Snyder v. SMCC, et al
Defendant / Appellee: LYNN BISSONNETTE, Superintendent - MCI Framingham, UNKNOWN OFFICER, with initials D.D., PETER RICE, Inner Perimeter Security, OFFICER MARK SULLIVAN, MCI - Framingham Mailroom, DAVID DUPLIN, MCI - Framingham, ANGEL SID, Investigator - Office of Investigative Services Milford, PATRICK DOHERTY, MCI - Framingham, MARTIN BOTTARI, SMCC - Inner Perimeter Security, LUIS S. SPENCER, Commissioner, PATRICK DEPALO, Deputy Superintendent - MCI Framingham, LISA JACKSON, Superintendent, KELLEY MURPHY, Correctional Program Officer, REBECCA DONAHUE, Disciplinary Hearing Officer - Department of Corrections, OFFICER MICHAEL ALVARADO, O.I.S., DAVID FREDERICK, Inner Perimeter Security - MCI Framingham, LYN MUISE, Director of Treatment, South Middlesex Correctional Center, MICHAEL SOUZA, Director of Security, SERGEANT LAUREN VINITSKY, Disciplinary Hearing Officer, Department of Corrections, SOUTH MIDDLESEX CORRECTIONAL CENTER (SMCC), JENNIFER TURGEON, MCI - Framingham Special Investigator and PAUL OXFORD, Chief Officer of Investigative Services
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOANNA M. SNYDER
Case Number: 19-1013
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Mail returned as undeliverable to Appellant Joanna M. Snyder. Copy of Correspondence sent on January 24, 2019. Forwarding address unknown. [19-1013] (ZN) [Entered: 02/20/2019 10:38 AM]
February 11, 2019 Mail returned as undeliverable to Party Joanna M. Snyder. Copy of Order entered February 4, 2019. Forwarded to 1428 West Berne Road Columbia Falls, MT 59912. [19-1013] (ZN) [Entered: 02/11/2019 04:52 PM]
February 4, 2019 Mail returned as undeliverable to Appellant Joanna M. Snyder. Copy of Correspondence (2) - January 24, 2019. Forwarded to 1428 West Berne Road Columbia Falls, MT 59912. [19-1013] (ZN) [Entered: 02/04/2019 04:32 PM]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by David J. Barron, Appellate Judge, denying motion for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Joanna M. Snyder. [19-1013] (CP) [Entered: 02/04/2019 10:48 AM]
February 1, 2019 DOCKET sheet sent to appellant. [19-1013] (CP) [Entered: 02/01/2019 12:14 PM]
February 1, 2019 LETTER sent to Appellant Joanna M. Snyder regarding the order issued this day. [19-1013] (CP) [Entered: 02/01/2019 12:09 PM]
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER directing appellant to file a corrected Transcript Report/Order Form by 02/15/2019. [19-1013] (CP) [Entered: 02/01/2019 10:54 AM]
January 24, 2019 PLRA LETTER issued. IFP was granted in district court. PLRA forms sent. PLRA response due 02/07/2019. [19-1013] (CP) [Entered: 01/24/2019 09:39 AM]
January 24, 2019 DOCKET sheet sent to appellant. [19-1013] (CP) [Entered: 01/24/2019 09:20 AM]
January 24, 2019 LETTER sent to Appellant Joanna M. Snyder in response to her recent correspondence received on January 22, 2019. [19-1013] (CP) [Entered: 01/24/2019 09:19 AM]
January 22, 2019 LETTER filed by Appellant Joanna M. Snyder concerning case opening. Certificate of service was not included. [19-1013] (CP) [Entered: 01/23/2019 11:53 AM]
January 22, 2019 PLEADING tendered: Transcript Report Order Form filed by Appellant Joanna M. Snyder. Certificate of service was not included. [19-1013] (CP) [Entered: 01/23/2019 11:50 AM]
January 22, 2019 MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Joanna M. Snyder. Certificate of service was not included. [19-1013] (CP) [Entered: 01/22/2019 04:06 PM]
January 9, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #98) filed by Appellant Joanna M. Snyder. Transcript Report/Order form due 01/23/2019. Fee due 01/23/2019. [19-1013] (CP) [Entered: 01/09/2019 10:36 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snyder v. SMCC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LYNN BISSONNETTE, Superintendent - MCI Framingham
Represented By: Kristin Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNKNOWN OFFICER, with initials D.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PETER RICE, Inner Perimeter Security
Represented By: Kristin Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER MARK SULLIVAN, MCI - Framingham Mailroom
Represented By: Kristin Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID DUPLIN, MCI - Framingham
Represented By: Kristin Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANGEL SID, Investigator - Office of Investigative Services Milford
Represented By: Kristin Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATRICK DOHERTY, MCI - Framingham
Represented By: Kristin Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARTIN BOTTARI, SMCC - Inner Perimeter Security
Represented By: Kristin Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LUIS S. SPENCER, Commissioner
Represented By: Kristin Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATRICK DEPALO, Deputy Superintendent - MCI Framingham
Represented By: Kristin Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LISA JACKSON, Superintendent
Represented By: Kristin Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KELLEY MURPHY, Correctional Program Officer
Represented By: Kristin Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REBECCA DONAHUE, Disciplinary Hearing Officer - Department of Corrections
Represented By: Kristin Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER MICHAEL ALVARADO, O.I.S.
Represented By: Kristin Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID FREDERICK, Inner Perimeter Security - MCI Framingham
Represented By: Kristin Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LYN MUISE, Director of Treatment, South Middlesex Correctional Center
Represented By: Kristin Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL SOUZA, Director of Security
Represented By: Kristin Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SERGEANT LAUREN VINITSKY, Disciplinary Hearing Officer, Department of Corrections
Represented By: Kristin Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SOUTH MIDDLESEX CORRECTIONAL CENTER (SMCC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JENNIFER TURGEON, MCI - Framingham Special Investigator
Represented By: Kristin Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAUL OXFORD, Chief Officer of Investigative Services
Represented By: Kristin Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOANNA M. SNYDER
Represented By: Joanna M. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?