In re: Nexium Antitrust
Plaintiff: SUPERVALU, INC., MEIJER, INC., KROGER COMPANY, WALGREEN CO., RITE AID HEADQUARTERS CORPORATION, HEB GROCERY CO. LP, BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY INC., MEIJER DISTRIBUTION, INC., CVS, INC., AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., on behalf of itself and others similarly situated, LABORERS INTERNATIONAL UNION OF NORTH AMERICA LOCAL 345 HEALTH CARE FUND, RITE AID CORPORATION, AMERICAN SALES COMPANY, LLC, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, SAFEWAY INCORPORATED, VALUE DRUG COMPANY, ECKERD CORPORATION, GIANT EAGLE, INC. and MAXI DRUG, INC., d/b/a Brooks Pharmacy
Defendant / Appellant: RANBAXY INC., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICAL LP, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., ASTRAZENECA AB and AKTIEBOLAGET HASSLE
Interested Party: JONATHAN RICH, EDWARD BREIVIK, CHRISTOPHER WIRTH, MCKESSON CORPORATION, TERRY LYNN NICHOLAS, JAMES JARED THULE, CAREMARKPCS, LLC and CHRISTOPHER DONNELLY
Plaintiff / Appellee: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 595 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, NEW YORK HOTEL TRADES COUNCIL AND HOTEL ASSOCIATION OF NEW YORK CITY, INC. HEALTH BENEFITS FUND, ALLIED SERVICES DIVISION WELFARE FUND, MICHIGAN REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS EMPLOYEE BENEFITS FUND, UNITED FOOD & COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNIONS AND EMPLOYERS MIDWEST HEALTH BENEFITS FUND, LABORERS INTERNATIONAL UNION OF NORTH AMERICA LOCAL 17 HEALTH CARE FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS DISTRICT NO. 15 HEALTH FUND, LABORERS INTERNATIONAL UNION OF NORTH AMERICA LOCAL 35 HEALTH CARE FUND, FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE MIAMI LODGE 20 INSURANCE TRUST FUND and A.F. OF L. - A.G.C. BUILDING TRADES WELFARE PLAN
Amicus Curiae: AMERICAN ANTITRUST INSTITUTE, US PUBLIC INTEREST RESEARCH GROUP, NATIONAL LEGISLATIVE ASSOCIATION FOR PRESCRIPTION DRUG PRICES, COMMUNITY CATALYST, INC., CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. and AMERICAN INDEPENDENT BUSINESS ALLIANCE
Intervenor: EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC. and CARDINAL HEALTH, INC.
Case Number: 14-1521
Filed: May 15, 2014
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Archives location information for appendices only. Transfer Number: 276-2019-0010. Box Number: 69. The Court of Appeals record is held at the Federal Records Center in Waltham, MA. [14-1511, 14-1513, 14-1514, 14-1520, 14-1521, 14-1528, 14-1530, 14-1531, 14-1533, 14-1535, 14-1538, 14-1539] (ATC) [Entered: 03/30/2020 12:02 PM]
August 14, 2015 Mail returned as undeliverable to interested party Terry L. Nichols. Copy of July 20, 2015 letter. Forwarding address unknown. [14-1521] (CMP) [Entered: 08/14/2015 08:40 AM]
July 20, 2015 LETTER sent to Not Party Terry Lynn Nicholas in 14-1521, 14-1522. [14-1521, 14-1522] (TS) [Entered: 07/20/2015 02:03 PM]
April 20, 2015 MOTION requesting a copy of documents and request for removal from case filed by pro se Not Party Terry Lynn Nicholas in 14-1521, 14-1522. Certificate of service was not included. [14-1521, 14-1522] (CMP) [Entered: 04/22/2015 09:21 AM]
April 8, 2015 LETTER sent to pro se Christopher Donnelly regarding his recent correspondence in 14-1521, 14-1522. [14-1521, 14-1522] (CMP) [Entered: 04/08/2015 02:18 PM]
March 23, 2015 LETTER filed by ro se not party Christopher Donnelly regarding Taxation of Costs. Certificate of service was not included. [14-1521, 14-1522] (CMP) [Entered: 03/23/2015 03:44 PM]
March 3, 2015 TAXATION of costs issued in favor of Appellees A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund and United Food & Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund in 14-1521, 14-1522 in the amount of $128.40. [14-1521, 14-1522] (CMP) [Entered: 03/03/2015 09:40 AM]
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER: Appellees' opposed February 3, 2015 Bill of Costs is allowed. The Clerk shall tax, in the usual course, costs in the amount $128.40 in favor of the appellees. [14-1521, 14-1522] (CMP) [Entered: 03/02/2015 10:03 AM]
February 18, 2015 MANDATE issued. [14-1521, 14-1522] (CMP) [Entered: 02/18/2015 09:06 AM]
February 18, 2015 RESPONSE filed by Not Party Terry Lynn Nicholas in 14-1521, 14-1522 to bill of costs [ # 5883890-2 ]. Certificate of service was not included. [14-1521, 14-1522] (CMP) [Entered: 02/18/2015 04:11 PM]
February 3, 2015 LETTER filed by Attorney David A. Schumacher for Not Party Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation in 14-1521, 14-1522. Certificate of service was not included. [14-1521, 14-1522] (CMP) [Entered: 02/04/2015 10:53 AM]
February 3, 2015 BILL of costs filed by Appellees A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund and United Food & Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund in 14-1521, 14-1522. Certificate of service dated 02/03/2015. [14-1521, 14-1522] (NLO) [Entered: 02/03/2015 02:40 PM]
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge; Timothy Belcher Dyk, Appellate Judge and William J. Kayatta , Jr., Appellate Judge denying motion to dismiss case filed by Appellants. [14-1521, 14-1522] (SBT) [Entered: 01/21/2015 03:55 PM]
January 21, 2015 OPINION issued by Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge; Timothy Belcher Dyk, Appellate Judge and William J. Kayatta , Jr., Appellate Judge. Published. [14-1521, 14-1522] (SBT) [Entered: 01/21/2015 04:22 PM]
January 21, 2015 JUDGMENT entered by Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge; William J. Kayatta , Jr., Appellate Judge and Timothy Belcher Dyk, Appellate Judge. Affirmed. [14-1521, 14-1522] (SBT) [Entered: 01/21/2015 04:27 PM]
December 19, 2014 RESPONSE filed by Appellees A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund and United Food & Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund in 14-1521 to motion to dismiss case [ # 5872980-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 12/19/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (GD) [Entered: 12/19/2014 03:25 PM]
December 10, 2014 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Appellants Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. in 14-1521, 14-1522. Certificate of service dated 12/10/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (KKS) [Entered: 12/10/2014 06:42 PM]
October 3, 2014 RESPONSE to citation of supplemental authorities pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) [ # 5857338-2 ] filed by Appellants Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. in 14-1521, 14-1522. Certificate of service dated 10/03/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (KKS) [Entered: 10/03/2014 06:32 PM]
October 3, 2014 Duplicate copy of CITATION of supplemental authorities pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) filed by Appellants Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. in 14-1521, 14-1522. Certificate of service dated 10/02/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (GAK) [Entered: 10/06/2014 08:49 AM]
October 2, 2014 CITATION of supplemental authorities pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) filed by Appellees A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund and United Food & Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund in 14-1521. Certificate of service dated 10/02/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (GD) [Entered: 10/02/2014 04:43 PM]
August 28, 2014 RESPONSE to citation of supplemental authorities pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) [ # 5848483-2 ] filed by Appellants Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. in 14-1521, 14-1522. Certificate of service dated 08/28/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (KKS) [Entered: 08/28/2014 01:21 PM]
August 26, 2014 CITATION of supplemental authorities pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) filed by Appellees A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund and United Food & Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund in 14-1521. Certificate of service dated 08/26/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (GD) [Entered: 08/26/2014 05:30 PM]
July 31, 2014 CASE argued. Panel: Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge; Timothy Belcher Dyk, Appellate Judge and William J. Kayatta , Jr., Appellate Judge. Arguing attorneys: Kannon K. Shanmugam for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca AB and Aktiebolaget Hassle and Kenneth A. Wexler for A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, United Food & Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund and International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health and Welfare Fund in 14-1522. [14-1521, 14-1522] (LM) [Entered: 07/31/2014 03:46 PM]
July 29, 2014 REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Nicholas S. Napolitan for Not Party McKesson Corporation in 14-1521, 14-1522. Certificate of service was not included. [14-1521, 14-1522] (GAK) [Entered: 07/29/2014 09:10 AM]
July 29, 2014 REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Caitlin G. Coslett for Not Parties Meijer, Inc., American Sales Company, LLC, Value Drug Company, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. and Meijer Distribution, Inc. in 14-1521, 14-1522. Certificate of service was not included. [14-1521, 14-1522] (GAK) [Entered: 07/29/2014 09:07 AM]
July 29, 2014 NOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorneys have been removed from the service list for this case: Caitlin G. Coslett for Meijer, Inc., American Sales Company, LLC, Value Drug Company, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. and Meijer Distribution, Inc. and Nicholas S. Napolitan for McKesson Corporation in 14-1521, Caitlin G. Coslett for Meijer, Inc., American Sales Company, LLC, Value Drug Company, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. and Meijer Distribution, Inc., Nicholas S. Napolitan for McKesson Corporation and Robert J. Tucker for Cardinal Health, Inc. in 14-1522. [14-1521, 14-1522] (GAK) [Entered: 07/29/2014 09:16 AM]
July 29, 2014 NOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorneys have been removed from the service list for this case: Yechiel Michael Twersky for Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. in 14-1521, 14-1522. [14-1521, 14-1522] (GAK) [Entered: 07/29/2014 11:13 AM]
July 29, 2014 REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Yechiel Michael Twersky for Not Party Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. in 14-1521, 14-1522. Certificate of service was not included. [14-1521, 14-1522] (GAK) [Entered: 07/29/2014 10:41 AM]
July 25, 2014 NOTICE of filing the following transcript(s) in district court by Court Reporter Richard Henry Romanow in 14-1521, 14-1522: 07/11/2014, Motion Hearing. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. [14-1521, 14-1522] (GAK) [Entered: 07/25/2014 02:08 PM]
July 9, 2014 NINE (9) paper copies of reply brief [ # 5836217-2 ] submitted by Appellants Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. in 14-1521, 14-1522. [14-1521, 14-1522] (CC) [Entered: 07/09/2014 10:39 AM]
July 9, 2014 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 5835855-2 ] submitted by Amicus Curiae American Antitrust Institute in 14-1521, 14-1522. [14-1521, 14-1522] (CC) [Entered: 07/09/2014 10:50 AM]
July 9, 2014 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 5835877-2 ] submitted by Amicus Curiae Community Catalyst, Inc. in 14-1521, 14-1522. [14-1521, 14-1522] (CC) [Entered: 07/09/2014 11:44 AM]
July 7, 2014 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 5835827-2 ] submitted by Amicus Curiae Public Citizen, Inc. in 14-1521, 14-1522. [14-1521, 14-1522] (CC) [Entered: 07/07/2014 01:52 PM]
July 7, 2014 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Donald W. Myers for Not Party Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation in 14-1521, 14-1522. Copy of 6/6/14 Appellees' Briefing Notice. Forwarded to Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC, Two Liberty Place, 50 S. 16th Street, Suite 3200, Philadelphia, PA 19102-2555. [14-1521, 14-1522] (GAK) [Entered: 07/07/2014 03:37 PM]
July 3, 2014 DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Kenneth A. Wexler for Appellees A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, United Food & Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund and International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health and Welfare Fund in 14-1521. Certificate of service dated 07/03/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (KAW) [Entered: 07/03/2014 11:23 AM]
July 3, 2014 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by American Antitrust Institute in 14-1521, 14-1522 in support of Appellees. Certificate of service dated 06/26/2014. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 07/10/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (GAK) [Entered: 07/03/2014 11:36 AM]
July 3, 2014 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Public Citizen, Inc. in 14-1521 in support of Appellees. Certificate of service dated 06/26/2014. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 07/10/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (GAK) [Entered: 07/03/2014 10:48 AM]
July 3, 2014 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) American Antitrust Institute filed by Attorney Daniel E. Gustafson. Certificate of service dated 07/03/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (DEG) [Entered: 07/03/2014 10:58 AM]
July 3, 2014 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Amicus Curiae Public Citizen, Inc. in 14-1521, 14-1522. Certificate of service dated 06/26/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (GAK) [Entered: 07/03/2014 10:50 AM]
July 3, 2014 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Amicus Curiae American Antitrust Institute in 14-1521, 14-1522. Certificate of service dated 06/26/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (GAK) [Entered: 07/03/2014 11:38 AM]
July 3, 2014 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Amici Curiae American Independent Business Alliance, Community Catalyst, Inc., National Legislative Association for Prescription Drug Prices and US Public Interest Research Group in 14-1521, 14-1522. Certificate of service dated 06/26/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (GAK) [Entered: 07/03/2014 12:07 PM]
July 3, 2014 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) Community Catalyst, Inc. The National Legislative Association for Prescription Drug Prices ("NLARx") United States Public Interest Research Group ("U.S. PIRG") American Independent Business Alliance ("AMIBA") filed by Attorney Ellen Meriwether. Certificate of service dated 07/03/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (EM) [Entered: 07/03/2014 12:00 PM]
July 3, 2014 BRIEF tendered by Appellants Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. in 14-1521, 14-1522. Certificate of service dated 07/03/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (KKS) [Entered: 07/03/2014 07:17 PM]
July 3, 2014 REPLY BRIEF filed by appellants Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. in 14-1521, 14-1522. Certificate of service dated 07/03/2014. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 07/14/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (CLT) [Entered: 07/07/2014 12:06 PM]
July 3, 2014 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by American Independent Business Alliance, Community Catalyst, Inc., National Legislative Association for Prescription Drug Prices and US Public Interest Research Group in 14-1521, 14-1522 in support of Appellees. Certificate of service dated 06/26/2014. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 07/10/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (GAK) [Entered: 07/03/2014 12:05 PM]
July 2, 2014 DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Kannon K. Shanmugam for Appellants AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca AB and Aktiebolaget Hassle in 14-1521, 14-1522. Certificate of service dated 07/02/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (KKS) [Entered: 07/02/2014 05:42 PM]
June 30, 2014 NINE (9) paper copies of appellee/respondent brief [ # 5834231-2 ] submitted by Appellees A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, United Food & Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund and Movant American Antitrust Institute in 14-1521, 14-1522, [14-1521, 14-1522] (CC) [Entered: 07/01/2014 08:06 AM]
June 27, 2014 NOTICE of change of name effective June 25, 2014 filed by Amicus Curiae Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 14-1521, 14-1522. Certificate of service was not included. [14-1521, 14-1522] (GAK) [Entered: 06/27/2014 02:50 PM]
June 27, 2014 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund and United Food & Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund in 14-1521 and 14-1522. Certificate of service dated 06/26/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (DK) [Entered: 06/27/2014 08:44 AM]
June 27, 2014 APPELLEES' BRIEF filed by Appellees A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund and United Food & Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund in 14-1521 and 14-1522. Certificate of service dated 06/26/2014. Reply brief due 07/03/2014 for APPELLANTS Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 07/02/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (DK) [Entered: 06/27/2014 08:40 AM]
June 26, 2014 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by The American Antitrust Institute. Certificate of service dated 06/26/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (DEG) [Entered: 06/26/2014 04:43 PM]
June 26, 2014 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by Community Catalyst, Inc., National Legislative Association for Prescription Drug Prices, United States Public Interest Research Group, American Independent Business Alliance. Certificate of service dated 06/26/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (EM) [Entered: 06/26/2014 04:59 PM]
June 26, 2014 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) Public Citizen. Inc. filed by Attorney Scott L. Nelson. Certificate of service dated 06/26/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (SLN) [Entered: 06/26/2014 05:04 PM]
June 26, 2014 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by Public Citizen, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 06/26/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (SLN) [Entered: 06/26/2014 05:06 PM]
June 26, 2014 BRIEF tendered by Appellees A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund and United Food & Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund in 14-1521, 14-1522. Certificate of service dated 06/26/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (KAW) [Entered: 06/26/2014 03:19 PM]
June 19, 2014 CASE calendared: Thursday, 07/31/2014 Boston, MA Panel Courtroom. Designation form due 07/03/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (LM) [Entered: 06/19/2014 04:12 PM]
June 18, 2014 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL filed by Not Parties Burlington Drug Company Inc. and Value Drug Company in 14-1521. Certificate of service dated 06/18/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (BEG) [Entered: 06/18/2014 10:02 AM]
June 17, 2014 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 5831007-2 ] submitted by Amicus Curiae Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 14-1521. 14-1522, [14-1521, 14-1522] (CC) [Entered: 06/17/2014 12:23 PM]
June 16, 2014 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Amicus Curiae Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 14-1521, 14-1522 in support of Appellants. Certificate of service dated 06/12/2014. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 06/23/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (GAK) [Entered: 06/16/2014 08:57 AM]
June 16, 2014 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Amicus Curiae Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 14-1521, 14-1522. Certificate of service dated 06/12/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (GAK) [Entered: 06/16/2014 08:59 AM]
June 13, 2014 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees A.F. of L. - A.G.C. A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trade Council and Hotel Assoc of New York City, Inc. Helath Benefits Fund and United Food & Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund in 14-1521, 14-1522. Certificate of service dated 06/13/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (NLO) [Entered: 06/13/2014 10:35 AM]
June 12, 2014 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) Amicus Curiae Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed by Attorney Jeffrey S. Bucholtz. Certificate of service dated 06/12/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (JSB) [Entered: 06/12/2014 09:21 AM]
June 12, 2014 NOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorneys have been removed from the service list for this case: Robert J. Tucker for Cardinal Health, Inc.. [14-1521] (GAK) [Entered: 06/12/2014 09:36 AM]
June 12, 2014 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by Chamber of Commerice of the United States of America. Certificate of service dated 06/12/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (JSB) [Entered: 06/12/2014 02:10 PM]
June 12, 2014 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Michael J Rossi for Not Party Express Scripts, Inc.. Copy of Case Opening Notice. Forwarded to Conn Kavanaugh Rosenthal Peisch & Ford LLP, 10 Post Office Sq, 4th Flr, Boston, MA 02109. [14-1521] (GAK) [Entered: 06/12/2014 12:35 PM]
June 10, 2014 NINE (9) paper copies of appellant/petitioner brief [ # 5828944-2 ] submitted by Appellants Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, LTD and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. in 14-1521, Appellants AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, LTD and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. in 14-1522. [14-1521, 14-1522] (CC) [Entered: 06/10/2014 11:08 AM]
June 10, 2014 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by appellants Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, LTD and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. in 14-1521, 14-1522. Certificate of service dated 06/05/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (CLT) [Entered: 06/10/2014 10:58 AM]
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to consolidate cases filed by Appellants AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, LTD, Astrazeneca AB, Aktiebolaget Hassle, Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd.. [14-1521, 14-1522] (GAK) [Entered: 06/06/2014 12:02 PM]
June 6, 2014 APPELLANTS' BRIEF filed by appellants Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, LTD and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. in 14-1521, 14-1522. Certificate of service dated 06/05/2014. Brief due 06/26/2014 for appellees A.F. of L. - A.G.C. A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trade Council and Hotel Assoc of New York City, Inc. Helath Benefits Fund and United Food & Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 06/13/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (CLT) [Entered: 06/06/2014 12:23 PM]
June 6, 2014 JOINT APPENDIX filed by appellants Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, LTD and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. in 14-1521, 14-1522. Number of volumes: 1. Number of copies: 5. Certificate of service dated 06/05/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (CLT) [Entered: 06/09/2014 09:53 AM]
June 5, 2014 ASSENTED TO MOTION to consolidate cases filed by Appellants Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, LTD and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. in 14-1521, 14-1522. Certificate of service dated 06/05/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (KKS) [Entered: 06/05/2014 10:03 PM]
June 5, 2014 BRIEF tendered by Appellants Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, LTD and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. in 14-1521, 14-1522. Certificate of service dated 06/05/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (KKS) [Entered: 06/05/2014 10:07 PM]
May 29, 2014 REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Robert J. Tucker for Not Party Cardinal Health, Inc.. Certificate of service was not included. [14-1521] (GAK) [Entered: 05/29/2014 03:14 PM]
May 29, 2014 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees A.F. of L. - A.G.C. A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trade Council and Hotel Assoc of New York City, Inc. Helath Benefits Fund and United Food & Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund in 14-1521, 14-1522 filed by Attorney J. Douglas Richards. Certificate of service dated 05/29/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (JDR) [Entered: 05/29/2014 10:09 AM]
May 29, 2014 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP and Astrazeneca AB. Certificate of service dated 05/29/2014. [14-1521] (KKS) [Entered: 05/29/2014 03:53 PM]
May 29, 2014 AMENDED DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP and Astrazeneca AB. Certificate of service dated 05/29/2014. [14-1521]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (KKS) [Entered: 05/29/2014 06:36 PM]
May 29, 2014 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP and Astrazeneca AB indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 05/29/2014. [14-1521] (KKS) [Entered: 05/29/2014 04:03 PM]
May 28, 2014 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees A.F. of L. - A.G.C. A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trade Council and Hotel Assoc of New York City, Inc. Helath Benefits Fund and United Food & Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund in 14-1521, 14-1522 filed by Attorney Glen DeValerio. Certificate of service dated 05/28/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (GD) [Entered: 05/28/2014 03:21 PM]
May 28, 2014 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, .F. of L. - A.G.C. A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trade Council and Hotel Assoc of New York City, Inc. Helath Benefits Fund and United Food & Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund in 14-1521, 14-1522 filed by Attorney Jayne A. Goldstein. Certificate of service dated 05/28/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] CLERK'S NOTE: Party selection was incorrect and/or incomplete. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (JAG) [Entered: 05/28/2014 02:49 PM]
May 28, 2014 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees A.F. of L. - A.G.C. A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trade Council and Hotel Assoc of New York City, Inc. Helath Benefits Fund and United Food & Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund in 14-1521, 14-1522 filed by Attorney Nathaniel L. Orenstein. Certificate of service dated 05/28/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (NLO) [Entered: 05/28/2014 03:29 PM]
May 28, 2014 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees A.F. of L. - A.G.C. A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trade Council and Hotel Assoc of New York City, Inc. Helath Benefits Fund and United Food & Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund in 14-1521, 14-1522 filed by Attorney Kenneth A. Wexler. Certificate of service dated 05/28/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (KAW) [Entered: 05/28/2014 03:51 PM]
May 28, 2014 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees A.F. of L. - A.G.C. A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trade Council and Hotel Assoc of New York City, Inc. Helath Benefits Fund and United Food & Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund in 14-1521, 14-1522 filed by Attorney Steve D. Shadowen. Certificate of service dated 05/28/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (SDS) [Entered: 05/28/2014 05:00 PM]
May 22, 2014 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd. and Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc. in 14-1521, 14-1522 filed by Attorney J. Douglas Baldridge. Certificate of service dated 05/22/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (JDB) [Entered: 05/22/2014 12:44 PM]
May 22, 2014 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd. and Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc. in 14-1521, 14-1522 filed by Attorney Sarah Choi. Certificate of service dated 05/22/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (SEC) [Entered: 05/22/2014 12:57 PM]
May 22, 2014 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd. and Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc. in 14-1521, 14-1522 filed by Attorney Danielle R. Foley. Certificate of service dated 05/22/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (DRF) [Entered: 05/22/2014 12:30 PM]
May 22, 2014 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd. and Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc. in 14-1521, 14-1522 filed by Attorney Lisa Jose Fales. Certificate of service dated 05/22/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (LJF) [Entered: 05/22/2014 01:06 PM]
May 21, 2014 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. in 14-1521 filed by Attorney Kevin D. McDonald. Certificate of service dated 05/21/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] CLERK'S NOTE: Additional attachments must be filed separately. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (KDM) [Entered: 05/21/2014 11:29 AM]
May 21, 2014 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. in 14-1521 filed by Attorney Jonathan Berman. Certificate of service dated 05/21/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] CLERK'S NOTE: Additional attachments must be filed separately. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (JBB) [Entered: 05/21/2014 11:14 AM]
May 21, 2014 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. in 14-1522 filed by Attorney Jonathan Berman. Certificate of service dated 05/21/2014. [14-1522, 14-1521] (JBB) [Entered: 05/21/2014 11:32 AM]
May 21, 2014 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. in 14-1522 filed by Attorney Kevin D. McDonald. Certificate of service dated 05/21/2014. [14-1522, 14-1521] (KDM) [Entered: 05/21/2014 11:30 AM]
May 21, 2014 Filing fee was paid in the district court by Appellants Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, LTD and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. on 05/19/2014. [14-1521] (DB) [Entered: 05/21/2014 12:33 PM]
May 21, 2014 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP and Astrazeneca AB in 14-1521 filed by Attorney Timothy Hester. Certificate of service dated 05/21/2014. [14-1521, 14-1522] (TCH) [Entered: 05/21/2014 11:51 AM]
May 21, 2014 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP and Astrazeneca AB in 14-1522 filed by Attorney Timothy Hester. Certificate of service dated 05/21/2014. [14-1522, 14-1521] (TCH) [Entered: 05/21/2014 12:14 PM]
May 20, 2014 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, LTD and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. filed by Attorney Laurence A. Schoen. Certificate of service dated 05/20/2014. [14-1521] (LAS) [Entered: 05/20/2014 10:53 AM]
May 20, 2014 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, LTD and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. filed by Attorney Karen N. Walker. Certificate of service dated 05/20/2014. [14-1521] (KNW) [Entered: 05/20/2014 12:34 PM]
May 19, 2014 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP and Astrazeneca AB filed by Attorney Kannon K. Shanmugam. Certificate of service dated 05/19/2014. [14-1521] (KKS) [Entered: 05/19/2014 10:25 PM]
May 15, 2014 BRIEFING schedule updated. Appellants shall file their briefs by June 5, 2014. Appellees shall file their briefs by June 26. Any reply briefs shall be filed by July 3. Oral argument can be expected during the week of July 28. [14-1521] (GAK) [Entered: 05/15/2014 04:11 PM]
May 15, 2014 CIVIL CASE docketed. The Petition for permission to appeal filed by Appellants Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, LTD and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. is granted. Docketing Statement due 05/29/2014. Record due 05/27/2014. Transcript Report/Order form due 05/29/2014. Appearance form due 05/29/2014. [14-1521]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to replace an attachment and attach a missing document. (GAK) [Entered: 05/15/2014 04:03 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In re: Nexium Antitrust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RANBAXY INC.
Represented By: Leslie F. Su
Represented By: Lisa Jose Fales
Represented By: Sarah E. Choi
Represented By: Andrew D. Lazerow
Represented By: Danielle R. Foley
Represented By: James Douglas Baldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Leslie F. Su
Represented By: Lisa Jose Fales
Represented By: Sarah E. Choi
Represented By: Andrew D. Lazerow
Represented By: Danielle R. Foley
Represented By: James Douglas Baldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: John M. Gore
Represented By: Jonathan B. Berman
Represented By: Ajay Kayal
Represented By: Stephanie L. Resnik
Represented By: Kevin D. McDonald
Represented By: Michael T. Marcucci
Represented By: Andrew D. Lazerow
Represented By: Andrew J. Miller
Represented By: Alan H. Pollack
Represented By: Ellen T. Lowenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICAL LP
Represented By: Enrique D. Longton
Represented By: Thomas A. Isaacson
Represented By: Adam R. Tarosky
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Jonathan B. Pitt
Represented By: Einar Stole
Represented By: Courtney R. Forrest
Represented By: Benjamin M. Greenblum
Represented By: James Harris Weingarten
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Represented By: Timothy C. Hester
Represented By: Marcie R. Ziegler
Represented By: Ashley E. Bass
Represented By: Nicholas W. Allen
Represented By: Andrew D. Lazerow
Represented By: James Douglas Baldridge
Represented By: Paul B. Gaffney
Represented By: Heidi K. Hubbard
Represented By: John E. Joiner
Represented By: William A. Zucker
Represented By: Kannon K. Shanmugam
Represented By: Evie Spanos
Represented By: Dane H. Bustwinkas
Represented By: Jonathan Gimblett
Represented By: Stanley E. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: Adam L. Sisitsky
Represented By: Laurence Adam Schoen
Represented By: Christopher M. Jackson
Represented By: Andrew D. Lazerow
Represented By: James Douglas Baldridge
Represented By: Karen Natalie Walker
Represented By: Rebecca A. Koch
Represented By: Thea Cohen
Represented By: Katie Einspanier
Represented By: Jay P. Lefkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
Represented By: Adam L. Sisitsky
Represented By: Laurence Adam Schoen
Represented By: Christopher M. Jackson
Represented By: Andrew D. Lazerow
Represented By: James Douglas Baldridge
Represented By: Karen Natalie Walker
Represented By: Rebecca A. Koch
Represented By: Thea Cohen
Represented By: Katie Einspanier
Represented By: Jay P. Lefkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD.
Represented By: John M. Gore
Represented By: Jonathan B. Berman
Represented By: Ajay Kayal
Represented By: Stephanie L. Resnik
Represented By: Kevin D. McDonald
Represented By: Michael T. Marcucci
Represented By: Andrew D. Lazerow
Represented By: Andrew J. Miller
Represented By: Alan H. Pollack
Represented By: Ellen T. Lowenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD.
Represented By: Leslie F. Su
Represented By: Lisa Jose Fales
Represented By: Sarah E. Choi
Represented By: Andrew D. Lazerow
Represented By: Danielle R. Foley
Represented By: James Douglas Baldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ASTRAZENECA AB
Represented By: Enrique D. Longton
Represented By: Thomas A. Isaacson
Represented By: Adam R. Tarosky
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Jonathan B. Pitt
Represented By: Einar Stole
Represented By: Courtney R. Forrest
Represented By: Benjamin M. Greenblum
Represented By: James Harris Weingarten
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Represented By: Timothy C. Hester
Represented By: Marcie R. Ziegler
Represented By: Ashley E. Bass
Represented By: Andrew D. Lazerow
Represented By: James Douglas Baldridge
Represented By: Paul B. Gaffney
Represented By: Heidi K. Hubbard
Represented By: John E. Joiner
Represented By: Kannon K. Shanmugam
Represented By: Evie Spanos
Represented By: Dane H. Bustwinkas
Represented By: Jonathan Gimblett
Represented By: Stanley E. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: AKTIEBOLAGET HASSLE
Represented By: Enrique D. Longton
Represented By: Thomas A. Isaacson
Represented By: Adam R. Tarosky
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Jonathan B. Pitt
Represented By: Einar Stole
Represented By: Courtney R. Forrest
Represented By: Benjamin M. Greenblum
Represented By: James Harris Weingarten
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Represented By: Timothy C. Hester
Represented By: Marcie R. Ziegler
Represented By: Ashley E. Bass
Represented By: Andrew D. Lazerow
Represented By: Paul B. Gaffney
Represented By: Heidi K. Hubbard
Represented By: John E. Joiner
Represented By: Kannon K. Shanmugam
Represented By: Evie Spanos
Represented By: Dane H. Bustwinkas
Represented By: Jonathan Gimblett
Represented By: Stanley E. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUPERVALU, INC.
Represented By: Scott E. Perwin
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Represented By: Lauren C. Ravkind
Represented By: Douglas H. Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEIJER, INC.
Represented By: Bradley J. Demuth
Represented By: Lindsey H. Taylor
Represented By: Donna M. Evans
Represented By: Peter A. Barile III
Represented By: Caitlin G. Coslett
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: John Paul Bjork
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KROGER COMPANY
Represented By: Scott E. Perwin
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Represented By: Lauren C. Ravkind
Represented By: Douglas H. Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WALGREEN CO.
Represented By: Scott E. Perwin
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Represented By: Lauren C. Ravkind
Represented By: Douglas H. Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RITE AID HEADQUARTERS CORPORATION
Represented By: Scott E. Perwin
Represented By: Monica L. Kiley
Represented By: Eric L. Bloom
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Represented By: Barry L. Refsin
Represented By: Douglas H. Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEB GROCERY CO. LP
Represented By: Scott E. Perwin
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Represented By: Lauren C. Ravkind
Represented By: Douglas H. Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY INC.
Represented By: Donna M. Evans
Represented By: Elena K. Chan
Represented By: Brian D. Brooks
Represented By: Susan C. Segura
Represented By: Russell A. Chorush
Represented By: Peter S. Pearlman
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Ephraim R. Gerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEIJER DISTRIBUTION, INC.
Represented By: Bradley J. Demuth
Represented By: Lindsey H. Taylor
Represented By: Donna M. Evans
Represented By: Peter A. Barile III
Represented By: Caitlin G. Coslett
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: John Paul Bjork
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CVS, INC.
Represented By: Douglas H. Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION
Represented By: Donald W. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., on behalf of itself and others similarly situated
Represented By: Donna M. Evans
Represented By: David F. Sorensen
Represented By: Peter R. Kohn
Represented By: Eric Cramer
Represented By: Nicholas Urban
Represented By: Caitlin G. Coslett
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Daniel C. Simons
Represented By: Yechiel Michael Twersky
Represented By: Archana Tamoshunas
Represented By: Joseph T. Lukens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LABORERS INTERNATIONAL UNION OF NORTH AMERICA LOCAL 345 HEALTH CARE FUND
Represented By: Frank R. Schirripa
Represented By: Michael Aaron Rose
Represented By: Virginia E. Anello
Represented By: James R. Dugan II
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Michael A. London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RITE AID CORPORATION
Represented By: Scott E. Perwin
Represented By: Monica L. Kiley
Represented By: Eric L. Bloom
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Represented By: Barry L. Refsin
Represented By: Douglas H. Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN SALES COMPANY, LLC, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Andrew J. Vasicek
Represented By: Donna M. Evans
Represented By: John D. Radice
Represented By: Caitlin G. Coslett
Represented By: David S. Nalven
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Kristen A. Johnson
Represented By: Don Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JCG (PJC) USA, LLC
Represented By: Scott E. Perwin
Represented By: Monica L. Kiley
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Represented By: Barry L. Refsin
Represented By: Douglas H. Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAFEWAY INCORPORATED
Represented By: Scott E. Perwin
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Represented By: Lauren C. Ravkind
Represented By: Douglas H. Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALUE DRUG COMPANY
Represented By: Donna M. Evans
Represented By: Elena K. Chan
Represented By: Brian D. Brooks
Represented By: Susan C. Segura
Represented By: Joseph Opper
Represented By: Russell A. Chorush
Represented By: Peter S. Pearlman
Represented By: Caitlin G. Coslett
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Ephraim R. Gerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ECKERD CORPORATION
Represented By: Scott E. Perwin
Represented By: Monica L. Kiley
Represented By: Eric L. Bloom
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Represented By: Barry L. Refsin
Represented By: Douglas H. Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GIANT EAGLE, INC.
Represented By: James F. Rosenberg
Represented By: Jonathan D. Marcus
Represented By: Bernard D. Marcus
Represented By: Scott E. Perwin
Represented By: Scott D. Livingston
Represented By: Brian C. Hill
Represented By: Moira E. Cain-Mannix
Represented By: Erin Gisbson Allen
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAXI DRUG, INC., d/b/a Brooks Pharmacy
Represented By: Scott E. Perwin
Represented By: Monica L. Kiley
Represented By: Eric L. Bloom
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Represented By: Barry L. Refsin
Represented By: Douglas H. Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JONATHAN RICH
Represented By: Jonathan Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: EDWARD BREIVIK
Represented By: Edward Breivik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CHRISTOPHER WIRTH
Represented By: Christopher Wirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Represented By: Nicholas S. Napolitan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: TERRY LYNN NICHOLAS
Represented By: Terry Lynn Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JAMES JARED THULE
Represented By: James Jared Thule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CAREMARKPCS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CHRISTOPHER DONNELLY
Represented By: Christopher Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 595 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Represented By: Aaron David Kaufmann
Represented By: Christina C. Sharp
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard
Represented By: Jayne A. Goldstein
Represented By: J. Douglas Richards
Represented By: Glen DeValerio
Represented By: Nathaniel L. Orenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NEW YORK HOTEL TRADES COUNCIL AND HOTEL ASSOCIATION OF NEW YORK CITY, INC. HEALTH BENEFITS FUND
Represented By: Sharon K. Robertson
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Christopher Lometti
Represented By: Jayne A. Goldstein
Represented By: George Farah
Represented By: J. Douglas Richards
Represented By: Glen DeValerio
Represented By: Nathaniel L. Orenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALLIED SERVICES DIVISION WELFARE FUND
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Represented By: Thomas G. Shapiro
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Jayne A. Goldstein
Represented By: J. Douglas Richards
Represented By: James R. Dugan II
Represented By: Glen DeValerio
Represented By: Nathaniel L. Orenstein
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: David Baylis Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MICHIGAN REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS EMPLOYEE BENEFITS FUND
Represented By: Nicole M. Acchione
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Lisa J. Rodriguez
Represented By: Donald A. Broggi
Represented By: Jayne A. Goldstein
Represented By: Christopher M. Burke
Represented By: J. Douglas Richards
Represented By: Glen DeValerio
Represented By: Nathaniel L. Orenstein
Represented By: Walter W. Noss
Represented By: Joseph P. Guglielmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED FOOD & COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNIONS AND EMPLOYERS MIDWEST HEALTH BENEFITS FUND
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Jayne A. Goldstein
Represented By: Justin N. Boley
Represented By: J. Douglas Richards
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Represented By: Glen DeValerio
Represented By: Nathaniel L. Orenstein
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Represented By: Jonathan Shapiro
Represented By: Bethany R. Turke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LABORERS INTERNATIONAL UNION OF NORTH AMERICA LOCAL 17 HEALTH CARE FUND
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Represented By: Thomas G. Shapiro
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Jayne A. Goldstein
Represented By: J. Douglas Richards
Represented By: James R. Dugan II
Represented By: Glen DeValerio
Represented By: Nathaniel L. Orenstein
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: David Baylis Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS DISTRICT NO. 15 HEALTH FUND
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Represented By: Kevin Peter Roddy
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Jayne A. Goldstein
Represented By: J. Douglas Richards
Represented By: Glen DeValerio
Represented By: Nathaniel L. Orenstein
Represented By: Brian Douglas Penny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LABORERS INTERNATIONAL UNION OF NORTH AMERICA LOCAL 35 HEALTH CARE FUND
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Represented By: Thomas G. Shapiro
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Jayne A. Goldstein
Represented By: J. Douglas Richards
Represented By: Glen DeValerio
Represented By: Nathaniel L. Orenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE MIAMI LODGE 20 INSURANCE TRUST FUND
Represented By: Natalie Finkelman Bennett
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Anne K. Fornecker
Represented By: Jayne A. Goldstein
Represented By: J. Douglas Richards
Represented By: Glen DeValerio
Represented By: Nathaniel L. Orenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: A.F. OF L. - A.G.C. BUILDING TRADES WELFARE PLAN
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Jayne A. Goldstein
Represented By: J. Douglas Richards
Represented By: Glen DeValerio
Represented By: Nathaniel L. Orenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ANTITRUST INSTITUTE
Represented By: Albert A. Foer
Represented By: Randy M. Stutz
Represented By: Richard M. Brunell
Represented By: Joshua P. Davis
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: US PUBLIC INTEREST RESEARCH GROUP
Represented By: Ellen Meriwether
Represented By: David A. Balto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL LEGISLATIVE ASSOCIATION FOR PRESCRIPTION DRUG PRICES
Represented By: Ellen Meriwether
Represented By: David A. Balto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COMMUNITY CATALYST, INC.
Represented By: Ellen Meriwether
Represented By: David A. Balto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kathryn L. Comerford Todd
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Bucholtz
Represented By: Ashley C. Parrish
Represented By: Tyler R. Green
Represented By: Karen F. Grohman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.
Represented By: Scott Lawrence Nelson
Represented By: Julie A. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN INDEPENDENT BUSINESS ALLIANCE
Represented By: Ellen Meriwether
Represented By: David A. Balto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC.
Represented By: Michael J. Rossi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: CARDINAL HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: Robert J. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?