Represented By: Charles V. Mehler
Represented By: Peter E. Gelhaar
Represented By: Amy Lewis Champagne
Represented By: Jason D. Wallach
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Aaronson
Represented By: Neil Alden
Represented By: Michael Sennett
Represented By: Jason Bruno
Represented By: Shamir Patel
Represented By: Tina D. Reynolds
Represented By: Curtis Bergen
Represented By: Jodi Trulove
Represented By: Andrew J. Jackson
Represented By: Vincent M. DeBella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGOURON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Vivian M. Quinn
Represented By: Mark D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.BRAUN OF AMERICA
Represented By: Colin R. Kass
Represented By: Daniel F. Attridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ, INC.
Represented By: David L. Kleinman
Represented By: Molly Mitchell Walker
Represented By: Thomas M. Biesty
Represented By: Joshua Weedman
Represented By: Paul Olszowka
Represented By: Michael Desimone
Represented By: Dwight A. Healy
Represented By: Michael J. Gallagher
Represented By: Raj Gandesha
Represented By: Wayne A. Cross
Represented By: Daniel R. Cohen
Represented By: Lara A. Berwanger
Represented By: Heather K. McDevitt
Represented By: Catherine R. Castaldo
Represented By: Joseph Angland
Represented By: Paul B. Carberry
Represented By: Philip B. Sineneng
Represented By: Danielle Audette
Represented By: Sheryl L. Dickey
Represented By: Marc E. Ackerman
Represented By: Victoria L. Oswald
Represented By: Ronald Edward McMillan
Represented By: Michael R. Wolford
Represented By: Brian L. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORGANON PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC
Represented By: Jennifer Aurora
Represented By: David M. Covey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.H. BOEHRINGER SOHN GRUNDSTUCKSVERWALTUNG GMBH & COMPANY KG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHARMA-INVESTMENT LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENSIA SICOR, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ETHEX CORPORATION
Represented By: C. Michael Moore
Represented By: Steven S. Diamond
Represented By: Richard T. Sullivan
Represented By: Gregory J. McDonald
Represented By: Scott A. Birnbaum
Represented By: Mark A. Flessner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By: James S. Zucker
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Sclafani
Represented By: Daniel J. Cloherty
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Marconi
Represented By: Christopher A. Shapley
Represented By: Steven M. Edwards
Represented By: Caesar Kinnier Lastimosa
Represented By: Sandhya P. Kawatra
Represented By: Lyndon M. Tretter
Represented By: Anthony J. Anscombe
Represented By: Kenneth D. Klein
Represented By: Thomas Edmund Dwyer Jr.
Represented By: Patricia K. Lundvall
Represented By: Melanie Matison Brown
Represented By: George Ian Brandon
Represented By: Thomas J. Sweeney
Represented By: Morris Waisbrot
Represented By: David Newmann
Represented By: Azure Marie Aronsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLAXO WELLCOME PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP., d/b/a GlaxoSmithKline
Represented By: Brennan J. Torregrossa
Represented By: Geoffrey E. Hobart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAULDING PHARMACEUTICALS
Represented By: Cheryl A. Mitchell
Represented By: Robert Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENSTONE LTD
Represented By: Vivian M. Quinn
Represented By: Mark D. Smith
Represented By: Alfred O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDIMMUNE, INC.
Represented By: James V. Hayes
Represented By: Manish K. Mital
Represented By: Steven M. Umin
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Represented By: John Adam Crawford
Represented By: Michael B. Hewes
Represented By: Joseph E. Zdarsky
Represented By: K. Michael Sawicki
Represented By: Mark A. Dreher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: Brian P. Kavanaugh
Represented By: Richard M. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEY PHARMA, L.P.
Represented By: Clifford Katz
Represented By: Philip D. Robben
Represented By: Neil Merkl
Represented By: Martin F. Murphy
Represented By: Sarah L. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE, INC.
Represented By: Kevin R. Sullivan
Represented By: Simeon E. Schopf
Represented By: Lee Davis Thames
Represented By: John D. Shakow
Represented By: Vivian M. Quinn
Represented By: Augusta Ridley
Represented By: Ann H. Malekzadeh
Represented By: Grace Rodriguez
Represented By: Mark A. Dreher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAXTER HEALTHCARE CORPORATION
Represented By: Alicia Insley
Represented By: Frank M. Holbrook
Represented By: Kathryn L. Holloman
Represented By: Lisa A. Hall
Represented By: Merle Miller Delancey Jr.
Represented By: Vincent John Montell
Represented By: Stephanie Rippee
Represented By: Karl Angelo Fazio
Represented By: Jocelyn L. Dyer
Represented By: Charles V. Mehler
Represented By: Paul R. Taskier
Represented By: Peter E. Gelhaar
Represented By: David Gunn
Represented By: Jonathan Uffelman
Represented By: Jason D. Wallach
Represented By: Neil Alden
Represented By: Jason Bruno
Represented By: Shamir Patel
Represented By: Tina D. Reynolds
Represented By: Curtis Bergen
Represented By: Jodi Trulove
Represented By: Andrew J. Jackson
Represented By: Joseph G. Derespino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: Scott R. Lassar
Represented By: Mary G. Pryor
Represented By: Yumeka Burt Rushing
Represented By: Jack M. Stover
Represented By: Erik Haas
Represented By: Jason Brett Fliegel
Represented By: Carlton W. Reeves
Represented By: Mark Gregory Young
Represented By: Charles John Biro
Represented By: Niraj J. Parekh
Represented By: Scott David Stein
Represented By: Violeta I. Balan
Represented By: Asish Shanker Prasad
Represented By: Andrew D. Schau
Represented By: Tyrone C. Fahner
Represented By: Adeel Abdullah Mangi
Represented By: Jordan Samuel Ginsberg
Represented By: William F. Cavanaugh Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEDFORD LABORATORIES
Represented By: Douglas L. Rogers
Represented By: Paul J. Coval
Represented By: Darrell A.H. Miller
Represented By: Randal C. Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENZYME CORPORATION
Represented By: Roy D. Campbell III
Represented By: John R. Therien
Represented By: Eric Paul Christofferson
Represented By: Lynn M. Blake
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Rick A. La Trace
Represented By: Brian T. Rafferty
Represented By: Robert W. Wilkinson
Represented By: W. Patrick Downes
Represented By: Peter J. Venaglia
Represented By: William F. Costigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY
Represented By: Lori A. Schechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIOGEN, INC.
Represented By: Maura T. Healey
Represented By: Andrew R. Varcoe
Represented By: James C. Burling
Represented By: William A. Davis
Represented By: Kimberly I. Friday
Represented By: William F. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTHECON, INC.
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Marconi
Represented By: Jacob Elberg
Represented By: Steven M. Edwards
Represented By: Lyndon M. Tretter
Represented By: Patricia K. Lundvall
Represented By: George Ian Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA COMPANY
Represented By: Lori A. Schechter
Represented By: John Mackay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHIRE US INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 151-200
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA L.P.
Represented By: Lori A. Schechter
Represented By: Kevin A. Ricotta
Represented By: Megan M. Auchincloss
Represented By: Oliver Metzger
Represented By: James E. Johnson
Represented By: Timur S. Engin
Represented By: Robert S. DeLuca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO BIOTECH PRODUCTS, LP
Represented By: Erik Haas
Represented By: Carlton W. Reeves
Represented By: Mark Gregory Young
Represented By: Niraj J. Parekh
Represented By: Andrew D. Schau
Represented By: Adeel Abdullah Mangi
Represented By: William F. Cavanaugh Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZENECA HOLDINGS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVENTIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: Andrea Schillaci
Represented By: Jonathan S. Hickey
Represented By: David M. Glynn
Represented By: Joseph G. Matye
Represented By: Michael F. Perley
Represented By: Pamela M. Overton
Represented By: Jennifer H. McGee
Represented By: Nicholas P. Mizell
Represented By: Brian T. Feeney
Represented By: Robert M. Smith
Represented By: James P. Muehlberger
Represented By: Brian G. Fedotin
Represented By: Alan Mansfield
Represented By: Aimee E. Bierman
Represented By: Cara E. Corbett
Represented By: Nicola R. Heskett
Represented By: Carlos Provencio
Represented By: Aaron Schepler
Represented By: Michael L. Koon
Represented By: Michael DeMarco
Represented By: Jeffrey S. King
Represented By: Jeanne Elizabeth Demers
Represented By: Gregory M. Petouvis
Represented By: Paul S. Schleifman
Represented By: Robert J. McCully
Represented By: Thomas C. Chabanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEPRACOR INC.
Represented By: Robert P. Sherman
Represented By: Lisa Stephanie Core
Represented By: Richard D. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UCB, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IVAX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Jennifer Gardner Levy
Represented By: Robert F. Stacy Jr.
Represented By: James W. Matthews
Represented By: Douglas T. Miracle
Represented By: Courtney Amber Clark
Represented By: John B. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN HOME PRODUCTS CORP.
Represented By: James C. Burling
Represented By: William F. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF IOWA
Represented By: Mitchell R. Jensen
Represented By: J Bradley Vatrt
Represented By: Charles Roderick Reynolds
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Aaron D. Hovan
Represented By: William L. Brauch
Represented By: Kathryn Bale
Represented By: James P. Carroll
Represented By: Joanne M. Cicala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COUNTY OF GREENE
Represented By: Roger W. Kirby
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Aaron D. Hovan
Represented By: Joanne M. Cicala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ACTION ALLIANCE OF SENIOR CITIZENS OF GREATER PHILADELPHIA
Represented By: Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Dianne Martha Nast
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Fegan
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Represented By: Blake M. Harper
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: Marc H. Edelson
Represented By: Jonathan D. Karmel
Represented By: Kirk B. Hulett
Represented By: Jennifer F. Connolly
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Represented By: Sean R. Matt
Represented By: Ira N. Richards
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COUNTY OF DUTCHESS
Represented By: Michael Coons
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Aaron D. Hovan
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: James P. Carroll
Represented By: Joanne M. Cicala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COUNTY OF ONEIDA
Represented By: Roger W. Kirby
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Aaron D. Hovan
Represented By: Joanne M. Cicala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KIMBERLY K. HOOVER
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COUNTY OF MADISON
Represented By: Roger W. Kirby
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Aaron D. Hovan
Represented By: Joanne M. Cicala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF HAWAII
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Gary Senega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COUNTY OF CAYUGA
Represented By: Roger W. Kirby
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Aaron D. Hovan
Represented By: Joanne M. Cicala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VERMONT PUBLIC INTEREST RESEARCH GROUP
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: David J. Bershad
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman
Represented By: Nicole Y. Brumsted
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Michael J. Flannery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF ARIZONA
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Ann Thompson Uglietta
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Robert B. Carey
Represented By: Sean R. Matt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COUNTY OF MONROE
Represented By: Michael E. Davis
Represented By: Roger W. Kirby
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Aaron D. Hovan
Represented By: Joanne M. Cicala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NATIONAL AUTOMATIC SPRINKLER INDUSTRY WELFARE FUND
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CONGRESS OF CALIFORNIA SENIORS
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman
Represented By: Nicole Y. Brumsted
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: David H. Bershad
Represented By: Michael J. Flannery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COUNTY OF JEFFERSON
Represented By: Roger W. Kirby
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Aaron D. Hovan
Represented By: Joanne M. Cicala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MURIEL TONACCHIO, representative of the Estate of Wilma Mort
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Edward Notargiacomo
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COUNTY OF FULTON
Represented By: Roger W. Kirby
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Aaron D. Hovan
Represented By: Joanne M. Cicala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROBERT J. SWANSTON
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LEROY TOWNSEND, Individually and on behalf of other similarly situated
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Friedman
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF TX
Represented By: W. Rick Copeland
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Greg Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: Christopher K. Barry-Smith
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RICHARD WESSELS, as personal representative of the Estate of Susan Wessels
Represented By: Jennifer F. Connolly
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Edward Notargiacomo
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHN B. RICE
Represented By: James A. Quadra
Represented By: Rebecca Bedwell-Coll
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Robert D. Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DONALD E. HAVILAND, JR.
Represented By: Donald E. Haviland Jr.
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COLORADO PROGRESSIVE COALITION
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman
Represented By: Nicole Y. Brumsted
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: David H. Bershad
Represented By: Michael J. Flannery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COUNTY OF STEUBEN
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Joanne M. Cicala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MAINE CONSUMERS FOR AFFORDABLE HEALTH CARE
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Represented By: David J. Bershad
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman
Represented By: Edward Notargiacomo
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TWIN CITIES BAKERY WORKERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND
Represented By: David Woodward
Represented By: Brian L. Williams
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Fegan
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Represented By: Blake M. Harper
Represented By: Samuel D. Heins
Represented By: Kirk B. Hulett
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Susan E. MacMenamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CITIZENS FOR CONSUMER JUSTICE
Represented By: J. Douglas Richards
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman
Represented By: Nicole Y. Brumsted
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: David H. Bershad
Represented By: Michael J. Flannery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF ILLINOIS
Represented By: Lisa Madigan
Represented By: Steven Fermon
Represented By: P. Jeffrey Archibald
Represented By: Timothy Nimrod
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Samuel S. Miller
Represented By: Charles Barnhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Carol Hunt
Represented By: Richard C. Heidlage
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Rand J. Riklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF DELAWARE
Represented By: Peter A. Mullin
Represented By: M. Jane Brady
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HEALTH CARE FOR ALL
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: David J. Bershad
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman
Represented By: Nicole Y. Brumsted
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Michael J. Flannery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COUNTY OF ONONDAGA
Represented By: Roger W. Kirby
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Aaron D. Hovan
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Joanne M. Cicala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES, ex rel.
Represented By: Justin Draycott
Represented By: Barbara Healy Smith
Represented By: A. Ann Woolfolk
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: George Bunsen Henderson II
Represented By: Rebecca L. Ford
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Ana Maria Martinez
Represented By: James Jeffrey Fauci
Represented By: Mark A. Lavine
Represented By: Laurie Oberembt
Represented By: Michelle Townes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COUNTY OF WARREN
Represented By: Roger W. Kirby
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Aaron D. Hovan
Represented By: Joanne M. Cicala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF UT
Represented By: Mitchell R. Jensen
Represented By: W. Daniel Miles
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Clinton C. Carter
Represented By: David Stallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY
Represented By: P. Jeffrey Archibald
Represented By: C. David Johnstone
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Paula J. Holbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WEST VIRGINIA CITIZEN ACTION
Represented By: David J. Bershad
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman
Represented By: Nicole Y. Brumsted
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Michael J. Flannery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COUNTY OF CATTARAUGUS
Represented By: Roger W. Kirby
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Aaron D. Hovan
Represented By: Joanne M. Cicala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SUFFOLK COUNTY (NY)
Represented By: Michael Coons
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Aaron D. Hovan
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Daniel Kovel
Represented By: Thomas W. Coons
Represented By: James P. Carroll
Represented By: Lloyd Donders
Represented By: Joanne M. Cicala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GRAY PANTHERS OF SACRAMENTO
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Represented By: David J. Bershad
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman
Represented By: Edward Notargiacomo
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Joseph Danis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROCKLAND COUNTY
Represented By: Daniel Hume
Represented By: Roger W. Kirby
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Daniel Kovel
Represented By: Lloyd Donders
Represented By: Joanne M. Cicala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WISCONSIN CITIZEN ACTION
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: David J. Bershad
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman
Represented By: Nicole Y. Brumsted
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Michael J. Flannery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ZACHARY T. BENTLEY
Represented By: Jonathan Shapiro
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF CT
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS
Represented By: David J. Bershad
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman
Represented By: Nicole Y. Brumsted
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Michael J. Flannery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MASSACHUSETTS SENIOR ACTION COUNCIL
Represented By: David J. Bershad
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman
Represented By: Nicole Y. Brumsted
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Michael J. Flannery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COUNTY OF WESTCHESTER
Represented By: Roger W. Kirby
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Joanne M. Cicala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NORTH CAROLINA FAIR SHARE
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Represented By: David J. Bershad
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman
Represented By: Edward Notargiacomo
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Joseph Danis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COUNTY OF WYOMING
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Aaron D. Hovan
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Joanne M. Cicala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COUNTY OF CORTLAND
Represented By: Roger W. Kirby
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Aaron D. Hovan
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Joanne M. Cicala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHN M. LOCKWOOD, Officer and Director of Ven-A-Care of the Florida Keys, Inc.
Represented By: James Joseph Breen
Represented By: Atlee W. Wampler
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GREG HAMILTON, Realtor
Represented By: Lauren John Udden
Represented By: Pooja Rajaram
Represented By: Mark Allen Kleiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COUNTY OF COLUMBIA, THE
Represented By: Roger W. Kirby
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Aaron D. Hovan
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Joanne M. Cicala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VEN-A-CARE OF THE FLORIDA KEYS, INC.
Represented By: John E. Clark
Represented By: Adam D. Miller
Represented By: Shauna B. Itri
Represented By: James Joseph Breen
Represented By: Margaret C. Moore
Represented By: Walter J. Lack
Represented By: Jonathan Shapiro
Represented By: Raymond C. Winter
Represented By: Atlee W. Wampler
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: C. Jarrett Anderson
Represented By: Robert S. Libman
Represented By: Glenn Grossenbacher
Represented By: Susan Schneider Thomas
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Alison W. Simon
Represented By: Kenneth M. Resnik
Represented By: Joseph C. Wilson
Represented By: Philip L. Gregory
Represented By: Glenn W. MacTaggart
Represented By: Larry Black
Represented By: Gary L. Azorsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CONNECTICUT CITIZEN ACTION GROUP
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Represented By: David J. Bershad
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman
Represented By: Edward Notargiacomo
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Joseph Danis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MINNESOTA SENIOR FEDERATION
Represented By: David J. Bershad
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman
Represented By: Nicole Y. Brumsted
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Michael J. Flannery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS, LOCAL NO. 68 WELFARE FUND
Represented By: TerriAnne Benedetto
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COUNTY OF HERKIMER
Represented By: Roger W. Kirby
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Aaron D. Hovan
Represented By: Joanne M. Cicala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COUNTY OF ALBANY
Represented By: Roger W. Kirby
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: OXFORD HEALTH PLANS, LLC
Represented By: Julie B. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: EXCELLUS BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: KLINE & SPECTER, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL HERITAGE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Benjamin Martin Wattenmaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JONATHAN MARKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: HEALTH NET, INC.
Represented By: Kevin McGinty
Represented By: Lance A. Selfridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERISOURCEBERGEN
Represented By: Meredith Myers LeConey
Represented By: Steven E. Bizar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: TUFTS ASSOCIATED HEALTH MAINTENANCE ORGANIZATION, INC.
Represented By: Anne Leslie Josephson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Represented By: John Albert Kiernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DEMRA JORDAN
Represented By: John P. Cowart
Represented By: Robert D. Hillman
Represented By: Scott C. Kinsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Ronald J. Ranta
Represented By: Donald E. Haviland Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MILBERG WEISS BERSHAD & SCHULMAN, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AETNA, INC.
Represented By: Todd S. Garber
Represented By: Peter Dexter St. Phillip Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MILBERG LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: HUMANA, INC.
Represented By: Todd S. Garber
Represented By: Peter Dexter St. Phillip Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: HAWAII MEDICAL SERVICE ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: FIRST DATABANK, INC.
Represented By: Richard J. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CONNECTICUT GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: Todd S. Garber
Represented By: Peter Dexter St. Phillip Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: M. JOYCE HOWE
Represented By: Donald E. Haviland Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: COUNTY OF ORANGE
Represented By: David Lee Darwin
Represented By: Theresa Ann Vitello
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn
Represented By: Stanley J. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ESSEX SUPERIOR COURT JUDGE
Represented By: Peter A. Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MAN-U SERVICE CONTRACT TRUST FUND
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: BAXTER PHARMACEUTICAL.
Represented By: Matthew A. Rossi
Represented By: J. Andrew Jackson
Represented By: Merle Miller Delancey Jr.
Represented By: Richard D. Raskin
Represented By: Clark Vellis
Represented By: Lisa Colcock Phelan
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dunne
Represented By: Thomas B. Hamilton
Represented By: Tina D. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: JOHN DOES 1-200
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Represented By: Paul K. Dueffert
Represented By: Andrew T. Boone
Represented By: Andrew R. McConville
Represented By: Stephen R. Delinsky
Represented By: Anthony M. Moccia
Represented By: Richard M. Cooper
Represented By: Thomas J. Roberts
Represented By: Erik J. Frick
Represented By: S. Paul Battaglia
Represented By: Kimberly Perrotta Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KREMERS URBAN DEV. CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STANLEY C. HOPKINS
Represented By: Jack E. Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANDRX PHARMACEUTICAL
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Wieczkowski
Represented By: Brooke Ferris III
Represented By: Ryan J. Mitchell
Represented By: Katy Ellen Koski
Represented By: Ann M. Campbell
Represented By: Richard O. Burson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: Ronald G. Peresich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ACTVIS, US
Represented By: Richard A. Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCHEIN PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Represented By: Stephen A. Ecenia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MCNEIL CONSUMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AG SCIENTIFIC, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROXANE INC
Represented By: Bill L. Bryant
Represented By: Richard M. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ORGANON USA
Represented By: Dawn M. Berhony
Represented By: William P. Campos
Represented By: Barry Gerstman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AVENTIS BEHRING LLC
Represented By: David M. Glynn
Represented By: Cable Matthew Frost
Represented By: Walker W. Jones III
Represented By: David Friederich Maron
Represented By: Jesse Mitchell III
Represented By: William P. Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SERONO INTERNATIONAL, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHARMACIA & UPJOHN, INC.
Represented By: Jennifer B. Jordan
Represented By: Barry D. Halpern
Represented By: David C. McElhinney
Represented By: John C. Dodds
Represented By: Joseph G. Adams
Represented By: Stephanie Vithoulkas Hackett
Represented By: Michael N. Feder
Represented By: Mitchell Edwards
Represented By: Mark D. Smith
Represented By: Scott A. Stempel
Represented By: Jason E. Baranski
Represented By: Joseph B.G. Fay
Represented By: John Clayton Everett
Represented By: Robert Alan White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WARRICK PHARMACEUTICALS CORPORATION
Represented By: Thomas Neal Jamerson
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Miller
Represented By: Crystal D. Talley
Represented By: Carisa A. Klemeyer
Represented By: Earle Jay Maiman
Represented By: Christopher Robert Dillon
Represented By: Dana George Toole
Represented By: Kim B. Nemirow
Represented By: Michael B. Wallace
Represented By: C. Michael Moore
Represented By: Andrew Foster Halaby
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Bennett
Represented By: Palmer G. Vance
Represented By: Ryan Michael DiSantis
Represented By: Jon Steven Baughman
Represented By: John T. Montgomery
Represented By: Jobe Galope Danganan
Represented By: Adam Lang Lang
Represented By: Kirsten V. Mayer
Represented By: Russell Patrick Plato
Represented By: John R. Therien
Represented By: Sheila L. Birnbaum
Represented By: Davisson F. Dunlap
Represented By: Eric Paul Christofferson
Represented By: Lynn M. Blake
Represented By: John P. Bueker
Represented By: Bryan R. Diederich
Represented By: Karin B. Torgerson
Represented By: Angela Marie Covington
Represented By: James D. Houston
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Represented By: David C. Potter
Represented By: John P. McDonald
Represented By: Richard L. Scheff
Represented By: Adam Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALL DEFENDANTS
Represented By: Jeremy Y. Weltman
Represented By: Nicholas C. Theodorou
Represented By: Andrew D. Schau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BIOVAIL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Michael T. Mervis
Represented By: Edwin Baum
Represented By: Lloyd B. Chinn
Represented By: Elise M. Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SICOR, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RELIANT PHARMACEAUTICALS, LLC
Represented By: Bruce A. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HOWARD A. SMITHLINE
Represented By: Frederick G. Herold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NOVAPHARM LTD.
Represented By: Jay B. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SANOFI-SYNTHELABO, INC.
Represented By: James P. Muehlberger
Represented By: Michael L. Koon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANDRX CORPORATION
Represented By: James W. Matthews
Represented By: Katy Ellen Koski
Represented By: Robert J. Muldoon Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PUREPAC PHARMACEUTICAL, CO.
Represented By: David E. Bell
Represented By: Janine L. Scancarelli
Represented By: Alex E. Sadler
Represented By: Douglas Farquhar
Represented By: Lisa J. Savitt
Represented By: Gregory J. McDonald
Represented By: James P. Ellison
Represented By: John R. Fleder
Represented By: Birgit Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH
Represented By: Bill L. Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELIZABETH M. BERGEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RJL SYSTEMS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EMD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Kelly Overstreet Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: CORINNA CONNICK
Represented By: Thomas J. Connick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?