Norris v. Specialty Surgery Center, PLLC, et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT MARKO, GLADYS G. AUSTIN, ROSANNE BROOKS, RONNIE A. BROWN, LESLIE G. MUSSELWHITE, JAMES GREENWOOD, JOAN HULSEY, LISA MARIA RUSSO, GLENDA STRATTON, MICHELLE JANIN LUNA, CLAY C. JEFFRIES, BRIAN T. PENNINGTON, ROBERT EARL HARRIS, JR., LAWRENCE CARTER, TAMELA M. MILLER, LAWRENCE TROPE, GAIL HEADLEY, WILLIAM BROUSSARD, III, ESTALENE MORRIS, JEFF PETTIT, DAWN M. ZAVACKI, PATRICK JOHNSTON, REBA M. SKELTON, FRANK HARANZO, JR., ROY H. SKELTON, DONNA MONTEE, MARGARET SCHRODER, GEORGE CARY, JENNA A. LETIZIA, SHIRLEY HIGDON, WILLIAM E. JOHNSON, KATHRYN S. LEAVERTON, PAULINE R. MCFARLANE, RANDALL FORSTER, WILLIAM TULEY, CHAD TRUDEAU, LORAINE MORRIS, PATRICIA DURBEN, DONALD HEADLEY, LINDA CHARLENE BOGGS, RICHARD BLANKENSHIP, CHRISTINE WHEELER, CHESTER T. KALINOSKI, SALLY L. PETTIT, KENNETH JUDD, SUSAN M. EDWARDS, STEVENS WYMAN, SUSAN FRICK, BARBARA KENNEDY, TAMMY ALLEN, TAWAN JENKINS, WAYNE A. REED, GEORGE BOSTIC, DONALD FLOECKHER, ROSANNE MCCALL, ANGELA NORMAN, RONALD TISA, JOSE A. RAMOS, JOE ALCOZAR, BARBARA J. STANSBERY, DIRK THOMPSON, III, JENNIFER L. TOLOTTI, GERALD W. WRAY, JAMES PALMER, ADAM BERTHIAUME, RONALD T. COURTNEY, KIMBERLY CHITWOOD, Z.L.F., a minor, by his parents and next friends, Benjamin T. Foutz and Andrea L. Foutz, ANDREA L. FOUTZ, PATRICIA S. BROWN, Executor of the Estate of Louis B. Spicer, Deceased, NAQUITA L. RIOS, AMARJIT K. DEOL, RANDOLPH E. SMITH, LEAD COUNSEL, TRACEY BRIGGS, WILMA S. CARTER, NANCY LEWIS, DALE DEVILLI, WILLIAM L. NEAL, PINAL PATEL, MEGHAN HANDY, REX JOHNSON SHAW, FREDERICK MAY, GRETA NORMAND, LARRY HALL, JOHN E. JONES, ALLISON MORRIS STOOTS, PAUL COMPTON, RAYMOND MCDOW, ROBERT COBB, BASIL J. MCELWEE, FERMAN WERTZ, MICHELLE PALMER, MICHAEL R. KENNEDY, STEPHEN HAYNES, CAROLYN BLAND, KATHLEEN GUZMAN, KEVIN R. RICHARDS, ELIZABETH SAWYERS, ANNA MARIA SHAW ALLRED, ROLAND BERTHIAUME, LECIA J. GOLDEN, BRENDA GARL, HELENA TROPE, a/k/a Linda Trope, ANNA M. SULLIVAN, JOSEPH BRADY, LARRY GASKINS, JENNIFER L. MARKO, MELISSA MARSHALL, EDWARD ADAMS, KATHRYN TAYVINSKY, JOHN MARSINKO, ABDUL BARAKAT, JOHN D. SPICER, Executor of the Estate of Louis B. Spicer, Deceased, EARLINE WILLIAMS, ROGER ZAVACKI, NAOMI DAUGHERTY, SANDRA HARRISON, JAMES WIRT SMITH, JR., NANCY GOODFELLOW, MEREDITH GOULD, JOSEPH M. PELLICONE, FORREST LINTHICUM, BRENDA VARLEY, DEBRA P. BUCHANAN, BARBARA J. FILSON, JOHN CHARLES SAWYERS, ROBERT COLE, BRITTANY HENLEY, HILDA C. ALLEN, DONNA TULEY, ROBERT SCHRODER, JAMES ROMAN, DENNIS STRATTON, RENATE FARISS, LARRY BROWNING, ALAN CRAIGO, NELLIE POELT, SARAH GILLIAM, MARY DENISE MORELL, PATRICIA FORTIER, ELTON LEE WILEY, SCOTT BERTHIAUME, BRITA CARIGNAN, THOMAS RANDY DAVIS, KIM FAYARD, ROBERT DANA BENDER, Executor of the Estate of Ralph James Irace, Jr., Deceased, BENJAMIN T. FOUTZ, parent-next friend of Z.L.F., CHERYL BROGAN, STUART KATZ, TREVA DAWN MORRIS, PAUL LETIZIA, CHERYL A. MCCARTHY, VIOLA COPSEY, CHRISTOPHER COMPTON, SHIRLEY DOYLE, MABEL HUTCHERSON, JOAN SIMAS, SUSANNE HASTINGS, ANDRE GOULD, DANA MARLENE BRADLEY, WILLIAM LEWIS, JOSEPH TOLOTTI, LEON BLAND, NORMA HURLEY, ELIZABETH DAWN SHAW FRANK, CHAD GREEN, PARK DAWN, ELFREIDA HUNT WILEY, MARIA LUMBRERAS, FRANKLIN JENKINS, STELLA M. MILLER, KIMBERLY J. BRADLEY COOPER, NORMA KING, JULIAN D. HOLBROOK, STEVE SWISHER, CRAIG S. SIMAS, JAGDISH PATEL, C. DALE SULLIVAN, SR., MARY MARTIN, SHARON W. BISHOP, NOSWORTHY REID, JANE MCKEON, STEVIE THOMAS, ROBERT S. TAYVINSKY, BURTON PANITZ, BERNADETTE EFFENDIAN, KATHRYN DRAIN, DEANNA SMITH, LEONARD SHAFFER, VICTORIA GIBSON, AUDREY RANSOME, JOHN DOE, DAWN ELLIOTT, ARDEMUS ALLEN, CLARK KENNETH OSBORNE, JOHN D. OVERSTREET, SHERYL TILLSON, JARROD WHIRLEY, CHANCE BAKER, DREW NORMAND, ARNOLD MOON, REBECCA BRADY, BERTRUM WALKER BRYANT, JR., next of kin of decedent Margaret Rhea Bryant, DENIA TALIAFERRO, RICHARD A. WHITLOW, SUSAN GRICE, CHRISTY FRALIN, MURIEL ARMSTRONG, ODESSA M. SHUCK, ANTHONY RIVERA, MARGARET HANSON, ROBERT PINKSTAFF, JENAE S. PATSELL, Executor of the Estate of Louis B. Spicer, Deceased, DIANE E. TISA, ANN BEQUETTE, JOANN OVERSTREET, KIMBERLY ELAINE BROWN, DIANA REED, DAVID W. LEAVERTON, ALLISON DEVILLI, TRUDY R. EPPERLY, JANE R. WRAY, ROSANNE MOON, GEORGE T. MOORE, MARY RADFORD, LARRY RICE, TOSHA ANDREWS, ROSE M. WHITE, DAVID L. COOPER, HENRY B. HIGDON, MAE L. PARMAN, OWEN FINNEGAN, MEGHAN R. JONES, SHARON OVERSTREET, LEISA COPP, GLENDA J. HURT, JUANITA M. RIVERA, JACOB HELM, SANDRA F. ARTIS, MARLENE FLOECKHER, RICKY RIOS, DEBRA HACHE, MARTHA PARKELL, JOSHUA KIRKWOOD, TIMOTHY REARDON, CHRISTOPHER M. HANNAH, CINDY A. CARMAN, DARREL CUMMINGS, SCOTT VINCENT SHAW, individually, as administrator of the Estate of Effie Elwina Shaw, deceased, and on behalf of the beneficiaries of the estate and JOJAYRA GARCIA
Defendant: ADIL KATABAY, ANDREW HOWDEN, PREMIER ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES SURGICAL CENTER, LLC, SAINT THOMAS HEALTH, TIM I. CHOWDHURY, VAUGHAN A. ALLEN, NASARETH HOSPITAL, INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTER VINELAND, f/k/a South Jersey Healthcare Regional Medical Center, ANONYMOUS HEALTH CARE PROVIDER 2, INSIGHT HEALTH CORP, JOHN KANE, PAUL ABRAMS, HIGH POINT SURGERY CENTER, A NORTH CAROLINA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP, VICTORY MECHANICAL SERVICES, INC., KIMBERLY YVETTE SMITH, a/k/a Kimberly Yvette Smith-Martin, CALISHER AND ASSOCIATES, INC., EUGEN D. WILLIAMS, JIM WHITE, PREMIER ORTHOPAEDIC AND SPORTS MEDICINE ASSOCIATES OF SOUTHERN NJ, LLC, trading as Premier Orthopaedic Associates, ADVANCED PAIN & ANESTHESIA CONSULTANTS PC, d/b/a APAC Centers for Pain Management, ANONYMOUS PAIN CLINIC, BKC PAIN SPECIALISTS, AMERIDOSE, LLC, ANONYMOUS MD 2, GLENN A. CHIN, LINDA PETCHELL, DAVID M. SCHULTZ, GURURAU SUDARSHAN, INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK, INC., f/k/a South Jersey Health System, Inc., INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTERS, INC., f/k/a South Jersey Hospital, Inc., NITESH BHAGAT, ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, d/b/a St. Mary's Surgicare, DONALD E. JONES, ANONYMOUS MD 1, NEW ENGLAND COMPOUNDING PHARMACY, INC, d/b/a New England Compounding Center, JOSHUA L. GREENSPAN, SOUTH JERSEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, TENET HEALTHSYSTEM HAHNEMANN, LLC, BRIAN MESZAROS, CARLA CONIGLIARO, WILLIAM A. ANTE, DEBRA SCHAMBERG, MEDICAL SALES MANAGEMENT SW, INC., HIGH POINT REGIONAL HEALTH, f/k/a High Point Regional Health System, d/b/a High Point Regional Hospital, MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM OF S.E. PENNYSLVANIA, ROTHMAN INSTITUTE, ANONYMOUS HEALTH CARE PROVIDER 5, WILSON CHU, BOX HILL SURGERY CENTER, LLC, VANNETTE PERKINS, HAHNEMANN UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, ARL BIO PHARMA, INC, d/b/a Analytical Research Laboratories, LISA CONIGLIARO CADDEN, ANN TUTTLE, ASCENSION HEALTH, AMBULATORY CARE CENTER, LLC, CINCINNATI PAIN MANAGEMENT CONSULTANTS, INC., DOUGLAS CONIGLIARO, IMAGE GUIDED PAIN MANAGEMENT, P.C., d/b/a Insight Imaging Roanoke, NEW YORK ADVANCED SURGICAL INTERVENTION CARE PLLC, ANONYMOUS HEALTH CARE PROVIDER 4, NIKESH BATRA, JOHN CULCLASURE, RANDOLPH Y. CHANG, ANONYMOUS HEALTH CARE PROVIDER 7, WILLIAM A. ANDERSON, FULLERTON ORTHOPAEDIC SURGERY MEDICAL GROUP, INC., DAVID TUNG, SAINT THOMAS OUTPATIENT NEUROSURGICAL CENTER, LLC, ALAUNUS PHARMACEUTICAL, LLC, MICHAEL J O'CONNELL, d/b/a Dr O'Connell's Pain Care Center, Inc, d/b/a Pain Care Centers, Inc., GLASER PAIN INSTITUTE, LORETTTA ZUDIDU, CINCINNATI PAIN MANAGEMENT CONSULTANTS, LTD., SAINT THOMAS WEST HOSPITAL, f/k/a Saint Thomas Hospital, ANONYMOUS HEALTH CARE PROVIDER 6, HOWELL ALLEN CLINIC, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION, MEENA CHADHA, SUNRISE HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, ABBESELOM GHERMAY, ANONYMOUS HEALTH CARE PROVIDER 8, BETTY MORROW, ANONYMOUS HEALTH CARE PROVIDER 1, ROBERT O'BRIEN, MICHAEL J O'CONNELL, JAMES MOLNAR, MEDICAL SALES MANAGEMENT, INC, ROTHMAN INSTITUTE AT NAZARETH HOSPITAL, JOHN MATHIS, OCEAN STATE PAIN MANAGEMENT, INC, GREGORY CONIGLIARO, THOMAS A. DWYER, GDC PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT, LLC, LORI SHEETS, ASCENSION HEALTH ALLIANCE, LINDA LUI LUONG, SOUTH JERSEY HEALTHCARE, JEFFREY B. GLASER, MARION PAIN MANAGEMENT CENTER, INC., BARBARA WAGNER, CARILION SURGERY CENTER NEW RIVER VALLEY, LLC, d/b/a New River Valley Surgery Center, LLC, PCA PAIN CARE CENTER, DALLAS BACK PAIN MANAGEMENT/MOMENTUM PAIN MANAGEMENT, MINNESOTA SURGERY CENTER, DR O'CONNELL'S PAIN CARE CENTER, INC, UNIFIRST CORPORATION, d/b/a Uniclean Cleanroom Services, VICTORY HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING CO., INC., BARRY J. CADDEN, MEDICAL ADVANCED PAIN SPECIALISTS, PA, SAUD SIDDIQUI, SAINT THOMAS NETWORK, ANONYMOUS HEALTH CARE PROVIDER 3, BRYAN ELZHOLZ and MARK ZACHERN
Interested Party: PLAINTIFFS' STEERING COMMITTEE, INTERVENTIONAL SPINE & SPORTS MEDICINE, PC, MICHAEL D. O'NEAL, PAIN CONSULTANTS OF WEST FLORIDA, EMORY CLINIC, INC., SURGERY CENTER OF WILSON, LLC, UNIVERSAL PAIN MANAGEMENT MEDICAL CORPORATION, d/b/a Universal Pain Management, ROANOKE AREA LICHTENSTEINFISHWICK INTERVENORS, NEUROSURGICAL GROUP OF CHATTANOOGA, d/b/a Chattanooga Neurosurgery & Spine, LEONA E. CORKER, GREENSPRING SURGICAL CENTER, ALLEGHENY PAIN MANAGEMENT, PC, LIBERTY INDUSTRIES, INC, OSMC, STATE OF TENNESSEE, PAIN ASSOCIATES OF CHARLSETON, LLC, d/b/a InverveneMD, SURGERY CENTER ASSOCIATES OF HIGHPOINT, LLC, SOUTHEAST MICHIGAN SURGICAL HOSPITAL, NORTH CAROLINA ORTHOPAEDIC CLINIC, OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS OF NEW ENGLAND COMPOUNDING PHARMACY, INC., ROANOKE GENTRY LOCKE PLAINTIFFS, SUMMIT SURGERY CENTER, PHARMACISTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, MARTIN KELVAS, THOREK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, UNITED STATES, HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF TENNESSEE, INC, a/k/a Centennial Medical Center, FORSYTH STREET AMBULATORY SURGERY CENTER, LLC, NEUROMUSCULAR AND REHABILITATION ASSOCIATES OF NORTHERN MICHIGAN, and its employees, TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA, PAIN MEDICINE SPECIALISTS PA, JOHN DOE, John Doe c/o Paul W. Shaw, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, BOARD OF REGISTRATION IN PHARMACY, FEDERAL-STATE LIAISON COUNSEL, ERLANGER HEALTH SYSTEM, VIRGINIA CRANDALL & KATT PLAINTIFFS, ROCHESTER BRAIN AND SPINE NEUROSURGERY & PAIN MANAGEMENT, LLC, MICHELE ERKAN, SOUTH BEND CLINIC, LLP, SURGCENTER OF BEL AIR, LLC, DOYLESTOWN HOSPITAL, JANE DOES, US FOOD & DRUG ADMINISTRATION, MICHIGAN PAIN SPECIALISTS, PLLC, VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY, JOHN DOES. 1-4, CUMBERLAND MEDICAL CENTER, SAHARA OUTPATIENT SURGERY CENTER, LTD, BALTIMORE PAIN MANAGEMENT CENTER, ORLANDO CENTER FOR OUTPATIENT SURGERY, LP, d/b/a Orlando Center for Outpatient Surgery, HARTFORD COUNTY AMBULATORY SURGICAL CENTER LLC, SURGICAL PARK CENTER, LTD, ENCINO OUTPATIENT SURGERY CENTER, INC and CARLOS JASSIR
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOCELYN KAE NORRIS
Trustee: PAUL D. MOORE, in his capacity as Chapter 11 Trustee of the Defendant New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc. d/b/a New England Compounding Center and LYNNE F. RILEY
Defendant / Appellee: SPECIALTY SURGERY CENTER, PLLC, d/b/a Specialty Surgery Center, KENNETH LISTER, M.D., P.C. and KENNETH R. LISTER
Case Number: 17-1003
Filed: March 22, 2017
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2018 Mail returned as undeliverable to Not Party Chad Trudeau in 17-1005. Copy of Judgment entered May 9, 2018. Forwarding address unknown. [17-1005, 17-1003] (ZN) [Entered: 06/07/2018 09:04 AM]
May 29, 2018 NOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorney has been removed from the service list for this case: Christopher Reade O'Hara for Douglas Conigliaro and Carla Conigliaro. [17-1005] (GB) [Entered: 05/30/2018 01:18 PM]
May 25, 2018 Mail returned as undeliverable to Not Party Darrel Cummings. Copy of Mandate entered on May 9, 2018. Forwarded to 1871 NW 8TH STREET POMPANO BCH., FL. 3306933069. [17-1003] (ZN) [Entered: 06/06/2018 04:37 PM]
May 14, 2018 NOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorney has been removed from the service list for this case: Thomas B.K. Ringe, III for Paul D. Moore. [17-1005] (GB) [Entered: 05/29/2018 12:27 PM]
May 9, 2018 MANDATE issued. [17-1003] (MNH) [Entered: 05/09/2018 01:09 PM]
May 9, 2018 JUDGMENT entered: Upon consideration of the parties' joint motion, it is hereby ordered that this appeal be voluntarily dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) with each party to bear its own costs. Mandate to issue forthwith. [17-1003] (MNH) [Entered: 05/09/2018 01:08 PM]
May 8, 2018 JOINT MOTION to dismiss case filed by Appellant Jocelyn Kae Norris. Certificate of service dated 05/08/2018. [17-1003] (CTC) [Entered: 05/08/2018 02:30 PM]
April 30, 2018 NOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorney has been removed from the service list for this case: Christopher Reade O'Hara for Douglas Conigliaro and Carla Conigliaro. [17-1003] (GB) [Entered: 05/03/2018 09:35 AM]
April 30, 2018 REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Christopher Reade O'Hara for Not Parties Douglas Conigliaro and Carla Conigliaro. Certificate of service was not included. [17-1003] (GB) [Entered: 05/03/2018 09:33 AM]
April 11, 2018 NOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorney has been removed from the service list for this case: Peter G. Hermes for Liberty Industries, Inc. [17-1003] (GB) [Entered: 04/11/2018 02:10 PM]
April 11, 2018 REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Peter G. Hermes for Not Party Liberty Industries, Inc. Certificate of service was not included. [17-1003] (GB) [Entered: 04/11/2018 02:09 PM]
April 11, 2018 NOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorney has been removed from the service list for this case: Kristen A. Johnson for Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, Lead Counsel, Sarah Gilliam, Robert Cole, Donald Headley and Gail Headley. [17-1003] (GB) [Entered: 04/11/2018 10:24 AM]
April 11, 2018 NOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorney has been removed from the service list for this case: Thomas M. Sobol for Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, Michele Erkan, Lead Counsel, Sarah Gilliam and Robert Cole. [17-1003] (GB) [Entered: 04/11/2018 10:16 AM]
April 10, 2018 NOTICE requesting removal from the service list filed by Attorney Thomas M. Sobol for Not Parties Robert Cole, Michele Erkan, Sarah Gilliam, Lead Counsel and Plaintiffs' Steering Committee in 17-1003. Certificate of service dated 04/10/2018. [17-1003] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional cases 13-2007, 14-1714, 14-1718, 17-1005. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (TMS) [Entered: 04/10/2018 03:35 PM]
April 6, 2018 NOTICE requesting removal from the service list filed by Attorney Kristen A. Johnson for Not Parties Robert Cole, Sarah Gilliam, Donald Headley, Gail Headley, Lead Counsel and Plaintiffs' Steering Committee in 17-1003. Certificate of service dated 04/06/2018. [17-1003] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional cases 13-2007, 14-1714, 14-1718, 17-1005. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (KAJ) [Entered: 04/06/2018 04:26 PM]
April 5, 2018 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 05/15/2018 for appellant Jocelyn Kae Norris. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 14 days following service of appellee's brief. [17-1003] (GB) [Entered: 04/05/2018 09:57 AM]
June 2, 2017 REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Lena L. Busscher for Not Party Insight Health Corp. Certificate of service was not included. [17-1003] (GB) [Entered: 06/02/2017 12:02 PM]
May 18, 2017 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Michael E. Hager for Not Parties Rochester Brain and Spine Neurosurgery & Pain Management, LLC and Rochester Brain and Spine Neurosurgery & Pain Management, LLC in 17-1003, Attorney Michael E. Hager for Not Parties Rochester Brain and Spine Neurosurgery & Pain Management, LLC, Rochester Brain and Spine Neurosurgery & Pain Management, LLC and Rochester Brain and Spine Neurosurgery & Pain Management, LLC in 17-1005. Copy of Notice issued on April 10, 2017 and Notice issued on April 12, 2017. Forwarded to PO Box 6291 Boston, MA 02114. [17-1003, 17-1005] (AMM) [Entered: 05/22/2017 04:08 PM]
May 3, 2017 REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Stephen D. Busch for Not Party Insight Health Corp. Certificate of service was not included. [17-1003] (GB) [Entered: 05/10/2017 04:25 PM]
May 3, 2017 REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Diane P. Flannery for Not Party Insight Health Corp. Certificate of service was not included. [17-1003] (GB) [Entered: 05/10/2017 04:21 PM]
May 3, 2017 REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Christopher E. Trible for Not Party Insight Health Corp. Certificate of service was not included. [17-1003] (GB) [Entered: 05/10/2017 02:13 PM]
May 1, 2017 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Michael E. Hager for Not Parties Rochester Brain and Spine Neurosurgery & Pain Management, LLC and Rochester Brain and Spine Neurosurgery & Pain Management, LLC in 17-1003, Attorney Michael E. Hager for Not Parties Rochester Brain and Spine Neurosurgery & Pain Management, LLC, Rochester Brain and Spine Neurosurgery & Pain Management, LLC and Rochester Brain and Spine Neurosurgery & Pain Management, LLC in 17-1005. Copy of Notice issued on April 10, 2017 and Notice issued on April 12, 2017. Forwarded to Dane & Howe 45 School St. Boston, MA 02108-3204. [17-1003, 17-1005]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (AMM) [Entered: 05/04/2017 09:44 AM]
May 1, 2017 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Kenneth R. Lister and Specialty Surgery Center, PLLC filed by Attorney Ashley E. Geno. Certificate of service dated 05/01/2017. [17-1003] (AEG) [Entered: 05/01/2017 04:43 PM]
May 1, 2017 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Kenneth R. Lister and Specialty Surgery Center, PLLC filed by Attorney Parks T. Chastain. Certificate of service dated 05/01/2017. [17-1003] (PTC) [Entered: 05/01/2017 04:32 PM]
April 28, 2017 NOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorneys have been removed from the service list for this case: Arthur P. Brock for Erlanger Health System. [17-1003] (GB) [Entered: 04/28/2017 02:17 PM]
April 28, 2017 REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Arthur P. Brock for Not Party Erlanger Health System. Certificate of service was not included. [17-1003] (GB) [Entered: 04/28/2017 02:15 PM]
April 28, 2017 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: John Thomas Jessee for John Mathis, Robert O'Brien and Image Guided Pain Management, P.C. and Steven A Stadtmauer for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc. [17-1003].. (GB) [Entered: 04/28/2017 10:21 AM]
April 25, 2017 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Thomas S. Scott., Jr. for Jocelyn Kae Norris and James Palmer and Michelle Palmer, Alan S. Bean for Specialty Surgery Center, PLLC, Kenneth R. Lister and Donald E. Jones, Howell Allen Clinic, A Professional Corporation, Debra Schamberg, John Culclasure, Saint Thomas Outpatient Neurosurgical Center, LLC and PCA Pain Care Center, Matthew H. Cline for Specialty Surgery Center, PLLC, Kenneth R. Lister and Donald E. Jones, Howell Allen Clinic, A Professional Corporation, Debra Schamberg, John Culclasure, Saint Thomas Outpatient Neurosurgical Center, LLC, PCA Pain Care Center and Neurosurgical Group of Chattanooga, C.J. Gideon, Jr. for Specialty Surgery Center, PLLC, Kenneth R. Lister, Kenneth Lister, M.D., P.C. and Donald E. Jones, Howell Allen Clinic, A Professional Corporation, Debra Schamberg, John Culclasure, Saint Thomas Outpatient Neurosurgical Center, LLC, PCA Pain Care Center and Neurosurgical Group of Chattanooga, John-Mark Zini for Specialty Surgery Center, PLLC, Kenneth R. Lister and Donald E. Jones, Howell Allen Clinic, A Professional Corporation, Debra Schamberg, John Culclasure, Saint Thomas Outpatient Neurosurgical Center, LLC, PCA Pain Care Center and Neurosurgical Group of Chattanooga, Joseph Ahillen for State of Tennessee, Peter J. Ainsworth for Dirk Thompson, III and Muriel Armstrong, Thomas J. Althauser for Hartford County Ambulatory Surgical Center LLC, Anne Andrews for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc., Kathleen Guzman, Victoria Gibson, Kathryn Drain, George T. Moore, Martha Parkell and Jagdish Patel, Rosemarie Arnold for Bernadette Effendian, Evan D. Baker for Bernadette Effendian, Kent M. Barker for Robert Cole, Michael Frank Barrett for Jennifer L. Marko, Robert Marko, Brian T. Pennington, Christopher M. Hannah, Kathryn S. Leaverton, Meghan R. Jones, Jose A. Ramos, Naquita L. Rios, Ricky Rios, Anthony Rivera, Juanita M. Rivera, Jennifer L. Tolotti, Joseph Tolotti, Kathryn Tayvinsky, Robert S. Tayvinsky, Dawn M. Zavacki, Roger Zavacki, Jenna A. Letizia, Paul Letizia, Andre Gould, Meredith Gould, Diane E. Tisa, Ronald Tisa, Drew Normand, Greta Normand and David W. Leaverton, Christopher W. Bascom for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc, Alana K. Bassin for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc, David H. Batten for Surgery Center of Wilson, LLC, James A. Beakes, III for Ameridose, LLC, Alan S. Bean for Donald E. Jones, Howell Allen Clinic, A Professional Corporation, Debra Schamberg, John Culclasure, Saint Thomas Outpatient Neurosurgical Center, LLC and PCA Pain Care Center, Scott C. Bentivenga for Thorek Memorial Hospital, Mary M. Bers for State of Tennessee, Jay J. Blumberg for Premier Orthopaedic and Sports Medicine Associates of Southern NJ, LLC, Premier Orthopaedic Associates Surgical Center, LLC, Kimberly Yvette Smith and Thomas A. Dwyer, Brian J Bouchard for Joshua L. Greenspan, Robert Laurent Bouley for Minnesota Surgery Center, Alan J. Bozer for Rochester Brain and Spine Neurosurgery & Pain Management, LLC, Arthur P. Brock for Erlanger Health System, Justin A. Browne for Joseph Brady, Susan M. Edwards, Clay C. Jeffries, Barbara Kennedy, Michael R. Kennedy, Michelle Janin Luna, Leslie G. Musselwhite, Lawrence Carter, Wilma S. Carter, David L. Cooper, Kimberly J. Bradley Cooper, Donna Montee, Pinal Patel, Jeff Pettit and Sally L. Pettit, Nicholas G. Brunette for Anonymous Health Care Provider 5, Jennifer L. Bullard for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc, Michelle P. Burchett for Anonymous Health Care Provider 4, Stephen D. Busch for Insight Health Corp, Lena L. Busscher for Insight Health Corp, David L. Campbell for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc, Barry J. Cadden, Gregory Conigliaro, Lisa Conigliaro Cadden, Douglas Conigliaro, Carla Conigliaro and Glenn A. Chin, Brigid M. Carpenter for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc, Barry J. Cadden, Gregory Conigliaro, Lisa Conigliaro Cadden, Douglas Conigliaro, Carla Conigliaro and Glenn A. Chin, Clare F. Carroll for David M. Schultz and Medical Advanced Pain Specialists, PA, Mark P. Chalos for Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, Federal-State Liaison Counsel, Gerald W. Wray, Jane R. Wray, Raymond McDow and Rosanne Brooks, Joanna J. Chen for Rochester Brain and Spine Neurosurgery & Pain Management, LLC, Patrick J. Cimmarusti for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc, Daniel L. Clayton for Stella M. Miller, Anna M. Sullivan, William E. Johnson, Reba M. Skelton, Roy H. Skelton and C. Dale Sullivan, Sr., Matthew H. Cline for Donald E. Jones, Howell Allen Clinic, A Professional Corporation, Debra Schamberg, John Culclasure, Saint Thomas Outpatient Neurosurgical Center, LLC, PCA Pain Care Center and Neurosurgical Group of Chattanooga, David J. Cocke for Henry B. Higdon and Shirley Higdon, Michael Coren for Kathleen Guzman, Mary Denise Morell and Meghan Handy, Paul Corson for Universal Pain Management Medical Corporation, Dina M. Cox for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc, Barry J. Cadden, Gregory Conigliaro and Lisa Conigliaro Cadden, Jennifer KM Crawford for Denia Taliaferro, Forrest Linthicum, Allison Morris Stoots, Linda Charlene Boggs, Kimberly Elaine Brown and Treva Dawn Morris, Brian M. Cullen for Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Judi Abbott Curry for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc, Matthew C. Daly for Interventional Spine & Sports Medicine, PC, Lauren R. Davis for Kathleen Guzman, Victoria Gibson, Kathryn Drain, George T. Moore, Martha Parkell and Jagdish Patel, Katharine A. Dennis for Ocean State Pain Management, Inc, Jason G. Denton for Cindy A. Carman and Thomas Randy Davis, Thomas Vincent DiGangi for Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Board of Registration in Pharmacy, Daniel J. Divis for Nasareth Hospital and Mercy Health System of S.E. Pennyslvania, Thomas M. Dolan, III for Ocean State Pain Management, Inc and Abdul Barakat, Kimberly A. Dougherty for Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, Joseph Brady, Rebecca Brady, Jojayra Garcia, Cheryl A. McCarthy, Joann Overstreet, John D. Overstreet, Susan M. Edwards, Clay C. Jeffries, Barbara Kennedy, Michael R. Kennedy, Michelle Janin Luna, Leslie G. Musselwhite, Lawrence Carter, Wilma S. Carter, David L. Cooper, Kimberly J. Bradley Cooper, Donna Montee, Pinal Patel, Jeff Pettit, Sally L. Pettit, Chad Green, Scott Vincent Shaw, Rex Johnson Shaw, Elizabeth Dawn Shaw Frank and Anna Maria Shaw Allred, Bryan R. Ebert for Box Hill Surgery Center, LLC, Lauren Ellerman for Chance Baker, Ferman Wertz and Patrick Johnston, Fredric L. Ellis for Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, Margaret Schroder, Robert Schroder, George Cary, Leonard Shaffer and Edward Adams, John D. Eure for Tosha Andrews, Patrick Thomas Fennell for Virginia Crandall & Katt Plaintiffs, Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, Hilda C. Allen, Tosha Andrews, Tamela M. Miller, Debra P. Buchanan, Sharon W. Bishop, Larry Gaskins and Christy Fralin, Diane P. Flannery for Insight Health Corp, Wendy R. Fleishman for Raymond McDow, C. Houston Foppiano for Surgery Center of Wilson, LLC, Elizabeth Masters Fraley for Abbeselom Ghermay and Dallas Back Pain Management/Momentum Pain Management, Bartholomew T. Freeze for Tim I. Chowdhury, Joshua R. Gale for Joan Hulsey, Michael D. Galligan for Bertrum Walker Bryant, Jr., Matthew Gammons for Burton Panitz, Harold D. Gibson for Robert Dana Bender, Patricia S. Brown and Rose M. White, Mary T. Gidaro for Jennifer L. Marko, Robert Marko, Brian T. Pennington, Christopher M. Hannah, Kathryn S. Leaverton, Meghan R. Jones, Jose A. Ramos, Naquita L. Rios, Ricky Rios, Anthony Rivera, Juanita M. Rivera, Jennifer L. Tolotti, Joseph Tolotti, Kathryn Tayvinsky, Robert S. Tayvinsky, Dawn M. Zavacki, Roger Zavacki, Jenna A. Letizia, Paul Letizia, Andre Gould, Meredith Gould, Diane E. Tisa, Ronald Tisa, Drew Normand, Greta Normand and David W. Leaverton, C.J. Gideon, Jr. for Donald E. Jones, Howell Allen Clinic, A Professional Corporation, Debra Schamberg, John Culclasure, Saint Thomas Outpatient Neurosurgical Center, LLC, PCA Pain Care Center and Neurosurgical Group of Chattanooga, Patricia M. Giordano for Allison Devilli and Dale Devilli, James E Girards for Brittany Henley, Molly J. Given for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc, David M. Glass for FDA and US, Mark P. Goodman for Sahara Outpatient Surgery Center, LTD, HCA Health Services of Tennessee, Inc and Surgical Park Center, Ltd, Michael E. Hager for Rochester Brain and Spine Neurosurgery & Pain Management, LLC, Stephanie R. Hanning for Jeffrey B. Glaser and Glaser Pain Institute, Heather Hansen for William A. Anderson, Rothman Institute at Nazareth Hospital and Rothman Institute, C. Meade Hartfield for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc, Michael B. Hayes for South Jersey Healthcare, South Jersey Regional Medical Center, Inspira Medical Center Vineland, Inspira Health Network, Inc. and Inspira Medical Centers, Inc., Barbara Hayes Buell for Hahnemann University Hospital and Tenet HealthSystem Hahnemann, LLC, James S. Higgins for Gerald W. Wray and Jane R. Wray, Eric J. Hoffman for Saint Thomas West Hospital, Saint Thomas Network, Saint Thomas Health and Martin Kelvas, Albert L. Hogan, III for Insight Health Corp, Robert Homes Hood, Jr. for Pain Associates of Charlseton, LLC, C. Mark Hoover for Michigan Pain Specialists, PLLC, Michael R. Hugo for Plaintiffs' Steering Committee and Chad Green, Kathryn J. Humphrey for Southeast Michigan Surgical Hospital, Michele A. Hunton for Alaunus Pharmaceutical, LLC, Rachel Park Hurt for Cumberland Medical Center, Martin S. Hyman for Interventional Spine & Sports Medicine, PC, Robert J. Iacopino for Linda Lui Luong, Eugen D. Williams and Fullerton Orthopaedic Surgery Medical Group, Inc., John Thomas Jessee for John Mathis, Robert O'Brien and Image Guided Pain Management, P.C., Richelle W. Kidder for Ameridose, LLC, James Stephen King for Henry B. Higdon and Shirley Higdon, Randall Loftkin Kinnard for Stella M. Miller, Anna M. Sullivan, William E. Johnson, Reba M. Skelton, Roy H. Skelton and C. Dale Sullivan, Sr., Gregory K. Kirby for B
April 19, 2017 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Kara A. Loridas for Not Parties Liberty Industries, Inc and Liberty Industries, Inc in 17-1003. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued on March 27, 2017. Forwarded to Hermes Netburn O'Connor & Spearing PC 265 Franklin St 7th Flr Boston, MA 02110-3113. [17-1003, 17-1005] (AMM) [Entered: 04/24/2017 03:42 PM]
April 13, 2017 SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: D.45-46 D.770-772,774-780,893-894,898,948-949,1015,1017,1040,1074,1112,1115-1116,1179-1180,1254-1255,1360,1719,2300,2302,2462-2467,2508,2537,2548,2700,2749,2755,2796,2812,2826,2882-2884,2994-2998,3021,3022,3027,3086,3087,3121,3122,3137,3168,3183, 3188. [17-1003] (GB) [Entered: 04/13/2017 11:30 AM]
April 12, 2017 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney George H. Nolan for Not Parties Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, Carolyn Bland, Leon Bland, Wayne A. Reed, Frederick May, Elfreida Hunt Wiley, Elton Lee Wiley and Basil J. McElwee in 17-1003. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued on March 27, 2017. Forwarded to Leader, Bulso & Nolan, PLC Suite 1740 414 Union Street Nashville, TN 37219. [17-1003, 17-1005] (AMM) [Entered: 04/14/2017 10:49 AM]
April 12, 2017 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Kenneth R. Lister, Kenneth R. Lister and Specialty Surgery Center, PLLC in 17-1003 filed by Attorney Clarence James Gideon, Jr.. Certificate of service dated 04/12/2017. [17-1003] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional cases [13-2007, 14-1714, 14-1718, 17-1005]. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (CJG) [Entered: 04/12/2017 05:57 PM]
April 12, 2017 NOTICE issued. After 04/26/2017, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: John Thomas Jessee for John Mathis, Robert O'Brien and Image Guided Pain Management, P.C. and Steven A Stadtmauer for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc. [17-1003] (GB) [Entered: 04/12/2017 01:40 PM]
April 10, 2017 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney James S. Higgins for Not Parties Gerald W. Wray and Jane R. Wray in 17-1003. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued on March 27, 2017. Forwarded to The Higgins Firm 525 Fourth Ave, S Nashville, TN 37201. [17-1003, 17-1005] (AMM) [Entered: 04/11/2017 04:43 PM]
April 10, 2017 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Richard D. Piliponis for Not Parties Gerald W. Wray, Jane R. Wray and Jane R. Wray in 17-1003. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued on March 27, 2017. Forwarded to The Higgins Firm 525 Fourth Ave, S Nashville, TN 37210. [17-1003, 17-1005] (AMM) [Entered: 04/11/2017 04:41 PM]
April 10, 2017 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Richard D. Piliponis for Not Parties Gerald W. Wray, Jane R. Wray and Jane R. Wray. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued on January 5, 2017. Forwarded to The Higgins Firm 525 Fourth Ave, S Nashville, TN 37210. [17-1003] (AMM) [Entered: 04/11/2017 04:40 PM]
April 10, 2017 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Kara A. Loridas for Not Parties Liberty Industries, Inc and Liberty Industries, Inc. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued on January 5, 2017. Forwarded to Hermes Netburn O'Connor & Spearing PC 265 Franklin St 7th Flr Boston, MA 02110-3113. [17-1003] (AMM) [Entered: 04/11/2017 04:31 PM]
April 10, 2017 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney James G. Stranch, III for Not Party Plaintiffs' Steering Committee. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued on January 5, 2017. Forwarded to Branstetter Stranch & Jennings PLLC 4th Floor 227 2nd Ave N Nashville, TN 37201-1631. [17-1003] (AMM) [Entered: 04/11/2017 04:09 PM]
April 10, 2017 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney James G. Stranch, III for Not Party Plaintiffs' Steering Committee in 17-1003. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued on March 27, 2017. Forwarded to Branstetter Stranch & Jennings PLLC 4th Floor 227 2nd Ave N Nashville, TN 37201-1631. [17-1003, 17-1005] (AMM) [Entered: 04/11/2017 04:08 PM]
April 10, 2017 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Mark P. Chalos for Not Parties Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, Federal-State Liaison Counsel, Gerald W. Wray, Jane R. Wray, Raymond McDow and Rosanne Brooks in 17-1003. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued on March 27, 2017. Forwarded to Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein, LLP Suite 1650 150 Fourth Avenue North Nashville, TN 37219. [17-1003, 17-1005] (AMM) [Entered: 04/11/2017 03:55 PM]
April 10, 2017 Mail returned as undeliverable to Not Party Chad Trudeau in 17-1005. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued on March 27, 2017. Forwarded to 16 Huron Ave Narragansett, RI 02882. [17-1003, 17-1005] (AMM) [Entered: 04/11/2017 03:10 PM]
April 10, 2017 Mail returned as undeliverable to Not Party Chad Trudeau. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued on January 5, 2017. Forwarded to 16 Huron Ave Narragansett, RI 02882. [17-1003] (AMM) [Entered: 04/11/2017 03:09 PM]
April 10, 2017 Mail returned as undeliverable to Not Party Darrel Cummings. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued on March 27, 2017. Forwarding address unknown. [17-1003] (AMM) [Entered: 04/11/2017 02:48 PM]
April 10, 2017 NOTICE issued. After April 24, 2017, the clerks office will no longer send notice of court-issued documents to the following attorneys unless they register for an appellate ECF account. [17-1003] (GB) [Entered: 04/10/2017 02:56 PM]
April 10, 2017 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Specialty Surgery Center, PLLC filed by Attorney Christopher J. Tardio. Certificate of service dated 04/10/2017. [17-1003] (CJT) [Entered: 04/10/2017 02:13 PM]
March 28, 2017 AMENDED notice of appeal (doc. #43) filed by Appellant Jocelyn Kae Norris on 01/13/2017. [17-1003] (GB) [Entered: 03/28/2017 09:19 AM]
March 28, 2017 SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: Amended Notice of Appeal. [17-1003] (GB) [Entered: 03/28/2017 09:05 AM]
March 24, 2017 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Jocelyn Kae Norris indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 03/24/2017. [17-1003] (CTC) [Entered: 03/24/2017 11:42 AM]
March 24, 2017 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Jocelyn Kae Norris. Certificate of service dated 03/24/2017. [17-1003] (CTC) [Entered: 03/24/2017 11:40 AM]
March 24, 2017 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Jocelyn Kae Norris filed by Attorney Christopher T. Cain. Certificate of service dated 03/24/2016. [17-1003] (CTC) [Entered: 03/24/2017 11:37 AM]
March 22, 2017 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #34) filed by Appellant Jocelyn Kae Norris. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form and Appearance form due 04/05/2017. PLEASE NOTE: The December 1, 2016 amendment to the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure made significant changes to appellate practice. The full text of the amendments, as well as a summary of major rule changes, is available # here . The changes went into effect on December 1, 2016. [17-1003]. (GB) [Entered: 03/22/2017 02:42 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Norris v. Specialty Surgery Center, PLLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PLAINTIFFS' STEERING COMMITTEE
Represented By: Marc E. Lipton
Represented By: Annika K. Martin
Represented By: James G. Stranch III
Represented By: Mark P. Chalos
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch IV
Represented By: Fredric L. Ellis
Represented By: Steven D. Resnick
Represented By: O. Mark Zamora
Represented By: Michael R. Hugo
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Fennell
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Gastel
Represented By: George H. Nolan
Represented By: Kristen A. Johnson
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: INTERVENTIONAL SPINE & SPORTS MEDICINE, PC
Represented By: Martin S. Hyman
Represented By: Matthew C. Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MICHAEL D. O'NEAL
Represented By: Kathryn M. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PAIN CONSULTANTS OF WEST FLORIDA
Represented By: Halley M. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: EMORY CLINIC, INC.
Represented By: Frank N. Gaeta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SURGERY CENTER OF WILSON, LLC
Represented By: G. Adam Moyers
Represented By: David H. Batten
Represented By: C. Houston Foppiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: UNIVERSAL PAIN MANAGEMENT MEDICAL CORPORATION, d/b/a Universal Pain Management
Represented By: Paul Corson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ROANOKE AREA LICHTENSTEINFISHWICK INTERVENORS
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NEUROSURGICAL GROUP OF CHATTANOOGA, d/b/a Chattanooga Neurosurgery & Spine
Represented By: Chris J. Tardio
Represented By: Clarence James Gideon Jr.
Represented By: Matthew H. Cline
Represented By: John-Mark Zini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: LEONA E. CORKER
Represented By: Steven Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: GREENSPRING SURGICAL CENTER
Represented By: John T. Sly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ALLEGHENY PAIN MANAGEMENT, PC
Represented By: Allen P. Neely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: LIBERTY INDUSTRIES, INC
Represented By: Peter G. Hermes
Represented By: Kara A. Loridas
Represented By: Scott Steven Spearing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: OSMC
Represented By: Robert James Durant Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: STATE OF TENNESSEE
Represented By: Mary M. Bers
Represented By: Joseph Ahillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PAIN ASSOCIATES OF CHARLSETON, LLC, d/b/a InverveneMD
Represented By: Robert Homes Hood Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SURGERY CENTER ASSOCIATES OF HIGHPOINT, LLC
Represented By: Terrill J. Harris
Represented By: Carrie A. Hanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOUTHEAST MICHIGAN SURGICAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kathryn J. Humphrey
Represented By: Steven Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NORTH CAROLINA ORTHOPAEDIC CLINIC
Represented By: Mark E. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS OF NEW ENGLAND COMPOUNDING PHARMACY, INC.
Represented By: David J. Molton
Represented By: Anne Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ROANOKE GENTRY LOCKE PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SUMMIT SURGERY CENTER
Represented By: Maura K. Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PHARMACISTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Nancy Darlene Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MARTIN KELVAS
Represented By: Marcy Hogan Greer
Represented By: Eric J. Hoffman
Represented By: Yvonne K. Puig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: THOREK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Scott C. Bentivenga
Represented By: Kip Joseph Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Amanda Masselam Strachan
Represented By: George P. Varghese
Represented By: Cynthia A. Young
Represented By: David M. Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF TENNESSEE, INC, a/k/a Centennial Medical Center
Represented By: Mark P. Goodman
Represented By: Maura K. Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: FORSYTH STREET AMBULATORY SURGERY CENTER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NEUROMUSCULAR AND REHABILITATION ASSOCIATES OF NORTHERN MICHIGAN, and its employees
Represented By: Brett J. Bean
Represented By: Timothy J. Dardas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: Brian M. Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PAIN MEDICINE SPECIALISTS PA
Represented By: Gregory K. Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JOHN DOE, John Doe c/o Paul W. Shaw
Represented By: Paul W. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, BOARD OF REGISTRATION IN PHARMACY
Represented By: Thomas Vincent DiGangi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: FEDERAL-STATE LIAISON COUNSEL
Represented By: Mark P. Chalos
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ERLANGER HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Cara E. Weiner
Represented By: Arthur P. Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: VIRGINIA CRANDALL & KATT PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Fennell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ROCHESTER BRAIN AND SPINE NEUROSURGERY & PAIN MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: Alan J. Bozer
Represented By: Michael E. Hager
Represented By: Joanna J. Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MICHELE ERKAN
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOUTH BEND CLINIC, LLP
Represented By: David E. Fialkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SURGCENTER OF BEL AIR, LLC
Represented By: Gregory K. Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DOYLESTOWN HOSPITAL
Represented By: John B. Reiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JANE DOES
Represented By: Mark David Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US FOOD & DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Cynthia A. Young
Represented By: David M. Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MICHIGAN PAIN SPECIALISTS, PLLC
Represented By: C. Mark Hoover
Represented By: David M. Thomas
Represented By: Randy J. Hackney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Frank N. Gaeta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JOHN DOES. 1-4
Represented By: Michael J. Pineault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CUMBERLAND MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Rachel Park Hurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SAHARA OUTPATIENT SURGERY CENTER, LTD
Represented By: Mark P. Goodman
Represented By: Maura K. Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: BALTIMORE PAIN MANAGEMENT CENTER
Represented By: Michelle J. Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ORLANDO CENTER FOR OUTPATIENT SURGERY, LP, d/b/a Orlando Center for Outpatient Surgery
Represented By: Theresa A. Domenico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: HARTFORD COUNTY AMBULATORY SURGICAL CENTER LLC
Represented By: Ashley L. Marucci
Represented By: Thomas J. Althauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SURGICAL PARK CENTER, LTD
Represented By: Mark P. Goodman
Represented By: Maura K. Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ENCINO OUTPATIENT SURGERY CENTER, INC
Represented By: Jack R. Reinholtz
Represented By: Cynthia A. Palin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CARLOS JASSIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADIL KATABAY
Represented By: Anthony E. Abeln
Represented By: Tory A. Weigand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW HOWDEN
Represented By: Andrew Howden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PREMIER ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES SURGICAL CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Wolk
Represented By: Jay J. Blumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAINT THOMAS HEALTH
Represented By: Marcy Hogan Greer
Represented By: Sarah P. Kelly
Represented By: Eric J. Hoffman
Represented By: Yvonne K. Puig
Represented By: Adam T. Schramek
Represented By: Stephen J. Brake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIM I. CHOWDHURY
Represented By: Mark L. Schumacher
Represented By: Bartholomew T. Freeze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VAUGHAN A. ALLEN
Represented By: Chris J. Tardio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NASARETH HOSPITAL
Represented By: Frank A. Gerolamo
Represented By: Daniel J. Divis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTER VINELAND, f/k/a South Jersey Healthcare Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Louis R. Moffa Jr.
Represented By: Michael B. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANONYMOUS HEALTH CARE PROVIDER 2
Represented By: Sarah P. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSIGHT HEALTH CORP
Represented By: William H. White Jr.
Represented By: Lena L. Busscher
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Matule
Represented By: Diane P. Flannery
Represented By: Ron E. Meisler
Represented By: Samuel Thurston Towell
Represented By: Albert L. Hogan III
Represented By: Christopher E. Trible
Represented By: Stephen D. Busch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN KANE
Represented By: James A. Bello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL ABRAMS
Represented By: Stephen A. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIGH POINT SURGERY CENTER, A NORTH CAROLINA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: Terrill J. Harris
Represented By: Carrie A. Hanger
Represented By: Joan O. Vorster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICTORY MECHANICAL SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY YVETTE SMITH, a/k/a Kimberly Yvette Smith-Martin
Represented By: Christopher M. Wolk
Represented By: Jay J. Blumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALISHER AND ASSOCIATES, INC.
Represented By: John W. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EUGEN D. WILLIAMS
Represented By: Robert J. Iacopino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIM WHITE
Represented By: Alyson L. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PREMIER ORTHOPAEDIC AND SPORTS MEDICINE ASSOCIATES OF SOUTHERN NJ, LLC, trading as Premier Orthopaedic Associates
Represented By: Christopher M. Wolk
Represented By: Jay J. Blumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADVANCED PAIN & ANESTHESIA CONSULTANTS PC, d/b/a APAC Centers for Pain Management
Represented By: Anthony E. Abeln
Represented By: Tory A. Weigand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANONYMOUS PAIN CLINIC
Represented By: Christopher L. Riegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BKC PAIN SPECIALISTS
Represented By: Anthony E. Abeln
Represented By: Tory A. Weigand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERIDOSE, LLC
Represented By: Walter R. Krzastek
Represented By: Richelle W. Kidder
Represented By: Charles F. Morrow
Represented By: James A. Beakes III
Represented By: Alan M. Winchester
Represented By: Ingrid Schupbach Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANONYMOUS MD 2
Represented By: Christopher L. Riegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENN A. CHIN
Represented By: Carrie W. McCutcheon
Represented By: Brigid M. Carpenter
Represented By: Alan M. Winchester
Represented By: Stephen John Weymouth
Represented By: David L. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDA PETCHELL
Represented By: Marc E. Lipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID M. SCHULTZ
Represented By: Clare F. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GURURAU SUDARSHAN
Represented By: Tory A. Weigand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK, INC., f/k/a South Jersey Health System, Inc.
Represented By: Louis R. Moffa Jr.
Represented By: Michael B. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTERS, INC., f/k/a South Jersey Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Louis R. Moffa Jr.
Represented By: Michael B. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NITESH BHAGAT
Represented By: John M. Lovely
Represented By: Joseph R. Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, d/b/a St. Mary's Surgicare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD E. JONES
Represented By: Chris J. Tardio
Represented By: Clarence James Gideon Jr.
Represented By: Matthew H. Cline
Represented By: John-Mark Zini
Represented By: Alan S. Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANONYMOUS MD 1
Represented By: Christopher L. Riegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW ENGLAND COMPOUNDING PHARMACY, INC, d/b/a New England Compounding Center
Represented By: James J. Yukevich
Represented By: David Michael Macdonald
Represented By: Carrie W. McCutcheon
Represented By: Brigid M. Carpenter
Represented By: Kim M. Schmid
Represented By: Jennifer D. LeBlanc
Represented By: Christopher W. Bascom
Represented By: Judi Abbott Curry
Represented By: Alana K. Bassin
Represented By: Steven A. Stadtmauer
Represented By: Alan M. Winchester
Represented By: C. Meade Hartfield
Represented By: Patrick J. Cimmarusti
Represented By: Jennifer L. Bullard
Represented By: Dina M. Cox
Represented By: Molly J. Given
Represented By: Sara M. Turner
Represented By: David L. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA L. GREENSPAN
Represented By: Brian J. Bouchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTH JERSEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Louis R. Moffa Jr.
Represented By: Michael B. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TENET HEALTHSYSTEM HAHNEMANN, LLC
Represented By: Barbara Hayes Buell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN MESZAROS
Represented By: Marc E. Lipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARLA CONIGLIARO
Represented By: David Michael Macdonald
Represented By: Carrie W. McCutcheon
Represented By: Brigid M. Carpenter
Represented By: David E. Meier
Represented By: Melinda L. Thompson
Represented By: Alan M. Winchester
Represented By: Christopher Weld Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Reade O'Hara
Represented By: David L. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM A. ANTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBRA SCHAMBERG
Represented By: Chris J. Tardio
Represented By: Clarence James Gideon Jr.
Represented By: Matthew H. Cline
Represented By: John-Mark Zini
Represented By: Alan S. Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL SALES MANAGEMENT SW, INC.
Represented By: Daniel M. Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIGH POINT REGIONAL HEALTH, f/k/a High Point Regional Health System, d/b/a High Point Regional Hospital
Represented By: Terrill J. Harris
Represented By: Carrie A. Hanger
Represented By: Joan O. Vorster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM OF S.E. PENNYSLVANIA
Represented By: Frank A. Gerolamo
Represented By: Daniel J. Divis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROTHMAN INSTITUTE
Represented By: Heather Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANONYMOUS HEALTH CARE PROVIDER 5
Represented By: Ronald A. Mingus
Represented By: Sarah P. Kelly
Represented By: Nicholas G. Brunette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILSON CHU
Represented By: Maura K. Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOX HILL SURGERY CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Bryan R. Ebert
Represented By: Gregory K. Kirby
Represented By: Catherine W. Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VANNETTE PERKINS
Represented By: Joseph R. Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAHNEMANN UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Barbara Hayes Buell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARL BIO PHARMA, INC, d/b/a Analytical Research Laboratories
Represented By: Courtney A. Longo
Represented By: Kenneth B. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA CONIGLIARO CADDEN
Represented By: David Michael Macdonald
Represented By: Carrie W. McCutcheon
Represented By: Brigid M. Carpenter
Represented By: Alan M. Winchester
Represented By: Dina M. Cox
Represented By: David L. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANN TUTTLE
Represented By: Tory A. Weigand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASCENSION HEALTH
Represented By: Marcy Hogan Greer
Represented By: Sarah P. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMBULATORY CARE CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Charles Klausing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CINCINNATI PAIN MANAGEMENT CONSULTANTS, INC.
Represented By: Tory A. Weigand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUGLAS CONIGLIARO
Represented By: Carrie W. McCutcheon
Represented By: Brigid M. Carpenter
Represented By: David E. Meier
Represented By: Melinda L. Thompson
Represented By: Alan M. Winchester
Represented By: Christopher Weld Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Reade O'Hara
Represented By: David L. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMAGE GUIDED PAIN MANAGEMENT, P.C., d/b/a Insight Imaging Roanoke
Represented By: John Thomas Jessee
Represented By: Nancy Fuller Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW YORK ADVANCED SURGICAL INTERVENTION CARE PLLC
Represented By: Esther S. Widowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANONYMOUS HEALTH CARE PROVIDER 4
Represented By: Bryan Elliott Rogers
Represented By: Jessica M. Mullen
Represented By: Michelle P. Burchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIKESH BATRA
Represented By: Anthony E. Abeln
Represented By: Tory A. Weigand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CULCLASURE
Represented By: Chris J. Tardio
Represented By: Clarence James Gideon Jr.
Represented By: Matthew H. Cline
Represented By: John-Mark Zini
Represented By: Alan S. Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDOLPH Y. CHANG
Represented By: Anthony E. Abeln
Represented By: Tory A. Weigand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANONYMOUS HEALTH CARE PROVIDER 7
Represented By: Sarah P. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM A. ANDERSON
Represented By: Heather Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FULLERTON ORTHOPAEDIC SURGERY MEDICAL GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Robert J. Iacopino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID TUNG
Represented By: James A. Bello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAINT THOMAS OUTPATIENT NEUROSURGICAL CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Chris J. Tardio
Represented By: Clarence James Gideon Jr.
Represented By: Matthew H. Cline
Represented By: John-Mark Zini
Represented By: Alan S. Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAUNUS PHARMACEUTICAL, LLC
Represented By: Franklin H. Levy
Represented By: Michele A. Hunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL J O'CONNELL, d/b/a Dr O'Connell's Pain Care Center, Inc, d/b/a Pain Care Centers, Inc.
Represented By: James A. Bello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLASER PAIN INSTITUTE
Represented By: Stephanie R. Hanning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORETTTA ZUDIDU
Represented By: Alyson L. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CINCINNATI PAIN MANAGEMENT CONSULTANTS, LTD.
Represented By: Tory A. Weigand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAINT THOMAS WEST HOSPITAL, f/k/a Saint Thomas Hospital
Represented By: Marcy Hogan Greer
Represented By: Sarah P. Kelly
Represented By: Eric J. Hoffman
Represented By: Yvonne K. Puig
Represented By: Adam T. Schramek
Represented By: Stephen J. Brake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANONYMOUS HEALTH CARE PROVIDER 6
Represented By: Sarah P. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWELL ALLEN CLINIC, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Chris J. Tardio
Represented By: Clarence James Gideon Jr.
Represented By: Matthew H. Cline
Represented By: John-Mark Zini
Represented By: Alan S. Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEENA CHADHA
Represented By: Anthony E. Abeln
Represented By: Tory A. Weigand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNRISE HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Maura K. Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABBESELOM GHERMAY
Represented By: Elizabeth Masters Fraley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANONYMOUS HEALTH CARE PROVIDER 8
Represented By: Sarah P. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BETTY MORROW
Represented By: Marc E. Lipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANONYMOUS HEALTH CARE PROVIDER 1
Represented By: Sarah P. Kelly
Represented By: Joseph Charles Klausing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT O'BRIEN
Represented By: John Thomas Jessee
Represented By: Nancy Fuller Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL J O'CONNELL
Represented By: James A. Bello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES MOLNAR
Represented By: Tory A. Weigand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL SALES MANAGEMENT, INC
Represented By: Carrie W. McCutcheon
Represented By: John K. Wells
Represented By: Alan M. Winchester
Represented By: Daniel M. Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROTHMAN INSTITUTE AT NAZARETH HOSPITAL
Represented By: Heather Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN MATHIS
Represented By: John Thomas Jessee
Represented By: Nancy Fuller Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN STATE PAIN MANAGEMENT, INC
Represented By: Matthew R. Connors
Represented By: Sean E. Capplis
Represented By: Thomas M. Dolan III
Represented By: Katharine A. Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY CONIGLIARO
Represented By: David Michael Macdonald
Represented By: Carrie W. McCutcheon
Represented By: Brigid M. Carpenter
Represented By: Alan M. Winchester
Represented By: Dina M. Cox
Represented By: David L. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS A. DWYER
Represented By: Christopher M. Wolk
Represented By: Jay J. Blumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GDC PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: Joshua A. Klarfeld
Represented By: Lisabeth Ryan Kundert
Represented By: Robert Ambrose Curley Jr.
Represented By: Joseph Paul Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORI SHEETS
Represented By: Anthony E. Abeln
Represented By: Tory A. Weigand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASCENSION HEALTH ALLIANCE
Represented By: Marcy Hogan Greer
Represented By: Sarah P. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDA LUI LUONG
Represented By: Robert J. Iacopino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTH JERSEY HEALTHCARE
Represented By: Louis R. Moffa Jr.
Represented By: Michael B. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY B. GLASER
Represented By: Stephanie R. Hanning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARION PAIN MANAGEMENT CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Tory A. Weigand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARBARA WAGNER
Represented By: Ashley L. Marucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARILION SURGERY CENTER NEW RIVER VALLEY, LLC, d/b/a New River Valley Surgery Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCA PAIN CARE CENTER
Represented By: Chris J. Tardio
Represented By: Clarence James Gideon Jr.
Represented By: Matthew H. Cline
Represented By: John-Mark Zini
Represented By: Alan S. Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DALLAS BACK PAIN MANAGEMENT/MOMENTUM PAIN MANAGEMENT
Represented By: Elizabeth Masters Fraley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINNESOTA SURGERY CENTER
Represented By: Robert Laurent Bouley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR O'CONNELL'S PAIN CARE CENTER, INC
Represented By: Matthew R. Connors
Represented By: James A. Bello
Represented By: Benjamin T. Siracusa Hillman
Represented By: Peter G. McGrath
Represented By: Jessica L. Cummings
Represented By: William E. Christie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIFIRST CORPORATION, d/b/a Uniclean Cleanroom Services
Represented By: Michael K. Murray
Represented By: Roberto M. Braceras
Represented By: James C. Rehnquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICTORY HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARRY J. CADDEN
Represented By: David Michael Macdonald
Represented By: Carrie W. McCutcheon
Represented By: Brigid M. Carpenter
Represented By: Alan M. Winchester
Represented By: Dina M. Cox
Represented By: David L. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL ADVANCED PAIN SPECIALISTS, PA
Represented By: Clare F. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAUD SIDDIQUI
Represented By: Anthony E. Abeln
Represented By: Tory A. Weigand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAINT THOMAS NETWORK
Represented By: Marcy Hogan Greer
Represented By: Sarah P. Kelly
Represented By: Eric J. Hoffman
Represented By: Yvonne K. Puig
Represented By: Adam T. Schramek
Represented By: Stephen J. Brake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANONYMOUS HEALTH CARE PROVIDER 3
Represented By: Sarah P. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRYAN ELZHOLZ
Represented By: Anthony E. Abeln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK ZACHERN
Represented By: Mark Zachern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT MARKO
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLADYS G. AUSTIN
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSANNE BROOKS
Represented By: Mark P. Chalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONNIE A. BROWN
Represented By: W. David Paxton
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LESLIE G. MUSSELWHITE
Represented By: Justin A. Browne
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES GREENWOOD
Represented By: Douglas D. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOAN HULSEY
Represented By: Joshua R. Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA MARIA RUSSO
Represented By: Peter G. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLENDA STRATTON
Represented By: Marc E. Lipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE JANIN LUNA
Represented By: Justin A. Browne
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLAY C. JEFFRIES
Represented By: Justin A. Browne
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN T. PENNINGTON
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT EARL HARRIS, JR.
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE CARTER
Represented By: Justin A. Browne
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMELA M. MILLER
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Fennell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE TROPE
Represented By: Jonathan Barry Nace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAIL HEADLEY
Represented By: Kristen A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM BROUSSARD, III
Represented By: Peter G. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTALENE MORRIS
Represented By: William Daniel Leader Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFF PETTIT
Represented By: Justin A. Browne
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAWN M. ZAVACKI
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK JOHNSTON
Represented By: Lauren Ellerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBA M. SKELTON
Represented By: Daniel L. Clayton
Represented By: Randall Loftkin Kinnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK HARANZO, JR.
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROY H. SKELTON
Represented By: Daniel L. Clayton
Represented By: Randall Loftkin Kinnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA MONTEE
Represented By: Justin A. Browne
Represented By: Lisa S. Lee
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGARET SCHRODER
Represented By: Fredric L. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE CARY
Represented By: Fredric L. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNA A. LETIZIA
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHIRLEY HIGDON
Represented By: James Stephen King
Represented By: David J. Cocke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM E. JOHNSON
Represented By: Daniel L. Clayton
Represented By: Randall Loftkin Kinnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHRYN S. LEAVERTON
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAULINE R. MCFARLANE
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDALL FORSTER
Represented By: Daniel Tysen Smith II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM TULEY
Represented By: Daniel Tysen Smith II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHAD TRUDEAU
Represented By: Chad Trudeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORAINE MORRIS
Represented By: Peter G. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA DURBEN
Represented By: Douglas D. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD HEADLEY
Represented By: Kristen A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA CHARLENE BOGGS
Represented By: Jennifer KM Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD BLANKENSHIP
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINE WHEELER
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHESTER T. KALINOSKI
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SALLY L. PETTIT
Represented By: Justin A. Browne
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH JUDD
Represented By: William Daniel Leader Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN M. EDWARDS
Represented By: Justin A. Browne
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVENS WYMAN
Represented By: Peter G. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN FRICK
Represented By: Douglas D. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA KENNEDY
Represented By: Justin A. Browne
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMMY ALLEN
Represented By: Peter G. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAWAN JENKINS
Represented By: S. James Boumil Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAYNE A. REED
Represented By: William Daniel Leader Jr.
Represented By: George H. Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE BOSTIC
Represented By: Douglas D. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD FLOECKHER
Represented By: S. James Boumil Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSANNE MCCALL
Represented By: Peter G. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA NORMAN
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD TISA
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE A. RAMOS
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOE ALCOZAR
Represented By: Douglas D. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA J. STANSBERY
Represented By: Ryan M. Osterholm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIRK THOMPSON, III
Represented By: Peter J. Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER L. TOLOTTI
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALD W. WRAY
Represented By: Annika K. Martin
Represented By: Mark P. Chalos
Represented By: James S. Higgins
Represented By: Richard D. Piliponis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES PALMER
Represented By: Christopher Todd Cain
Represented By: Thomas S. Scott. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM BERTHIAUME
Represented By: Frank Prokos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD T. COURTNEY
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY CHITWOOD
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z.L.F., a minor, by his parents and next friends, Benjamin T. Foutz and Andrea L. Foutz
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREA L. FOUTZ
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA S. BROWN, Executor of the Estate of Louis B. Spicer, Deceased
Represented By: Harold D. Gibson
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAQUITA L. RIOS
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMARJIT K. DEOL
Represented By: William Daniel Leader Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDOLPH E. SMITH
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEAD COUNSEL
Represented By: Jessica Rose MacAuley
Represented By: Kristen A. Johnson
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACEY BRIGGS
Represented By: Douglas D. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILMA S. CARTER
Represented By: Justin A. Browne
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY LEWIS
Represented By: Kathleeln Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DALE DEVILLI
Represented By: Patricia M. Giordano
Represented By: Thomas B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM L. NEAL
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PINAL PATEL
Represented By: Justin A. Browne
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEGHAN HANDY
Represented By: Harry M. Roth
Represented By: Michael Coren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REX JOHNSON SHAW
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREDERICK MAY
Represented By: William Daniel Leader Jr.
Represented By: Paul J. Krog
Represented By: George H. Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRETA NORMAND
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY HALL
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN E. JONES
Represented By: Robert Arthur Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLISON MORRIS STOOTS
Represented By: Jennifer KM Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL COMPTON
Represented By: Peter G. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND MCDOW
Represented By: Wendy R. Fleishman
Represented By: Mark P. Chalos
Represented By: Marilyn T. McGoldrick
Represented By: Fabrice N. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT COBB
Represented By: Douglas D. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BASIL J. MCELWEE
Represented By: William Daniel Leader Jr.
Represented By: George H. Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FERMAN WERTZ
Represented By: Lauren Ellerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE PALMER
Represented By: Christopher Todd Cain
Represented By: Thomas S. Scott. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL R. KENNEDY
Represented By: Justin A. Browne
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN HAYNES
Represented By: Dennis R. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLYN BLAND
Represented By: William Daniel Leader Jr.
Represented By: George H. Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN GUZMAN
Represented By: Harry M. Roth
Represented By: John C. Thornton III
Represented By: Karren Schaeffer
Represented By: Christopher M. Placitella
Represented By: Lauren R. Davis
Represented By: Daniel J. Murphy
Represented By: Anne Andrews
Represented By: Michael Coren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN R. RICHARDS
Represented By: William Daniel Leader Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH SAWYERS
Represented By: Brian L. Schuette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNA MARIA SHAW ALLRED
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROLAND BERTHIAUME
Represented By: Frank Prokos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LECIA J. GOLDEN
Represented By: John E. Lyons Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA GARL
Represented By: Douglas D. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HELENA TROPE, a/k/a Linda Trope
Represented By: Jonathan Barry Nace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNA M. SULLIVAN
Represented By: Daniel L. Clayton
Represented By: Randall Loftkin Kinnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH BRADY
Represented By: Justin A. Browne
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY GASKINS
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Fennell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER L. MARKO
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELISSA MARSHALL
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD ADAMS
Represented By: Fredric L. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATH