Palmer, et al v. Specialty Surgery Center, PLLC, et al
Plaintiff: SANDRA F. ARTIS, DANA MARLENE BRADLEY, RONNIE A. BROWN, RONALD T. COURTNEY, TRUDY R. EPPERLY, BARBARA J. FILSON, Z.L.F., a minor, by his parents and next friends, Benjamin T. Foutz and Andrea L. Foutz, ROBERT EARL HARRIS, JR., JULIAN D. HOLBROOK, ROBERT DANA BENDER, Executor of the Estate of Ralph James Irace, Jr., Deceased, CHESTER T. KALINOSKI, PAULINE R. MCFARLANE, ODESSA M. SHUCK, JAMES WIRT SMITH, JR., RANDOLPH E. SMITH, PATRICIA S. BROWN, Executor of the Estate of Louis B. Spicer, Deceased, JOHN D. SPICER, Executor of the Estate of Louis B. Spicer, Deceased, JENAE S. PATSELL, Executor of the Estate of Louis B. Spicer, Deceased, ROSE M. WHITE, RICHARD A. WHITLOW, SHIRLEY HIGDON, BRITTANY HENLEY, JOAN HULSEY, JOSE A. RAMOS, NORMA KING, THOMAS RANDY DAVIS, CINDY A. CARMAN, BENJAMIN T. FOUTZ, parent-next friend of Z.L.F., ANDREA L. FOUTZ, JOHN CHARLES SAWYERS, ELIZABETH SAWYERS, HILDA C. ALLEN, JUANITA M. RIVERA, CHAD TRUDEAU, DENIA TALIAFERRO, FORREST LINTHICUM, ALLISON MORRIS STOOTS, LINDA CHARLENE BOGGS, KIMBERLY ELAINE BROWN, TREVA DAWN MORRIS, WILLIAM L. NEAL, GLADYS G. AUSTIN, RICHARD BLANKENSHIP, CHERYL BROGAN, KIMBERLY CHITWOOD, CHRISTOPHER COMPTON, SHIRLEY DOYLE, RENATE FARISS, NANCY GOODFELLOW, NORMA HURLEY, MABEL HUTCHERSON, ROSANNE MOON, SHARON OVERSTREET, MARY RADFORD, AUDREY RANSOME, NOSWORTHY REID, LARRY HALL, FRANK HARANZO, JR., SUSANNE HASTINGS, JACOB HELM, STUART KATZ, MELISSA MARSHALL, JANE MCKEON, ANGELA NORMAN, LARRY RICE, DEANNA SMITH, STEVIE THOMAS, BRENDA VARLEY, CHRISTINE WHEELER, BRIAN T. PENNINGTON, NANCY LEWIS, JAMES ROMAN, DENNIS STRATTON, BERNADETTE EFFENDIAN, MARY DENISE MORELL, WILLIAM LEWIS, ROBERT PINKSTAFF, WILLIAM E. JOHNSON, RANDALL FORSTER, DONNA TULEY, WILLIAM TULEY, JARROD WHIRLEY, BURTON PANITZ, JOAN SIMAS, SARAH GILLIAM, WAYNE A. REED, MARGARET HANSON, TOSHA ANDREWS, ROLAND BERTHIAUME, SCOTT BERTHIAUME, DEBRA P. BUCHANAN, ADAM BERTHIAUME, SHARON W. BISHOP, KIM FAYARD, LARRY GASKINS, REBA M. SKELTON, PAUL COMPTON, ROY H. SKELTON, BRITA CARIGNAN, TAMMY ALLEN, STEVENS WYMAN, SHERYL TILLSON, STEVE SWISHER, LISA MARIA RUSSO, LORAINE MORRIS, PARK DAWN, NELLIE POELT, DALE DEVILLI, TIMOTHY REARDON, ALLISON DEVILLI, DEBRA HACHE, CHRISTY FRALIN, ROSANNE MCCALL, WILLIAM BROUSSARD, III, JOJAYRA GARCIA, CHERYL A. MCCARTHY, CHAD GREEN, LECIA J. GOLDEN, SCOTT VINCENT SHAW, individually, as administrator of the Estate of Effie Elwina Shaw, deceased, and on behalf of the beneficiaries of the estate, OWEN FINNEGAN, REX JOHNSON SHAW, STEPHEN HAYNES, ELIZABETH DAWN SHAW FRANK, JOANN OVERSTREET, ANNA MARIA SHAW ALLRED, JOHN D. OVERSTREET, ABDUL BARAKAT, CRAIG S. SIMAS, JOHN E. JONES, NAOMI DAUGHERTY, ROBERT COLE, LEON BLAND, DONALD HEADLEY, GAIL HEADLEY, SUSAN M. EDWARDS, FREDERICK MAY, CLAY C. JEFFRIES, BARBARA KENNEDY, MICHAEL R. KENNEDY, ELTON LEE WILEY, MICHELLE JANIN LUNA, LESLIE G. MUSSELWHITE, LAWRENCE CARTER, WILMA S. CARTER, DAVID L. COOPER, KIMBERLY J. BRADLEY COOPER, DONNA MONTEE, PINAL PATEL, JEFF PETTIT, SALLY L. PETTIT, ANN BEQUETTE, CAROLYN BLAND, AMARJIT K. DEOL, GLENDA J. HURT, KENNETH JUDD, JOSHUA KIRKWOOD, MARY MARTIN, ESTALENE MORRIS, CLARK KENNETH OSBORNE, MAE L. PARMAN, JOSEPH M. PELLICONE, DIANA REED, KEVIN R. RICHARDS, ELFREIDA HUNT WILEY, EARLINE WILLIAMS, JOE ALCOZAR, ARDEMUS ALLEN, GEORGE BOSTIC, TRACEY BRIGGS, LARRY BROWNING, ROBERT COBB, LEISA COPP, VIOLA COPSEY, ALAN CRAIGO, PATRICIA DURBEN, DAWN ELLIOTT, PATRICIA FORTIER, SUSAN FRICK, BRENDA GARL, SUSAN GRICE, MEGHAN HANDY, JAMES GREENWOOD, KATHRYN DRAIN, VICTORIA GIBSON, GEORGE T. MOORE, MARTHA PARKELL, JAGDISH PATEL, BARBARA J. STANSBERY, LEAD COUNSEL, HENRY B. HIGDON, ANNA M. SULLIVAN, CHANCE BAKER, FERMAN WERTZ, PATRICK JOHNSTON, TAMELA M. MILLER, JOHN DOE, TAWAN JENKINS, FRANKLIN JENKINS, DIRK THOMPSON, III, SANDRA HARRISON, MURIEL ARMSTRONG, DONALD FLOECKHER, MARLENE FLOECKHER, RAYMOND MCDOW, GEORGE CARY, ROBERT SCHRODER, MARGARET SCHRODER, HELENA TROPE, a/k/a Linda Trope, LAWRENCE TROPE, JENNIFER L. MARKO, ROBERT MARKO, CHRISTOPHER M. HANNAH, DAVID W. LEAVERTON, MEGHAN R. JONES, NAQUITA L. RIOS, RICKY RIOS, ANTHONY RIVERA, JENNIFER L. TOLOTTI, JOSEPH TOLOTTI, ROBERT S. TAYVINSKY, KATHRYN TAYVINSKY, DAWN M. ZAVACKI, ROGER ZAVACKI, JENNA A. LETIZIA, PAUL LETIZIA, ANDRE GOULD, MEREDITH GOULD, DIANE E. TISA, RONALD TISA, GRETA NORMAND, DREW NORMAND, JANE R. WRAY, GERALD W. WRAY, MARIA LUMBRERAS, BASIL J. MCELWEE, ARNOLD MOON, JOHN MARSINKO, KATHLEEN GUZMAN, JOSEPH BRADY, REBECCA BRADY, DARREL CUMMINGS, EDWARD ADAMS, STELLA M. MILLER, ROSANNE BROOKS, GLENDA STRATTON, C. DALE SULLIVAN, SR., KATHRYN S. LEAVERTON, BERTRUM WALKER BRYANT, JR., next of kin of decedent Margaret Rhea Bryant, JOCELYN KAE NORRIS and LEONARD SHAFFER
Defendant: FULLERTON ORTHOPAEDIC SURGERY MEDICAL GROUP, INC., ALAUNUS PHARMACEUTICAL, LLC, GDC PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT, LLC, DOUGLAS CONIGLIARO, CARLA CONIGLIARO, GLENN A. CHIN, SOUTH JERSEY HEALTHCARE, SOUTH JERSEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, NITESH BHAGAT, CARILION SURGERY CENTER NEW RIVER VALLEY, LLC, d/b/a New River Valley Surgery Center, LLC, PREMIER ORTHOPAEDIC AND SPORTS MEDICINE ASSOCIATES OF SOUTHERN NJ, LLC, trading as Premier Orthopaedic Associates, PREMIER ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES SURGICAL CENTER, LLC, KIMBERLY YVETTE SMITH, a/k/a Kimberly Yvette Smith-Martin, PCA PAIN CARE CENTER, SAINT THOMAS OUTPATIENT NEUROSURGICAL CENTER, LLC, HOWELL ALLEN CLINIC, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION, EUGEN D. WILLIAMS, OCEAN STATE PAIN MANAGEMENT, INC, MEDICAL SALES MANAGEMENT SW, INC., JOHN CULCLASURE, DEBRA SCHAMBERG, INSIGHT HEALTH CORP, SAINT THOMAS WEST HOSPITAL, f/k/a Saint Thomas Hospital, SAINT THOMAS NETWORK, SAINT THOMAS HEALTH, BKC PAIN SPECIALISTS, ADIL KATABAY, NIKESH BATRA, UNIFIRST CORPORATION, d/b/a Uniclean Cleanroom Services, MINNESOTA SURGERY CENTER, MEDICAL ADVANCED PAIN SPECIALISTS, PA, DAVID M. SCHULTZ, ASCENSION HEALTH, ASCENSION HEALTH ALLIANCE, AMBULATORY CARE CENTER, LLC, ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, d/b/a St. Mary's Surgicare, WILLIAM A. ANTE, VAUGHAN A. ALLEN, ADVANCED PAIN & ANESTHESIA CONSULTANTS PC, d/b/a APAC Centers for Pain Management, RANDOLPH Y. CHANG, CINCINNATI PAIN MANAGEMENT CONSULTANTS, INC., GURURAU SUDARSHAN, SUNRISE HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, WILSON CHU, HAHNEMANN UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, TENET HEALTHSYSTEM HAHNEMANN, LLC, ABBESELOM GHERMAY, DALLAS BACK PAIN MANAGEMENT/MOMENTUM PAIN MANAGEMENT, NASARETH HOSPITAL, MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM OF S.E. PENNYSLVANIA, JOHN MATHIS, ROBERT O'BRIEN, WILLIAM A. ANDERSON, ROTHMAN INSTITUTE, ROTHMAN INSTITUTE AT NAZARETH HOSPITAL, ANDREW HOWDEN, MARK ZACHERN, JEFFREY B. GLASER, GLASER PAIN INSTITUTE, ANONYMOUS HEALTH CARE PROVIDER 1, ANONYMOUS HEALTH CARE PROVIDER 2, ANONYMOUS HEALTH CARE PROVIDER 3, ANONYMOUS HEALTH CARE PROVIDER 5, BRYAN ELZHOLZ, NEW YORK ADVANCED SURGICAL INTERVENTION CARE PLLC, ANONYMOUS PAIN CLINIC, ANONYMOUS MD 1, ANONYMOUS MD 2, TIM I. CHOWDHURY, SAUD SIDDIQUI, MEENA CHADHA, PAUL ABRAMS, ANONYMOUS HEALTH CARE PROVIDER 6, ANONYMOUS HEALTH CARE PROVIDER 7, ANONYMOUS HEALTH CARE PROVIDER 8, JAMES MOLNAR, ANONYMOUS HEALTH CARE PROVIDER 4, DR O'CONNELL'S PAIN CARE CENTER, INC, JOHN KANE, MICHAEL J O'CONNELL, d/b/a Dr O'Connell's Pain Care Center, Inc, d/b/a Pain Care Centers, Inc., MICHAEL J O'CONNELL, DAVID TUNG, JOSHUA L. GREENSPAN, CALISHER AND ASSOCIATES, INC., BARBARA WAGNER, VICTORY MECHANICAL SERVICES, INC., VICTORY HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING CO., INC., DONALD E. JONES, BOX HILL SURGERY CENTER, LLC, JIM WHITE, LORETTTA ZUDIDU, INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTER VINELAND, f/k/a South Jersey Healthcare Regional Medical Center, BRIAN MESZAROS, BETTY MORROW, LINDA PETCHELL, LINDA LUI LUONG, THOMAS A. DWYER, INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK, INC., f/k/a South Jersey Health System, Inc., INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTERS, INC., f/k/a South Jersey Hospital, Inc., MARION PAIN MANAGEMENT CENTER, INC., HIGH POINT REGIONAL HEALTH, f/k/a High Point Regional Health System, d/b/a High Point Regional Hospital, HIGH POINT SURGERY CENTER, A NORTH CAROLINA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP, IMAGE GUIDED PAIN MANAGEMENT, P.C., d/b/a Insight Imaging Roanoke, CINCINNATI PAIN MANAGEMENT CONSULTANTS, LTD., VANNETTE PERKINS, LORI SHEETS, ANN TUTTLE, NEW ENGLAND COMPOUNDING PHARMACY, INC, d/b/a New England Compounding Center, AMERIDOSE, LLC, MEDICAL SALES MANAGEMENT, INC, BARRY J. CADDEN, GREGORY CONIGLIARO, LISA CONIGLIARO CADDEN and ARL BIO PHARMA, INC, d/b/a Analytical Research Laboratories
Plaintiff / Appellant: JAMES PALMER and MICHELLE PALMER
Defendant / Appellee: SPECIALTY SURGERY CENTER, PLLC, d/b/a Specialty Surgery Center, KENNETH R. LISTER and KENNETH LISTER, M.D., P.C.
Interested Party: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, BOARD OF REGISTRATION IN PHARMACY, EMORY CLINIC, INC., VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY, SUMMIT SURGERY CENTER, MICHAEL D. O'NEAL, OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS OF NEW ENGLAND COMPOUNDING PHARMACY, INC., UNITED STATES, ROANOKE AREA LICHTENSTEINFISHWICK INTERVENORS, JOHN DOES. 1-4, JOHN DOE, John Doe c/o Paul W. Shaw, JANE DOES, ORLANDO CENTER FOR OUTPATIENT SURGERY, LP, d/b/a Orlando Center for Outpatient Surgery, OSMC, CARLOS JASSIR, VIRGINIA CRANDALL & KATT PLAINTIFFS, US FOOD & DRUG ADMINISTRATION, CUMBERLAND MEDICAL CENTER, LEONA E. CORKER, ERLANGER HEALTH SYSTEM, NEUROSURGICAL GROUP OF CHATTANOOGA, d/b/a Chattanooga Neurosurgery & Spine, LIBERTY INDUSTRIES, INC, SOUTHEAST MICHIGAN SURGICAL HOSPITAL, SURGICAL PARK CENTER, LTD, HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF TENNESSEE, INC, a/k/a Centennial Medical Center, MICHIGAN PAIN SPECIALISTS, PLLC, THOREK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SURGERY CENTER ASSOCIATES OF HIGHPOINT, LLC, BALTIMORE PAIN MANAGEMENT CENTER, NORTH CAROLINA ORTHOPAEDIC CLINIC, MARTIN KELVAS, SOUTH BEND CLINIC, LLP, SURGERY CENTER OF WILSON, LLC, FORSYTH STREET AMBULATORY SURGERY CENTER, LLC, NEUROMUSCULAR AND REHABILITATION ASSOCIATES OF NORTHERN MICHIGAN, and its employees, GREENSPRING SURGICAL CENTER, ROCHESTER BRAIN AND SPINE NEUROSURGERY & PAIN MANAGEMENT, LLC, PAIN CONSULTANTS OF WEST FLORIDA, DOYLESTOWN HOSPITAL, ALLEGHENY PAIN MANAGEMENT, PC, ENCINO OUTPATIENT SURGERY CENTER, INC, INTERVENTIONAL SPINE & SPORTS MEDICINE, PC, SAHARA OUTPATIENT SURGERY CENTER, LTD, PAIN ASSOCIATES OF CHARLSETON, LLC, d/b/a InverveneMD, UNIVERSAL PAIN MANAGEMENT MEDICAL CORPORATION, d/b/a Universal Pain Management, PAIN MEDICINE SPECIALISTS PA, TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA, SURGCENTER OF BEL AIR, LLC, PHARMACISTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, HARTFORD COUNTY AMBULATORY SURGICAL CENTER LLC, MICHELE ERKAN, ROANOKE GENTRY LOCKE PLAINTIFFS, PLAINTIFFS' STEERING COMMITTEE, FEDERAL-STATE LIAISON COUNSEL and STATE OF TENNESSEE
Trustee: PAUL D. MOORE, in his capacity as Chapter 11 Trustee of the Defendant New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc. d/b/a New England Compounding Center and LYNNE F. RILEY
Case Number: 17-1005
Filed: March 27, 2017
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2018 NOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorney has been removed from the service list for this case: Christopher Reade O'Hara for Douglas Conigliaro and Carla Conigliaro. [17-1005] (GB) [Entered: 05/30/2018 01:18 PM]
May 29, 2018 REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Christopher Reade O'Hara for Not Parties Douglas Conigliaro and Carla Conigliaro. Certificate of service was not included. [17-1005] (GB) [Entered: 05/30/2018 01:16 PM]
May 29, 2018 Mail returned as undeliverable to Not Party Chad Trudeau in 17-1005. Copy of Judgment entered May 9, 2018. Forwarding address unknown. [17-1005, 17-1003] (ZN) [Entered: 06/07/2018 09:04 AM]
May 14, 2018 REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Thomas B.K. Ringe, III for Not Party Paul D. Moore. Certificate of service was not included. [17-1005] (GB) [Entered: 05/29/2018 12:26 PM]
May 14, 2018 NOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorney has been removed from the service list for this case: Thomas B.K. Ringe, III for Paul D. Moore. [17-1005] (GB) [Entered: 05/29/2018 12:27 PM]
May 9, 2018 JUDGMENT entered: Upon consideration of the parties' joint motion, it is hereby ordered that this appeal be voluntarily dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) with each party to bear its own costs. Mandate to issue forthwith. [17-1005] (MNH) [Entered: 05/09/2018 01:14 PM]
May 9, 2018 MANDATE issued. [17-1005] (MNH) [Entered: 05/09/2018 01:15 PM]
May 8, 2018 JOINT MOTION to dismiss case filed by Appellant Michelle Palmer. Certificate of service dated 05/08/2018. [17-1005] (CTC) [Entered: 05/08/2018 02:36 PM]
May 8, 2018 JOINT MOTION to dismiss case filed by Appellant James Palmer. Certificate of service dated 05/08/2018. [17-1005] (CTC) [Entered: 05/08/2018 02:34 PM]
April 23, 2018 Mail returned as undeliverable to Not Party Darrel Cummings. Copy of Appellant's Briefing Notice issued on April 6, 2018. Forwarding address unknown. [17-1005] (AMM) [Entered: 04/27/2018 12:19 PM]
April 6, 2018 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 05/16/2018 for appellants James Palmer and Michelle Palmer. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 14 days following service of appellee's brief. [17-1005] (GB) [Entered: 04/06/2018 01:38 PM]
June 14, 2017 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Specialty Surgery Center, PLLC filed by Attorney CJ Gideon Jr.. Certificate of service dated 06/14/2017. [17-1005] (CJT) [Entered: 06/14/2017 02:42 PM]
June 9, 2017 REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Mark David Smith for Not Party Jane Does 1-10. Certificate of service was not included. [17-1005] (GB) [Entered: 06/09/2017 10:56 AM]
June 2, 2017 REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Lena L. Busscher for Not Party Insight Health Corp. Certificate of service was not included. [17-1005] (GB) [Entered: 06/02/2017 12:09 PM]
May 18, 2017 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Michael E. Hager for Not Parties Rochester Brain and Spine Neurosurgery & Pain Management, LLC and Rochester Brain and Spine Neurosurgery & Pain Management, LLC in 17-1003, Attorney Michael E. Hager for Not Parties Rochester Brain and Spine Neurosurgery & Pain Management, LLC, Rochester Brain and Spine Neurosurgery & Pain Management, LLC and Rochester Brain and Spine Neurosurgery & Pain Management, LLC in 17-1005. Copy of Notice issued on April 10, 2017 and Notice issued on April 12, 2017. Forwarded to PO Box 6291 Boston, MA 02114. [17-1003, 17-1005] (AMM) [Entered: 05/22/2017 04:08 PM]
May 12, 2017 REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney David E. Fialkow for Not Party South Bend Clinic, LLP. Certificate of service was not included. [17-1005] (GB) [Entered: 05/12/2017 04:45 PM]
May 10, 2017 REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Diane P. Flannery for Not Party Insight Health Corp. Certificate of service was not included. [17-1005] (GB) [Entered: 05/10/2017 04:30 PM]
May 10, 2017 REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Stephen D. Busch for Not Party Insight Health Corp. Certificate of service was not included. [17-1005] (GB) [Entered: 05/10/2017 04:32 PM]
May 3, 2017 REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Christopher E. Trible for Not Party Insight Health Corp. Certificate of service was not included. [17-1005] (GB) [Entered: 05/10/2017 04:29 PM]
May 1, 2017 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Michael E. Hager for Not Parties Rochester Brain and Spine Neurosurgery & Pain Management, LLC and Rochester Brain and Spine Neurosurgery & Pain Management, LLC in 17-1003, Attorney Michael E. Hager for Not Parties Rochester Brain and Spine Neurosurgery & Pain Management, LLC, Rochester Brain and Spine Neurosurgery & Pain Management, LLC and Rochester Brain and Spine Neurosurgery & Pain Management, LLC in 17-1005. Copy of Notice issued on April 10, 2017 and Notice issued on April 12, 2017. Forwarded to Dane & Howe 45 School St. Boston, MA 02108-3204. [17-1003, 17-1005]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (AMM) [Entered: 05/04/2017 09:44 AM]
April 27, 2017 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Thomas S. Scott., Jr. for James Palmer, Michelle Palmer and Jocelyn Kae Norris, Alan S. Bean for Specialty Surgery Center, PLLC, Kenneth R. Lister and Donald E. Jones, Howell Allen Clinic, A Professional Corporation, Debra Schamberg, John Culclasure, Saint Thomas Outpatient Neurosurgical Center, LLC and PCA Pain Care Center, Matthew H. Cline for Specialty Surgery Center, PLLC, Kenneth R. Lister and Donald E. Jones, Howell Allen Clinic, A Professional Corporation, Debra Schamberg, John Culclasure, Saint Thomas Outpatient Neurosurgical Center, LLC, PCA Pain Care Center and Neurosurgical Group of Chattanooga, Ashley E. Geno for Specialty Surgery Center, PLLC, Kenneth R. Lister and Kenneth Lister, M.D., P.C., C.J. Gideon, Jr. for Specialty Surgery Center, PLLC, Kenneth R. Lister, Kenneth Lister, M.D., P.C. and Donald E. Jones, Howell Allen Clinic, A Professional Corporation, Debra Schamberg, John Culclasure, Saint Thomas Outpatient Neurosurgical Center, LLC, PCA Pain Care Center and Neurosurgical Group of Chattanooga, Kent E. Krause for Specialty Surgery Center, PLLC and Kenneth R. Lister, John-Mark Zini for Specialty Surgery Center, PLLC, Kenneth R. Lister and Donald E. Jones, Howell Allen Clinic, A Professional Corporation, Debra Schamberg, John Culclasure, Saint Thomas Outpatient Neurosurgical Center, LLC, PCA Pain Care Center and Neurosurgical Group of Chattanooga, Thomas J. Althauser for Hartford County Ambulatory Surgical Center LLC, Mark E. Anderson for North Carolina Orthopaedic Clinic, Anne Andrews for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc., Kathleen Guzman, Victoria Gibson, Kathryn Drain, George T. Moore, Martha Parkell and Jagdish Patel, Rosemarie Arnold for Bernadette Effendian, Evan D. Baker for Bernadette Effendian, Kent M. Barker for Robert Cole, Michael Frank Barrett for Jennifer L. Marko, Robert Marko, Brian T. Pennington, Christopher M. Hannah, Kathryn S. Leaverton, Meghan R. Jones, Jose A. Ramos, Naquita L. Rios, Ricky Rios, Anthony Rivera, Juanita M. Rivera, Jennifer L. Tolotti, Joseph Tolotti, Kathryn Tayvinsky, Robert S. Tayvinsky, Dawn M. Zavacki, Roger Zavacki, Jenna A. Letizia, Paul Letizia, Andre Gould, Meredith Gould, Diane E. Tisa, Ronald Tisa, Drew Normand, Greta Normand and David W. Leaverton, Christopher W. Bascom for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc, Alana K. Bassin for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc, David H. Batten for Surgery Center of Wilson, LLC, James A. Beakes, III for Ameridose, LLC, Alan S. Bean for Donald E. Jones, Howell Allen Clinic, A Professional Corporation, Debra Schamberg, John Culclasure, Saint Thomas Outpatient Neurosurgical Center, LLC and PCA Pain Care Center, Scott C. Bentivenga for Thorek Memorial Hospital, Mary M. Bers for State of Tennessee, Jay J. Blumberg for Premier Orthopaedic and Sports Medicine Associates of Southern NJ, LLC, Premier Orthopaedic Associates Surgical Center, LLC, Kimberly Yvette Smith and Thomas A. Dwyer, Brian J Bouchard for Joshua L. Greenspan, Robert Laurent Bouley for Minnesota Surgery Center, Alan J. Bozer for Rochester Brain and Spine Neurosurgery & Pain Management, LLC, Arthur P. Brock for Erlanger Health System, Justin A. Browne for Joseph Brady, Rebecca Brady, Susan M. Edwards, Clay C. Jeffries, Barbara Kennedy, Michael R. Kennedy, Michelle Janin Luna, Leslie G. Musselwhite, Lawrence Carter, Wilma S. Carter, David L. Cooper, Kimberly J. Bradley Cooper, Donna Montee, Pinal Patel, Jeff Pettit and Sally L. Pettit, Nicholas G. Brunette for Anonymous Health Care Provider 5, Jennifer L. Bullard for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc, Michelle P. Burchett for Anonymous Health Care Provider 4, Stephen D. Busch for Insight Health Corp, Lena L. Busscher for Insight Health Corp, David L. Campbell for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc, Barry J. Cadden, Gregory Conigliaro, Lisa Conigliaro Cadden, Douglas Conigliaro, Carla Conigliaro and Glenn A. Chin, Brigid M. Carpenter for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc, Barry J. Cadden, Gregory Conigliaro, Lisa Conigliaro Cadden, Douglas Conigliaro, Carla Conigliaro and Glenn A. Chin, Clare F. Carroll for David M. Schultz and Medical Advanced Pain Specialists, PA, Mark P. Chalos for Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, Federal-State Liaison Counsel, Gerald W. Wray, Jane R. Wray, Raymond McDow and Rosanne Brooks, Joanna J. Chen for Rochester Brain and Spine Neurosurgery & Pain Management, LLC, Patrick J. Cimmarusti for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc, Daniel L. Clayton for Stella M. Miller, Anna M. Sullivan, William E. Johnson, Reba M. Skelton, Roy H. Skelton and C. Dale Sullivan, Sr., Matthew H. Cline for Donald E. Jones, Howell Allen Clinic, A Professional Corporation, Debra Schamberg, John Culclasure, Saint Thomas Outpatient Neurosurgical Center, LLC, PCA Pain Care Center and Neurosurgical Group of Chattanooga, David J. Cocke for Henry B. Higdon and Shirley Higdon, Michael Coren for Kathleen Guzman, Mary Denise Morell and Meghan Handy, Paul Corson for Universal Pain Management Medical Corporation, Dina M. Cox for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc, Barry J. Cadden, Gregory Conigliaro and Lisa Conigliaro Cadden, Jennifer KM Crawford for Denia Taliaferro, Forrest Linthicum, Allison Morris Stoots, Linda Charlene Boggs, Kimberly Elaine Brown and Treva Dawn Morris, Brian M. Cullen for Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Judi Abbott Curry for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc, Matthew C. Daly for Interventional Spine & Sports Medicine, PC, Lauren R. Davis for Kathleen Guzman, Victoria Gibson, Kathryn Drain, George T. Moore, Martha Parkell and Jagdish Patel, Katharine A. Dennis for Ocean State Pain Management, Inc, Jason G. Denton for Cindy A. Carman and Thomas Randy Davis, Thomas Vincent DiGangi for Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Board of Registration in Pharmacy, Daniel J. Divis for Nasareth Hospital and Mercy Health System of S.E. Pennyslvania, Thomas M. Dolan, III for Ocean State Pain Management, Inc and Abdul Barakat, Kimberly A. Dougherty for Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, Joseph Brady, Rebecca Brady, Jojayra Garcia, Cheryl A. McCarthy, Joann Overstreet, John D. Overstreet, Susan M. Edwards, Clay C. Jeffries, Barbara Kennedy, Michael R. Kennedy, Michelle Janin Luna, Leslie G. Musselwhite, Lawrence Carter, Wilma S. Carter, David L. Cooper, Kimberly J. Bradley Cooper, Donna Montee, Pinal Patel, Jeff Pettit, Sally L. Pettit, Chad Green, Scott Vincent Shaw, Rex Johnson Shaw, Elizabeth Dawn Shaw Frank and Anna Maria Shaw Allred, Bryan R. Ebert for Box Hill Surgery Center, LLC, Lauren Ellerman for Chance Baker, Ferman Wertz and Patrick Johnston, Fredric L. Ellis for Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, Margaret Schroder, Robert Schroder, George Cary, Leonard Shaffer and Edward Adams, John D. Eure for Tosha Andrews, Patrick Thomas Fennell for Virginia Crandall & Katt Plaintiffs, Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, Hilda C. Allen, Tosha Andrews, Tamela M. Miller, Debra P. Buchanan, Sharon W. Bishop, Larry Gaskins and Christy Fralin, Diane P. Flannery for Insight Health Corp, Wendy R. Fleishman for Raymond McDow, C. Houston Foppiano for Surgery Center of Wilson, LLC, Elizabeth Masters Fraley for Abbeselom Ghermay and Dallas Back Pain Management/Momentum Pain Management, Bartholomew T. Freeze for Tim I. Chowdhury, Frank N. Gaeta for Emory Clinic, Inc. and Vanderbilt University, Joshua R. Gale for Joan Hulsey, Michael D. Galligan for Bertrum Walker Bryant, Jr., Matthew Gammons for Burton Panitz, Frank A. Gerolamo for Nasareth Hospital and Mercy Health System of S.E. Pennyslvania, Harold D. Gibson for Robert Dana Bender, Patricia S. Brown and Rose M. White, Mary T. Gidaro for Jennifer L. Marko, Robert Marko, Brian T. Pennington, Christopher M. Hannah, Kathryn S. Leaverton, Meghan R. Jones, Jose A. Ramos, Naquita L. Rios, Ricky Rios, Anthony Rivera, Juanita M. Rivera, Jennifer L. Tolotti, Joseph Tolotti, Kathryn Tayvinsky, Robert S. Tayvinsky, Dawn M. Zavacki, Roger Zavacki, Jenna A. Letizia, Paul Letizia, Andre Gould, Meredith Gould, Diane E. Tisa, Ronald Tisa, Drew Normand, Greta Normand and David W. Leaverton, C.J. Gideon, Jr. for Donald E. Jones, Howell Allen Clinic, A Professional Corporation, Debra Schamberg, John Culclasure, Saint Thomas Outpatient Neurosurgical Center, LLC, PCA Pain Care Center and Neurosurgical Group of Chattanooga, Patricia M. Giordano for Allison Devilli and Dale Devilli, James E Girards for Brittany Henley, Molly J. Given for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc, David M. Glass for FDA and US, Mark P. Goodman for Sahara Outpatient Surgery Center, LTD, HCA Health Services of Tennessee, Inc and Surgical Park Center, Ltd, Deborah Gresko-Blackburn for Craig S. Simas and Joan Simas, Stephen A. Grossman for Paul Abrams, Michael E. Hager for Rochester Brain and Spine Neurosurgery & Pain Management, LLC, Stephanie R. Hanning for Jeffrey B. Glaser and Glaser Pain Institute, Heather Hansen for William A. Anderson, Rothman Institute at Nazareth Hospital and Rothman Institute, C. Meade Hartfield for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc, Michael B. Hayes for South Jersey Healthcare, South Jersey Regional Medical Center, Inspira Medical Center Vineland, Inspira Health Network, Inc. and Inspira Medical Centers, Inc., Barbara Hayes Buell for Hahnemann University Hospital and Tenet HealthSystem Hahnemann, LLC, James S. Higgins for Gerald W. Wray and Jane R. Wray, Albert L. Hogan, III for Insight Health Corp, Robert Homes Hood, Jr. for Pain Associates of Charlseton, LLC, C. Mark Hoover for Michigan Pain Specialists, PLLC, Michael R. Hugo for Plaintiffs' Steering Committee and Chad Green, Kathryn J. Humphrey for Southeast Michigan Surgical Hospital, Michele A. Hunton for Alaunus Pharmaceutical, LLC, Rachel Park Hurt for Cumberland Medical Center, Martin S. Hyman for Interventional Spine & Sports Medicine, PC, Robert J. Iacopino for Linda Lui Luong, Eugen D. Williams and Fullerton Orthopaedic Surgery Medical Group, Inc., John Thomas Jessee for John Mathis, Robert O'Brien and Image Guided Pain Man
April 19, 2017 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Kara A. Loridas for Not Parties Liberty Industries, Inc and Liberty Industries, Inc in 17-1003. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued on March 27, 2017. Forwarded to Hermes Netburn O'Connor & Spearing PC 265 Franklin St 7th Flr Boston, MA 02110-3113. [17-1003, 17-1005] (AMM) [Entered: 04/24/2017 03:42 PM]
April 13, 2017 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Specialty Surgery Center, PLLC filed by Attorney Chris J. Tardio. Certificate of service dated 04/13/2017. [17-1005] (CJT) [Entered: 04/13/2017 04:28 PM]
April 13, 2017 SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: ECF 46,47; D.770-772,774-780,893,894,898,948,949,1015,1017,1040,1074,1112,1115,1116,1179,1180,1254,1255,1360,1719,2300,2302,2462-2467,2508,2537,2548,2700,2749,2755,2796,2812,2826,2882-2884,2994-2998,3021,3022,3027,3086,3087,3121,3122,3137,3168,3183, 3188. [17-1005] (GB) [Entered: 04/13/2017 11:42 AM]
April 12, 2017 NOTICE issued. After 04/26/2017, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Thomas S. Scott., Jr. for James Palmer, Michelle Palmer and Jocelyn Kae Norris, Alan S. Bean for Specialty Surgery Center, PLLC, Kenneth R. Lister and Donald E. Jones, Howell Allen Clinic, A Professional Corporation, Debra Schamberg, John Culclasure, Saint Thomas Outpatient Neurosurgical Center, LLC and PCA Pain Care Center, Megan A. Carrick for Specialty Surgery Center, PLLC and Kenneth R. Lister, Parks T. Chastain for Specialty Surgery Center, PLLC and Kenneth R. Lister, Matthew H. Cline for Specialty Surgery Center, PLLC, Kenneth R. Lister and Donald E. Jones, Howell Allen Clinic, A Professional Corporation, Debra Schamberg, John Culclasure, Saint Thomas Outpatient Neurosurgical Center, LLC, PCA Pain Care Center and Neurosurgical Group of Chattanooga, Ashley E. Geno for Specialty Surgery Center, PLLC and Kenneth R. Lister, C.J. Gideon, Jr. for Specialty Surgery Center, PLLC, Kenneth R. Lister and Donald E. Jones, Howell Allen Clinic, A Professional Corporation, Debra Schamberg, John Culclasure, Saint Thomas Outpatient Neurosurgical Center, LLC, PCA Pain Care Center and Neurosurgical Group of Chattanooga, Kent E. Krause for Specialty Surgery Center, PLLC and Kenneth R. Lister, John-Mark Zini for Specialty Surgery Center, PLLC, Kenneth R. Lister and Donald E. Jones, Howell Allen Clinic, A Professional Corporation, Debra Schamberg, John Culclasure, Saint Thomas Outpatient Neurosurgical Center, LLC, PCA Pain Care Center and Neurosurgical Group of Chattanooga, Joseph Ahillen for State of Tennessee, Peter J. Ainsworth for Dirk Thompson, III and Muriel Armstrong, Linda Aldon for John Doe, Thomas J. Althauser for Hartford County Ambulatory Surgical Center LLC, Mark E. Anderson for North Carolina Orthopaedic Clinic, Anne Andrews for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc., Kathleen Guzman, Victoria Gibson, Kathryn Drain, George T. Moore, Martha Parkell and Jagdish Patel, Rosemarie Arnold for Bernadette Effendian, Evan D. Baker for Bernadette Effendian, Kent M. Barker for Robert Cole, Michael Frank Barrett for Jennifer L. Marko, Robert Marko, Brian T. Pennington, Christopher M. Hannah, Kathryn S. Leaverton, Meghan R. Jones, Jose A. Ramos, Naquita L. Rios, Ricky Rios, Anthony Rivera, Juanita M. Rivera, Jennifer L. Tolotti, Joseph Tolotti, Kathryn Tayvinsky, Robert S. Tayvinsky, Dawn M. Zavacki, Roger Zavacki, Jenna A. Letizia, Paul Letizia, Andre Gould, Meredith Gould, Diane E. Tisa, Ronald Tisa, Drew Normand, Greta Normand and David W. Leaverton, Christopher W. Bascom for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc, Alana K. Bassin for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc, David H. Batten for Surgery Center of Wilson, LLC, James A. Beakes, III for Ameridose, LLC, Scott C. Bentivenga for Thorek Memorial Hospital, Mary M. Bers for State of Tennessee, Jay J. Blumberg for Premier Orthopaedic and Sports Medicine Associates of Southern NJ, LLC, Premier Orthopaedic Associates Surgical Center, LLC, Kimberly Yvette Smith and Thomas A. Dwyer, Brian J Bouchard for Joshua L. Greenspan, Robert Laurent Bouley for Minnesota Surgery Center, Alan J. Bozer for Rochester Brain and Spine Neurosurgery & Pain Management, LLC, Arthur P. Brock for Erlanger Health System, Dennis R. Brown for Owen Finnegan and Stephen Haynes, Justin A. Browne for Joseph Brady, Rebecca Brady, Susan M. Edwards, Clay C. Jeffries, Barbara Kennedy, Michael R. Kennedy, Michelle Janin Luna, Leslie G. Musselwhite, Lawrence Carter, Wilma S. Carter, David L. Cooper, Kimberly J. Bradley Cooper, Donna Montee, Pinal Patel, Jeff Pettit and Sally L. Pettit, Nicholas G. Brunette for Anonymous Health Care Provider 5, Jennifer L. Bullard for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc, Michelle P. Burchett for Anonymous Health Care Provider 4, Stephen D. Busch for Insight Health Corp, Lena L. Busscher for Insight Health Corp, David L. Campbell for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc, Barry J. Cadden, Gregory Conigliaro, Lisa Conigliaro Cadden, Douglas Conigliaro, Carla Conigliaro and Glenn A. Chin, Brigid M. Carpenter for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc, Barry J. Cadden, Gregory Conigliaro, Lisa Conigliaro Cadden, Douglas Conigliaro, Carla Conigliaro and Glenn A. Chin, Clare F. Carroll for David M. Schultz and Medical Advanced Pain Specialists, PA, Mark P. Chalos for Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, Federal-State Liaison Counsel, Gerald W. Wray, Jane R. Wray, Raymond McDow and Rosanne Brooks, Joanna J. Chen for Rochester Brain and Spine Neurosurgery & Pain Management, LLC, Patrick J. Cimmarusti for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc, Daniel L. Clayton for Stella M. Miller, Anna M. Sullivan, William E. Johnson, Reba M. Skelton, Roy H. Skelton and C. Dale Sullivan, Sr., Matthew H. Cline for Donald E. Jones, Howell Allen Clinic, A Professional Corporation, Debra Schamberg, John Culclasure, Saint Thomas Outpatient Neurosurgical Center, LLC, PCA Pain Care Center and Neurosurgical Group of Chattanooga, David J. Cocke for Henry B. Higdon and Shirley Higdon, Matthew R. Connors for Dr O'Connell's Pain Care Center, Inc, Ocean State Pain Management, Inc and Abdul Barakat, Michael Coren for Kathleen Guzman, Mary Denise Morell and Meghan Handy, Paul Corson for Universal Pain Management Medical Corporation, Dina M. Cox for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc, Barry J. Cadden, Gregory Conigliaro and Lisa Conigliaro Cadden, Jennifer KM Crawford for Denia Taliaferro, Forrest Linthicum, Allison Morris Stoots, Linda Charlene Boggs, Kimberly Elaine Brown and Treva Dawn Morris, Brian M. Cullen for Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Jessica L. Cummings for Dr O'Connell's Pain Care Center, Inc, Judi Abbott Curry for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc, Matthew C. Daly for Interventional Spine & Sports Medicine, PC, Lauren R. Davis for Kathleen Guzman, Victoria Gibson, Kathryn Drain, George T. Moore, Martha Parkell and Jagdish Patel, Katharine A. Dennis for Ocean State Pain Management, Inc, Jason G. Denton for Cindy A. Carman and Thomas Randy Davis, Thomas Vincent DiGangi for Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Board of Registration in Pharmacy, Daniel J. Divis for Nasareth Hospital and Mercy Health System of S.E. Pennyslvania, Thomas M. Dolan, III for Ocean State Pain Management, Inc and Abdul Barakat, Kimberly A. Dougherty for Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, Joseph Brady, Rebecca Brady, Jojayra Garcia, Cheryl A. McCarthy, Joann Overstreet, John D. Overstreet, Susan M. Edwards, Clay C. Jeffries, Barbara Kennedy, Michael R. Kennedy, Michelle Janin Luna, Leslie G. Musselwhite, Lawrence Carter, Wilma S. Carter, David L. Cooper, Kimberly J. Bradley Cooper, Donna Montee, Pinal Patel, Jeff Pettit, Sally L. Pettit, Chad Green, Scott Vincent Shaw, Rex Johnson Shaw, Elizabeth Dawn Shaw Frank and Anna Maria Shaw Allred, Bryan R. Ebert for Box Hill Surgery Center, LLC, Lauren Ellerman for Chance Baker, Ferman Wertz and Patrick Johnston, Fredric L. Ellis for Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, Margaret Schroder, Robert Schroder, George Cary, Leonard Shaffer and Edward Adams, John D. Eure for Tosha Andrews, Patrick Thomas Fennell for Virginia Crandall & Katt Plaintiffs, Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, Hilda C. Allen, Tosha Andrews, Tamela M. Miller, Debra P. Buchanan, Sharon W. Bishop, Larry Gaskins and Christy Fralin, Diane P. Flannery for Insight Health Corp, Wendy R. Fleishman for Raymond McDow, C. Houston Foppiano for Surgery Center of Wilson, LLC, Elizabeth Masters Fraley for Abbeselom Ghermay and Dallas Back Pain Management/Momentum Pain Management, Bartholomew T. Freeze for Tim I. Chowdhury, Frank N. Gaeta for Emory Clinic, Inc. and Vanderbilt University, Joshua R. Gale for Joan Hulsey, Michael D. Galligan for Bertrum Walker Bryant, Jr., Matthew Gammons for Burton Panitz, Frank A. Gerolamo for Nasareth Hospital and Mercy Health System of S.E. Pennyslvania, Harold D. Gibson for Robert Dana Bender, Patricia S. Brown and Rose M. White, Mary T. Gidaro for Jennifer L. Marko, Robert Marko, Brian T. Pennington, Christopher M. Hannah, Kathryn S. Leaverton, Meghan R. Jones, Jose A. Ramos, Naquita L. Rios, Ricky Rios, Anthony Rivera, Juanita M. Rivera, Jennifer L. Tolotti, Joseph Tolotti, Kathryn Tayvinsky, Robert S. Tayvinsky, Dawn M. Zavacki, Roger Zavacki, Jenna A. Letizia, Paul Letizia, Andre Gould, Meredith Gould, Diane E. Tisa, Ronald Tisa, Drew Normand, Greta Normand and David W. Leaverton, C.J. Gideon, Jr. for Donald E. Jones, Howell Allen Clinic, A Professional Corporation, Debra Schamberg, John Culclasure, Saint Thomas Outpatient Neurosurgical Center, LLC, PCA Pain Care Center and Neurosurgical Group of Chattanooga, Patricia M. Giordano for Allison Devilli and Dale Devilli, James E Girards for Brittany Henley, Molly J. Given for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc, David M. Glass for FDA and US, Mark P. Goodman for Sahara Outpatient Surgery Center, LTD, HCA Health Services of Tennessee, Inc and Surgical Park Center, Ltd, Deborah Gresko-Blackburn for Craig S. Simas and Joan Simas, Stephen A. Grossman for Paul Abrams, Michael E. Hager for Rochester Brain and Spine Neurosurgery & Pain Management, LLC, Stephanie R. Hanning for Jeffrey B. Glaser and Glaser Pain Institute, Heather Hansen for William A. Anderson, Rothman Institute at Nazareth Hospital and Rothman Institute, C. Meade Hartfield for New England Compounding Pharmacy, Inc, Michael B. Hayes for South Jersey Healthcare, South Jersey Regional Medical Center, Inspira Medical Center Vineland, Inspira Health Network, Inc. and Inspira Medical Centers, Inc., Barbara Hayes Buell for Hahnemann University Hospital and Tenet HealthSystem Hahnemann, LLC, James S. Higgins for Gerald W. Wray and Jane R. Wray, Eric J. Hoffman for Saint Thomas West Hospital, Saint Thomas Network, Saint Thomas Health and Martin Kelvas, Albert L. Hogan, III for Insight Health Corp, Robert Homes Hood, Jr. for Pain Associates of Charlseton, LLC, C. Mark Hoover for Michigan Pain Specialists, PLLC, Michael R. Hugo for Plaintiffs' Steering Committee and Chad Green, Kathryn J. Humphrey for Southeast
April 12, 2017 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Kenneth R. Lister, Kenneth R. Lister and Specialty Surgery Center, PLLC in 17-1005 filed by Attorney Clarence James Gideon, Jr.. Certificate of service dated 04/12/2017. [17-1005] CLERK'S NOTE: The wrong PDF file was attached. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS. Document should not have been filed in additional cases. [13-2007, 14-1714, 14-1718, 17-1003] Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (CJG) [Entered: 04/12/2017 05:44 PM]
April 12, 2017 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney George H. Nolan for Not Parties Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, Carolyn Bland, Leon Bland, Wayne A. Reed, Frederick May, Elfreida Hunt Wiley, Elton Lee Wiley and Basil J. McElwee in 17-1003. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued on March 27, 2017. Forwarded to Leader, Bulso & Nolan, PLC Suite 1740 414 Union Street Nashville, TN 37219. [17-1003, 17-1005] (AMM) [Entered: 04/14/2017 10:49 AM]
April 10, 2017 Mail returned as undeliverable to Not Party Chad Trudeau in 17-1005. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued on March 27, 2017. Forwarded to 16 Huron Ave Narragansett, RI 02882. [17-1003, 17-1005] (AMM) [Entered: 04/11/2017 03:10 PM]
April 10, 2017 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Mark P. Chalos for Not Parties Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, Federal-State Liaison Counsel, Gerald W. Wray, Jane R. Wray, Raymond McDow and Rosanne Brooks in 17-1003. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued on March 27, 2017. Forwarded to Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein, LLP Suite 1650 150 Fourth Avenue North Nashville, TN 37219. [17-1003, 17-1005] (AMM) [Entered: 04/11/2017 03:55 PM]
April 10, 2017 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney James G. Stranch, III for Not Party Plaintiffs' Steering Committee in 17-1003. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued on March 27, 2017. Forwarded to Branstetter Stranch & Jennings PLLC 4th Floor 227 2nd Ave N Nashville, TN 37201-1631. [17-1003, 17-1005] (AMM) [Entered: 04/11/2017 04:08 PM]
April 10, 2017 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney James S. Higgins for Not Parties Gerald W. Wray and Jane R. Wray in 17-1003. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued on March 27, 2017. Forwarded to The Higgins Firm 525 Fourth Ave, S Nashville, TN 37201. [17-1003, 17-1005] (AMM) [Entered: 04/11/2017 04:43 PM]
April 10, 2017 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Richard D. Piliponis for Not Parties Gerald W. Wray, Jane R. Wray and Jane R. Wray in 17-1003. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued on March 27, 2017. Forwarded to The Higgins Firm 525 Fourth Ave, S Nashville, TN 37210. [17-1003, 17-1005] (AMM) [Entered: 04/11/2017 04:41 PM]
March 31, 2017 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants James Palmer and Michelle Palmer indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 03/31/2017. [17-1005] (CTC) [Entered: 03/31/2017 09:34 AM]
March 31, 2017 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants James Palmer and Michelle Palmer filed by Attorney Christopher T. Cain. Certificate of service dated 03/31/2017. [17-1005] (CTC) [Entered: 03/31/2017 09:33 AM]
March 28, 2017 AMENDED notice of appeal (doc. #44) filed by Appellants James Palmer and Michelle Palmer on 01/13/2017. [17-1005] (GB) [Entered: 03/28/2017 09:21 AM]
March 28, 2017 SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: Amended Notice of Appeal. [17-1005] (GB) [Entered: 03/28/2017 09:20 AM]
March 28, 2017 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants James Palmer and Michelle Palmer. Certificate of service dated 03/28/2017. [17-1005] (CTC) [Entered: 03/28/2017 11:39 AM]
March 28, 2017 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants James Palmer and Michelle Palmer filed by Attorney Christoher T. Cain. Certificate of service dated 03/28/2017. [17-1005] CLERK'S NOTE: The name of the ECF Filer must be preceded by an "s/" and typed in the space where the signature would otherwise appear. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS (04/03/2017). (CTC) [Entered: 03/28/2017 11:41 AM]
March 28, 2017 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants James Palmer and Michelle Palmer indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 03/28/2017. [17-1005] CLERK'S NOTE: The document is incomplete: the filer's name, signature, firm's name, address, email address and telephone number is required. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS (04/03/2017). (CTC) [Entered: 03/28/2017 11:43 AM]
March 27, 2017 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #35) filed by Appellants James Palmer and Michelle Palmer. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form and Appearance form due 04/10/2017. PLEASE NOTE: The December 1, 2016 amendment to the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure made significant changes to appellate practice. The full text of the amendments, as well as a summary of major rule changes, is available # here . The changes went into effect on December 1, 2016. [17-1005] (GB) [Entered: 03/27/2017 03:17 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Palmer, et al v. Specialty Surgery Center, PLLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES PALMER
Represented By: Christopher Todd Cain
Represented By: Thomas S. Scott. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHELLE PALMER
Represented By: Christopher Todd Cain
Represented By: Thomas S. Scott. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA F. ARTIS
Represented By: W. David Paxton
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANA MARLENE BRADLEY
Represented By: W. David Paxton
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONNIE A. BROWN
Represented By: W. David Paxton
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD T. COURTNEY
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUDY R. EPPERLY
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA J. FILSON
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z.L.F., a minor, by his parents and next friends, Benjamin T. Foutz and Andrea L. Foutz
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT EARL HARRIS, JR.
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIAN D. HOLBROOK
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT DANA BENDER, Executor of the Estate of Ralph James Irace, Jr., Deceased
Represented By: Harold D. Gibson
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHESTER T. KALINOSKI
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAULINE R. MCFARLANE
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ODESSA M. SHUCK
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES WIRT SMITH, JR.
Represented By: W. David Paxton
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDOLPH E. SMITH
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA S. BROWN, Executor of the Estate of Louis B. Spicer, Deceased
Represented By: Harold D. Gibson
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN D. SPICER, Executor of the Estate of Louis B. Spicer, Deceased
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENAE S. PATSELL, Executor of the Estate of Louis B. Spicer, Deceased
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSE M. WHITE
Represented By: Harold D. Gibson
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD A. WHITLOW
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHIRLEY HIGDON
Represented By: David J. Cocke
Represented By: James Stephen King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRITTANY HENLEY
Represented By: James E. Girards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOAN HULSEY
Represented By: Joshua R. Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE A. RAMOS
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORMA KING
Represented By: Kathleeln Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS RANDY DAVIS
Represented By: Jason G. Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CINDY A. CARMAN
Represented By: Jason G. Denton
Represented By: Edgar Taylor III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENJAMIN T. FOUTZ, parent-next friend of Z.L.F.
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREA L. FOUTZ
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN CHARLES SAWYERS
Represented By: Brian L. Schuette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH SAWYERS
Represented By: Brian L. Schuette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HILDA C. ALLEN
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Fennell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUANITA M. RIVERA
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHAD TRUDEAU
Represented By: Chad Trudeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENIA TALIAFERRO
Represented By: Jennifer KM Crawford
Represented By: Nolan Ray Nicely Jr.
Represented By: Russell Wayne Updike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FORREST LINTHICUM
Represented By: Jennifer KM Crawford
Represented By: Nolan Ray Nicely Jr.
Represented By: Russell Wayne Updike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLISON MORRIS STOOTS
Represented By: Jennifer KM Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA CHARLENE BOGGS
Represented By: Jennifer KM Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY ELAINE BROWN
Represented By: Jennifer KM Crawford
Represented By: Nolan Ray Nicely Jr.
Represented By: Russell Wayne Updike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TREVA DAWN MORRIS
Represented By: Jennifer KM Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM L. NEAL
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLADYS G. AUSTIN
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD BLANKENSHIP
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERYL BROGAN
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY CHITWOOD
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER COMPTON
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHIRLEY DOYLE
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RENATE FARISS
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY GOODFELLOW
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORMA HURLEY
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MABEL HUTCHERSON
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSANNE MOON
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON OVERSTREET
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY RADFORD
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUDREY RANSOME
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOSWORTHY REID
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY HALL
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK HARANZO, JR.
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSANNE HASTINGS
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACOB HELM
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STUART KATZ
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELISSA MARSHALL
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE MCKEON
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA NORMAN
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY RICE
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEANNA SMITH
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVIE THOMAS
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA VARLEY
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINE WHEELER
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN T. PENNINGTON
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY LEWIS
Represented By: Kathleeln Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES ROMAN
Represented By: Jonathan Barry Nace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS STRATTON
Represented By: Marc E. Lipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERNADETTE EFFENDIAN
Represented By: Rosemarie Arnold
Represented By: Evan D. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY DENISE MORELL
Represented By: Michael Coren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM LEWIS
Represented By: Kathleeln Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT PINKSTAFF
Represented By: Daniel Tysen Smith II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM E. JOHNSON
Represented By: Daniel L. Clayton
Represented By: Randall Loftkin Kinnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDALL FORSTER
Represented By: Daniel Tysen Smith II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA TULEY
Represented By: Daniel Tysen Smith II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM TULEY
Represented By: Daniel Tysen Smith II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JARROD WHIRLEY
Represented By: Daniel Tysen Smith II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BURTON PANITZ
Represented By: Matthew Gammons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOAN SIMAS
Represented By: Deborah Gresko-Blackburn
Represented By: Timothy P. Wickstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARAH GILLIAM
Represented By: Kristen A. Johnson
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAYNE A. REED
Represented By: William Daniel Leader Jr.
Represented By: George H. Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGARET HANSON
Represented By: Frank Prokos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOSHA ANDREWS
Represented By: John D. Eure
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Fennell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROLAND BERTHIAUME
Represented By: Frank Prokos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT BERTHIAUME
Represented By: Frank Prokos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBRA P. BUCHANAN
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Fennell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM BERTHIAUME
Represented By: Frank Prokos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON W. BISHOP
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Fennell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIM FAYARD
Represented By: Frank Prokos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY GASKINS
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Fennell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBA M. SKELTON
Represented By: Daniel L. Clayton
Represented By: Randall Loftkin Kinnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL COMPTON
Represented By: Peter G. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROY H. SKELTON
Represented By: Daniel L. Clayton
Represented By: Randall Loftkin Kinnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRITA CARIGNAN
Represented By: Peter G. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMMY ALLEN
Represented By: Peter G. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVENS WYMAN
Represented By: Peter G. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERYL TILLSON
Represented By: Peter G. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVE SWISHER
Represented By: Peter G. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA MARIA RUSSO
Represented By: Peter G. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORAINE MORRIS
Represented By: Peter G. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PARK DAWN
Represented By: Peter G. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NELLIE POELT
Represented By: Peter G. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DALE DEVILLI
Represented By: Patricia M. Giordano
Represented By: Thomas B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY REARDON
Represented By: Peter G. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLISON DEVILLI
Represented By: Patricia M. Giordano
Represented By: Thomas B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBRA HACHE
Represented By: Peter G. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTY FRALIN
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Fennell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSANNE MCCALL
Represented By: Peter G. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM BROUSSARD, III
Represented By: Peter G. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOJAYRA GARCIA
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERYL A. MCCARTHY
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHAD GREEN
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Represented By: Michael R. Hugo
Represented By: O. Mark Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LECIA J. GOLDEN
Represented By: John E. Lyons Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT VINCENT SHAW, individually, as administrator of the Estate of Effie Elwina Shaw, deceased, and on behalf of the beneficiaries of the estate
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OWEN FINNEGAN
Represented By: Dennis R. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REX JOHNSON SHAW
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN HAYNES
Represented By: Dennis R. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH DAWN SHAW FRANK
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOANN OVERSTREET
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNA MARIA SHAW ALLRED
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN D. OVERSTREET
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABDUL BARAKAT
Represented By: Matthew R. Connors
Represented By: Thomas M. Dolan III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRAIG S. SIMAS
Represented By: Deborah Gresko-Blackburn
Represented By: Timothy P. Wickstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN E. JONES
Represented By: Robert Arthur Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAOMI DAUGHERTY
Represented By: Brian Chadwick Rickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT COLE
Represented By: Kent M. Barker
Represented By: Kristen A. Johnson
Represented By: Kristen Johnson Parker
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Peter G. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEON BLAND
Represented By: William Daniel Leader Jr.
Represented By: George H. Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD HEADLEY
Represented By: Kristen A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAIL HEADLEY
Represented By: Kristen A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN M. EDWARDS
Represented By: Justin A. Browne
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREDERICK MAY
Represented By: Paul J. Krog
Represented By: William Daniel Leader Jr.
Represented By: George H. Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLAY C. JEFFRIES
Represented By: Justin A. Browne
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA KENNEDY
Represented By: Justin A. Browne
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL R. KENNEDY
Represented By: Justin A. Browne
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELTON LEE WILEY
Represented By: Paul J. Krog
Represented By: William Daniel Leader Jr.
Represented By: George H. Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE JANIN LUNA
Represented By: Justin A. Browne
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LESLIE G. MUSSELWHITE
Represented By: Justin A. Browne
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE CARTER
Represented By: Justin A. Browne
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILMA S. CARTER
Represented By: Justin A. Browne
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID L. COOPER
Represented By: Justin A. Browne
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY J. BRADLEY COOPER
Represented By: Justin A. Browne
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA MONTEE
Represented By: Justin A. Browne
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Represented By: Lisa S. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PINAL PATEL
Represented By: Justin A. Browne
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFF PETTIT
Represented By: Justin A. Browne
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SALLY L. PETTIT
Represented By: Justin A. Browne
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANN BEQUETTE
Represented By: William Daniel Leader Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLYN BLAND
Represented By: William Daniel Leader Jr.
Represented By: George H. Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMARJIT K. DEOL
Represented By: William Daniel Leader Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLENDA J. HURT
Represented By: William Daniel Leader Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH JUDD
Represented By: William Daniel Leader Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA KIRKWOOD
Represented By: William Daniel Leader Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY MARTIN
Represented By: William Daniel Leader Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTALENE MORRIS
Represented By: William Daniel Leader Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLARK KENNETH OSBORNE
Represented By: William Daniel Leader Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAE L. PARMAN
Represented By: William Daniel Leader Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH M. PELLICONE
Represented By: William Daniel Leader Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANA REED
Represented By: William Daniel Leader Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN R. RICHARDS
Represented By: William Daniel Leader Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELFREIDA HUNT WILEY
Represented By: Paul J. Krog
Represented By: William Daniel Leader Jr.
Represented By: George H. Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EARLINE WILLIAMS
Represented By: William Daniel Leader Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOE ALCOZAR
Represented By: Douglas D. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARDEMUS ALLEN
Represented By: Douglas D. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE BOSTIC
Represented By: Douglas D. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACEY BRIGGS
Represented By: Douglas D. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY BROWNING
Represented By: Douglas D. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT COBB
Represented By: Douglas D. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEISA COPP
Represented By: Douglas D. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIOLA COPSEY
Represented By: Douglas D. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALAN CRAIGO
Represented By: Douglas D. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA DURBEN
Represented By: Douglas D. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAWN ELLIOTT
Represented By: Douglas D. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA FORTIER
Represented By: Douglas D. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN FRICK
Represented By: Douglas D. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA GARL
Represented By: Douglas D. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN GRICE
Represented By: Douglas D. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEGHAN HANDY
Represented By: Michael Coren
Represented By: Harry M. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES GREENWOOD
Represented By: Douglas D. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHRYN DRAIN
Represented By: Anne Andrews
Represented By: Lauren R. Davis
Represented By: John C. Thornton III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTORIA GIBSON
Represented By: Anne Andrews
Represented By: Lauren R. Davis
Represented By: John C. Thornton III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE T. MOORE
Represented By: Anne Andrews
Represented By: Lauren R. Davis
Represented By: John C. Thornton III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTHA PARKELL
Represented By: Anne Andrews
Represented By: Lauren R. Davis
Represented By: John C. Thornton III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAGDISH PATEL
Represented By: Anne Andrews
Represented By: Lauren R. Davis
Represented By: John C. Thornton III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA J. STANSBERY
Represented By: Ryan M. Osterholm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEAD COUNSEL
Represented By: Kristen A. Johnson
Represented By: Jessica Rose MacAuley
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY B. HIGDON
Represented By: David J. Cocke
Represented By: James Stephen King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNA M. SULLIVAN
Represented By: Daniel L. Clayton
Represented By: Randall Loftkin Kinnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHANCE BAKER
Represented By: Lauren Ellerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FERMAN WERTZ
Represented By: Lauren Ellerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK JOHNSTON
Represented By: Lauren Ellerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMELA M. MILLER
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Fennell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE
Represented By: Linda Aldon
Represented By: Peter G. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAWAN JENKINS
Represented By: S. James Boumil Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANKLIN JENKINS
Represented By: S. James Boumil Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIRK THOMPSON, III
Represented By: Peter J. Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA HARRISON
Represented By: Anthony V. Agudelo
Represented By: Michael S. Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MURIEL ARMSTRONG
Represented By: Peter J. Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD FLOECKHER
Represented By: S. James Boumil Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARLENE FLOECKHER
Represented By: S. James Boumil Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND MCDOW
Represented By: Mark P. Chalos
Represented By: Wendy R. Fleishman
Represented By: Marilyn T. McGoldrick
Represented By: Fabrice N. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE CARY
Represented By: Fredric L. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT SCHRODER
Represented By: Fredric L. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGARET SCHRODER
Represented By: Fredric L. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HELENA TROPE, a/k/a Linda Trope
Represented By: Jonathan Barry Nace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE TROPE
Represented By: Jonathan Barry Nace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER L. MARKO
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT MARKO
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER M. HANNAH
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID W. LEAVERTON
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEGHAN R. JONES
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAQUITA L. RIOS
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICKY RIOS
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY RIVERA
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER L. TOLOTTI
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH TOLOTTI
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT S. TAYVINSKY
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHRYN TAYVINSKY
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAWN M. ZAVACKI
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROGER ZAVACKI
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNA A. LETIZIA
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL LETIZIA
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDRE GOULD
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEREDITH GOULD
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANE E. TISA
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD TISA
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRETA NORMAND
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DREW NORMAND
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE R. WRAY
Represented By: Mark P. Chalos
Represented By: James S. Higgins
Represented By: Annika K. Martin
Represented By: Richard D. Piliponis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALD W. WRAY
Represented By: Mark P. Chalos
Represented By: James S. Higgins
Represented By: Annika K. Martin
Represented By: Richard D. Piliponis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA LUMBRERAS
Represented By: Ronald Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BASIL J. MCELWEE
Represented By: William Daniel Leader Jr.
Represented By: George H. Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARNOLD MOON
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN MARSINKO
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN GUZMAN
Represented By: Anne Andrews
Represented By: Michael Coren
Represented By: Lauren R. Davis
Represented By: Daniel J. Murphy
Represented By: Christopher M. Placitella
Represented By: Harry M. Roth
Represented By: Karren Schaeffer
Represented By: John C. Thornton III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH BRADY
Represented By: Justin A. Browne
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBECCA BRADY
Represented By: Justin A. Browne
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARREL CUMMINGS
Represented By: Darrel Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD ADAMS
Represented By: Fredric L. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STELLA M. MILLER
Represented By: Daniel L. Clayton
Represented By: Randall Loftkin Kinnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSANNE BROOKS
Represented By: Mark P. Chalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLENDA STRATTON
Represented By: Marc E. Lipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. DALE SULLIVAN, SR.
Represented By: Daniel L. Clayton
Represented By: Randall Loftkin Kinnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHRYN S. LEAVERTON
Represented By: Michael Frank Barrett
Represented By: Mary T. Gidaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERTRUM WALKER BRYANT, JR., next of kin of decedent Margaret Rhea Bryant
Represented By: Michael D. Galligan
Represented By: Susan N. Marttala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOCELYN KAE NORRIS
Represented By: Christopher Todd Cain
Represented By: Thomas S. Scott. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEONARD SHAFFER
Represented By: Fredric L. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SPECIALTY SURGERY CENTER, PLLC, d/b/a Specialty Surgery Center
Represented By: Alan S. Bean
Represented By: Parks T. Chastain
Represented By: Matthew H. Cline
Represented By: Ashley E. Geno
Represented By: Clarence James Gideon Jr.
Represented By: Kent E. Krause
Represented By: Chris J. Tardio
Represented By: John-Mark Zini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KENNETH R. LISTER
Represented By: Alan S. Bean
Represented By: Parks T. Chastain
Represented By: Matthew H. Cline
Represented By: Ashley E. Geno
Represented By: Clarence James Gideon Jr.
Represented By: Kent E. Krause
Represented By: Chris J. Tardio
Represented By: John-Mark Zini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KENNETH LISTER, M.D., P.C.
Represented By: Ashley E. Geno
Represented By: Clarence James Gideon Jr.
Represented By: Chris J. Tardio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FULLERTON ORTHOPAEDIC SURGERY MEDICAL GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Robert J. Iacopino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAUNUS PHARMACEUTICAL, LLC
Represented By: Michele A. Hunton
Represented By: Franklin H. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GDC PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: Robert Ambrose Curley Jr.
Represented By: Joshua A. Klarfeld
Represented By: Lisabeth Ryan Kundert
Represented By: Joseph Paul Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUGLAS CONIGLIARO
Represented By: David L. Campbell
Represented By: Brigid M. Carpenter
Represented By: Carrie W. McCutcheon
Represented By: David E. Meier
Represented By: Christopher Reade O'Hara
Represented By: Melinda L. Thompson
Represented By: Christopher Weld Jr.
Represented By: Alan M. Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARLA CONIGLIARO
Represented By: David L. Campbell
Represented By: Brigid M. Carpenter
Represented By: David Michael Macdonald
Represented By: Carrie W. McCutcheon
Represented By: David E. Meier
Represented By: Christopher Reade O'Hara
Represented By: Melinda L. Thompson
Represented By: Christopher Weld Jr.
Represented By: Alan M. Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENN A. CHIN
Represented By: David L. Campbell
Represented By: Brigid M. Carpenter
Represented By: Carrie W. McCutcheon
Represented By: Stephen John Weymouth
Represented By: Alan M. Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTH JERSEY HEALTHCARE
Represented By: Michael B. Hayes
Represented By: Louis R. Moffa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTH JERSEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Michael B. Hayes
Represented By: Louis R. Moffa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NITESH BHAGAT
Represented By: Joseph R. Lang
Represented By: John M. Lovely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARILION SURGERY CENTER NEW RIVER VALLEY, LLC, d/b/a New River Valley Surgery Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PREMIER ORTHOPAEDIC AND SPORTS MEDICINE ASSOCIATES OF SOUTHERN NJ, LLC, trading as Premier Orthopaedic Associates
Represented By: Jay J. Blumberg
Represented By: Christopher M. Wolk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PREMIER ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES SURGICAL CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Jay J. Blumberg
Represented By: Christopher M. Wolk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY YVETTE SMITH, a/k/a Kimberly Yvette Smith-Martin
Represented By: Jay J. Blumberg
Represented By: Christopher M. Wolk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCA PAIN CARE CENTER
Represented By: Alan S. Bean
Represented By: Matthew H. Cline
Represented By: Clarence James Gideon Jr.
Represented By: Chris J. Tardio
Represented By: John-Mark Zini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAINT THOMAS OUTPATIENT NEUROSURGICAL CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Alan S. Bean
Represented By: Matthew H. Cline
Represented By: Clarence James Gideon Jr.
Represented By: Chris J. Tardio
Represented By: John-Mark Zini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWELL ALLEN CLINIC, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Alan S. Bean
Represented By: Matthew H. Cline
Represented By: Clarence James Gideon Jr.
Represented By: Chris J. Tardio
Represented By: John-Mark Zini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EUGEN D. WILLIAMS
Represented By: Robert J. Iacopino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN STATE PAIN MANAGEMENT, INC
Represented By: Sean E. Capplis
Represented By: Matthew R. Connors
Represented By: Katharine A. Dennis
Represented By: Thomas M. Dolan III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL SALES MANAGEMENT SW, INC.
Represented By: Daniel M. Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CULCLASURE
Represented By: Alan S. Bean
Represented By: Matthew H. Cline
Represented By: Clarence James Gideon Jr.
Represented By: Chris J. Tardio
Represented By: John-Mark Zini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBRA SCHAMBERG
Represented By: Alan S. Bean
Represented By: Matthew H. Cline
Represented By: Clarence James Gideon Jr.
Represented By: Chris J. Tardio
Represented By: John-Mark Zini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSIGHT HEALTH CORP
Represented By: Stephen D. Busch
Represented By: Lena L. Busscher
Represented By: Diane P. Flannery
Represented By: Albert L. Hogan III
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Matule
Represented By: Ron E. Meisler
Represented By: Samuel Thurston Towell
Represented By: Christopher E. Trible
Represented By: William H. White Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAINT THOMAS WEST HOSPITAL, f/k/a Saint Thomas Hospital
Represented By: Stephen J. Brake
Represented By: Marcy Hogan Greer
Represented By: Eric J. Hoffman
Represented By: Sarah P. Kelly
Represented By: Yvonne K. Puig
Represented By: Adam T. Schramek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAINT THOMAS NETWORK
Represented By: Stephen J. Brake
Represented By: Marcy Hogan Greer
Represented By: Eric J. Hoffman
Represented By: Sarah P. Kelly
Represented By: Yvonne K. Puig
Represented By: Adam T. Schramek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAINT THOMAS HEALTH
Represented By: Stephen J. Brake
Represented By: Marcy Hogan Greer
Represented By: Eric J. Hoffman
Represented By: Sarah P. Kelly
Represented By: Yvonne K. Puig
Represented By: Adam T. Schramek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BKC PAIN SPECIALISTS
Represented By: Anthony E. Abeln
Represented By: Tory A. Weigand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADIL KATABAY
Represented By: Anthony E. Abeln
Represented By: Tory A. Weigand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIKESH BATRA
Represented By: Anthony E. Abeln
Represented By: Tory A. Weigand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch |