Gould, et al v. Morgan, et al

Plaintiff: IRWIN CRUZ and MARKUS VALLASTER
Defendant: DAVID A. PROVENCHER, in his Official Capacity as Chief of the New Bedford Police Department
Petitioner: ERWIN CHEMERINSKY, ALAN B. MORRISON, DAVID KONIG, JOSEPH BLOCHER, JACK RAKOVE, PROSECUTORS AGAINST GUN VIOLENCE, GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE, SAUL CORNELL and DARRELL A.H. MILLER
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOHN R. STANTON, DANNY WENG, COMMONWEALTH SECOND AMENDMENT, INC., MICHAEL GOULD, CHRISTOPHER HART and SARAH ZESCH
Amicus Curiae: EVERYTOWN FOR GUN SAFETY, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF UTAH, STATE OF WISCONSIN, NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF ARIZONA, STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA, STATE OF IDAHO, STATE OF MO, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF WYOMING, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF IOWA, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF MD, STATE OF NEW JERSEY and STATE OF HAWAII
Defendant / Appellee: WILLIAM B. EVANS, in his Official Capacity as Commissioner of the Boston Police Department, MASSACHUSETTS ATTORNEY GENERAL, DANIEL C. O'LEARY, in his Official Capacity as Chief of the Brookline Police Department, MARK MORGAN, Acting Chief of the Brookline Police Department and WILLIAM G. GROSS, in his Official Capacity as Commissioner of the Boston Police Department
Case Number: 17-2202
Filed: December 15, 2017
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
November 2, 2018 Summary Gould v. Morgan

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2018 JUDGMENT. 17-2202 Affirmed [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 11/02/2018 02:16 PM]
November 2, 2018 OPINION issued by Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge; Bruce M. Selya, Appellate Judge and William J. Kayatta, Jr., Appellate Judge. Published. [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 11/02/2018 02:13 PM]
August 23, 2018 NOTICE of Automatic Substitution of Officeholder filed by Appellee William B. Evans. Certificate of service dated 08/23/2018. [17-2202] (MMM) [Entered: 08/23/2018 01:40 PM]
July 30, 2018 RESPONSE to citation of supplemental authorities pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) [ # 6185847-2 ] filed by Appellee Mark Morgan. Certificate of service dated 07/30/2018. [17-2202] (JT) [Entered: 07/30/2018 04:54 PM]
July 25, 2018 CASE argued. Panel: Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge; Bruce M. Selya, Appellate Judge and William J. Kayatta, Jr., Appellate Judge. Arguing attorneys: David H. Thompson for Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, Danny Weng, Sarah Zesch and John R. Stanton, Timothy J. Casey for Massachusetts Attorney General, Matthew Michael McGarry for William B. Evans and Jonathan Taylor for Mark Morgan. [17-2202] (DT) [Entered: 07/25/2018 12:07 PM]
July 24, 2018 CITATION of supplemental authorities pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) filed by Appellants Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R. Stanton, Danny Weng and Sarah Zesch. Certificate of service dated 07/24/2018. [17-2202] (DHT) [Entered: 07/24/2018 03:07 PM]
July 6, 2018 DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument. Arguing Person Information Updated for: Jonathan Taylor arguing for Appellee Mark Morgan. [17-2202] (DT) [Entered: 07/06/2018 04:36 PM]
July 6, 2018 NOTICE of appearance filed by Attorney Jonathan Taylor for Appellee Mark Morgan. Certificate of service dated 07/03/2018. [17-2202] (DT) [Entered: 07/06/2018 04:32 PM]
July 6, 2018 Featured Case ORDER granting motion for leave to file notice of appearance filed by Appellee Mark Morgan. [17-2202] (DT) [Entered: 07/06/2018 04:29 PM]
July 3, 2018 MOTION requesting leave for Attorney Jonathan E. Taylor to enter an appearance filed by Appellee Mark Morgan. Certificate of service dated 07/03/2018. [17-2202] (DG) [Entered: 07/03/2018 10:27 PM]
July 2, 2018 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 6179470-2 ] submitted by Amici Curiae Joseph Blocher, Erwin Chemerinsky, Saul Cornell, David Konig, Darrell A.H. Miller and Movants Alan B. Morrison and Jack Rakove. [17-2202] (LIM) [Entered: 07/03/2018 09:23 AM]
July 2, 2018 NINE (9) paper copies of reply brief [ # 6180088-2 ] submitted by Appellants Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R. Stanton, Danny Weng and Sarah Zesch. [17-2202] (LIM) [Entered: 07/03/2018 09:17 AM]
June 28, 2018 PLEADING tendered: NINE (9) Paper copies filed [ # 6179470-2 ] and ONE (1) copy of the Addendum filed seperately by Amici Curiae Joseph Blocher, Erwin Chemerinsky, Saul Cornell, David Konig, Darrell A.H. Miller and Movants Alan B. Morrison and Jack Rakove. [17-2202] (LIM) [Entered: 06/29/2018 09:43 AM]
June 27, 2018 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 6179590-2 ] submitted by Amicus Curiae Prosecutors Against Gun Violence. [17-2202] (LIM) [Entered: 06/28/2018 04:01 PM]
June 27, 2018 REPLY BRIEF filed by Appellants Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R. Stanton, Danny Weng and Sarah Zesch. Certificate of service dated 06/27/2018. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 07/05/2018 . [17-2202] (AMM) [Entered: 06/27/2018 02:05 PM]
June 27, 2018 BRIEF tendered by Appellants Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R. Stanton, Danny Weng and Sarah Zesch. [17-2202] (DHT) [Entered: 06/27/2018 12:11 PM]
June 26, 2018 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 6179589-2 ] submitted by Amicus Curiae Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence. [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 06/26/2018 08:57 AM]
June 25, 2018 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Amicus Curiae Prosecutors Against Gun Violence in support of Appellees. Certificate of service dated 06/13/2018. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 07/02/2018 . [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 06/25/2018 05:18 PM]
June 25, 2018 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Amicus Curiae Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence in support of Appellee. Number of copies: 9. Certificate of service dated 06/13/2018. [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 06/25/2018 05:15 PM]
June 25, 2018 Featured Case ORDER entered by Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge: The motions for leave to file Amicus briefs filed by Movants Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence and Prosecutors Against Gun Violence are allowed. The briefs are accepted for filing on this date. [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 06/25/2018 05:09 PM]
June 25, 2018 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Amici Curiae Joseph Blocher, Erwin Chemerinsky, Saul Cornell, David Konig, Darrell A.H. Miller, Alan B. Morrison and Jack Rakove in support of Appellees. Certificate of service dated 06/13/2017. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 07/02/2018 . [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 06/25/2018 03:10 PM]
June 25, 2018 Featured Case ORDER entered by Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge: Movants Joseph Blocher, Erwin Chemerinsky, Saul Cornell, David Konig, Darrell Miller, Alan Morrison, and Jack Rakove's motion for leave to file an amicus curiae brief in support of Appellees is allowed. Movants' amicus curiae brief is accepted for filing on this date. [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 06/25/2018 02:53 PM]
June 21, 2018 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Amicus Curiae Everytown for Gun Safety in support of Appellee. Certificate of service dated 06/13/2018. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 06/28/2018 . [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 06/21/2018 04:46 PM]
June 21, 2018 Featured Case ORDER entered by Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge: Upon consideration, movant Everytown for Gun Safety's motion for leave to file an amicus brief is allowed. Movant's motion for leave to file an oversized addendum to the amicus brief is allowed to the extent the materials are properly before the court. [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 06/21/2018 04:39 PM]
June 21, 2018 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by movant Everytown for Gun Safety. Certificate of service dated 06/15/2018. [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 06/21/2018 11:06 AM]
June 20, 2018 DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Matthew Michael McGarry for Appellee William B. Evans. Certificate of service dated 06/20/2018. [17-2202] (MMM) [Entered: 06/20/2018 03:43 PM]
June 20, 2018 DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney David H. Thompson for Appellants Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R. Stanton, Danny Weng and Sarah Zesch. Certificate of service dated 06/20/2018. [17-2202] (DHT) [Entered: 06/20/2018 03:11 PM]
June 20, 2018 DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Timothy J. Casey for Appellee Massachusetts Attorney General. Certificate of service dated 06/20/2018. [17-2202] (TJC) [Entered: 06/20/2018 11:44 AM]
June 19, 2018 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 6177177-2 ] submitted by Amici Curiae District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of MD, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of Rhode Island and State of West Virginia. [17-2202] (LIM) [Entered: 06/20/2018 08:30 AM]
June 19, 2018 CASE calendared: Wednesday, 07/25/2018 AM Boston, MA Panel Courtroom. Designation form due 07/03/2018. [17-2202] (DT) [Entered: 06/19/2018 03:36 PM]
June 18, 2018 NINE (9) paper copies of appellee/respondent brief [ # 6176802-2 ] submitted by Appellee Mark Morgan. [17-2202] (LIM) [Entered: 06/22/2018 08:23 AM]
June 15, 2018 MOTION for leave to file an addendum filed by Movant(s) Everytown for Gun Safety. Certificate of service dated 06/15/2018. [17-2202]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (MCF) [Entered: 06/15/2018 05:43 PM]
June 15, 2018 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence filed by Attorney Simon J. Frankel. Certificate of service dated 06/15/2018. [17-2202] (SJF) [Entered: 06/15/2018 02:35 PM]
June 15, 2018 Featured Case ORDER granting motion to extend time to file reply brief filed by Appellants Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, Danny Weng, Sarah Zesch and John R. Stanton. Reply brief due 06/27/2018 for appellant Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R. Stanton, Danny Weng and Sarah Zesch. No further extension of this deadline should be expected. [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 06/15/2018 02:17 PM]
June 15, 2018 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) PROSECUTORS AGAINST GUN VIOLENCE filed by Attorney Antonio J. Perez-Marques. Certificate of service dated 06/15/2018. [17-2202] (AP) [Entered: 06/15/2018 11:15 AM]
June 15, 2018 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Movant Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence. Certificate of service dated 06/15/2018. [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 06/15/2018 10:20 AM]
June 15, 2018 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Movant Prosecutors Against Gun Violence. Certificate of service dated 06/15/2018. [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 06/15/2018 09:01 AM]
June 14, 2018 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Amici Curiae Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of MD, State of New Jersey and State of Rhode Island. [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 06/14/2018 04:59 PM]
June 14, 2018 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Amici Curiae Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of MD, State of New Jersey, State of New York and State of Rhode Island in support of Appellee. Certificate of service dated 06/13/2018. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 06/21/2018 . [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 06/14/2018 04:56 PM]
June 14, 2018 Featured Case ORDER entered: Pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 43(c)(2), it is hereby ordered that Mark Morgan be substituted for Daniel O'Leary as Acting Chief of the Brookline Police Department. [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 06/14/2018 03:16 PM]
June 14, 2018 NINE (9) paper copies of MOTION [60] for leave to file amicus curiae brief filed by Movant(s) Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence. [17-2202] (AP) [Entered: 06/14/2018 10:58 AM]
June 13, 2018 MOTION for leave to file amicus curiae brief in support of Appellee filed by Movant(s) PROSECUTORS AGAINST GUN VIOLENCE. Certificate of service dated 06/13/2018. [17-2202] (AP) [Entered: 06/13/2018 06:12 PM]
June 13, 2018 MOTION for leave to file amicus curiae brief in support of Appellee filed by Movant(s) Everytown for Gun Safety. Certificate of service dated 06/13/2018. [17-2202] (MCF) [Entered: 06/13/2018 05:31 PM]
June 13, 2018 ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file reply brief filed by Appellants Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R. Stanton, Danny Weng and Sarah Zesch. Certificate of service dated 06/13/2018. [17-2202] (DHT) [Entered: 06/13/2018 05:22 PM]
June 13, 2018 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) Everytown for Gun Safety filed by Attorney E. Ross Cohen. Certificate of service dated 06/13/2018. [17-2202] (ERC) [Entered: 06/13/2018 05:18 PM]
June 13, 2018 MOTION for leave to file amicus curiae brief in support of Appellee filed by Movant(s) Joseph Blocher, Erwin Chemerinsky, Saul Cornell, David Konig, Darrell Miller, Alan Morrison, and Jack Rakove. Certificate of service dated 06/13/2018. [17-2202] (IMF) [Entered: 06/13/2018 05:13 PM]
June 13, 2018 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) Joseph Blocher, Erwin Chemerinsky, Saul Cornell, David Konig, Darrell Miller, Alan Morrison, and Jack Rakove filed by Attorney Ira M. Feinberg. Certificate of service dated 06/13/2018. [17-2202] (IMF) [Entered: 06/13/2018 05:08 PM]
June 13, 2018 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) Everytown for Gun Safety filed by Attorney Tasha J. Bahal. Certificate of service dated 06/13/2018. [17-2202] (TJB) [Entered: 06/13/2018 05:08 PM]
June 13, 2018 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) Everytown for Gun Safety filed by Attorney Mark C. Fleming. Certificate of service dated 06/13/2018. [17-2202] (MCF) [Entered: 06/13/2018 04:40 PM]
June 13, 2018 APPELLEE'S BRIEF filed by Appellee Daniel C. O'Leary. Certificate of service dated 06/08/2018. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 06/20/2018 . Reply brief due 06/22/2018 for APPELLANT Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R. Stanton, Danny Weng and Sarah Zesch. [17-2202] (AMM) [Entered: 06/13/2018 04:20 PM]
June 13, 2018 MOTION for leave to file amicus curiae brief filed by Movant(s) Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence. Certificate of service dated 06/13/2018. [17-2202] (SJF) [Entered: 06/13/2018 01:38 PM]
June 13, 2018 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by Amici Curiae States of New Jersey, California, Connecticut, Delaware, Hawaii, Illinois, Iowa, Maryland, New York, Rhode Island, Virginia, and the District of Columbia.. [17-2202] (JF) [Entered: 06/13/2018 12:42 AM]
June 12, 2018 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) Amicus State of New Jersey filed by Attorney Jeremy M. Feigenbaum. Certificate of service dated 06/12/2018. [17-2202] (JF) [Entered: 06/12/2018 10:38 PM]
June 8, 2018 BRIEF tendered by Appellee Daniel C. O'Leary. [17-2202] (DG) [Entered: 06/08/2018 05:49 PM]
June 7, 2018 NINE (9) paper copies of appellee/respondent brief [ # 6175107-2 ] submitted by Appellee Massachusetts Attorney General. [17-2202] (LIM) [Entered: 06/08/2018 09:11 AM]
June 7, 2018 Featured Case ORDER directing Appellee Daniel C. O'Leary to file a conforming brief. Brief due 06/14/2018. [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 06/07/2018 03:55 PM]
June 7, 2018 APPELLEE'S BRIEF filed by Appellee Massachusetts Attorney General. Certificate of service dated 06/06/2018. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 06/14/2018 . [17-2202] (MH) [Entered: 06/07/2018 09:50 AM]
June 6, 2018 BRIEF tendered by Appellee Daniel C. O'Leary. [17-2202] (DG) [Entered: 06/06/2018 10:21 PM]
June 6, 2018 BRIEF tendered by Appellee Massachusetts Attorney General. [17-2202] (TJC) [Entered: 06/06/2018 05:25 PM]
June 6, 2018 NOTICE of automatic substitution of officeholder filed by Appellee Daniel C. O'Leary. Certificate of service dated 06/06/2018. [17-2202] (DG) [Entered: 06/06/2018 03:06 PM]
June 4, 2018 Featured Case ORDER entered: Appellants Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R. Stanton, Danny Weng and Sarah Zesch's May 25, 2018 motion for extension of time to file the reply brief is denied without prejudice as premature. Because all the appellees' briefs have not been accepted for filing, the time to file the reply brief has not yet begun to run under Fed. R. App. P. 31(a)(1) and 1st Cir. 31.0(a)(1). [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 06/04/2018 04:41 PM]
June 1, 2018 NINE (9) paper copies of appellee/respondent brief [ # 6173393-2 ] submitted by Appellee William B. Evans. [17-2202] (LIM) [Entered: 06/04/2018 09:00 AM]
May 31, 2018 APPELLEE'S BRIEF filed by Appellee William B. Evans. Certificate of service dated 05/23/2018. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 06/07/2018 . [17-2202] (LIM) [Entered: 05/31/2018 09:07 AM]
May 25, 2018 ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file reply brief filed by Appellants Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R. Stanton, Danny Weng and Sarah Zesch. Certificate of service dated 05/25/2018. [17-2202] (DHT) [Entered: 05/25/2018 12:06 PM]
May 23, 2018 BRIEF tendered by Appellee William B. Evans. [17-2202] (MMM) [Entered: 05/23/2018 11:50 AM]
May 16, 2018 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee William B. Evans filed by Attorney Peter M. Geraghty. Certificate of service dated 05/16/2018. [17-2202] (PMG) [Entered: 05/16/2018 02:02 PM]
May 10, 2018 Featured Case ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees Massachusetts Attorney General, Daniel C. O'Leary and William B. Evans. Brief due 06/06/2018 for appellee William B. Evans, Massachusetts Attorney General and Daniel C. O'Leary. [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 05/10/2018 12:29 PM]
May 7, 2018 ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees Daniel C. O'Leary, Massachusetts Attorney General and William B. Evans. Certificate of service dated 05/07/2018. [17-2202] (DG) [Entered: 05/07/2018 06:03 PM]
May 4, 2018 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Daniel C. O'Leary filed by Attorney Deepak Gupta. Certificate of service dated 05/04/2018. [17-2202] (DG) [Entered: 05/04/2018 05:58 PM]
April 5, 2018 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 6160556-2 ] submitted by Amici Curiae State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming. [17-2202] (LIM) [Entered: 04/05/2018 02:56 PM]
April 4, 2018 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 6159866-2 ] submitted by Amicus Curiae National Rifle Association. [17-2202] (LIM) [Entered: 04/04/2018 03:16 PM]
April 2, 2018 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Movants State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in support of Appellant. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 04/09/2018 . [17-2202]. (AL) [Entered: 04/02/2018 03:51 PM]
March 29, 2018 APPENDIX filed by Amicus Curiae National Rifle Association. Number of volumes: 1. Number of copies: 5. Certificate of service dated 03/12/2018. [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 03/29/2018 02:14 PM]
March 29, 2018 Featured Case ORDER entered: No objections having been filed, the National Rifle Association of America, Inc.'s motion for leave to file an amicus curiae brief in support of the appellants is granted, and the brief is accepted for filing this day. [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 03/29/2018 02:12 PM]
March 29, 2018 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Movant National Rifle Association in support of Appellant. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 04/05/2018 . [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 03/29/2018 02:07 PM]
March 27, 2018 Featured Case ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees Massachusetts Attorney General, Daniel C. O'Leary and William B. Evans. Brief due 05/16/2018 for appellee William B. Evans, Massachusetts Attorney General and Daniel C. O'Leary. [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 03/27/2018 09:40 AM]
March 26, 2018 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Movants State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming. Certificate of service dated 03/26/2018. [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 03/26/2018 02:56 PM]
March 23, 2018 NINE (9) paper copies of appellant/petitioner brief [ # 6157890-2 ] submitted by Appellants Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R. Stanton, Danny Weng and Sarah Zesch. [17-2202] (LIM) [Entered: 03/26/2018 02:25 PM]
March 23, 2018 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant State of Arizona filed by Attorney Oramel H. Skinner. Certificate of service dated 03/23/2018. [17-2202] (OHS) [Entered: 03/23/2018 05:04 PM]
March 23, 2018 ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees Massachusetts Attorney General, Daniel C. O'Leary and William B. Evans. Certificate of service dated 03/23/2018. [17-2202] (TJC) [Entered: 03/23/2018 04:48 PM]
March 22, 2018 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant National Rifle Association filed by Attorney Stephen P. Halbrook. Certificate of service dated 03/22/2018. [17-2202] (SPH) [Entered: 03/22/2018 03:05 PM]
March 21, 2018 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc. Certificate of service dated 03/16/2018. [17-2202] (EP) [Entered: 03/21/2018 12:03 PM]
March 21, 2018 APPELLANTS' BRIEF filed by Appellants Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R. Stanton, Danny Weng and Sarah Zesch. Certificate of service dated 03/16/2018. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 03/28/2018 . Brief due 04/16/2018 for APPELLEES William B. Evans, Massachusetts Attorney General and Daniel C. O'Leary. [17-2202] (EP) [Entered: 03/21/2018 11:53 AM]
March 20, 2018 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Movant National Rifle Association. Certificate of service dated 03/12/2018. [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 03/20/2018 03:56 PM]
March 19, 2018 APPENDIX filed by Appellants Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R. Stanton, Danny Weng and Sarah Zesch. Number of volumes: 1. Number of copies: 5. Certificate of service dated 03/05/2018. [17-2202] (EP) [Entered: 03/21/2018 12:07 PM]
March 16, 2018 BRIEF tendered by Appellants Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Danny Weng, Sarah Zesch and John R. Stanton. [17-2202] (DHT) [Entered: 03/16/2018 11:51 AM]
March 16, 2018 Featured Case ORDER directing Appellants Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R. Stanton, Danny Weng and Sarah Zesch to file a conforming brief and appendix. Brief and Appendix due 03/23/2018. [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 03/16/2018 11:13 AM]
March 15, 2018 PLEADING tendered: APPENDIX filed by Movant National Rifle Association of America, Inc. Number of volumes: 1. Number of copies: 5. Certificate of service dated 03/12/2018. [17-2202] (EP) [Entered: 03/16/2018 12:43 PM]
March 12, 2018 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by States of ARIZONA, ALABAMA, ARKANSAS, GEORGIA, IDAHO, INDIANA, LOUISIANA, MICHIGAN, MISSOURI, MONTANA, NEBRASKA, OKLAHOMA, SOUTH CAROLINA, SOUTH DAKOTA, TEXAS, UTAH, WEST VIRGINIA, WISCONSIN, AND WYOMING. [17-2202] (OHS) [Entered: 03/12/2018 10:39 PM]
March 12, 2018 MOTION for leave to file amicus curiae brief filed by Movant(s) National Rifle Association of America, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 03/12/2018. [17-2202] (JPS) [Entered: 03/12/2018 01:52 PM]
March 12, 2018 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) National Rifle Association of America filed by Attorney John Parker Sweeney. Certificate of service dated 03/12/2018. [17-2202] (JPS) [Entered: 03/12/2018 10:46 AM]
March 6, 2018 PLEADING tendered: APPENDIX filed by Appellants Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R. Stanton, Danny Weng and Sarah Zesch. Number of volumes: 1. Number of copies: 5. Certificate of service dated 03/05/2018. [17-2202] (EP) [Entered: 03/06/2018 11:42 AM]
March 5, 2018 BRIEF tendered by Appellants Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Danny Weng, Sarah Zesch and John R. Stanton. [17-2202] (DHT) [Entered: 03/05/2018 05:13 PM]
January 22, 2018 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 03/05/2018 for appellant Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R. Stanton, Danny Weng and Sarah Zesch. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 14 days following service of appellee's brief. [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 01/22/2018 03:21 PM]
January 22, 2018 NOTICE of filing the following transcripts in district court by Court Reporter Valerie A. O'Hara: 03/03/2017, Motion Hearing; Motion Hearing, 11/08/2017. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 01/22/2018 03:17 PM]
January 22, 2018 NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Nicholas F. Ortiz for Everytown for Gun Safety. [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 01/22/2018 03:09 PM]
January 8, 2018 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Daniel C. O'Leary filed by Attorney John J. Buchheit. Certificate of service dated 01/08/2018. [17-2202] (JJB) [Entered: 01/08/2018 01:31 PM]
January 5, 2018 NOTICE issued. After 01/19/2018, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: Nicholas F. Ortiz for Everytown for Gun Safety. [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 01/05/2018 05:15 PM]
December 28, 2017 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Daniel C. O'Leary filed by Attorney Jonathan Simpson. Certificate of service dated 12/28/2017. [17-2202] (JES) [Entered: 12/28/2017 02:08 PM]
December 20, 2017 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R. Stanton, Danny Weng and Sarah Zesch filed by Attorney David H. Thompson. Certificate of service dated 12/20/2017. [17-2202] (DHT) [Entered: 12/20/2017 10:15 AM]
December 20, 2017 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R. Stanton, Danny Weng and Sarah Zesch filed by Attorney Peter A. Patterson. Certificate of service dated 12/20/2017. [17-2202] (PAP) [Entered: 12/20/2017 10:12 AM]
December 20, 2017 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R. Stanton, Sarah Zesch and Danny Weng filed by Attorney John D. Ohlendorf. Certificate of service dated 12/20/2017. [17-2202] (JO) [Entered: 12/20/2017 10:10 AM]
December 20, 2017 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Massachusetts Attorney General filed by Attorney Timothy J. Casey. Certificate of service dated 12/20/2017. [17-2202] (TJC) [Entered: 12/20/2017 10:02 AM]
December 19, 2017 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R. Stanton, Danny Weng and Sarah Zesch indicating the following transcripts are being ordered: Motion hearing 03/03/2017 and motion hearing 11/08/2017. Transcript(s) due 02/20/2018 from Court Reporter Valerie A. O'Hara. [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 12/19/2017 09:59 AM]
December 19, 2017 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, Danny Weng, Sarah Zesch, John R. Stanton and Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc. indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 12/18/2017. [17-2202] (DDJ) [Entered: 12/19/2017 12:12 AM]
December 18, 2017 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, Danny Weng, Sarah Zesch, John R. Stanton and Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc. indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 12/18/2017. [17-2202] CLERK'S NOTE: The ECF filer did not select the option that best describes the document. No further action required. (DDJ) [Entered: 12/18/2017 06:27 PM]
December 18, 2017 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, Danny Weng, Sarah Zesch, John R. Stanton and Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 12/18/2017. [17-2202] (DDJ) [Entered: 12/18/2017 06:26 PM]
December 18, 2017 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, Danny Weng, Sarah Zesch, John R. Stanton and Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc. filed by Attorney David D. Jensen. Certificate of service dated 12/18/2017. [17-2202] (DDJ) [Entered: 12/18/2017 06:24 PM]
December 15, 2017 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee William B. Evans filed by Attorney Matthew M. McGarry. Certificate of service dated 12/15/2017. [17-2202] (MMM) [Entered: 12/15/2017 04:43 PM]
December 15, 2017 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #94) filed by Appellants Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc., Michael Gould, Christopher Hart, John R. Stanton, Danny Weng and Sarah Zesch. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form and Appearance form due 12/29/2017. [17-2202] (AL) [Entered: 12/15/2017 12:52 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gould, et al v. Morgan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN R. STANTON
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: John Ohlendorf
Represented By: David D. Jensen
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DANNY WENG
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: John Ohlendorf
Represented By: David D. Jensen
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: COMMONWEALTH SECOND AMENDMENT, INC.
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: John Ohlendorf
Represented By: David D. Jensen
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Represented By: Patrick Michael Groulx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL GOULD
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: John Ohlendorf
Represented By: David D. Jensen
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Represented By: Patrick Michael Groulx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTOPHER HART
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: John Ohlendorf
Represented By: David D. Jensen
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Represented By: Patrick Michael Groulx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SARAH ZESCH
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: John Ohlendorf
Represented By: David D. Jensen
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EVERYTOWN FOR GUN SAFETY
Represented By: Nicholas F. Ortiz
Represented By: Tasha J. Bahal
Represented By: Eric Ross Cohen
Represented By: Mark Christopher Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Represented By: Dominic E. Draye
Represented By: Oramel H. Skinner III
Represented By: Angela Kebric Paton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF NEBRASKA
Represented By: Dominic E. Draye
Represented By: Oramel H. Skinner III
Represented By: Angela Kebric Paton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF UTAH
Represented By: Dominic E. Draye
Represented By: Oramel H. Skinner III
Represented By: Angela Kebric Paton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF WISCONSIN
Represented By: Dominic E. Draye
Represented By: Oramel H. Skinner III
Represented By: Angela Kebric Paton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: James W. Porter
Represented By: Stephen P. Halbrook
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: T. Sky Woodward
Represented By: James Wallace Porter III
Represented By: Tara Sky Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF OKLAHOMA
Represented By: Dominic E. Draye
Represented By: Oramel H. Skinner III
Represented By: Angela Kebric Paton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF ALABAMA
Represented By: Dominic E. Draye
Represented By: Oramel H. Skinner III
Represented By: Angela Kebric Paton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF TEXAS
Represented By: Dominic E. Draye
Represented By: Oramel H. Skinner III
Represented By: Angela Kebric Paton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF ARIZONA
Represented By: Mark Brnovich
Represented By: Dominic E. Draye
Represented By: Oramel H. Skinner III
Represented By: Angela Kebric Paton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF ARKANSAS
Represented By: Dominic E. Draye
Represented By: Oramel H. Skinner III
Represented By: Angela Kebric Paton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA
Represented By: Dominic E. Draye
Represented By: Oramel H. Skinner III
Represented By: Angela Kebric Paton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF INDIANA
Represented By: Dominic E. Draye
Represented By: Oramel H. Skinner III
Represented By: Angela Kebric Paton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MICHIGAN
Represented By: Dominic E. Draye
Represented By: Oramel H. Skinner III
Represented By: Angela Kebric Paton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF GEORGIA
Represented By: Dominic E. Draye
Represented By: Oramel H. Skinner III
Represented By: Angela Kebric Paton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA
Represented By: Dominic E. Draye
Represented By: Oramel H. Skinner III
Represented By: Angela Kebric Paton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF IDAHO
Represented By: Dominic E. Draye
Represented By: Oramel H. Skinner III
Represented By: Angela Kebric Paton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MO
Represented By: Dominic E. Draye
Represented By: Oramel H. Skinner III
Represented By: Angela Kebric Paton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MONTANA
Represented By: Dominic E. Draye
Represented By: Oramel H. Skinner III
Represented By: Angela Kebric Paton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF LOUISIANA
Represented By: Dominic E. Draye
Represented By: Oramel H. Skinner III
Represented By: Angela Kebric Paton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF WYOMING
Represented By: Dominic E. Draye
Represented By: Oramel H. Skinner III
Represented By: Angela Kebric Paton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA
Represented By: Karl A. Racine
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Peter F. Kilmartin
Represented By: Jeremy Feigenbaum
Represented By: Brian E. Frosh
Represented By: Lisa Madigan
Represented By: Matthew P. Denn
Represented By: Tom Miller
Represented By: Claudia Joy Demitro
Represented By: Adam D. Klein
Represented By: Mark R. Herring
Represented By: George Jespen
Represented By: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Russell A. Suzuki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF DELAWARE
Represented By: Karl A. Racine
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Peter F. Kilmartin
Represented By: Jeremy Feigenbaum
Represented By: Brian E. Frosh
Represented By: Lisa Madigan
Represented By: Matthew P. Denn
Represented By: Tom Miller
Represented By: Claudia Joy Demitro
Represented By: Adam D. Klein
Represented By: Mark R. Herring
Represented By: George Jespen
Represented By: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Russell A. Suzuki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By: Karl A. Racine
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Peter F. Kilmartin
Represented By: Jeremy Feigenbaum
Represented By: Brian E. Frosh
Represented By: Lisa Madigan
Represented By: Matthew P. Denn
Represented By: Tom Miller
Represented By: Claudia Joy Demitro
Represented By: Adam D. Klein
Represented By: Mark R. Herring
Represented By: George Jespen
Represented By: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Russell A. Suzuki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Karl A. Racine
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Peter F. Kilmartin
Represented By: Jeremy Feigenbaum
Represented By: Brian E. Frosh
Represented By: Lisa Madigan
Represented By: Matthew P. Denn
Represented By: Tom Miller
Represented By: Claudia Joy Demitro
Represented By: Adam D. Klein
Represented By: Mark R. Herring
Represented By: George Jespen
Represented By: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Russell A. Suzuki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF ILLINOIS
Represented By: Karl A. Racine
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Peter F. Kilmartin
Represented By: Jeremy Feigenbaum
Represented By: Brian E. Frosh
Represented By: Lisa Madigan
Represented By: Matthew P. Denn
Represented By: Tom Miller
Represented By: Claudia Joy Demitro
Represented By: Adam D. Klein
Represented By: Mark R. Herring
Represented By: George Jespen
Represented By: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Russell A. Suzuki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF RHODE ISLAND
Represented By: Karl A. Racine
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Peter F. Kilmartin
Represented By: Jeremy Feigenbaum
Represented By: Brian E. Frosh
Represented By: Lisa Madigan
Represented By: Matthew P. Denn
Represented By: Tom Miller
Represented By: Claudia Joy Demitro
Represented By: Adam D. Klein
Represented By: Mark R. Herring
Represented By: George Jespen
Represented By: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Russell A. Suzuki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF IOWA
Represented By: Karl A. Racine
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Peter F. Kilmartin
Represented By: Jeremy Feigenbaum
Represented By: Brian E. Frosh
Represented By: Lisa Madigan
Represented By: Matthew P. Denn
Represented By: Tom Miller
Represented By: Claudia Joy Demitro
Represented By: Adam D. Klein
Represented By: Mark R. Herring
Represented By: George Jespen
Represented By: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Russell A. Suzuki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF CONNECTICUT
Represented By: Karl A. Racine
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Peter F. Kilmartin
Represented By: Jeremy Feigenbaum
Represented By: Brian E. Frosh
Represented By: Lisa Madigan
Represented By: Matthew P. Denn
Represented By: Tom Miller
Represented By: Claudia Joy Demitro
Represented By: Adam D. Klein
Represented By: Mark R. Herring
Represented By: George Jespen
Represented By: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Russell A. Suzuki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Karl A. Racine
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Peter F. Kilmartin
Represented By: Jeremy Feigenbaum
Represented By: Brian E. Frosh
Represented By: Lisa Madigan
Represented By: Matthew P. Denn
Represented By: Tom Miller
Represented By: Claudia Joy Demitro
Represented By: Adam D. Klein
Represented By: Mark R. Herring
Represented By: George Jespen
Represented By: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Russell A. Suzuki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MD
Represented By: Karl A. Racine
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Peter F. Kilmartin
Represented By: Jeremy Feigenbaum
Represented By: Brian E. Frosh
Represented By: Lisa Madigan
Represented By: Matthew P. Denn
Represented By: Tom Miller
Represented By: Claudia Joy Demitro
Represented By: Adam D. Klein
Represented By: Mark R. Herring
Represented By: George Jespen
Represented By: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Russell A. Suzuki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Represented By: Karl A. Racine
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Peter F. Kilmartin
Represented By: Jeremy Feigenbaum
Represented By: Brian E. Frosh
Represented By: Lisa Madigan
Represented By: Matthew P. Denn
Represented By: Tom Miller
Represented By: Claudia Joy Demitro
Represented By: Adam D. Klein
Represented By: Mark R. Herring
Represented By: George Jespen
Represented By: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Russell A. Suzuki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF HAWAII
Represented By: Karl A. Racine
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Peter F. Kilmartin
Represented By: Jeremy Feigenbaum
Represented By: Brian E. Frosh
Represented By: Lisa Madigan
Represented By: Matthew P. Denn
Represented By: Tom Miller
Represented By: Claudia Joy Demitro
Represented By: Adam D. Klein
Represented By: Mark R. Herring
Represented By: George Jespen
Represented By: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Russell A. Suzuki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM B. EVANS, in his Official Capacity as Commissioner of the Boston Police Department
Represented By: Peter Martin Geraghty
Represented By: Matthew Michael McGarry
Represented By: Lisa Skehill Maki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MASSACHUSETTS ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: William W. Porter
Represented By: Timothy J. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANIEL C. O'LEARY, in his Official Capacity as Chief of the Brookline Police Department
Represented By: Jonathan E. Simpson
Represented By: John J. Buchheit
Represented By: Jonathan Taylor
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK MORGAN, Acting Chief of the Brookline Police Department
Represented By: Jonathan E. Simpson
Represented By: John J. Buchheit
Represented By: Jonathan Taylor
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM G. GROSS, in his Official Capacity as Commissioner of the Boston Police Department
Represented By: Peter Martin Geraghty
Represented By: Matthew Michael McGarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID A. PROVENCHER, in his Official Capacity as Chief of the New Bedford Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRWIN CRUZ
Represented By: David D. Jensen
Represented By: Patrick Michael Groulx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARKUS VALLASTER
Represented By: David D. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ERWIN CHEMERINSKY
Represented By: Shaun Michael Donnelly
Represented By: Ira M. Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ALAN B. MORRISON
Represented By: Shaun Michael Donnelly
Represented By: Ira M. Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DAVID KONIG
Represented By: Shaun Michael Donnelly
Represented By: Ira M. Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOSEPH BLOCHER
Represented By: Shaun Michael Donnelly
Represented By: Ira M. Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JACK RAKOVE
Represented By: Shaun Michael Donnelly
Represented By: Ira M. Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PROSECUTORS AGAINST GUN VIOLENCE
Represented By: Antonio Perez-Marques
Represented By: David Brendan Toscano
Represented By: Kevin Osowski
Represented By: Anne Burton-Walsh
Represented By: Sushila Rao Pentapati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Represented By: Hannah Shearer
Represented By: Simon J. Frankel
Represented By: Allison Whelan
Represented By: J. Adams Skaggs
Represented By: Nandini Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SAUL CORNELL
Represented By: Shaun Michael Donnelly
Represented By: Ira M. Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DARRELL A.H. MILLER
Represented By: Shaun Michael Donnelly
Represented By: Ira M. Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?