Bernardo, et al v. Napolitano, et al
Plaintiff - Appellant: HENRY BERNARDO, SAMUEL MARINHO FREITAS, RUTH LOPES FREITAS, DANIEL LOPES FREITAS, GRACIANE LOPES FREITAS and GRAZIELA LOPES FREITAS
Defendant - Appellee: JANET NAPOLITANO, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR., ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, GREGORY A RICHARDSON and RON ROSENBERG
Case Number: 15-1177
Filed: February 5, 2015
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
January 29, 2016 Summary Bernardo v. Johnson
February 5, 2016 Summary Bernardo v. Johnson
February 24, 2016 Summary Bernardo v. Johnson

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106962780 ERRATA issued by court to opinion (published) [5973372-2]. [15-1177]
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106955436 ERRATA issued by court to opinion (published) [5973372-2]. [15-1177]
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106952143 OPINION issued by Jeffrey R. Howard, Chief Appellate Judge; Sandra L. Lynch, Appellate Judge and Kermit V. Lipez, Appellate Judge. Published. [15-1177]
Search for this case: Bernardo, et al v. Napolitano, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: HENRY BERNARDO
Represented By: Annelise Araujo
Represented By: Stefanie Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: SAMUEL MARINHO FREITAS
Represented By: Annelise Araujo
Represented By: Stefanie Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: RUTH LOPES FREITAS
Represented By: Annelise Araujo
Represented By: Stefanie Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: DANIEL LOPES FREITAS
Represented By: Annelise Araujo
Represented By: Stefanie Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: GRACIANE LOPES FREITAS
Represented By: Annelise Araujo
Represented By: Stefanie Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: GRAZIELA LOPES FREITAS
Represented By: Annelise Araujo
Represented By: Stefanie Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: JANET NAPOLITANO
Represented By: Dina Michael Chaitowitz
Represented By: Giselle J. Joffre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: ERIC H. HOLDER, JR.
Represented By: Dina Michael Chaitowitz
Represented By: Giselle J. Joffre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
Represented By: Dina Michael Chaitowitz
Represented By: Giselle J. Joffre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: GREGORY A RICHARDSON
Represented By: Dina Michael Chaitowitz
Represented By: Giselle J. Joffre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: RON ROSENBERG
Represented By: Dina Michael Chaitowitz
Represented By: Giselle J. Joffre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?